Cable v. Agence France-Presse et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Wayne Cable
Defendant: Agence France-Presse and Does I through V
Case Number: 1:2009cv08031
Filed: December 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Blanche M. Manning
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: On defendant's motion for relief from order 28 , response due by 8/6/2010. Reply due by 8/13/2010. Ruling by mail.Mailed notice (rth, )
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion by Joshua J Kaufman for presentment of motion for reconsideration, motion for relief,, 28 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 7/29/2010 at 11:00 AM. (Kaufman, Joshua)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM by Agence France-Presse in support of motion for reconsideration, motion for relief,, 28 (Kaufman, Joshua)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION by Defendant Agence France-Presse for reconsideration regarding order on motion to dismiss, written opinion, set hearings,,, 25 (Kaufman, Joshua)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file sur-reply instanter 22 is denied.Mailed notice (rth, )
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Arlander Keys pursuant to Local Rule 72.1. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/21/2010. (ber, )
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 7/20/2010: For the reasons stated below, Agence France Presses motion to dismiss 16 is denied. This case is referred to the magistrate judge for purposes of supervising discovery, ruling on all non-dispositive motions and participating in settlement discussions at the appropriate time. Status is set for August 26, 2010, at 11 a.m. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice (ber, )
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file sur-reply instanter 22 is taken under advisement. No appearance is required on 7/20/2010.Mailed notice (rth, )
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by Mark H. Barinholtz for presentment of motion for leave to file 22 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 7/20/2010 at 11:00 AM. (Barinholtz, Mark)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION by Plaintiff Wayne Cable for leave to file Sur-reply Instanter (Barinholtz, Mark)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY by Defendant Agence France-Presse to motion to dismiss 16 , response in opposition to motion 20 (Kaufman, Joshua)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE by Wayne Cablein Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Agence France-Presse to dismiss 16 (Barinholtz, Mark)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Application for Joshua Kaufman to appear pro hac vice 15 is granted. On defendant's motion to dismiss 16 , response due by 6/24/2010. Reply due by 7/8/2010. Ruling by mail. Status hearing set to 6/3/2010 is stricken. New dates, as necessary, will be set when the court rules on the motion to dismiss.Mailed notice (rth, )
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Joshua J Kaufman for presentment of motion to dismiss 17 , motion to dismiss 16 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 6/3/2010 at 11:00 AM. (Kaufman, Joshua)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Defendant Agence France-Presse to dismiss Memorandum in Support of Motion (Kaufman, Joshua) Modified on 6/1/2010 (ber, ).
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Agence France-Presse to dismiss (Kaufman, Joshua)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-4851126. (Kaufman, Joshua)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Defendant Agence France-Presse motion for extension of time until 5/31/2010 in which to respond to plaintiff's complaint is granted. The status hearing scheduled for 5/20/2010 is reset to 6/3/2010 at 11:00a.m. No court appearance required on 5/6/2010 and 5/20/2010. Mailed notice (slb, )
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel A. Cummings for presentment of extension of time 12 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 5/6/2010 at 11:00 AM. (Cummings, Daniel)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Agence France-Presse for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Cummings, Daniel)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Agence France-Presse by Daniel A. Cummings (Cummings, Daniel)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning:Status hearing held and continued to 5/20/2010 at 11:00a.m. Mailed notice (slb, )
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Agence France-Presse. (mb, )
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Status hearing held on 2/25/2010. Status hearing set for 4/15/2010 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (rth, )
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Status hearing set for 2/25/2010 at 11:00 AM. Plaintiff's counsel should be prepared to advise the court regarding the progress of efforts to serve the defendants. Mailed notice (rth, )
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Agence France-Presse. (ber, )
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Agence France-Presse. (ber, )
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wayne Cable by Mark H. Barinholtz (Barinholtz, Mark)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Barinholtz, Mark)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Wayne Cable; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-4394619. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Barinholtz, Mark)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Blanche M. Manning. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Arlander Keys. (kjd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cable v. Agence France-Presse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Cable
Represented By: Mark H. Barinholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agence France-Presse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I through V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?