Pinpoint Incorporated v. Groupon, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Pinpoint Incorporated
Defendant: Groupon, Inc., Hotwire, Inc., L.L. Bean, Inc. and Orbitz LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv05597
Filed: August 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John F. Grady
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2012 Filing 97 SUR-REPLY by Plaintiff Pinpoint Incorporated Regarding Indefiniteness and Mathematical Construct Claim Limitations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K, # 2 Exhibit L)(Haan, Brian)
July 27, 2012 Filing 96 REPLY by Defendant Hotwire, Inc. to other,,,,,,,,, 93 Regarding Indefiniteness and Mathematical Construct Claim Limitations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Q, # 2 Exhibit R, # 3 Exhibit S, # 4 Exhibit T, # 5 Exhibit U)(Shah, Kalpesh)
June 29, 2012 Filing 95 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Pinpoint Incorporated [Pinpoint's Response Brief Regarding Indefiniteness and Mathematical Construct Claim Limitations] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B, Part 1, # 4 Exhibit B, Part 2, # 5 Exhibit C, Part 1, # 6 Exhibit C, Part 2, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, Part 1, # 10 Exhibit F, Part 2, # 11 Exhibit G, Part 1, # 12 Exhibit G, Part 2, # 13 Exhibit H, # 14 Exhibit I, Part 1, # 15 Exhibit I, Part 2, # 16 Exhibit I, Part 3, # 17 Exhibit J)(Haan, Brian)
June 4, 2012 Filing 94 ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant Groupon, Inc. by Jessica Marie Jax (Jax, Jessica)
April 30, 2012 Filing 93 Opening Brief by Hotwire, Inc. Regarding Indefiniteness and Mathematical Construct Claim Limitations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Deposition of Frederick Herz dated 03/04/04, # 2 Exhibit B - Pinpoint's Patent Family Tree, # 3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 7,242,988 to Hoffberg, File History, Office Action of 03/26/02, # 4 Exhibit D - References Discussing Recommendation Systems (Part 1 of 4), # 5 Exhibit D - References Discussing Recommendation Systems (Part 2 of 4), # 6 Exhibit D - References Discussing Recommendation Systems (Part 3 of 4), # 7 Exhibit D - References Discussing Recommendation Systems (Part 4 of 4), # 8 Exhibit E - Asserted Patents in Pinpoint v. Amazon.com Litigation (Part 1 of 3), # 9 Exhibit E - Asserted Patents in Pinpoint v. Amazon.com Litigation (Part 2 of 3), # 10 Exhibit E - Asserted Patents in Pinpoint v. Amazon.com Litigation (Part 3 of 3), # 11 Exhibit F - Patents-in_Suit ('600, '100, and '938) (Part 1 of 4), # 12 Exhibit F - Patents-in_Suit ('600, '100, and '938) (Part 2 of 4), # 13 Exhibit F - Patents-in_Suit ('600, '100, and '938) (Part 3 of 4), # 14 Exhibit F - Patents-in_Suit ('600, '100, and '938) (Part 4 of 4), # 15 Exhibit G - Excerpts from '100 Patent File History (Part 1 of 6), # 16 Exhibit G - Excerpts from '100 Patent File History (Part 2 of 6), # 17 Exhibit G - Excerpts from '100 Patent File History (Part 3 of 6), # 18 Exhibit G - Excerpts from '100 Patent File History (Part 4 of 6), # 19 Exhibit G - Excerpts from '100 Patent File History (Part 5 of 6), # 20 Exhibit G - Excerpts from '100 Patent File History (Part 6 of 6), # 21 Exhibit H - Patent Citation Cross References, # 22 Exhibit I - Preferred Embodiment of '600 and '100, # 23 Exhibit J - Table of Cases for '600 and '100, # 24 Exhibit K - Table of Cases for '938, # 25 Exhibit L - Comparison of the Parties' Proposed Construction, # 26 Exhibit M - Comparison of Claim Terms in Amazon.com Litigation and Hotwire Litigation, # 27 Exhibit N - Excerpts from Depositions of Jason Eisner, Ph.D. dated 02/27/04 and 02/28/04, # 28 Exhibit O - Excerpts from Deposition of Lyle H. Ungar, Ph.D. dated 02/12/04, # 29 Exhibit P - Excerpts from '036 Patent File History)(Shah, Kalpesh)
February 29, 2012 Filing 92 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady: Pre-Markman hearing held. The court will take briefs on the following two issues: (1) whether the "mathematical construct" limits all of the claims of the three patents-in-suit, or, if not all of the claims, specific claims that will be discussed; and (2) whether various terms of the three patents-in-suit are indefinite so as to invalidate the claims. Defendant may file an opening brief by April 30, 2012; plaintiff may respond by June 29, 2012; defendant may reply by July 27, 2012; and plaintiff may sur-reply by August 10, 2012. Mailed notice (cdh, )
