Harris v. State of Illinois et al

Plaintiff: Pamela Harris
Defendant: State of Illinois, Roger E. Walker, Jr, Debbie Denning and Mary Sigler
Case Number: 1:2009cv03071
Filed: May 21, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Joan H. Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2014 132 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 6/18/2014: Defendants' motion for summary judgment 112 is granted on all claims other than (1) Harris's claim for retaliation in violation of Title VII with respect to her termi nation and (2) her Ethics Act claim. In light of the significantly narrowed scope of this suit, the parties should consult regarding a consensual resolution of the remaining claims. Parties will report on the status of their discussions at a status hearing on July 1, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice(mad, )
November 9, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 11/9/2010:Mailed notice(mad, )
January 12, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 1/12/2010:Mailed notice(mad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. State of Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Harris
Represented By: James Bryan Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger E. Walker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Denning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Sigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?