Blockowicz et al v. Williams et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: David Blockowicz, Mary Blockowicz and Lisa Blockowicz
Defendant: Joseph David Williams and Michelle Ramey
Case Number: 1:2009cv03955
Filed: June 30, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: James F. Holderman
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2010 45 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal 38 (USCA no. 10-1167) consisting of one volume of transcripts. (jj, )
March 26, 2010 44 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/10/09 before the Honorable James F. Holderman. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway@312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/16/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2010. (Conway, Colleen)
February 9, 2010 43 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by David Blockowicz, Lisa Blockowicz, Mary Blockowicz.(Poor Quality Original - Paper Document on File.) (smm)
February 8, 2010 42 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 38 (USCA no. 10-1167) (dj, )
January 21, 2010 41 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 38 ; USCA Case No. 10-1167. (vcf, )
January 21, 2010 40 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 38 . Notified counsel (dj, )
January 21, 2010 39 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record (dj, )
January 20, 2010 38 NOTICE of appeal by David Blockowicz, Lisa Blockowicz, Mary Blockowicz regarding orders 36 , 37 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-4452692. (Nelson, Cameron)
December 21, 2009 37 Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 12/21/2009: Mailed notice (am)
December 21, 2009 36 MINUTE entry before Honorable James F. Holderman: ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion for third party enforcement of injunction 20 is denied. Mailed notice (am)
December 1, 2009 35 SUR-REPLY by Plaintiffs David Blockowicz, Mary Blockowicz, Lisa Blockowicz to motion for miscellaneous relief 20 in support of motion for third party enforcement of injunction (Nelson, Cameron)
November 23, 2009 34 NOTICE by Xcentric Ventures, LLC re sur-reply 33 to Motion for Third Party Enforcement of Injunction (Connelly, Matthew)
November 23, 2009 33 SUR-REPLY by Movant Xcentric Ventures, LLC to motion for miscellaneous relief 20 (Connelly, Matthew)
November 16, 2009 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James F. Holderman: The court has reviewed plaintiffs David Blockowicz, Mary Blockowicz, and Lisa Blockowicz's (collectively "Blockowiczs") "Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Third Party Enforcement of Injunction" 31 . Based on that review, the court requests that third party, Xcentric Ventures, LLC ("Xcentric") file a sur-reply to address the Blockowiczs' newly raised argument that Xcentric is in privity with defendants Joseph David Williams and Michelle Ramey based on a contractual relationship. (See Pls.' Reply 2-4.) Xcentric is to file its sur-reply by November 23, 2009. The Blockowiczs have until December 1, 2009 to file a final reply. Mailed notice (am)
November 13, 2009 31 MEMORANDUM by David Blockowicz, Mary Blockowicz, Lisa Blockowicz in support of motion for miscellaneous relief 20 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P, # 2 Exhibit Q, # 3 Exhibit R, # 4 Exhibit S)(Nelson, Cameron)
November 10, 2009 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James F. Holderman: On plaintiffs' motion for third party enforcement of injunction 20 , reply due by 11/13/2009. Third Party Xcentric Ventures, LLC to file by 11/17/2009 at 5:00 P.M. a statement regarding the need for a sur-reply brief. If necessary, a sur-reply will due by 11/23/2009. Mailed notice (am)
November 9, 2009 29 NOTICE by Xcentric Ventures, LLC re Response 28 to Motion for Third Party Enforcement of Injunction (Connelly, Matthew)
November 9, 2009 28 RESPONSE by Movant Xcentric Ventures, LLC to motion for miscellaneous relief 20 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Connelly, Matthew)
November 5, 2009 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James F. Holderman: Movant Xcentric Ventures, LLC's motion to continue Hearing Scheduled for November 5, 2009 and Allow Time for Xcentric to File its Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce the Injunction Against Xcentric 24 is granted; response to plaintiffs' motion for third party enforcement of injunction 20 due by 11/9/2009. Hearing on plaintiffs' motion for third party enforcement is set for 11/10/2009 at 1:30 PM. All parties and attorneys involved in the case shall appear for hearing on 11/10/2009 at 1:30 PM. Mailed notice (am)
November 3, 2009 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Xcentric Ventures, LLC by Garrett Cleland Carter (Carter, Garrett)
November 3, 2009 25 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Patrick Connelly for presentment of motion to continue, 24 before Honorable James F. Holderman on 11/5/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Connelly, Matthew)
November 3, 2009 24 MOTION by Movant Xcentric Ventures, LLC to continue Hearing Scheduled for November 5, 2009 and Allow Time for Xcentric to File its Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce the Injunction Against Xcentric (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Connelly, Matthew)
November 3, 2009 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Non-Party Xcentric Ventures, LLC (Connelly, Matthew)
October 29, 2009 22 MEMORANDUM by David Blockowicz, Mary Blockowicz, Lisa Blockowicz in support of motion for miscellaneous relief 20 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-I, # 2 Exhibit J-O)(Nelson, Cameron)