February 8, 2012 Filing 91 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hotwire, Inc. by Adam Wolek (Wolek, Adam)
January 27, 2012 Filing 90 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to compel Hotwire to produce documents 87 is denied as discussed in open court. The pre-Markman hearing set for February 22, 2012 is stricken and reset to February 29, 2012 at 01:30 PM. Mailed notice (jmp, )
January 23, 2012 Filing 89 RESPONSE by Hotwire, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Pinpoint Incorporated to compel Hotwire to Produce Documents Relating to Claim Construction 87 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Hearing transcript, # 2 Exhibit B- Letter from Vickrey, # 3 Exhibit C- Pinpoint's Answers to Hotwire's Interrogatories)(Shah, Kalpesh)
January 13, 2012 Filing 88 NOTICE of Motion by Paul K Vickrey for presentment of motion to compel 87 before Honorable John F. Grady on 1/25/2012 at 11:00 AM. (Vickrey, Paul)
January 13, 2012 Filing 87 MOTION by Plaintiff Pinpoint Incorporated to compel Hotwire to Produce Documents Relating to Claim Construction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Vickrey, Paul)
December 22, 2011 Filing 86 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady:At the request of counsel for defendant Hotwire, Inc., the status hearing set for February 15, 2012 is canceled and reset to February 22, 2012 at 11:00 is granted without objection. Mailed notice (cdh, )
December 21, 2011 ELECTRONIC Acknowledgment of case transferred to the District of Maine as case 2:11-cv-00483, filed 12/21/2011. (lcw, )
December 19, 2011 Filing 85 TRANSFERRED to the District of Maine the original file with documents numbered 1-84, the electronic record via CMECF.(jmp, )
December 14, 2011 Filing 84 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady: Defendant L.L. Beans, Inc.'s motion for first extension of time up to and including January 5, 2012, to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint 82 is granted. Mailed notice (cdh, )
December 14, 2011 Filing 83 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Long Farris for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief 82 before Honorable John F. Grady on 12/28/2011 at 11:00 AM. (Farris, Daniel)
December 14, 2011 Filing 82 MOTION by Defendant L.L. Bean, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint 74 Agreed Motion for First Extension of Time to Answer or Plead (Farris, Daniel)
December 13, 2011 Filing 81 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady: Plaintiff's motion to dismiss defendants Groupon, Inc. and Orbitz, LLC without prejudice 78 is granted. No appearance is necessary on December 14, 2011. Mailed notice (cdh, )
December 13, 2011 Filing 80 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hotwire, Inc. by Emily Louise Peel (Peel, Emily)
December 12, 2011 Filing 79 NOTICE of Motion by Oliver D. Yang for presentment of motion to dismiss 78 before Honorable John F. Grady on 12/14/2011 at 11:00 AM. (Yang, Oliver)
December 12, 2011 Filing 78 MOTION by Plaintiff Pinpoint Incorporated to dismiss Defendants Groupon, Inc. and Orbitz, LLC Without Prejudice (Yang, Oliver)
December 5, 2011 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM Opinion Signed by the Honorable John F. Grady on 12/5/2011. Mailed notice(cdh, )
December 5, 2011 Filing 76 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady: The motion of defendant L.L. Bean, Inc. to sever and transfer the claims against it to the District of Maine 41 is granted. The Clerk is directed to transfer the claims against L.L. Bean to the District of Maine. Plaintiff is directed to dismiss without prejudice, by December 12, 2011, two of the remaining three defendants in this action. If plaintiff chooses to refile actions in this district against the two dismissed defendants, it should do so in accordance with this opinion. ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION. Mailed notice (cdh, )
December 2, 2011 Filing 75 Amended Local Rule 3.4 Notice Of Claims Involving Patents by Pinpoint Incorporated (Gibbons, Paul)
December 1, 2011 Filing 74 AMENDED complaint by Pinpoint Incorporated against All Defendants (Gibbons, Paul)
