Loufrani et al v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Plaintiff: Franklin Loufrani and The Smiley Company SPRL
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv03062
Filed: May 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7/20/2010 before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Status Conference. Court Reporter Contact Information: April Metzler, april.courtreporter@gmail.com, 419-787-1832.
March 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/19/2010 before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motion Hearing. Court Reporter Contact Information: April Metzler, april.courtreporter@gmail.com, 419-787-1832.
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman:Pursuant to parties' stipulation and order of dismissal #89 , the case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (keg, )
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Telephonic Magistrate Judge status hearing set for 6/20/2011 is stricken, stipulation and order of dismissal having been filed. The referral is terminated and the case is returned to the District Judge for further proceedings. Honorable Sheila Finnegan no longer referred to the case. Mailed notice. (is, )
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION of Dismissal and order - with prejudice (Baron, Steven)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Telephonic Magistrate Judge status hearing held on 6/10/2011 and continued to 6/20/2011 at 9:45 a.m. Parties report that settlement agreement has been finalized and one party has signed and the other party has affirmed that he will do so. Parties are to file a stipulation to dismiss prior to the next status hearing. The status hearing will be cancelled once the stipulation to dismiss has been filed. Mailed notice. (is, )
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Telephonic Magistrate Judge status hearing held on 5/31/2011 and continued to 6/10/2011 at 10:00 a.m. Parties anticipate that agreement will be finalized by next status. Mailed notice. (is, )
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Magistrate Judge Status hearing is reset to 5/31/2011 at 11:00 a.m. (telephonic) to allow the parties additional time to discuss settlement. Mailed notice. (is, )
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Magistrate Judge status hearing held on 4/28/2011 and continued to 5/12/2011 at 10:00 a.m. (telephonic). Parties report that they are close to finalizing settlement. Mailed notice. (is, )
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Magistrate Judge telephonic status hearing (off the record) is set for 4/28/2011 at 10:00 a.m. Parties are to initiate the conference call to Judge Finnegan. Mailed notice. (is, )
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Settlement conference held with counsel for both parties on 4/5/2011. Mailed notice. (is, )
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 3/25/2011. Telephonic Magistrate Judge Status hearing set for 4/5/2011 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (is, )
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Telephonic Magistrate Judge Status hearing set for 3/22/2011 is stricken. Magistrate Judge Status hearing is reset to 3/25/2011 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice. (is, )
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Magistrate Judge Telephonic Status hearing held on 3/1/2011 and continued to 3/22/2011 at 9:00 a.m. Parties report that they expect to have settlement agreement and related documentation completed by next status. Mailed notice. (is, )
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Magistrate Judge Telephonic Status hearing held on 2/15/2011 and continued to 3/1/2011 at 12:30 PM. Parties report that they have exchanged another draft of settlement agreement but require an additional 14 days to review it with their respective clients. Mailed notice. (is, )
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Magistrate Judge Telephonic Status hearing held on 1/14/2011 and continued to 2/15/2011 at 11:30 AM. Parties report that they have exchanged drafts of settlement agreement but require an additional 30 days to review and finalize the agreement. Mailed notice. (is, )
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Magistrate Judge telephonic status hearing held on 12/17/2010 and continued to 1/14/2011 at 10:30 AM. Parties are to report at the next status on progress in documenting settlement. Mailed notice. (is, )
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Magistrate Judge telephonic status hearing held on 12/9/2010 and continued to 12/17/2010 at 10:30 a.m. The parties have reached a settlement agreement in principle. Parties are to report at the next status on progress in preparing settlement documentation. Mailed notice. (is, )
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: The date and time as to the telephonic status conference is amended as follows: A telephonic status conference will be held with counsel on 12/9/2010 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice. (is, )
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Settlement conference held on 11/16/2010. Substantial progress made. Plaintiffs will send samples of holograms and proposed variations on designs 8 and 9 to Defendant. Defendant will determine its position on these remaining issues no later than 12/6/2010. If the parties reach agreement on these issues, counsel are to begin drafting settlement papers. A telephonic status conference will be held with counsel on 12/6/2010 at 10 a.m. Mailed notice. (is, )
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Telephonic Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 11/2/2010. Parties report that Plaintiff has sent a new written settlement demand to which Defendant expects to respond by 11/4/2010. If necessary, the parties are to appear for another settlement conference on 11/16/2010 at 10 a.m. Mailed notice. (is, )
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Settlement Conference set for 10/14/2010 is stricken, at the parties' request. Telephonic Magistrate Status hearing set for 11/2/2010 at 02:30 PM., to set a date for the continued settlement conference. Mailed notice. (is, )
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Settlement Conference set for 10/7/2010 is stricken. Settlement Conference is reset to 10/14/2010 at 10:30 AM., by agreement of the parties. Mailed notice. (is, )
