Kole et al v. Village of Norridge, et al
Plaintiff: Ghost Industries, LLC and Tony Kole
Defendant: Judith D. Bernardi, Mark V. Chester, Dominic S. Falagario, Jacqueline Gregorio, James J. Jobe, Ursula A. Kucharski, Robert Martwick, Ronald A. Oppedisano, Dennis H. Stefanowicz, Dominic Sulimowski and Village of Norridge
Case Number: 1:2011cv03871
Filed: June 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 302 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Pursuant to stipulation, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. The 1/23/2019 status hearing is vacatd.Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (srn, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 301 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DiCianni, Thomas)
December 21, 2018 Filing 300 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 12/21/2018. Status hearing set for 1/23/2019 at 09:00 AM. This action will be dismissed with prejudice on 1/23/2019 absent a request from plaintiff. Mailed notice (srn, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 299 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 11/27/2018. Status hearing set for 12/21/2018 at 09:00 AM. If a stipulation to dismiss is filed before the next status hearing no appearance will be required at the next status hearing. Mailed notice (srn, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 298 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Village of Norridge by John R. Hayes (Hayes, John)
October 26, 2018 Filing 297 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 10/26/2018. The parties announce that a settlement has been reached. The 10/29/2018 jury trial is vacated. Status hearing set for 11/27/2018 at 09:00 AM. If a stipulation to dismiss is filed before the next status hearing no appearance will be required. Mailed notice (srn, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 296 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Settlement conference held on 10/25/2018. Mailed notice (srn, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 295 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 3/6/14 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Status hearing. Order Number: 32563. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Renke, OfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312.435.6053. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2019. (Renke, Laura)
October 25, 2018 Filing 294 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2/13/14 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Motion hearing. Order Number: 32563. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Renke, OfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312.435.6053. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2019. (Renke, Laura)
October 25, 2018 Filing 293 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 1/16/14 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Status hearing. Order Number: 32563. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Renke, OfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312.435.6053. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2019. (Renke, Laura)
October 25, 2018 Filing 292 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/20/13 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Status hearing. Order Number: 32563. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Renke, OfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312.435.6053. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2019. (Renke, Laura)
October 25, 2018 Filing 291 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/26/13 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Status hearing. Order Number: 32563. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Renke, OfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312.435.6053. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2019. (Renke, Laura)
October 25, 2018 Filing 290 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/21/13 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Motion hearing. Order Number: 32563. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Renke, OfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312.435.6053. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2019. (Renke, Laura)
October 22, 2018 Filing 289 PRETRIAL Memorandum (Sigale, David)
October 22, 2018 Filing 288 RESPONSE by Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole to MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridgein limine #282 (Sigale, David)
October 22, 2018 Filing 287 RESPONSE by Defendant Village of Norridge to motion in limine #285 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kunkle, Kathleen)
October 20, 2018 Filing 286 RESPONSE by Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole to MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge to bar Plaintiff's Expert's Testimony and Opinions #283 (Sigale, David)
October 15, 2018 Filing 285 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kolein limine (Sigale, David)
October 15, 2018 Filing 284 MEMORANDUM by Village of Norridge in support of motion to bar #283 Plaintiff's Expert's Testimony and Opinions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Kunkle, Kathleen)
October 15, 2018 Filing 283 MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge to bar Plaintiff's Expert's Testimony and Opinions (Kunkle, Kathleen)
October 15, 2018 Filing 282 MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridgein limine (Bolin, Daniel)
September 11, 2018 Filing 281 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:In chambers conference held on 9/11/2018. Any Daubert motions are to be filed by 10/15/2018. Responses to Daubert motions are to be filed by 10/19/2018. A Daubert hearing is tentatively scheduled for 10/25/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Motions in limine are to be filed by 10/15/2018. Responses are to be filed by 10/22/2018. Pretrial order is due by 10/22/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2018 at 10:00 a.m. or immediately following the Daubert hearing if one is held.Mailed notice (srn, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 280 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 9/7/2018. In chambers conference is set for 9/11/2018 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 279 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Village of Norridge by Kathleen Margaret Kunkle (Kunkle, Kathleen)
August 9, 2018 Filing 278 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Agreed motion to extend time to disclose expert report and to take depositions #276 is granted. Defendants are to provide their expert report by 9/7/2018. The deposition of plaintiffs' expert witness is to be completed by 9/7/2018. The deposition of defendant's expert witness is to be completed by 9/28/2018. The 10/29/2018 trial date stands. No appearance is required on 8/13/2018. Mailed notice (srn, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 277 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Joseph Bolin for presentment of extension of time #276 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/13/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Bolin, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 Filing 276 MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge for extension of time to disclose expert report and to take depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order 5.7.18, #2 Exhibit B - Order 6.6.18)(Bolin, Daniel)
June 6, 2018 Filing 275 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiffs' agreed motion for extension of time to submit their expert witness report #273 is granted. Plaintiffs' expert witness report is now due by 7/25/2018. No appearance is required on 6/27/2018.Mailed notice (srn, )
June 5, 2018 Filing 274 AGREED NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #273 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/27/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David)
June 5, 2018 Filing 273 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole for extension of time to complete discovery (to submit expert report) (Sigale, David)
May 7, 2018 Filing 272 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing set for 9/7/2018 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
May 7, 2018 Filing 271 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 5/7/2018. Plaintiffs' expert report is due by 6/7/2018. Plaintiffs' expert is to be deposed by 7/9/2018. Defendants' expert report is due by 8/8/2018. Defendants' expert is to be deposed by 9/7/2018. Jury Trial set for 10/29/2018 at 09:30 AM. A status hearing is set for 9/7/2018 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (srn, )
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER: Defendant's motion for reconsideration of this Court's amended summary judgment opinion #248 is denied. At the May 7, 2018 status hearing, the parties should be prepared to discuss trial dates. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/3/2018:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 26, 2018 Filing 269 REPLY by Defendant Village of Norridge to response to motion #263 to reconsider amended order on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Bolin, Daniel)
April 23, 2018 Filing 268 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing set for 5/7/2018 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
April 19, 2018 Filing 267 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin: Settlement conference held on 4/19/2018, agreement not reached. The referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned judge. Judge Honorable Daniel G. Martin no longer referred to the case.Mailed notice (lxs, )
