Empress Casino Joliet Corporation et al v. Blagojevich et al

Plaintiff: Empress Casino Joliet Corporation, Des Plaines Development Limited Partnership, Hollywood Casino-Aurora, Inc. and Elgin Riverboat Resort-Riverboat Casino
Defendant: Rod Blagojevich, Friends of Blagojevich, John Johnston, Balmoral Racing Club, Inc., Maywood Park Trotting Association, Inc., Arlington Park Racecourse, LLC., Fairmount Park, Inc. and Hawthorne Race Course, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv03585
Filed: June 12, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Will
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2015 367 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/10/2015: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies defendants' motion for judgment as a matter of law and for a new trial [dkt. no. 341]. (mk)
November 28, 2014 321 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/28/2014: The parties' motions in limine [dkt. nos. 306 & 307] are ruled upon in accordance with this decision. Counsel are expected to carefully inform their witnesses regarding the Court's rulings, so as to avoid introduction of evidence that the Court has excluded. (mk)
August 19, 2013 256 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/19/2013: By this corrected decision, the Court corrects two scrivener's errors in its 8/7/2013 decision, located at pages 7 (third line from the bottom) and 15 (seventh line from the top). (mk)
August 7, 2013 250 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/7/2013. Mailed notice(mgh, )
December 7, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/7/2009.Mailed notice(vcf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Empress Casino Joliet Corporation et al v. Blagojevich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Empress Casino Joliet Corporation
Represented By: Blair Robert Zanzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Des Plaines Development Limited Partnership
Represented By: Blair Robert Zanzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollywood Casino-Aurora, Inc.
Represented By: Blair Robert Zanzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elgin Riverboat Resort-Riverboat Casino
Represented By: Blair Robert Zanzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Blagojevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friends of Blagojevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balmoral Racing Club, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maywood Park Trotting Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlington Park Racecourse, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairmount Park, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawthorne Race Course, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?