Chicago Import, Inc. v. Amercan States Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Chicago Import, Inc.
Defendant: Amercan States Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2009cv02885
Filed: May 12, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Norgle
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2016 426 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 8/16/2016: Plaintiff's motion to alter or amend the judgment, 413 , is denied. Defendant's motion for judgment as a matter of law, a new trial, or remittitur, 417 , is denied. Terminate civil case. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, )
May 8, 2015 341 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, each party's motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Summary judgment is granted for Chicago Import on American States's sixth affirmative defense (insure d's neglect). Summary judgment is granted for American States on Count III of Chicago Import's complaint (bad-faith delay). In all other respects, the motions 323 and 327 are denied. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 5/8/2015. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
August 24, 2010 128 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Michael T. Mason on 8/24/2010.(rbf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chicago Import, Inc. v. Amercan States Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago Import, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald R. Rassin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amercan States Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?