April 6, 2018 Filing 266 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant's agreed motion for extension of time to 4/26/2018 to file its reply to its motion motion for reconsideration is granted. #264 No appearance is required on 4/10/2018. Mailed notice (srn, )
April 5, 2018 Filing 265 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Joseph Bolin for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #264 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/10/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Bolin, Daniel)
April 5, 2018 Filing 264 MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge for extension of time to file response/reply (Agreed) (Bolin, Daniel)
March 23, 2018 Filing 263 RESPONSE by Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole to MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge for reconsideration regarding memorandum opinion and order, set/reset hearings,,,, #243 #248 (Sigale, David)
March 8, 2018 Filing 262 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiffs' agreed motion for extension of time to file a response to defendant Village of Norridge's motion for reconsideration #258 is granted. Plaintiffs' response is due by 3/22/2018. Defendant's reply is due by 4/5/2018. No appearance is required on 3/12/2018. Mailed notice (srn, )
March 7, 2018 Filing 261 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin: By agreement of the parties, continued settlement conference set for 4/19/2018 at 02:00 PM. Mailed notice (lxs, )
March 5, 2018 Filing 260 (Agreed - refiled for entry of date and time) NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #258 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/12/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David)
March 5, 2018 Filing 259 (Agreed) NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of (Sigale, David)
March 5, 2018 Filing 258 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for reconsideration #248 (Agreed) (Sigale, David)
March 2, 2018 Filing 257 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin: Continued settlement conference set for 3/5/2018 is stricken. New date to follow.Mailed notice (lxs, )
February 27, 2018 Filing 256 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin:Status hearing held. Parties wish to participate in a continued settlement conference. Continued settlement conference is set for 3/5/2018 at 2 p.m. Prior to the continued settlement conference, Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's latest demand. Plaintiff Tony Kole is granted leave to participate telephonically in the continued settlement conference.Mailed notice (lxs, )
February 20, 2018 Filing 255 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin: At the request of the parties, status hearing set for 2/20/2018 is stricken and reset to 2/27/2018 at 09:30 a.m. FIRM DATE. Mailed notice (lxs, )
February 16, 2018 Filing 254 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin: Status hearing set for 2/20/2018 at 09:30 a.m. Mailed notice (lxs, )
February 12, 2018 Filing 253 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:The 2/16/2018 status date is vacated.Mailed notice (srn, )
February 5, 2018 Filing 252 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiffs' agreed motion for extension of time to file a response to defendants' motion for reconsideration #248 is granted. #250 . Plaintiffs' response is now due by 3/5/2018. Defendants' reply is due by 3/19/2018. No appearance is required on 2/8/2018.Mailed notice (srn, )
February 2, 2018 Filing 251 (Agreed) NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #250 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 2/8/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David)
February 2, 2018 Filing 250 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for reconsideration #248 (Agreed) (Sigale, David)
February 1, 2018 Filing 249 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin: Settlement conference held on 2/1/2018. Parties shall continue with settlement discussions. Counsel are directed to contact Judge Martins courtroom deputy on 2/9/2018 to advise if another in-person settlement conference is desired.Mailed notice (lxs, )
January 5, 2018 Filing 248 MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge for reconsideration regarding memorandum opinion and order, set/reset hearings,,,, #243 (Bolin, Daniel)
November 28, 2017 Filing 247 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin:Status hearing held. Settlement conference is set for 2/1/2018 at 2:00 p.m. Plaintiffs settlement letters are due by 1/18/2018; Defendants settlement letters are due by 1/25/2018. Parties are reminded that Magistrate Judge Martin requires compliance with his Standing Order for Settlement Conference, which is available on the courts website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov.Mailed notice (lxs, )
November 20, 2017 Filing 246 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin: Initial status hearing set for 11/28/2017 at 09:30 a.m. in Courtroom 1350 to set a settlement conference. Parties are reminded that Magistrate Judge Martin requires compliance with his Standing Order for Settlement Conference, which is available on the courts website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (lxs, )
November 20, 2017 Filing 245 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Daniel G. Martin for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: settlement conference.(srn, )Mailed notice.
November 20, 2017 Filing 244 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 11/20/2017. Defendant's motion to reconsider is to be filed by 1/5/2018. Plaintiffs' response is due by 2/2/2018. This action is referred to Magistrate Judge Martin for a settlement conference. Status hearing set for 2/16/2018 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
November 6, 2017 Filing 243 AMENDED MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: During a status hearing held on 11/3/2017, this Court set a briefing schedule on an anticipated motion for reconsideration by defendant. Upon further review, this Court is amending and reissuing its opinion to eliminate a discussion that was not central to its holding. A status hearing is set for 11/20/2017. At that hearing, defendant may report on whether it still intends to file a motion for reconsideration or whether that briefing schedule should be stricken. Status hearing set for 11/20/2017 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/6/2017:Mailed notice(srn, )
November 3, 2017 Filing 242 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 11/3/2017. Plaintiff did not appear. Defendants' motion to reconsider is to be filed by 12/8/2017. Plaintiff's response is due 1/5/2018. Defendants' reply is due 1/19/2018. Status hearing set for 1/31/2018 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
October 27, 2017 Filing 241 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, the Court denies the Village's and plaintiffs' cross-motions for summary judgment #191 , #196 on plaintiffs' Second and Fourteenth Amendment claims in Count I and plaintiffs' corresponding retaliation claims in Counts VI and VII. The Court also denies the Village's and plaintiffs' cross-motions for summary judgment on plaintiffs' First Amendment claim regarding the exterior signage prohibition in Count IV. The Court grants the Village's motion for summary judgment #191 with respect to plaintiffs' remaining claims: Count II (substantive due process); Count III (dormant commerce clause); Count V (declaratory judgment under the Illinois Constitution); and Count VIII (equal protection). A status hearing is set for 11/3/2017 at 09:00 AM. At the status hearing the parties should be prepared to discuss a trial date or a referral to the magistrate judge for a settlement conference. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/27/2017:Mailed notice(srn, )
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER: The Clerk of Court has notified the Court that Walter Maksym has not renewed his membership in the Court's Trial Bar as required under Local Rule 83.11(i). Walter Maksym is given 14 days from the date of this order to renew his membership or be subject to removal as lead counsel from this matter. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/4/2017:Mailed notice(srn, )
January 23, 2017 Filing 239 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:The 1/30/2017 status date is vacated. The Court will rule by mail on the pending motions.Mailed notice (srn, )
November 29, 2016 Filing 238 REPLY by Defendant Village of Norridge to motion for summary judgment #191 (Bolin, Daniel)
November 29, 2016 Filing 237 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendants' motion for leave to file oversized reply brief #233 is granted. No appearance is required on 12/5/2016.Mailed notice (srn, )
November 28, 2016 Filing 236 RULE 56 56.1 Statement (Response to Defendant's L.R. 56.1 Statement of Additional Material Facts) (Sigale, David)
November 28, 2016 Filing 235 REPLY by Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole to MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole for summary judgment #196 , response in opposition to motion #225 (Sigale, David)
November 28, 2016 Filing 234 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Joseph Bolin for presentment of motion for leave to file #233 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 12/5/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Bolin, Daniel)
