Rothstein v. American Airlines, Inc.

Plaintiff: Steven Rothstein
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv02770
Filed: May 5, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Kendall
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2012 139 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/15/2012: Motion for pro hac vice counsel for leave to withdraw 138 is granted. Status hearing stricken for 6/18/2012and reset to and reset to 7/9/2012 @ 9:00 a.m. Entered by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/15/2012.Mailed notice(tsa, )
February 10, 2012 130 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/10/2012: The Court denies both Rothsteins and Americans motions (Docs. 100 and 113) without prejudice, to be considered only if American chooses not to remove the claim to the bankruptcy court. The parties shall appear at a status hearing on April 5, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. to report whether American will continue here or the bankruptcy court. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/10/2012.Mailed notice(tsa, )
June 30, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/30/2011.(tsa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothstein v. American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Rothstein
Represented By: Daniel A. Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Samuel Susina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?