November 29, 2011 Filing 73 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady: Motion to substitute counsel of record for defendant/counterclaimant Hotwire, Inc. 71 is granted. Kirkland & Ellis LLP is granted leave to withdraw as counsel and Kal K. Shah is given leave to file his appearance on behalf of Hotwire, Inc. Attorney Kalpesh K. Shah for Hotwire, Inc. added. Attorneys Atif Khawaja; Craig D. Leavell; James Brian Medek; Sharon Helen Billington and Robert A Gretch terminated. Mailed notice (jmp, )
November 23, 2011 Filing 72 NOTICE of Motion by Craig D. Leavell for presentment of motion to substitute attorney 71 before Honorable John F. Grady on 11/30/2011 at 11:00 AM. (Leavell, Craig)
November 23, 2011 Filing 71 MOTION by Defendant Hotwire, Inc. to substitute attorney (Leavell, Craig)
November 23, 2011 Filing 70 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hotwire, Inc. by Kalpesh K Shah (Shah, Kalpesh)
November 17, 2011 Filing 69 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady: Status hearing held. Pre-Markman hearing discovery to be completed by January 20, 2012. Status conference is set for 2/15/2012 at 01:30 PM.to set a date for any necessary Markman hearing. Plaintiff is given leave to amend the complaint by December 1, 2011 to add allegations regarding an additional patent. Mailed notice (jmp, )
November 15, 2011 Filing 68 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady: Status hearing set for November 16, 2011 is canceled and reset to Thursday, November 17, 2011 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
November 14, 2011 Filing 67 ANSWER to counterclaim of Orbitz by Pinpoint Incorporated(Mahalek, David)
November 8, 2011 Filing 66 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady:The parties' joint motion for extension of time to file proposed scheduling order and Rule 26(f) report (62) is granted. No appearance is necessary on November 9, 2011. The court acknowledges that the parties timely filed their proposed scheduling order and Rule 26(f) report on November 7, 2011. A status hearing is set for November 16, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. to discuss the proposed scheduling order.Mailed notice (cdh, )
November 7, 2011 Filing 65 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EDiscovery Model Order)(Yang, Oliver)
November 2, 2011 Filing 64 REPLY by Defendant L.L. Bean, Inc., Counter Claimant L.L. Bean, Inc. to memorandum in opposition to motion 54 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Second D. SwetnamBurland Dec., # 2 Exhibit 1-A, # 3 Exhibit 1-B)(Farris, Daniel)
November 2, 2011 Filing 63 NOTICE of Motion by Jacob Douglas Smith for presentment of extension of time 62 before Honorable John F. Grady on 11/9/2011 at 11:00 AM. (Smith, Jacob)
November 2, 2011 Filing 62 MOTION by Defendants Groupon, Inc., Hotwire, Inc., L.L. Bean, Inc., Orbitz LLC, Plaintiff Pinpoint Incorporated for extension of time Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order and Rule 26(f) Report (Smith, Jacob)
November 1, 2011 Filing 61 ANSWER to counterclaim of Groupon by Pinpoint Incorporated(Mahalek, David)
October 31, 2011 Filing 60 ANSWER to counterclaim of L.L. Bean by Pinpoint Incorporated(Mahalek, David)
October 31, 2011 Filing 59 ANSWER to counterclaim of Hotwire by Pinpoint Incorporated(Mahalek, David)
October 24, 2011 Filing 58 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Orbitz LLC (Bisbikis, John)
October 24, 2011 Filing 57 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Orbitz LLC against Pinpoint Incorporated. by Orbitz LLC(Bisbikis, John)
October 19, 2011 Filing 56 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady: L.L. Bean may reply to the plaintiff's response to its motion to sever and transfer 41 by November 2, 2011. Discovery to proceed. Parties to submit a proposed joint scheduling order by November 2, 2011 in conformance with local patent rules. The Court will set a further status hearing upon receiving and reviewing the proposed scheduling order. Status hearing set for November 9, 2011 is stricken. J. David Hadden' motion for leave to appear pro hac vice 55 is granted. Attorney J David Hadden for Groupon, Inc. added. Mailed notice (jmp, )
October 19, 2011 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6484836. (Hadden, J.)
