Lakeview Collection, LLC v. Bank of America National Association

Plaintiff: Lakeview Collection, LLC
Defendant: Bank of America National Association
Case Number: 1:2009cv03933
Filed: June 30, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Blanche M. Manning
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2013 322 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, the Bank's motions to strike and for partial summary judgment are denied. 237 256 282 . The Bank's motion regarding the recent sale of the property to Target, Lakeview's mot ion for leave to take a Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of the Bank regarding its commercial lending practices, and Lakeview's motion to take limited discovery regarding witnesses recently identified in the Bank's untimely witness disclosures are also denied. 297 304 306 (See order for further detail) Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/29/2013:Mailed notice(srn, )
October 11, 2012 207 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/11/2012: Defendant's motion to dismiss or for judgment on the pleadings 172 is denied. Status hearing set for 11/13/12 is stricken and reset to 10/24/12 at 8:30 a.m. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
March 17, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 3/17/2011: The defendant's motion to dismiss counts II and III of the amended complaint [64-1] is denied. The defendant shall file its response to the complaint by April 19, 2011. The parties shall report for a status hearing on June 16, 2011.Mailed notice(rth, )
December 4, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 12/4/2009:Mailed notice(rth, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lakeview Collection, LLC v. Bank of America National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America National Association
Represented By: Lawrence Mitchell Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeview Collection, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?