Terry v. Cook County Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Shanika Terry
Defendant: Cook County Department of Corrections, Cermak Health Services of Cook County, Cook County, Thomas Dart, Cook County Sheriff, Cook County Bureau of Health, Cook County Jail, David Fagus and Other Unknown Defendants
Case Number: 1:2009cv03093
Filed: May 22, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2011 171 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 1/13/2011: For the reasons set out below, plaintiff's Second Motion to Take an Excess of Ten Depositions 153 is granted in a part and denied in part; Defendant Dart's Reques t for a Protective Order Barring his Deposition 130 is granted; and Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Answer 26(a)(2) 157 is granted. The dates for the completion of fact discovery and plaintiff's expert disclosures and reports will be set at the status hearing on 1/18/11. [For further details see minute order.] Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
July 8, 2010 100 Opinion or Order of the Court Motion to bifurcate 70 is denied; Motion to stay 70 is denied; WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 7/8/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )
January 22, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 1/22/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry v. Cook County Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanika Terry
Represented By: Michael Rothmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County Department of Corrections
Represented By: Edgar L. Berre, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cermak Health Services of Cook County
Represented By: Edgar L. Berre, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County
Represented By: Edgar L. Berre, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dart
Represented By: Edgar L. Berre, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County Sheriff
Represented By: Edgar L. Berre, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County Bureau of Health
Represented By: Edgar L. Berre, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County Jail
Represented By: Edgar L. Berre, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Fagus
Represented By: Edgar L. Berre, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Unknown Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?