October 18, 2011 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM by Pinpoint Incorporated in Opposition to motion to sever,, motion to transfer case, 41 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Mahalek, David)
October 13, 2011 Filing 53 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady: Robert A. Gretch, Atif Khawaja, and Sharon H. Billingtons motions for leave to appear pro hac vice 50 , 51 , and 52 are granted. Attorney Robert A Gretch, Atif Khawaja, Sharon Helen Billington for Hotwire, Inc. added. Mailed notice (jmp, )
October 12, 2011 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6464296. For Hotwire, Inc. (Billington, Sharon)
October 12, 2011 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6464234. For Hotwire, Inc. (Khawaja, Atif)
October 12, 2011 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6463988. For Hotwire, Inc. (Gretch, Robert)
October 12, 2011 Filing 49 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hotwire, Inc., Counter Claimant Hotwire, Inc. by James Brian Medek (Medek, James)
October 11, 2011 Filing 48 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Orbitz LLC by Brett Edward Bachtell (Bachtell, Brett)
October 11, 2011 Filing 47 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Orbitz LLC by Brent Allen Hawkins (Hawkins, Brent)
October 11, 2011 Filing 46 Groupon's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Groupon, Inc. against Pinpoint Incorporated. by Groupon, Inc. (Smith, Jacob)
October 10, 2011 Filing 45 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Hotwire, Inc. Hotwire, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notification as to Affiliates (Leavell, Craig)
October 10, 2011 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Hotwire, Inc. against Pinpoint Incorporated Hotwire, Inc.'s Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims. by Hotwire, Inc.(Leavell, Craig)
October 10, 2011 Filing 43 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hotwire, Inc. by Craig D. Leavell (Leavell, Craig)
October 10, 2011 Filing 42 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Long Farris for presentment of motion to sever,, motion to transfer case, 41 before Honorable John F. Grady on 10/19/2011 at 11:00 AM. (Farris, Daniel)
October 10, 2011 Filing 41 MOTION by Defendant L.L. Bean, Inc., Counter Claimant L.L. Bean, Inc. to sever, MOTION by Defendant L.L. Bean, Inc., Counter Claimant L.L. Bean, Inc. to transfer case (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 1-A, # 3 Exhibit 1-B, # 4 Exhibit 1-C, # 5 Exhibit 2)(Farris, Daniel)
October 10, 2011 Filing 40 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by L.L. Bean, Inc. (Farris, Daniel)
October 10, 2011 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM filed by L.L. Bean, Inc. against Pinpoint Incorporated. by L.L. Bean, Inc.(Farris, Daniel)
October 6, 2011 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady: Defendants' agreed motion for extension of time to and including October 24, 2011, to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint 36 is granted. No appearance is necessary on October 12, 2011. Status hearing is set for November 9, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
October 6, 2011 Filing 37 NOTICE of Motion by John G. Bisbikis for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 36 before Honorable John F. Grady on 10/12/2011 at 10:30 AM. (Bisbikis, John)
October 6, 2011 Filing 36 MOTION by Defendant Orbitz LLC for extension of time to file answer Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Bisbikis, John)
October 6, 2011 Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Orbitz LLC by John G. Bisbikis (Bisbikis, John)
September 16, 2011 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady: David Swetnam-Burland's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of L.L. Bean, Inc. 32 is granted. Hector J. Ribera's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Groupon, Inc. 33 is granted; Attorney David Swetnam-Burland and Hector J. Ribera added. Mailed notice (jmp, )
September 15, 2011 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6381510. For Groupon, Inc. (Ribera, Hector)
September 12, 2011 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6368003. (Swetnam-burland, David)
September 12, 2011 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady: Groupon, Inc.'s agreed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint, up to and including October 11, 2011 26 is granted. Stacy Stitham and Peter Brann's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of L. L. Bean, Inc. [29 and 30] are granted. No appearance is necessary on September 21, 2011. Attorney Stacy O. Stitham, Peter J. Brann for L.L. Bean, Inc. added. Mailed notice (jmp, )
September 9, 2011 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6364283. (Brann, Peter)
September 9, 2011 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6361847. (Stitham, Stacy)
September 8, 2011 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Groupon, Inc. (Smith, Jacob)
September 8, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE of Motion by Jacob Douglas Smith for presentment of extension of time 26 before Honorable John F. Grady on 9/21/2011 at 11:00 AM. (Smith, Jacob)