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Settlement conference held on 9/28/2010. Parties will reconvene on 10/7/2010 at 10:30 a.m. to continue settlement discussions with Judge Finnegan. Mailed notice. (is, )
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STATUS Report - Joint Initial by Franklin Loufrani, The Smiley Company SPRL, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Baron, Steven)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Settlement Conference is reset to 9/28/2010 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice. (is, )
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Settlement conference held on 9/13/2010. Substantial progress made. No agreement reached. Parties will reconvene on 9/28/2010 at 12 p.m. for settlement conference with Judge Finnegan. Mailed notice. (is, )
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been reassigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. The parties aredirected to meet and discuss the status of the case. Please file a joint status report not exceeding 5 pages by 9/23/2010 (with a courtesy copy to the Courtroom Deputy, Room 1428). The Joint Status Report should contain the information found on the Courts webpage at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov located under District Judges, Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman, Case Management Procedures, Initial Status Conferences, Joint Status Report. All pending status or hearing dates before the previously assigned district judge are vacated. All other dates to stand pending further order.Mailed notice(air, )
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that, pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on August 23, 2010, the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman, therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED That the attached list of 264 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order shall become effective on Wednesday, September 8, 2010. Mailed notices.(td, )
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Settlement Conference is reset to 9/13/2010 at 02:00 PM., by agreement of the parties. Mailed notice. (is, )
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Settlement Conference set for 8/30/2010 is stricken, by agreement of the parties. Parties are to contact Judge Finnegan's courtroom deputy to set a new agreed upon settlement conference date. Mailed notice. (is, )
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Telephone Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 8/25/2010. Mailed notice. (is, )
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Telephone Magistrate Judge Status hearing set for 8/24/2010 is stricken. Telephone Magistrate Judge Status hearing set for 8/25/2010 at 09:15 AM. Mailed notice. (is, )
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Telephone Magistrate Judge Status hearing set for 8/24/2010 at 09:15 AM. Mailed notice. (is, )
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Settlement Conference set for 8/13/2010 is stricken. Settlement Conference is reset to 8/30/2010 at 01:00 PM., by agreement of the parties. Mailed notice. (is, )
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Status hearing held and continued to 8/30/2010 at 09:00 AM for a second report on settllement.Advised in open court (jms, )
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Settlement conference held on 7/19/2010. Substantial progress made. No agreement reached. Parties will reconvene on 8/13/2010 at 1 p.m. for settlement conference with Judge Finnegan if the case is not settled by the parties prior to this. Mailed notice. (is, )
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Defendant's telephonic request to reset the status hearing until after the settlement conference with the magistrate judge is granted. Status hearing is reset for 7/20/2010 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (jms, )
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Telephonic Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 6/14/2010. Settlement conference set for 7/19/2010 at 01:00 PM. Plaintiffs' counsel shall submit a written itemization of damages and settlement demand to defendant by 6/28/2010. Defendant's counsel shall submit a written offer to plaintiffs' counsel by 7/12/2010. Plaintiffs' counsel shall deliver or fax copies of all letters to Judge Finnegan's chambers by 7/13/2010. (For further details see Judge Finnegan's Standing Order for Settlement Conferences on the court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/judges.aspx.) Mailed notice. (is, )
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Telephonic Magistrate Judge Status hearing set for 6/14/2010 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice. (is, )
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: This case has been referred to Judge Finnegan to conduct a settlement conference. The parties shall jointly contact the courtroom deputy, Imelda Saccomonto (312/408-5110) by June 9, 2010 with mutually agreeable dates for a settlement conference and for an initial status hearing. The parties are directed to review and to comply with Judge Finnegan's Standing Order For Settlement Conferences. Copies are available in chambers or through Judge Finnegan's web page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice. (is, )
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER:Case referred to the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan in accordance with Internal Operating Procedure 14(B) I recuse myself from this case assigned to my calendar pursuant to Local Rule 72.1 or Local Criminal Rule 50.3(D) for the reasons specifically set forth : I own stock in Wal-Mart Company. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/3/10.(mjc, )
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE entry before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: This case has been referred to Judge Brown. Judge Brown is on calendar adjustment. Pursuant to IOP 19(g) the referral of this case shall be assigned by lot to another magistrate judge. Judge Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown no longer referred to the case.Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/26/10.(gcy, )
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: settlement conference.(jms, )Mailed notice.
