Groupon, Inc. v. Groupon Pty. Ltd. et al Featured Case

U.S.-based Groupon sues Australian defendants Groupon Pty. Ltd. and Scoopon Pty., Ltd. for cybersquatting and trademark infringement.

Plaintiff: Groupon, Inc.
Defendant: Groupon Pty. Ltd. and Scoopon Pty., Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2010cv05634
Filed: September 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2011 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before Honorable William J. Hibbler: Stipulation and Joint Motion for dismissal without prejudice and without costs or attorney's fees 37 is granted. All pending dates and motions are terminated as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (jdh)
July 20, 2011 Filing 37 STIPULATION and Joint Motion for Dismissal by Plaintiff Groupon, Inc. (Pine, Jeffrey) (Docket text Modified by clerk's office on 7/21/2011 (ca, ).
June 21, 2011 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before Honorable William J. Hibbler: Plaintiff's Motion for leave to exceed page limit for its memorandum in opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss or in ther alternative to stay proceedings, not to exceed 22 pages 31 is granted. Mailed notice (jdh)
June 16, 2011 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Jeffrey A. Pine regarding memorandum in opposition to motion 33 (Schindler, Michelle)
June 16, 2011 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Matthew Goodman regarding memorandum in opposition to motion 33 (Schindler, Michelle)
June 16, 2011 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM by Groupon, Inc. in Opposition to motion to dismiss or in the alternative to stay proceedings 18 (Schindler, Michelle) (Docket text Modified by clerk's office on 6/17/2011 (ca, ).
June 16, 2011 Filing 32 NOTICE of Motion by Michelle Kramer Schindler for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 31 before Honorable William J. Hibbler on 6/22/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Schindler, Michelle)
June 16, 2011 Filing 31 MOTION by Plaintiff Groupon, Inc. for leave to file excess pages for its Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Stay Proceedings (Schindler, Michelle)
June 9, 2011 Filing 30 SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of Hezi Leibovich regarding motion to dismiss 18 or in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings (McGrath, William) (Docket text Modified by clerk's office on 6/10/2011 (ca, ).
May 19, 2011 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before Honorable William J. Hibbler: Motion hearing held on 5/19/2011 regarding motion to dismiss 18 , motion for leave to file excess pages 22 . Defendants' Motion to dismiss 18 is taken under advisement. Defendants' Motion for leave to file excess pages, not to exceed 17 pages 22 is granted. Plaintiff to respond by 6/16/2011. Defendants to reply by 7/15/2011. Ruling by mail. Status hearing date of 6/15/2011 and date for submission of joint proposed discovery schedule are vacated pending disposition of the motion to dismiss. Mailed notice (jdh)
May 16, 2011 Filing 28 ALIAS SUMMONS Returned Executed by Groupon, Inc. as to Groupon Pty. Ltd. on 4/1/2011, answer due 4/22/2011 (Different address) (Schindler, Michelle) (Docket text Modified by clerk's office on 5/17/2011 (ca, ).
May 16, 2011 Filing 27 ALIAS SUMMONS Returned Executed by Groupon, Inc as to Scoopon Pty. Ltd on 4/1/2011, answer due 4/22/2011 (Different address) (Schindler, Michelle) (Docket text Modified by clerk's office on 5/17/2011 (ca, ).
May 16, 2011 Filing 26 ALIAS SUMMONS Returned Executed by Groupon, Inc. as to Groupon Pty. Ltd. on 4/1/2011, answer due 4/22/2011. (Schindler, Michelle) (Docket text Modified by clerk's office on 5/17/2011 (ca, ).
May 16, 2011 Filing 25 ALIAS SUMMONS Returned Executed by Groupon, Inc. as to Scoopon Pty., Ltd. on 4/1/2011, answer due 4/22/2011. (Schindler, Michelle) (Docket text Modified by clerk's office on 5/17/2011 (ca, ).
