Convergence Aviation, Ltd. et al v. Dallas Airmotive, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Convergence Aviation, Ltd., Image Air of Southwest Florida, L.C. and Onala Aviation, LLC
Defendant: Dallas Airmotive, Inc., United Technologies Corporation, Pratt & Whitney Canada Corporation and JetProp, LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv02021
Filed: April 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald A. Guzman
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 350 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Defendant has filed a motion for summary judgment on Count IV of plaintiffs' complaint, which alleges spoliation of evidence. Defendant argues both that this claim is barred under the economic loss doctrine - known as the Moorman doctrine in Illinois - and that this claim cannot survive because the law requires a concurrent products liability claim to present a spoliation claim. We find that Count IV is not barred by the Moorman doctrine and the claim does not fail on a procedural basis because we hereby grant plaintiffs' request to re-plead their products liability claim. Defendant's motion is denied [dkt. 327]. Signed by the Honorable Susan E. Cox on 11/13/2013. Mailed notice. (np, )
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 315 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Susan E. Cox on 5/9/13: Defendant's motion with respect to production of settlement documents is granted [dkt. 300]. (For further details see minute order). Mailed notice (vkd, )
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Susan E. Cox on 2/29/12: Mailed notice (vkd, )
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Susan E. Cox on 4/7/2011: (vkd, )
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 119 WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 10/26/2010: For the reasons provided herein, the Court denies defendant JetPROP, LLC's motion for protective order [doc. no. 115 ]. [For further details see written opinion.] Mailed notice (ber, )
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 8/10/2010: For the reasons provided herein, the Court denies Defendant Jetprop, LLC's motion for protective order (doc. no. 78 ). [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice (ber, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Convergence Aviation, Ltd. et al v. Dallas Airmotive, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Airmotive, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Wilson Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratt & Whitney Canada Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetProp, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Convergence Aviation, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Image Air of Southwest Florida, L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onala Aviation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?