November 28, 2016 Filing 233 MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge for leave to file Oversized Reply Brief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's Reply Brief in support of MSJ)(Bolin, Daniel)
November 14, 2016 Filing 232 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendants' agreed motion for extension of time to 11/28/2016 to file cross replies to the summary judgment motions #230 is granted. Replies due by 11/28/2016. The 11/30/2016 status date is vacated. Status hearing reset for 1/30/2017 at 09:00 AM. No appearance is required on 11/16/2016. Mailed notice (srn, )
November 11, 2016 Filing 231 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Joseph Bolin for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief #230 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/16/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Bolin, Daniel)
November 11, 2016 Filing 230 MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for summary judgment #191 (Bolin, Daniel)
October 26, 2016 Filing 229 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to file replies to the cross-motions for summary judgment #227 is granted. The parties' replies are due by 11/11/2016. No appearance is required on 10/27/2016.Mailed notice (jms, )
October 24, 2016 Filing 228 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas George DiCianni for presentment of extension of time #227 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/27/2016 at 09:00 AM. (DiCianni, Thomas)
October 24, 2016 Filing 227 MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge for extension of time to file Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment (Agreed) (DiCianni, Thomas)
October 17, 2016 Filing 226 RESPONSE by Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole to MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge for summary judgment #191 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sigale, David)
October 12, 2016 Filing 225 RESPONSE by Village of Norridgein Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole for summary judgment #196 (DiCianni, Thomas)
October 11, 2016 Filing 224 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendants' motion for leave to file oversized brief #217 is granted. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file oversized brief #222 is granted. No appearance is required on 10/12/16 and 10/13/2016. Mailed notice (srn, )
October 10, 2016 Filing 223 NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for leave to file, motion for leave to file excess pages,, #222 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/13/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David)
October 10, 2016 Filing 222 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole for leave to file Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole for leave to file excess pages Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Response to Defendant's SJ Motion, #2 Exhibit Joint Status Report in Second Amendment Arms)(Sigale, David)
October 8, 2016 Filing 221 L.R.56(b)(3)(C) Statement of Additional Undisputed Facts STATEMENT by Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole (Sigale, David)
October 7, 2016 Filing 220 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole to Rule 56 statement,, #190 (Sigale, David)
October 7, 2016 Filing 219 RULE 56 Statement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(DiCianni, Thomas)
October 7, 2016 Filing 218 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas George DiCianni for presentment of motion for leave to file #217 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/12/2016 at 09:00 PM. (DiCianni, Thomas)
October 7, 2016 Filing 217 MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge for leave to file (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DiCianni, Thomas)
September 29, 2016 Filing 216 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendants' agreed motion for extension of time to file responses and replies to cross motions for summary judgment #214 is granted. Responses due by 10/7/2016. Replies due by 10/28/2016. No appearance is required on 10/3/2016.Mailed notice (srn, )
September 28, 2016 Filing 215 Agreed NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Joseph Bolin for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief #214 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/3/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Bolin, Daniel)
September 28, 2016 Filing 214 MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for summary judgment #196 (Bolin, Daniel)
September 22, 2016 Filing 213 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:The 11/2/2016 status date is vacated and reset for 11/30/2016 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
September 21, 2016 Filing 212 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiffs' agreed motion for extension of time to file a response to defendants' motion for summary judgment #191 #210 is granted. Plaintiffs' response is due by 9/30/2016. Defendants' reply is due by 10/21/2016. No appearance required on 9/27/2016.Mailed notice (srn, )
September 19, 2016 Filing 211 (Agreed) NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief #210 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/27/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David)
September 19, 2016 Filing 210 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for summary judgment #191 (Agreed) (Sigale, David)
August 26, 2016 Filing 209 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to file responses to cross-motions for summary judgment #207 is granted. Responses to cross-motions for summary judgment are due 9/20/2016. Replies are due 10/11/2016. The 9/27/2016 status hearing is vacated and reset for 11/2/2016 at 09:00 AM. No appearance required on 8/30/2016. Mailed notice (srn, )
August 25, 2016 Filing 208 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Joseph Bolin for presentment of extension of time #207 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/30/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Bolin, Daniel)
August 25, 2016 Filing 207 MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge for extension of time to file Responses to Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment (Bolin, Daniel)
August 3, 2016 Filing 206 MEMORANDUM by Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole in support of motion for summary judgment #196 (Sigale, David)
August 3, 2016 Filing 205 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file memorandum in support of motion for summary judgment and to file excess pages #202 is granted. No appearance is required on 8/4/2016.Mailed notice (srn, )
July 31, 2016 Filing 204 Exhibit List by Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15 (corrected) - Deposition of Tony Kole 080814 (full mini), #2 Exhibit 17 (corrected) - Deposition of Tony Kole 021916 (full mini))(Sigale, David)
July 31, 2016 Filing 203 NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for leave to file #202 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/4/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David)
July 31, 2016 Filing 202 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole for leave to file Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, Oversized Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Memorandum in Support of SJ Motion)(Sigale, David)
July 29, 2016 Filing 201 Exhibit List by Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26 - Norridge Zoning Ordinance)(Sigale, David)
July 29, 2016 Filing 200 Exhibit List by Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21 - Bill Hicks & Co., Ltd. info, #2 Exhibit 22 - Letter to Kathy Gaseor 051713, #3 Exhibit 23 - Kole phone records, #4 Exhibit 24 - Photos (comic book store), #5 Exhibit 25 - Photo (4701 N. Cumberland), #6 Exhibit 27 - Inventory Purchase by Vendor summary 2012-2014)(Sigale, David)
July 29, 2016 Filing 199 Exhibit List by Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 - 2013 Weapons Dealers Ordinance, #2 Exhibit 12 - Available Land Area chart, #3 Exhibit 13 - Gun Store Zoning Map, #4 Declaration of Tony Kole 062514 (Exh.14), #5 Exhibit 15 - Excerpts of Tony Kole Deposition 080814, #6 Exhibit 16 - Excerpts of P.I. Hearing 081814, #7 Exhibit 17 - Excerpts of Tony Kole Deposition 021916, #8 Exhibit 18 - Ghost Ind. FFL Exp.2017, #9 Exhibit 19 - Kole Type 3 FFL Exp. 2018, #10 Exhibit 20 - Camfour, Inc. info)(Sigale, David)
July 29, 2016 Filing 198 Exhibit List by Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tony Kole 020714 (Exh.1), #2 Exhibit 2 - Weapons Dealers Ordinance (1972), #3 Exhibit 3 - E-mail with Brian Gaseor 110810, #4 Exhibit 4 - Email with Brian Gaseor 111210, #5 Exhibit 5 - Letter to Brian Gaseor 111210, #6 Exhibit 6 - E-mail to Mark Chester 121710, #7 Exhibit 7 - Montrose Office Lease, #8 Exhibit 8 - Agreement 113010, #9 Exhibit 9 - Ghost Ind. FFL Exp. 2014, #10 Exhibit 10 - 2011 Weapons Dealers Ordinance)(Sigale, David)
July 29, 2016 Filing 197 L.R.56(a)(3) Statement of Undisputed Facts STATEMENT by Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole (Sigale, David)
July 29, 2016 Filing 196 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole for summary judgment (Sigale, David)
July 26, 2016 Filing 195 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (DiCianni, Thomas)