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to compel #45 is denied without prejudice while the parties are pursuing settlement. Discovery is stayed pending settlement discussions with Magistrate Judge Brown. Status hearing date of 6/22/2010 is reset for 7/14/2010 at 09:00 AM for a report on settlement.Advised in open court (jms, )
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Motion by Natalie Anne Harris for presentment of motion to compel #45 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 5/19/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Harris, Natalie)
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM by Franklin Loufrani, The Smiley Company SPRL in support of motion to compel #45 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C - 1, #4 Exhibit C - 2, #5 Exhibit C - 3, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G)(Harris, Natalie)
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION by Plaintiffs Franklin Loufrani, The Smiley Company SPRL, Counter Defendants Franklin Loufrani, The Smiley Company SPRL to compel (Harris, Natalie)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Defendant's motion for extension of time to complete discovery #42 is granted; All fact discovery shall be completed by 6/15/2010. The parties shall comply with FRCP(26)(a)(2) by 6/30/10. Expert depositions shall be completed by 7/30/2010. Rebuttal expert disclosures pursuant to FRCP(26)(a)(2)shall be completed by 8/15/2010. All discovery, including rebuttal experts, shall be completed by 8/31/2010. Dispositive motions with supporting memoranda are to be filed by 9/30/2010. Responses are to be filed by 10/28/2010. Replies are due by 11/12/2010. Court will rule by mail. Status hearing set for 6/22/2010 at 09:00 AM for a report on whether the parties wish to have a settlement conference.Mailed notice (jms, )
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Motion by Robert Eliot Shapiro for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #42 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/15/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Shapiro, Robert)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc. for extension of time to complete discovery (Shapiro, Robert)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Status hearing date of 3/18/2010 is stricken.Mailed notice (jms, )
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to complete discovery #38 is granted. All fact discovery shall be completed by 4/15/2010. The parties shall comply with FRCP(26)(a)(2) by 4/30/10. Expert depositions shall be completed by 5/31/2010. Rebuttal expert disclosures pursuant to FRCP(26)(a)(2)shall be completed by 6/15/2010. All discovery, including rebuttal experts, shall be completed by 6/30/2010. Dispositive motions with supporting memoranda are to be filed by 7/30/2010. Responses are to be filed by 8/27/2010. Replies are due by 9/13/2010. Court will rule by mail.Mailed notice (jms, )
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Motion by Steven L. Baron for presentment of extension of time #38 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/25/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Baron, Steven)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION by Plaintiffs Franklin Loufrani, The Smiley Company SPRL, Counter Defendants Franklin Loufrani, The Smiley Company SPRL for extension of time of fact discovery deadline (Baron, Steven)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Status hearing date of 2/4/2010 is reset for 3/18/2010 at 09:00 AM for a report on whether the parties want a settlement conference.Mailed notice (jms, )
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ANSWER to counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses by Franklin Loufrani, The Smiley Company SPRL(Harris, Natalie)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Status hearing held and continued to 2/4/2010 at 09:00 AM. Defendant's oral motion for an extension of time to 12/4/2009 to answer or otherwise plead to the counterclaim is granted.Advised in open court (jms, )
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Defendant's request to reset status hearing of 11/24/2009 is granted without objection. Status hearing reset for 11/23/2009 at 9:00 AM.Mailed notice (tlp, )
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/12/2009:Mailed notice(slb, )
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Plaintiffs' motion to dismiss counts II-IV of Wal-Mart's counterclaim per rule 12(b)(6) is denied. Mailed notice (slb, )
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY by Plaintiffs Franklin Loufrani, The Smiley Company SPRL, Counter Defendants Franklin Loufrani, The Smiley Company SPRL to motion to dismiss #23 counts II-VI of Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Counterclaims (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Baron, Steven)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. in Opposition to motion to dismiss #23 Counts II-VI of Wal-Mart's Counterclaim (Sloane, Wendi)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Status hearing held and continued to 11/24/2009 at 09:00 AM. The court adopts the parties' proposed discovery schedule. FRCP 26(a)(1) disclosures are to be completed by 10/31/2009. All fact discovery shall be completed by 2/28/2010. The parties shall comply with FRCP(26)(a)(2) by 3/15/10. Expert depositions shall be completed by 4/15/2010. Rebuttal expert disclosures pursuant to FRCP(26)(a)(2)shall be completed by 5/2/2010. All discovery, including rebuttal experts, shall be completed by 6/2/2010. Dispositive motions with supporting memoranda are to be filed by 6/30/2010. Responses are to be filed by 7/30/2010. Replies are due by 8/13/2010. Court will rule by mail. By agreement of the parties, any appeals shall be made to the Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit.Mailed notice (jms, )
