Motorola Mobility, Inc. v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case

Motorola subsidiary Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s patent infringement lawsuit against Apple, Inc. alleging violations of 6 patents. This is one of 3 patent infringement lawsuits that Motorola filed against Apple on October 6, 2010. A total of 18 Motorola patents were alleged to have been infringed by Apple in its hardware and software products in the 3 cases.

Plaintiff: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv06381
Filed: October 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John F. Grady
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2010 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady: Pursuant to Motorola Mobility, Inc.s Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) 25 this case is dismissed. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (mb, )
November 23, 2010 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady: Motions for leave to appear pro hac vice by Matthew D. Powers 16 , Steven S. Cherensky 17 , Mark G. Davis 18 , Jill Jane Ho 19 , Nathan A. Greenblatt 20 , Jenny C. Wu 21 , Patricia Young 22 , Anne M. Cappella 23 are granted. Mailed notice (mb, )
November 10, 2010 Filing 26 NOTICE of Correction regarding 24 . (ph, )
November 9, 2010 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Motorola Mobility, Inc. WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Bauer, Jennifer)
November 9, 2010 Filing 24 DOCUMENT ENTERED IN ERROR. (Bauer, Jennifer) Modified on 11/10/2010 (ph, ).
November 1, 2010 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5377958. Anne Capella (Bianco, Brian)
November 1, 2010 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5377895. Patricia Young (Bianco, Brian)
November 1, 2010 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5377878. Jenny Wu (Bianco, Brian)
November 1, 2010 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5377855. Nathan Greenblatt (Bianco, Brian)
November 1, 2010 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5377816. Jill Ho (Bianco, Brian)
November 1, 2010 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5377760. Mark Davis (Bianco, Brian)
November 1, 2010 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5377661. Steve Cherensky (Bianco, Brian)
November 1, 2010 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5377462. Matthew Powers (Bianco, Brian)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Signed by the Honorable John F. Grady on 10/28/2010:(mb, )
October 28, 2010 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady: Apple Inc.s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise plead to the Complaint until 11/29/2010 12 is granted. No appearance is necessary on 11/3/2010. Enter Order Granting Apple Inc.s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Mailed notice (mb, )
October 27, 2010 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Apple, Inc. by Brian Christopher Bianco (Bianco, Brian)
October 27, 2010 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Apple, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding notice of motion 11 (Switzer, Michael)
October 27, 2010 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Douglas Switzer for presentment of before Honorable John F. Grady on 11/3/2010 at 11:00 AM. (Switzer, Michael)
October 27, 2010 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Apple, Inc. by Michael Douglas Switzer (Switzer, Michael)
October 19, 2010 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. as to Apple, Inc. on 10/7/2010, answer due 10/28/2010. (Bauer, Jennifer)
October 6, 2010 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Apple, Inc. (mb, )
October 6, 2010 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc. by Jennifer Anne Bauer (Bauer, Jennifer)
October 6, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. NOTICE OF CLAIMS INVOLVING PATENTS (Nelson, David)
October 6, 2010 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Nelson, David) Modified on 10/7/2010 (mb, ).
October 6, 2010 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Motorola Mobility, Inc. by David Aaron Nelson (Nelson, David)
October 6, 2010 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Nelson, David)
October 6, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-5290059. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 01 - US5311516, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 02 - US5319712, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 03 - US5490230, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 04 - US5572193, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 05 - US6175559, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 06 - US6359898.)(Nelson, David)
October 6, 2010 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Grady. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. (nsf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motorola Mobility, Inc. v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?