July 26, 2016 Filing 194 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendants' motion for leave to file an over-sized brief #188 is granted. Plaintiffs' motion for extension of time in which to file its motion for summary judgment #192 is granted. Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is to be filed by 7/29/2016. Responses are due by 8/30/2016. Replies are due by 9/20/2016. No appearance is required on 7/28/2016. Mailed notice (srn, )
July 25, 2016 Filing 193 NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for extension of time to file #192 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/28/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David)
July 25, 2016 Filing 192 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole for extension of time to file Motion for Summary Judgment and supporting documents (Sigale, David)
July 25, 2016 Filing 191 MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge for summary judgment (DiCianni, Thomas)
July 25, 2016 Filing 190 RULE 56 Statement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18 - Part 1, #19 Exhibit 18 - Part 2, #20 Exhibit 18 - Part 3, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20 - Part 1, #23 Exhibit 20 - Part 2, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29)(DiCianni, Thomas)
July 25, 2016 Filing 189 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas George DiCianni for presentment of motion for leave to file #188 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/28/2016 at 09:00 AM. (DiCianni, Thomas)
July 25, 2016 Filing 188 MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge for leave to file Oversized Brief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DiCianni, Thomas)
July 18, 2016 Filing 187 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendants' agreed motion for extension of time to file cross-motions for summary judgment #185 is granted. Cross motions for summary judgment are to be filed by 7/25/2016. Cross responses are due 8/26/2016, and replies are due on 9/16/2016. No appearance is required on 7/20/2016. Mailed notice (srn, )
July 15, 2016 Filing 186 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Joseph Bolin for presentment of motion for extension of time to file #185 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/20/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Bolin, Daniel)
July 15, 2016 Filing 185 MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge for extension of time to file Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment (Bolin, Daniel)
June 30, 2016 Filing 184 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for extension of time to file a motion for summary judgment #182 is granted. Motions for summary judgment are to be filed by 7/18/2016. Responses due by 8/15/2016. Replies are due 8/30/2016. The 8/30/16 status date is vacated and reset for 9/27/2016 at 09:00 AM. No appearance is required on 7/5/2016.Mailed notice (srn, )
June 27, 2016 Filing 183 Agreed NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for extension of time to file #182 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/5/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David)
June 27, 2016 Filing 182 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole for extension of time to file Motion for Summary Judgment (Agreed) (Sigale, David)
June 13, 2016 Filing 181 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 8/18/14 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Preliminary injunction hearing. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Renke, laura_renke@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312.435.6053. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/4/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2016. (Renke, Laura)
June 13, 2016 Filing 180 ANSWER to amended complaint by Village of Norridge(DiCianni, Thomas)
June 13, 2016 Filing 179 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant Village of Norridge's agreed motion for extension of time to file cross motions for summary judgment #176 is granted. Cross motions for summary judgment are to be filed by 6/30/2016. Cross responses are due 7/29/2016. Replies are due 8/12/2016. No appearance required on 6/15/2016. Mailed notice (srn, )
June 13, 2016 Filing 178 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant Village of Norridge's agreed motion for leave to file its answer to the third amended complaint instanter #174 is granted. No appearance required on 6/15/2016. Mailed notice (srn, )
June 10, 2016 Filing 177 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas George DiCianni for presentment of motion for extension of time to file #176 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/15/2016 at 09:00 AM. (DiCianni, Thomas)
June 10, 2016 Filing 176 MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge for extension of time to file Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment (Agreed) (DiCianni, Thomas)
June 10, 2016 Filing 175 ( NOTICE of Motion by Thomas George DiCianni for presentment of motion for leave to file #174 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/15/2016 at 09:00 AM. (DiCianni, Thomas)
June 10, 2016 Filing 174 MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge for leave to file Answer to Third Amended Complaint, Instatner (Agreed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DiCianni, Thomas)
April 29, 2016 Filing 173 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 4/29/2016. Cross motions for summary judgment are to be filed by 6/15/2016. Cross response are due by 7/15/2016. Replies are due 7/29/2016. Status hearing set for 8/30/2016 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
February 29, 2016 Filing 172 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 2/29/2016. Liability discovery ordered closed by 4/29/2016. Status hearing set for 4/29/2016 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
January 25, 2016 Filing 171 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 1/25/2016. Plaintiffs' oral request to extend discovery is granted. Discovery ordered closed by 2/29/2016. Plaintiff's deposition must be taken by 2/29/16. Status hearing set for 2/29/2016 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 170 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing reset for 1/25/2016 at 09:00 AM. The 1/29/16 status date is stricken.Mailed notice (srn, )
November 9, 2015 Filing 169 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant's motion to compel #167 is granted. The parties are to confer regarding the dates for the plaintiff's deposition. Motion hearing held on 11/9/2015. Plaintiff's oral motion to extend the discovery deadline is granted. Discovery ordered closed by 1/29/2016. Status hearing set for 1/29/2016 at 09:00 AM. The 11/30/15 close of discovery and status date are vacated. Plaintiff has to and including November 30, 2015 in which to file an amended complaint. Defendants' answer date will be set at the 1/29/16 status hearing. Mailed notice (srn, )
November 2, 2015 Filing 168 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas George DiCianni for presentment of motion to compel #167 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/9/2015 at 09:00 AM. (DiCianni, Thomas)
November 2, 2015 Filing 167 MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge to compel (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(DiCianni, Thomas)
October 1, 2015 Filing 166 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 10/1/2015. Several attempts were made to contact plaintiff's counsel by telephone, however, the Court was unsuccessful. Defense counsel reported on the status of the case. Status hearing set for 11/30/2015 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
July 17, 2015 Filing 165 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 7/17/2015.All Discovery ordered closed by 11/30/2015. Status hearing set for 10/1/2015 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
July 10, 2015 Filing 163 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing set for 7/17/2015 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
June 29, 2015 Filing 162 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin: At the request of Plaintiffs' counsel, and Defendants not objecting, Settlement Conference set for 6/30/2015 is reset for 7/10/2015 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (lxs, )
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin: Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 5/12/2015. Settlement Conference set for 6/30/2015 at 02:00 p.m. Plaintiffs' settlement demand letter is due by 6/16/2015; Defendants' settlement offer letter is due by 6/23/2015. The parties shall review and comply with Judge Martin's Standing Order for Settlement Conferences which is available on Judge Martin's web page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Each party is required to email a copy of its settlement letter to Judge Martin's settlement conference inbox on the same day that it is provided to opposing counsel. The email address is Settlement_Correspondence_Martin@ilnd.uscourts.gov. Do not file copies of these letters on the court docket. Because of the volume of settlement conferences conducted by Judge Martin, once a settlement conference date has been agreed upon, the settlement conference will not be rescheduled without a motion showing good cause. Mailed notice (lxs, )
May 4, 2015 Filing 160 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin: Status hearing set for 5/12/2015 at 09:30 a.m. to set a settlement conference.Mailed notice (lxs, )
April 30, 2015 Filing 159 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Daniel G. Martin for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: settlement conference.(srn, )Mailed notice.