October 29, 2009 21 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron Matthew Nelson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 20 before Honorable James F. Holderman on 11/5/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Nelson, Cameron)
October 29, 2009 20 MOTION by Plaintiffs David Blockowicz, Mary Blockowicz, Lisa Blockowicz FOR THIRD PARTY ENFORCEMENT OF INJUNCTION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Cameron)
October 6, 2009 19 PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 10/6/2009: Mailed notice (am)
October 6, 2009 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James F. Holderman: Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment, permanent injunction and an award of damages 16 is granted. Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction 4 is moot. ENTER PERMANENT INJUNCTION: Defendants shall immediately remove all postings identified in plaintiffs' complaint and motion for preliminary injunction from any and all websites where those statements are currently published, and defendants will refrain from republishing those statements. Further, plaintiffs are awarded twenty thousand dollars ($20,000) in nominal, combined damages for all three Counts of plaintiffs complaint. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (am)
October 1, 2009 17 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron Matthew Nelson for presentment of motion for default judgment, motion for permanent injunction, motion for miscellaneous relief,,, 16 before Honorable James F. Holderman on 10/6/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Nelson, Cameron)
October 1, 2009 16 MOTION by Plaintiffs David Blockowicz, Mary Blockowicz, Lisa Blockowicz for default judgment as to Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, MOTION by Plaintiffs David Blockowicz, Mary Blockowicz, Lisa Blockowicz for permanent injunction, MOTION by Plaintiffs David Blockowicz, Mary Blockowicz, Lisa Blockowicz AWARD OF DAMAGES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Nelson, Cameron)
August 20, 2009 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James F. Holderman:Motion hearing held on 8/20/2009 regarding Plaintiffs' motion for 12 for service by special order or, alternative, for leave to conduct limited discovery. The plaintiffs' motion for service by special order is granted. Motion terminated. The Court deems the plaintiffs attempts at service by certified mail and electronic mail adequate service for purposes of this case, and considers today as service having been effectuated. Hearing on prove up is set for 10/6/2009 at 09:00 AM. Documentation is to be filed by 10/1/09. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
August 17, 2009 14 NOTICE of Motion by Cameron Matthew Nelson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 12 before Honorable James F. Holderman on 8/20/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Nelson, Cameron)
August 17, 2009 13 DECLARATION of Cameron M. Nelson regarding motion for miscellaneous relief 12 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Nelson, Cameron)
August 17, 2009 12 MOTION by Plaintiffs David Blockowicz, Mary Blockowicz, Lisa Blockowicz FOR SERVICE BY SPECIAL ORDER OR, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY (Nelson, Cameron)
July 1, 2009 11 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Joseph David Williams, Michelle Ramey. (vcf, )
July 1, 2009 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable James F. Holderman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. (li, )
June 30, 2009 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs David Blockowicz, Mary Blockowicz, Lisa Blockowicz by Kevin John O'Shea (O'Shea, Kevin)
June 30, 2009 9 EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs David Blockowicz, Mary Blockowicz, Lisa Blockowicz A-O In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-O Continued)(Nelson, Cameron)
June 30, 2009 8 DECLARATION of Lisa Blockowicz regarding motion for preliminary injunction 4 (Nelson, Cameron)
June 30, 2009 7 DECLARATION of David Blockowicz regarding motion for preliminary injunction 4 (Nelson, Cameron)
June 30, 2009 6 DECLARATION of Cameron M. Nelson regarding motion for preliminary injunction 4 (Nelson, Cameron)
June 30, 2009 5 MEMORANDUM by David Blockowicz, Mary Blockowicz, Lisa Blockowicz in support of motion for preliminary injunction 4 (Nelson, Cameron)
June 30, 2009 4 MOTION by Plaintiffs David Blockowicz, Mary Blockowicz, Lisa Blockowicz for preliminary injunction (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Preliminary Injunction)(Nelson, Cameron)
June 30, 2009 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs David Blockowicz, Mary Blockowicz, Lisa Blockowicz by Cameron Matthew Nelson (Nelson, Cameron)
June 30, 2009 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Nelson, Cameron)
June 30, 2009 1 COMPLAINT filed by David Blockowicz, Mary Blockowicz, Lisa Blockowicz; Y. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 07520000000003889361.(Nelson, Cameron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blockowicz et al v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Blockowicz
Represented By: Kevin John O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Blockowicz
Represented By: Kevin John O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Blockowicz
Represented By: Kevin John O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph David Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?