May 16, 2011 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Groupon, Inc. by Michelle Kramer Schindler (Schindler, Michelle)
May 12, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by William T. McGrath for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 22 before Honorable William J. Hibbler on 5/19/2011 at 09:30 AM. (McGrath, William)
May 12, 2011 Filing 22 MOTION by Defendant Scoopon Pty., Ltd. for leave to exceed page limit for their motion to dismiss memoranda of law (McGrath, William) (Docket text Modified by clerk's office on 5/13/2011 (ca, ).
May 12, 2011 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Hezi Leibovich in Support of Defendants' motion to dismiss 18 (McGrath, William) (Docket text Modified by clerk's office on 5/13/2011 (ca, ).
May 12, 2011 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM by Scoopon Pty., Ltd. in support of motion to dismiss 18 or in the Alternative to Stay Proceedings (McGrath, William)
May 9, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by William T. McGrath for presentment of motion to dismiss 18 before Honorable William J. Hibbler on 5/19/2011 at 09:30 AM. (McGrath, William)
May 9, 2011 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant Scoopon Pty., Ltd. to dismiss OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY PROCEEDINGS (McGrath, William)
April 20, 2011 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before Honorable William J. Hibbler: Defendants' Motion to extend time until 5/9/2011 to answer or otherwise plead 15 is granted. Status hearing date of 6/15/2011 to stand. Parties to submit joint proposed discovery schedule to the Court by 6/13/2011. Mailed notice (jdh)
April 18, 2011 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by William T. McGrath for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 15 before Honorable William J. Hibbler on 4/26/2011 at 09:30 AM. (McGrath, William)
April 18, 2011 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Scoopon Pty., Ltd. to extend time to answer or otherwise plead (McGrath, William) (Docket text Modified by Clerk's office on 4/19/2011 (ca, ).
April 18, 2011 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Scoopon Pty., Ltd. by Christopher William Schneider (Schneider, Christopher)
April 18, 2011 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Scoopon Pty., Ltd. by William T. McGrath (McGrath, William)
March 1, 2011 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before Honorable William J. Hibbler: Plaintiff's Motion for extension of time until 5/2/2011 to serve summons and complaint 9 is granted. Status hearing set for 6/15/11 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (jdh)
February 23, 2011 Filing 11 ALIAS Summons Issued, four originals and four copies as to Groupon Pty. Ltd., Scoopon Pty., Ltd. (Two separate addresses in Australia) (ca, ).
February 23, 2011 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey A Pine for presentment of extension of time 9 before Honorable William J. Hibbler on 3/2/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Pine, Jeffrey)
February 23, 2011 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Groupon, Inc. for extension of time to serve summons and complaint (Pine, Jeffrey)
January 28, 2011 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued, two originals and two copies as to Defendants Groupon Pty. Ltd., Scoopon Pty., Ltd. (ca, ).
January 12, 2011 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before Honorable William J. Hibbler:Motion by Plaintiff Groupon, Inc. for extension of time to serve summons and complaint 5 is granted. Leave is granted for an additional sixty(60) days, pursuant to Rule 4(m), to serve Defendants with the Summons and Complaint.Mailed notice (tlp, )
January 4, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey A Pine for presentment of extension of time 5 before Honorable William J. Hibbler on 1/12/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Pine, Jeffrey)
January 4, 2011 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Groupon, Inc. for extension of time to serve summons and complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter requesting waiver, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendants' letter response re waiver)(Pine, Jeffrey)
September 7, 2010 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable William J. Hibbler. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila Finnegan. (ef, )
September 3, 2010 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Groupon, Inc. by Jeffrey A Pine (Pine, Jeffrey)
September 3, 2010 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Pine, Jeffrey)
September 3, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Trademark Infringement, Unfair Competition, Dilution, Consumer Fraud, Deceptive Trade Practices and Copyright Infringment filed by Groupon, Inc. ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-5188078. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Exhibit D-F, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Supplement Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, # 5 Supplement Notice of Claims Involving Patents or Trademarks, # 6 Supplement Attorney Appearance Form)(Pine, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Groupon, Inc. v. Groupon Pty. Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Groupon, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A Pine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groupon Pty. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scoopon Pty., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?