April 30, 2015 Filing 158 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 4/30/2015. This action is referred to Magistrate Judge Martin for a settlement conference.Mailed notice (srn, )
April 23, 2015 Filing 157 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 4/23/2015. Status hearing set for 4/30/2015 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
April 21, 2015 Filing 156 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 4/21/2015. Status hearing set for 4/23/2015 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
March 6, 2015 Filing 155 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim is denied without prejudice. # 123 Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction # 137 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted to and including 4/21/15 in which to file an amended complaint. Status hearing held on 3/6/2015. Status hearing set for 4/21/2015 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
January 26, 2015 Filing 154 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing reset for 3/6/2015 at 09:00 AM. The 2/25/15 status date is vacated. Mailed notice (srn, )
January 8, 2015 Filing 153 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 1/8/2015. Status hearing set for 2/25/2015 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
November 6, 2014 Filing 152 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 11/6/2014. Status hearing set for 1/8/2015 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
October 3, 2014 Filing 151 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 10/3/2014. Status hearing set for 11/6/2014 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
September 3, 2014 Filing 150 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 9/3/2014. Status hearing set for 10/3/2014 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
August 22, 2014 Filing 149 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing set for 9/3/2014 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
August 20, 2014 Filing 148 NOTICE by David G. Sigale of Change of Address (Sigale, David)
August 20, 2014 Filing 147 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Preliminary Injunction hearing held on 8/20/2014. Counsel is to contact this Court's courtroom deputy to schedule a next status date. Mailed notice (srn, )
July 21, 2014 Filing 146 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendants' motion to compel # 142 is granted by agreement. Motion hearing held on 7/21/2014. The briefing schedule on plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction is vacated. Mailed notice (srn, )
July 16, 2014 Filing 145 NOTICE of Motion by Brent O. Denzin for presentment of motion to compel, # 142 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/21/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Denzin, Brent)
July 16, 2014 Filing 144 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:The 7/17/14 notice motion date is stricken. Judge Durkin is not hearing motions on that day. Counsel is directed to re-notice when Judge Durkin is sitting. Mailed notice (srn, )
July 14, 2014 Filing 143 NOTICE of Motion by Brent O. Denzin for presentment of motion to compel, # 142 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/17/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Denzin, Brent)
July 14, 2014 Filing 142 MOTION by Defendants Judith D. Bernardi, Mark V. Chester, Dominic S. Falagario, Jacqueline Gregorio, James J. Jobe, Ursula A. Kucharski, Robert Martwick, Ronald A. Oppedisano, Dennis H. Stefanowicz, Dominic Sulimowski, Village of Norridge to compel Deposition of Tony Kole (Denzin, Brent)
June 27, 2014 Filing 141 AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole in Support of MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole for preliminary injunction # 137 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Village Gun Store Availability Map)(Sigale, David)
June 25, 2014 Filing 140 MEMORANDUM by Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole in support of motion for preliminary injunction # 137 (Sigale, David)
June 17, 2014 Filing 139 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction # 137 is entered and continued to 8/18/14 at 9:00 a.m. Motion hearing held on 6/17/2014. Plaintiff's memorandum in support is to be filed by 6/24/14. Defendants' response is due by 7/22/2014 Plaintiff's reply is due by 8/5/2014. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 8/18/2014 at 09:30 AM. The briefing on the motion to dismiss is stayed. Mailed notice (srn, )
June 12, 2014 Filing 138 NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction # 137 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/17/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David)
June 12, 2014 Filing 137 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole for preliminary injunction (Sigale, David)
May 30, 2014 Filing 136 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 5/30/2014. Plaintiff will file and notice up a motion for preliminary injunction. At that time the Court will set a briefing schedule. Mailed notice (srn, )
May 28, 2014 Filing 135 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing set for 5/30/2014 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
May 27, 2014 Filing 134 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin: Continued settlement conference held on 5/27/2014. Agreement not reached. All matters relating to the referral of this action having been concluded, the referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned judge.Judge Honorable Daniel G. Martin no longer referred to the case. Mailed notice (lxs, )
April 15, 2014 Filing 133 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin: Continued settlement conference held. The Court will hold a further settlement conference with the attorneys only on 5/27/2014 at 2:00 p.m. Mailed notice. (rbf, )
March 24, 2014 Filing 132 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin: Settlement conference held on 3/24/2014 and continued to 4/15/2014 at 10:30 AM. Mailed notice (lxs, )
March 20, 2014 Filing 131 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/27/13 before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Renke, laura_renke@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312.435.6053. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/21/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2014. (Renke, Laura)
March 11, 2014 Filing 130 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin: Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 3/11/2014. Settlement Conference set for 3/24/2014 at 10:00 AM. Plaintiffs' settlement demand are due by 3/13/2014. Defendants' settlement counter-offer is due by 3/20/2014. The parties shall review and comply with Judge Martin's Standing Order for Settlement Conferences which is available on Judge Martin's web page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Each party is required to email a copy of its settlement letter to Judge Martin's settlement conference inbox on the same day that it is provided to opposing counsel. The email address is Settlement_Correspondence_Martin@ilnd.uscourts.gov. Do not file copies of these letters on the court docket. Mailed notice (lxs, )
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Daniel G. Martin: This case has been referred to Judge Martin to conduct a settlement conference. Initial status hearing is set for 3/11/2014 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 1350 to set a settlement conference. The parties shall review and comply with Judge Martin's Standing Order for Settlement Conferences which is available on Judge Martin's web page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Each party is required to email a copy of its settlement letter to Judge Martin's settlement conference inbox on the same day that it is provided to opposing counsel. The email address is Settlement_Correspondence_Martin@ilnd.uscourts.gov. Do not file copies of these letters on the court docket. Because of the volume of settlement conferences conducted by Judge Martin, once a settlement conference date has been agreed upon, the settlement conference will not be rescheduled without a motion showing good cause. Mailed notice (lxs, )
March 6, 2014 Filing 128 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Daniel G. Martin for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: settlement conference.(srn, )Mailed notice.
March 6, 2014 Filing 127 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Motion for preliminary injunction # 116 is denied without prejudice as moot in light of the fact that the defendants have agreed to extend the temporary restraining order until the decision on the outcome of the instant litigation (or for one additional year, whichever is less). Status hearing held on 3/6/2014. The 3/7/14 preliminary injunction hearing is stricken. Briefing on defendants' motion to dismiss # 123 is stayed. This action is referred to Magistrate Judge Martin to conduct a settlement conference. This Court will set a status hearing after the settlement conference has been completed. Mailed notice (srn, )
March 6, 2014 Filing 126 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Preliminary Injunction hearing reset for 3/7/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Note: time change only)Mailed notice (srn, )
March 5, 2014 Filing 125 RESPONSE by Village of Norridge to MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole for preliminary injunction # 116 (Bolin, Daniel)
March 5, 2014 Filing 124 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Joseph Bolin for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim # 123 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/7/2014 at 10:30 AM. (Bolin, Daniel)
March 5, 2014 Filing 123 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Third Amended Complaint (Bolin, Daniel)
February 14, 2014 Filing 122 MEMORANDUM by Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole in support of motion for preliminary injunction # 116 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tony Kole (Exhibit A), # 2 Exhibit B - FFL, # 3 Exhibit C - Ultra Vires Agreement, # 4 Exhibit D - New Ordinance)(Sigale, David)
February 13, 2014 Filing 121 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Defendants' motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a claim # 91 is denied as moot. Plaintiffs' Motion for preliminary injunction # 116 is entered and continued. Plaintiffs' Motion for leave to file and to file excess pages # 118 is granted. Motion hearing held on 2/13/2014. Defendants' response to plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction is due by 3/5/2014. Defendants' answer to the Third Amended Complaint is due 3/5/14. Mailed notice (srn, )
February 11, 2014 Filing 120 DECLARATION of Tony Kole regarding motion for leave to file,,, motion for leave to file excess pages,, # 118 (Corrected Doc. 118-2) (Sigale, David)
February 9, 2014 Filing 119 NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for leave to file,,, motion for leave to file excess pages,, # 118 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 2/13/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David)
February 9, 2014 Filing 118 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole for leave to file Memoramdum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole for leave to file excess pages Memoramdum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Memoramdum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Declaration Exhibit A to Memorandum - Declaration of Tony Kole, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Memorandum - Renewed FFL, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Memorandum - UVA, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Memorandum - New Ordinance)(Sigale, David)
