Gayden v. Mariano (Star # 6691) et al
Plaintiff: Isaac Gayden
Defendant: Officer Mariano (Star # 6691) and City of Chicago
Case Number: 1:2009cv07557
Filed: December 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 9/7/2010:Mailed notice(srn, )
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/31/2010:Mailed notice(srn, )
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/8/2010:Mailed notice(srn, )
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 2/12/2010:Mailed notice(srn, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gayden v. Mariano (Star # 6691) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Gayden
Represented By: Brendan Shiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Mariano (Star # 6691)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?