Catledge v. City Of Chicago et al

Plaintiff: Lee Catledge
Defendant: City Of Chicago, Chicago Police Department, Plain Clothes female Detective in unmarked police car and (2nd) Detective in marked police car from same 012 District Monroe
Case Number: 1:2009cv05065
Filed: August 18, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Samuel Der-Yeghiayan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2016 272 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order (See 264 ):The Court's memorandum opinion of 12/15/15 contained a statement in the opening paragraph that was inconsistent with the ruling. As the balance of that opinion, the docket entry, and the separat e judgment indicate, the Court granted the defendants' motion for summary judgment in full. The corrected opinion issued today removes the erroneous language from the opening paragraph and replaces it with an accurate summary of the ruling. No further changes have been made and the substance of the ruling is unchanged. ENTER CORRECTED MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 1/15/2016. Mailed notice(air, )
December 15, 2015 264 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: The defendants' motion for summary judgment 254 is granted for the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion. Final judgment will be entered for the defendants. This matter is terminated. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 12/15/2015. Mailed notice(air, )
February 26, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 2/26/2013:Mailed notice(air, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Catledge v. City Of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Catledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plain Clothes female Detective in unmarked police car
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (2nd) Detective in marked police car from same 012 District Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?