January 31, 2014 Filing 117 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re amended complaint, # 115 , MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole for preliminary injunction # 116 (Sigale, David)
January 31, 2014 Filing 116 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole for preliminary injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - New Ordinance, # 2 Exhibit B - Ultra Vires Agreement)(Sigale, David)
January 31, 2014 Filing 115 Third AMENDED complaint by Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole against Village of Norridge (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FFL, # 2 Exhibit B - Original Ordinance, # 3 Exhibit C - Ultra Vires Agreement, # 4 Exhibit D - Revised Ordinance, # 5 Exhibit E - New Ordinance)(Sigale, David)
January 16, 2014 Filing 114 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 1/16/2014. Plaintiff has to 1/31/14 in which to file an amended complaint. Preliminary Injunction hearing set for 3/7/2014 at 10:30 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
December 20, 2013 Filing 113 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 12/20/2013. Status hearing set for 1/16/2014 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
December 12, 2013 Filing 112 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 12/12/2013. The Temporary Restraining Order is hereby extended another 14 days, to expire at 12:01 a.m. December 29, 2013. Status hearing set for 12/20/2013 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
December 10, 2013 Filing 111 MEMORANDUM (Supplemental) in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dckt. #102) (Sigale, David)
December 10, 2013 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM by Judith D. Bernardi, Mark V. Chester, Dominic S. Falagario, Jacqueline Gregorio, James J. Jobe, Ursula A. Kucharski, Robert Martwick, Ronald A. Oppedisano, Dennis H. Stefanowicz, Dominic Sulimowski, Village of Norridge in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim # 91 Supplemental Brief (Denzin, Brent)
December 4, 2013 Filing 109 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Supplemental filings are due on or before 12/10/13.Mailed notice (srn, )
November 27, 2013 Filing 108 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:For the reasons stated orally, plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction # 102 is granted as to the entry of a temporary restraining order. The temporary restraining order will become effective at 12:01 a.m. on 12/1/13. No bond is required. Motion hearing held on 11/27/2013. Status hearing set for 12/12/2013 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
November 26, 2013 Filing 107 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing reset for 11/27/2013 at 02:00 PM.Mailed notice (srn, )
November 25, 2013 Filing 106 RESPONSE by Village of Norridgein Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole for preliminary injunction # 102 (DiCianni, Thomas)
November 21, 2013 Filing 105 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Motion hearing held on 11/21/2013.Defendants' response to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction # 102 is due by 11/25/2013. Motion Hearing set for 11/26/2013 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
November 21, 2013 Filing 104 MEMORANDUM by Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole in support of motion for preliminary injunction # 102 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Tony Kole)(Sigale, David)
November 15, 2013 Filing 103 NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction # 102 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/21/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David)
November 15, 2013 Filing 102 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole for preliminary injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ultra Vires Agreement, # 2 Exhibit Revised Ordinance)(Sigale, David)
October 31, 2013 Filing 101 REPLY by Defendants Dominic S. Falagario, Jacqueline Gregorio, Ursula A. Kucharski, Robert Martwick, Ronald A. Oppedisano, Dennis H. Stefanowicz, Dominic Sulimowski, Village of Norridge in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (mr, )
October 31, 2013 Filing 100 MINUTE entry before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant Village of Norridge's motion for leave to file oversize brief # 98 is granted. No appearance required on 11/6/13. Mailed notice (srn, )
October 30, 2013 Filing 99 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Joseph Bolin for presentment of motion for leave to file # 98 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/6/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Bolin, Daniel)
October 30, 2013 Filing 98 MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge for leave to file Oversized Reply, Instanter (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint)(Bolin, Daniel)
October 15, 2013 Filing 97 MINUTE entry before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 10/15/2013. Defendants' reply brief to its Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim # 91 is due on or before 10/29/13. The Court will rule by mail. Status hearing set for 1/9/2014 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (srn, )
October 15, 2013 Filing 96 RESPONSE by Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kolein Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM # 91 (Sigale, David)
September 9, 2013 Filing 95 MINUTE entry before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendants' motion for leave to file to file oversized brief # 93 is granted. Motion hearing held on 9/9/2013. Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim # 91 is entered and continued.Plaintiff's response is due by 10/7/2013. Defendants' Replies due by 10/15/2013. Status hearing set for 10/15/2013 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
August 28, 2013 Filing 94 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Joseph Bolin for presentment of motion for leave to file # 93 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/9/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Bolin, Daniel)
August 28, 2013 Filing 93 MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge for leave to file Oversized Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memo of Law)(Bolin, Daniel)
August 28, 2013 Filing 92 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Joseph Bolin for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim # 91 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 9/9/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Bolin, Daniel)
August 28, 2013 Filing 91 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Bolin, Daniel)
August 15, 2013 Filing 90 MINUTE entry before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Defendant Village of Norridge's motion for extension of time to 8/28/13 in which to answer or otherwise plead # 88 is granted. No appearance required on 8/26/13. Mailed notice (srn, )
August 15, 2013 Filing 89 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Joseph Bolin for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer # 88 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/26/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Bolin, Daniel)
August 15, 2013 Filing 88 MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Bolin, Daniel)
July 24, 2013 Filing 87 MINUTE entry before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file an Amended Complaint # 84 is granted. Motion hearing held on 7/24/2013. Defendants have to 8/14/13 to answer or otherwise plead. The parties are to submit a joint discovery schedule on or before 8/14/13. Status hearing set for 10/15/2013 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
July 9, 2013 Filing 86 NOTICE of Motion by David G. Sigale for presentment of motion for leave to file # 84 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/24/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Sigale, David)
July 9, 2013 Filing 85 Proposed Second Amended Complaint Exh. A (Exhs. B-D attached) by Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint Exh. B, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint Exh. C, # 3 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint Exh. D)(Sigale, David)
July 9, 2013 Filing 84 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole for leave to file Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Sigale, David)
June 24, 2013 Filing 83 MINUTE entry before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 6/24/2013. Plaintiff is to notice up a motion for leave to file an amended complaint within 14 days. Mailed notice (srn, )
June 6, 2013 Filing 82 MINUTE entry before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 6/6/2013. Status hearing set for 6/24/2013 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
June 5, 2013 Filing 81 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ghost Industries, LLC, Tony Kole by David G. Sigale (Sigale, David)
May 24, 2013 Filing 80 MINUTE entry before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 5/24/2013. Attorney David Sigale is granted leave to file an appearance on behalf of the plaintiffs. Status hearing set for 6/6/2013 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
April 19, 2013 Filing 79 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order.For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, # 13 , is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs shall file a Second Amended Complaint consistent with this Order on or before May 17, 2013. If Plaintiffs need additional time, they must seek an extension before the deadline expires. This matter is set for a status hearing on 5/24/2013 at 09:00 AM. To the extent the parties have not already done so, the parties should confer pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and submit a proposed discovery schedule at least 3 days before the hearing. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/19/2013:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 17, 2013 Filing 78 MINUTE entry before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:The 4/17/13 status date is vacated.Mailed notice (srn, )
April 16, 2013 Filing 77 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Village of Norridge by Daniel Joseph Bolin (Bolin, Daniel)
February 27, 2013 Filing 76 MINUTE entry before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Village of Norridge's Motion to strike # 74 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Supplemental Authorities # 72 is denied. In ruling on the pending motion to dismiss # 13 , the Court will consider only the new cases cited by the parties, and not any additional arguments beyond those contained in the more than 125 pages of briefs already filed. Mailed notice (srn, )
February 26, 2013 Filing 75 NOTICE of Motion by Brent O. Denzin for presentment of motion to strike, motion for relief # 74 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/12/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Denzin, Brent)
February 26, 2013 Filing 74 MOTION by Defendant Village of Norridge to strike memorandum # 72 (Denzin, Brent)
February 22, 2013 Filing 73 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re memorandum # 72 of Supplemental Authorities Reported Since Briefing of Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Maksym, Walter)
February 22, 2013 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM by Tony Kole of Supplemental Authorities Reported Since Briefing of Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Maksym, Walter)
February 22, 2013 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM by Village of Norridge of New Cases Following Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (DiCianni, Thomas) (Text Modified by Help Desk on 2/22/2013, to reflect the correct filer) (tg, ).