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE by Franklin Loufrani, The Smiley Company SPRL re memorandum #27 (Baron, Steven)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM by Franklin Loufrani, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., The Smiley Company SPRL Regarding the Appropriate Standard of Review and Procedures under Section 21(b)(1) of the Lanham Act - Joint Bench (Baron, Steven)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Plaintiffs' motion to dismiss Counts II-VI of the counterclaim #23 is taken under advisement. Response is to be filed by 9/23/2009. Reply is to be filed by 9/30/2009. Court will rule by mail. Mailed notice (jms, )
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by Steven L. Baron for presentment of motion to dismiss #23 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/9/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Baron, Steven)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM by Franklin Loufrani, The Smiley Company SPRL in support of motion to dismiss #23 (Baron, Steven)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION by Plaintiffs Franklin Loufrani, The Smiley Company SPRL, Counter Defendants Franklin Loufrani, The Smiley Company SPRL to dismiss counts II-IV of Wal-Mart's counterclaim per rule 12(b)(6) (Baron, Steven)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Status hearing held and continued to 9/23/2009 at 09:00 AM. The parties are to file a joint discovery schedule and a bench memorandum regarding the standard of review and procedures as outlined in open court by 9/16/2009. Advised in open court (jms, )
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STATUS Report - Joint Initial by Franklin Loufrani, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., The Smiley Company SPRL (Baron, Steven)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to 9/2/2009 to answer or otherwise plead to the counterclaim #17 is granted; plaintiff's motion to reset the initial status hearing #17 is granted in part. Initial status hearing date of 8/11/2009 is reset to 8/25/2009 at 9:00 am. The parties are to file the joint status report by 8/19/2009. Mailed notice (jms, )
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Re- NOTICE of Motion by Natalie Anne Harris for presentment of extension of time #17 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/5/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Harris, Natalie)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Natalie Anne Harris for presentment of extension of time #17 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/3/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Harris, Natalie)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION by Counter Defendants Franklin Loufrani, The Smiley Company SPRL for extension of time (partially Agreed, partially Unopposed) (Harris, Natalie)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Sloane, Wendi)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim for Review of Decision of Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. against Franklin Loufrani, The Smiley Company SPRL. by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sloane, Wendi)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Initial Status hearing set for 8/11/2009 at 09:00 AM. Joint Status Report due by 8/5/2009. (See Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about status reports). The parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (jms, )
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Defndant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to 7/13/2009 to answer or otherwise plead is granted.Mailed notice (jms, )
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca D Ray for presentment of extension of time #11 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/15/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Ray, Rebecca)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc. for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead or Move (Unopposed) (Ray, Rebecca)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc. by Robert Eliot Shapiro (Shapiro, Robert)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc. by Wendi E. Sloane (Sloane, Wendi)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc. by Rebecca D Ray (Ray, Rebecca)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Franklin Loufrani, The Smiley Company SPRL as to Wal-Mart Stores Inc. on 5/22/2009, answer due 6/11/2009. (Baron, Steven)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Franklin Loufrani, The Smiley Company SPRL by Lindsay Harvey LaVine. (gcy, )
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Franklin Loufrani, The Smiley Company SPRL by Steven L. Baron. (gcy, )
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Franklin Loufrani, The Smiley Company SPRL by Natalie Anne Harris. (gcy, )
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, )
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for De Novo Review of decision of Trademark Trial and Appeal Board filed by Franklin Loufrani, The Smiley Company SPRL; Filing fee $ 350. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(gcy, )
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (gcy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loufrani et al v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Loufrani
Represented By: Steven L Baron
Represented By: Lindsay Harvey LaVine
Represented By: Natalie Anne Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Smiley Company SPRL
Represented By: Steven L Baron
Represented By: Lindsay Harvey LaVine
Represented By: Natalie Anne Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Represented By: Robert Eliot Shapiro
Represented By: Rebecca D Ray
Represented By: Wendi E. Sloane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?