September 8, 2011 Filing 26 MOTION by Defendant Groupon, Inc. for extension of time (AGREED) to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Smith, Jacob)
September 8, 2011 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Groupon, Inc. by Jacob Douglas Smith (Smith, Jacob)
September 8, 2011 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Groupon, Inc. by Todd Clark Jacobs (Jacobs, Todd)
September 8, 2011 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady: Defendant L.L. Bean, Inc.'s agreed motion for a first extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint up to and including October 10, 2011 19 is granted. Plaintiff's agreed motion for a first extension of time for Orbitz and Hotwire to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint up to and including October 10, 2011 21 is granted. No appearance is necessary on September 21, 2011. Mailed notice (cdh, )
September 8, 2011 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Paul Christopher Gibbons for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 21 before Honorable John F. Grady on 9/21/2011 at 11:00 AM. (Gibbons, Paul)
September 8, 2011 Filing 21 MOTION by Plaintiff Pinpoint Incorporated for extension of time to file answer Agreed Motion For A First Extension Of Time For Orbitz And Hotwire To Answer Or Plead (Gibbons, Paul)
September 8, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Robert David Donoghue for presentment of extension of time 19 before Honorable John F. Grady on 9/21/2011 at 11:00 AM. (Donoghue, Robert)
September 8, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendant L.L. Bean, Inc. for extension of time to Answer of Otherwise Plead (Donoghue, Robert)
September 8, 2011 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant L.L. Bean, Inc. by Daniel Long Farris (Farris, Daniel)
September 8, 2011 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant L.L. Bean, Inc. by Robert David Donoghue (Donoghue, Robert)
August 22, 2011 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pinpoint Incorporated as to Groupon, Inc. on 8/19/2011, answer due 9/9/2011. (Yang, Oliver)
August 22, 2011 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pinpoint Incorporated as to Orbitz LLC on 8/18/2011, answer due 9/8/2011. (Yang, Oliver)
August 22, 2011 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pinpoint Incorporated as to L.L. Bean, Inc. on 8/19/2011, answer due 9/9/2011. (Yang, Oliver)
August 22, 2011 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pinpoint Incorporated as to Hotwire, Inc. on 8/19/2011, answer due 9/9/2011. (Yang, Oliver)
August 17, 2011 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pinpoint Incorporated by David Joseph Mahalek (Mahalek, David)
August 17, 2011 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Groupon, Inc., Hotwire, Inc., L.L. Bean, Inc., Orbitz LLC (jn, )
August 16, 2011 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pinpoint Incorporated by Paul Christopher Gibbons (Gibbons, Paul)
August 16, 2011 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pinpoint Incorporated by Raymond P. Niro (Niro, Raymond)
August 16, 2011 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pinpoint Incorporated by Patrick Francis Solon (Solon, Patrick)
August 16, 2011 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pinpoint Incorporated by Oliver D. Yang (Yang, Oliver)
August 16, 2011 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pinpoint Incorporated by Brian Erik Haan (Haan, Brian)
August 16, 2011 Filing 5 Local Rule 3.4 Notice of Claims Involving Patents by Pinpoint Incorporated (Vickrey, Paul)
August 16, 2011 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Pinpoint Incorporated (Vickrey, Paul)
August 16, 2011 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pinpoint Incorporated by Paul K Vickrey (Vickrey, Paul)
August 16, 2011 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vickrey, Paul)
August 16, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed by Pinpoint Incorporated; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-6287265.(Vickrey, Paul)
August 16, 2011 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Grady. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Morton Denlow. (ef, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinpoint Incorporated v. Groupon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinpoint Incorporated
Represented By: Paul Christopher Gibbons
Represented By: Brian Erik Haan
Represented By: David Joseph Mahalek
Represented By: Raymond P. Niro
Represented By: Patrick Francis Solon
Represented By: Paul K Vickrey
Represented By: Oliver D. Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groupon, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Clark Jacobs
Represented By: Jacob Douglas Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotwire, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.L. Bean, Inc.
Represented By: Peter J. Brann
Represented By: Robert David Donoghue
Represented By: Daniel Long Farris
Represented By: Stacy O. Stitham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orbitz LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?