January 28, 2013 Filing 70 MINUTE entry before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing set for 2/8/2013 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
January 14, 2013 Filing 69 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that, pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on January 3, 2013, the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin, therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED That the attached list of 330 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order shall become effective on Tuesday, January 15, 2013. Case reassigned to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/14/2013.(td, )
May 10, 2012 Filing 68 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to cite, as supplemental authority, other United States District Court cases in opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss # 65 is deniedMailed notice (ewf, )
April 25, 2012 Filing 67 NOTICE of Motion by Walter Peter Maksym, Jr for presentment of motion to supplement # 65 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 5/11/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Maksym, Walter)
April 25, 2012 Filing 66 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re MOTION by Plaintiff Tony Kole to supplement for Lave to Cite New Case Authorities # 65 (Maksym, Walter)
April 25, 2012 Filing 65 MOTION by Plaintiff Tony Kole to supplement for Lave to Cite New Case Authorities (Maksym, Walter)
April 19, 2012 Filing 64 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Plaintiffs' motion to reconsider dismissal orders [ # 56 ] is denied. Mailed notice (mb, )
April 19, 2012 Filing 63 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: The April 20, 2012 notion of motion presentment date is stricken.Mailed notice (ewf, )
April 18, 2012 Filing 62 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re memorandum in opposition to motion # 61 Reconsider Two Orders (Maksym, Walter)
April 18, 2012 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM by Tony Kole in Opposition to motion to amend/correct # 56 Reconsider Two Orders (Maksym, Walter)
April 17, 2012 Filing 60 RESPONSE by Judith D. Bernardi, Mark V. Chester, Dominic S. Falagario, Jacqueline Gregorio, James J. Jobe, Ursula A. Kucharski, Robert Martwick, Ronald A. Oppedisano, Dennis H. Stefanowicz, Dominic Sulimowski, Village of Norridgein Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Tony Kole to amend/correct Motion to Reconsider Orders # 56 (DiCianni, Thomas)
April 6, 2012 Filing 59 NOTICE of Motion by Walter Peter Maksym, Jr for presentment of motion to amend/correct # 56 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 4/20/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Maksym, Walter)
April 5, 2012 Filing 58 NOTICE of Motion by Walter Peter Maksym, Jr for presentment of motion to amend/correct # 56 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 4/20/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Maksym, Walter)
April 5, 2012 Filing 57 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re MOTION by Plaintiff Tony Kole to amend/correct Motion to Reconsider Orders # 56 , order on motion to dismiss, text entry # 54 , add and terminate parties, # 55 (Maksym, Walter)
April 5, 2012 Filing 56 MOTION by Plaintiff Tony Kole to amend/correct Motion to Reconsider Orders (Maksym, Walter)
March 28, 2012 Filing 55 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint [ # 13 ] is granted in part. Defendants Jobe and Bernardi are dismissed in both their official and individual capacities. Defendant Chester is dismissed in his individual capacity. The rest of the motion remains under advisement. Mailed notice (mb, )
March 22, 2012 Filing 54 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Defendants' motion to dismiss [ # 13 ] is granted in part. The rest of the motion is taken under advisement. Mailed notice (mb, )
March 22, 2012 Filing 53 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Defendants' Motion to Extend Discovery and Revise Case Management Schedule # 51 is granted. All dates set in the order of October 26, 2011 are stricken. In a separate minute order the motions of certain defendants to dismiss have been granted. Other motions to dismiss remain under advisement. Counsel are not required to appear on March 23, 2012. Mailed notice (ewf, )
March 21, 2012 Filing 52 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas George DiCianni for presentment of extension of time, # 51 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 3/23/2012 at 09:30 AM. (DiCianni, Thomas)
March 21, 2012 Filing 51 MOTION by Defendants Judith D. Bernardi, Mark V. Chester, Dominic S. Falagario, Jacqueline Gregorio, James J. Jobe, Ursula A. Kucharski, Robert Martwick, Ronald A. Oppedisano, Dennis H. Stefanowicz, Dominic Sulimowski, Village of Norridge for extension of time to Extend Discovery and Revise Case Management Schedule (DiCianni, Thomas)
February 23, 2012 Filing 50 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Oversized Reply, Instanter # 48 is granted. The parties need not appear before the court on 2/24/2012. Mailed notice (ewf, )
February 21, 2012 Filing 49 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas George DiCianni for presentment of motion for leave to file, [ # 48 ] before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 2/24/2012 at 09:30 AM. (mb, )
February 21, 2012 Filing 48 MOTION by Defendants Judith D. Bernardi, Mark V. Chester, Dominic S. Falagario, Jacqueline Gregorio, James J. Jobe, Ursula A. Kucharski, Robert Martwick, Ronald A. Oppedisano, Dennis H. Stefanowicz, Dominic Sulimowski, Village of Norridge for leave to file oversized reply, instanter. (mb, )
February 9, 2012 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Motion for extension of time # 45 is granted. The parties need not appear on February 10, 2012. Mailed notice (ewf, )
February 8, 2012 Filing 46 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas George DiCianni for presentment of extension of time, # 45 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 2/10/2012 at 09:30 AM. (DiCianni, Thomas)
February 8, 2012 Filing 45 MOTION by Defendants Judith D. Bernardi, Mark V. Chester, Dominic S. Falagario, Jacqueline Gregorio, James J. Jobe, Ursula A. Kucharski, Robert Martwick, Ronald A. Oppedisano, Dennis H. Stefanowicz, Dominic Sulimowski, Village of Norridge for extension of time to file Reply (DiCianni, Thomas)
February 2, 2012 Filing 44 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time and for Leave to File Oversized Reply # 42 is granted. The parties need not appear before the court on February 3, 2012. Mailed notice (ewf, )
January 31, 2012 Filing 43 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas George DiCianni for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply,, motion for relief, # 42 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 2/3/2012 at 09:30 AM. (DiCianni, Thomas)
January 31, 2012 Filing 42 MOTION by Defendants Judith D. Bernardi, Mark V. Chester, Dominic S. Falagario, Jacqueline Gregorio, James J. Jobe, Ursula A. Kucharski, Robert Martwick, Ronald A. Oppedisano, Dennis H. Stefanowicz, Dominic Sulimowski, Village of Norridge for extension of time to file response/reply as to response in opposition to motion, # 35 and to file Oversized Reply (DiCianni, Thomas)
January 23, 2012 Filing 41 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Judith D. Bernardi, Mark V. Chester, Dominic S. Falagario, Jacqueline Gregorio, James J. Jobe, Ursula A. Kucharski, Robert Martwick, Ronald A. Oppedisano, Dennis H. Stefanowicz, Dominic Sulimowski, Village of Norridge by Brent O. Denzin (Denzin, Brent)
January 11, 2012 Filing 39 AGREED ORDER Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 1/11/2012:(mb, )
January 11, 2012 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Enter Agreed Order modifying the briefing schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. [For further detail see separate order.] Mailed notice (mb, )
January 10, 2012 Filing 37 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Amended Notice of Filing Amended Response & Memo in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint & Memo in Support (Maksym, Walter)
January 10, 2012 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM by Tony Kole in Opposition to motion to dismiss, # 13 Amended Complaint (Maksym, Walter)
January 4, 2012 Filing 35 RESPONSE by Tony Kolein Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Dennis H. Stefanowicz, James J. Jobe, Village of Norridge, Dominic Sulimowski, Jacqueline Gregorio, Judith D. Bernardi, Dominic S. Falagario, Ronald A. Oppedisano, Mark V. Chester, Robert Martwick, Ursula A. Kucharski to dismiss # 13 Amende Respnse (Maksym, Walter)
December 22, 2011 Filing 34 AGREED ORDER Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 12/22/2011:(mb, )
December 22, 2011 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Enter Agreed Order for extension of time to file response. [For further detail see separate order.] Mailed notice (mb, )
December 22, 2011 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr:Motion for extension of time # 29 is granted. Plaintiffs' time to file their response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, # 13 is extended to and including 1/4/2012. Defendants' reply is due on or before 1/25/2012. The parties are not required to appear before the court on 12/30/2011. Mailed notice (ewf, )
