Frederickson v. County of Will et al
Plaintiff: |
Rex Allen Frederickson |
Defendant: |
Fred Hayes, Unknown Police Officers, Det. Brick, Det. Talbot, Art Schultz, Roger C Claar, Det. Landerous, Paul Kaupas, Unknown Sheriffs, Det. Scarpetta, Unknown State Police and Roy Martin |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv03484 |
Filed: |
May 24, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois |
Office: |
Chicago Office |
County: |
Will |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert M. Dow |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 7, 2018 |
Filing
263
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion for summary judgment 207 , is granted in part and denied in part. It is granted as to the claims against Scarpetta, and Counts I, II, IV, and V against Landeros. It is denied as to Count III against Landeros. A status hearing is set for March 21, 2018 at 9:00 a.m., at which time the parties should be prepared to set a trial date. Defendants' motion for summary judgment 181 , is moot in light of stipulations 248 252 , and related minute orders 249 252 . Status hearing set for 3/21/2018 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/7/2018:Mailed notice(srn, )
|
October 29, 2015 |
Filing
137
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Defendants' motion to dismiss 117 is granted in part and denied in part. The Bolingbrook Defendants also seek to have Sergeant Gunty dismissed from the case on statute of limitations grounds. Frederickson conce des this argument, and does not contest Sergeant Gunty's dismissal. See R. 132 at 12. For this reason, Frederickson's claims against Sergeant Gunty are dismissed. Sergeant Gunty terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/29/2015:Mailed notice(srn, )
|
July 26, 2011 |
Filing
15
WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 7/26/2011: Plaintiffs motions for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction [10, 13] are respectfully denied. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
|
June 2, 2011 |
Filing
7
WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/2/2011: Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 4 is granted. The Court orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to deduct $ 6.10 from Plaintiff's account for payment to the Clerk of the Court as an initial partial filing fee, and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. The Clerk shallsend a copy of this order to the trust fund officer at the Will County Adult Detention Facility. Will County and the Will County Jail are dismissed as Defendants on preliminary review pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A. The Clerk is directed to issue summonses for service on all other named Defendants by the U.S. Marshal. The Clerk is further directed to send Plaintiff a Magistrate Judge Consent Form and Instructions for Submitting Documents along with a copy of this order. Plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel 5 is denied, without prejudice. (For further details see Written Opinion.) Mailed notice. (psm, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?