December 19, 2011 Filing 31 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re notice of motion # 30 , MOTION by Plaintiff Tony Kole for extension of time and for Leave to File Memo in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint # 29 (Maksym, Walter)
December 19, 2011 Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion by Walter Peter Maksym, Jr for presentment of extension of time # 29 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 12/30/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Maksym, Walter)
December 19, 2011 Filing 29 MOTION by Plaintiff Tony Kole for extension of time and for Leave to File Memo in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Maksym, Walter)
December 1, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re response in opposition to motion, # 27 (Maksym, Walter)
December 1, 2011 Filing 27 RESPONSE by Tony Kolein Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Dennis H. Stefanowicz, James J. Jobe, Village of Norridge, Dominic Sulimowski, Jacqueline Gregorio, Judith D. Bernardi, Dominic S. Falagario, Ronald A. Oppedisano, Mark V. Chester, Robert Martwick, Ursula A. Kucharski to dismiss # 13 {15} & {15.1} (Maksym, Walter)
November 28, 2011 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Motion for extension of time # 23 is granted. Plaintiffs' time within which to file their Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is extended to and until December 1, 2011. Defendants may file their Reply on or before December 15, 2011. Mailed notice (ewf, )
November 18, 2011 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by Walter Peter Maksym, Jr for presentment of extension of time # 23 , motion to dismiss, # 13 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 11/29/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Maksym, Walter)
November 18, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re MOTION by Plaintiff Tony Kole for extension of time to file Respose to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint # 23 (Maksym, Walter)
November 18, 2011 Filing 23 MOTION by Plaintiff Tony Kole for extension of time to file Respose to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Maksym, Walter)
October 26, 2011 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Motion to Enlarge Time and for Leave to File an Oversized Memorandum # 18 is granted. Discovery ordered closed by 4/2/2012. Pretrial Order due by 5/1/2012. Jury trial is set for 7/3/2012 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, October 28, 2011. Mailed notice (ewf, )
October 21, 2011 Filing 21 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re MOTION by Plaintiff Tony Kole for extension of time and for leave to file oversized Memoranda # 18 Notice of Filing Motion for Extension of Time and for Leave (Maksym, Walter)
October 21, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Walter Peter Maksym, Jr for presentment of extension of time # 18 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 10/28/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Maksym, Walter)
October 21, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re MOTION by Plaintiff Tony Kole for extension of time and for leave to file oversized Memoranda # 18 (Maksym, Walter)
October 21, 2011 Filing 18 MOTION by Plaintiff Tony Kole for extension of time and for leave to file oversized Memoranda (Maksym, Walter)
September 29, 2011 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM by defendants of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. (lw, )
September 29, 2011 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Motion for Leave to File Over sized Brief # 15 is granted. Response to motion to dismiss, # 13 is due on or before 10/21/2011. Defendant's reply is due on or before 11/4/2011. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, September 30, 2011. Mailed notice (ewf, )
September 27, 2011 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas George DiCianni for presentment of motion for leave to file, # 15 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 9/30/2011 at 09:30 AM. (DiCianni, Thomas)
September 27, 2011 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendants Judith D. Bernardi, Mark V. Chester, Dominic S. Falagario, Jacqueline Gregorio, James J. Jobe, Ursula A. Kucharski, Robert Martwick, Ronald A. Oppedisano, Dennis H. Stefanowicz, Dominic Sulimowski, Village of Norridge for leave to file Oversized Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DiCianni, Thomas)
September 27, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas George DiCianni for presentment of motion to dismiss, # 13 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 9/30/2011 at 09:30 AM. (DiCianni, Thomas)
September 27, 2011 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendants Dennis H. Stefanowicz, James J. Jobe, Village of Norridge, Dominic Sulimowski, Jacqueline Gregorio, Judith D. Bernardi, Dominic S. Falagario, Ronald A. Oppedisano, Mark V. Chester, Robert Martwick, Ursula A. Kucharski to dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (DiCianni, Thomas)
September 6, 2011 Filing 12 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re amended complaint # 11 (Maksym, Walter)
September 6, 2011 Filing 11 AMENDED complaint by Tony Kole against All Plaintiffs (Maksym, Walter)
August 3, 2011 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time # 8 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on 8//5/2011. Mailed notice (ewf, )
July 28, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas George DiCianni for presentment of extension of time, # 8 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 8/5/2011 at 09:30 AM. (DiCianni, Thomas)
July 28, 2011 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendants Judith D. Bernardi, Mark V. Chester, Jacqueline Gregorio, James J. Jobe, Ursula A. Kucharski, Robert Martwick, Ronald A. Oppedisano, Dennis H. Stefanowicz, Dominic Sulimowski, Village of Norridge for extension of time (DiCianni, Thomas)
July 15, 2011 Filing 7 AGREED ORDER Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 7/15/2011. (ber, )
July 15, 2011 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr: Enter Agreed Order that Defendants are granted to July 28, 2011, to answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint. [For further detail see separate order(s).] Mailed notice (ber, )
July 1, 2011 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Judith D. Bernardi, Mark V. Chester, Jacqueline Gregorio, James J. Jobe, Ursula A. Kucharski, Robert Martwick, Ronald A. Oppedisano, Dennis H. Stefanowicz, Dominic Sulimowski, Village of Norridge by Thomas George DiCianni (DiCianni, Thomas)
June 8, 2011 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Judith D. Bernardi, Mark V. Chester, Dominic S. Falagario, Jacqueline Gregorio, James J. Jobe, Ursula A. Kucharski, Robert Martwick, Ronald A. Oppedisano, Dennis H. Stefanowicz, Dominic Sulimowski, Village of Norridge. (ber, )
June 7, 2011 Filing 3 Appearance by TONY KOLE and GHOST INDUSTRIES, LLC (Maksym, Walter)
June 7, 2011 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Maksym, Walter)
June 7, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by TONY KOLE; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-6074393.(Maksym, Walter)
June 7, 2011 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Morton Denlow. (daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kole et al v. Village of Norridge, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ghost Industries, LLC
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Kole
Represented By: Walter Peter Maksym, Jr.
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith D. Bernardi
Represented By: Brent O. Denzin
Represented By: Thomas George DiCianni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark V. Chester
Represented By: Brent O. Denzin
Represented By: Thomas George DiCianni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic S. Falagario
Represented By: Brent O. Denzin
Represented By: Thomas George DiCianni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Gregorio
Represented By: Brent O. Denzin
Represented By: Thomas George DiCianni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Jobe
Represented By: Brent O. Denzin
Represented By: Thomas George DiCianni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ursula A. Kucharski
Represented By: Brent O. Denzin
Represented By: Thomas George DiCianni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Martwick
Represented By: Brent O. Denzin
Represented By: Thomas George DiCianni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald A. Oppedisano
Represented By: Brent O. Denzin
Represented By: Thomas George DiCianni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis H. Stefanowicz
Represented By: Brent O. Denzin
Represented By: Thomas George DiCianni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Sulimowski
Represented By: Brent O. Denzin
Represented By: Thomas George DiCianni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Norridge
Represented By: Brent O. Denzin
Represented By: Thomas George DiCianni
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Bolin
Represented By: Kathleen Margaret Kunkle
Represented By: John R. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?