Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC v. Comfort Inn O'Hare et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC
Defendant: Comfort Inn O'Hare, Comfort Inn (Orland Park), Comfort Inn (Skokie), Comfort Inn (Romeoville), Comfort Inn (Sycamore), Comfort Inn (Gurnee), Comfort Inn (Palatine), Comfort Inn (Rockford), Comfort Inn (Downers Grove), Comfort Inn (Waukegan), Comfort Inn (Crystal Lake), Comfort Inn (Hoffman Estates), Comfort Inn (Bolingbrook), Comfort Inn (Ottawa), Comfort Inn (Dixon), Comfort Inn (Rochelle), Comfort Inn (Mundelein), Comfort Inn (Oakbrook Terrace), Comfort Inn & Suites (Markham), Comfort Inn & Suites (Harvey), Comfort Inn O'Hare South, Comfort Inn & Suites (Geneva) and Comfort Inn & Suites (Antioch)
Case Number: 1:2011cv06481
Filed: September 16, 2011
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Joan B. Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2011 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC by Brian Erik Haan (Haan, Brian)
September 26, 2011 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC by Gabriel I Opatken (Opatken, Gabriel)
September 22, 2011 8 MINUTE entry before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Status Hearing set for 11/22/11 at 9:30 AM. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendant of the status hearing forthwith. Parties are directed to discuss settlement of case, consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge and a proposed discovery plan. See Judge Gottschall's civil case management information about pretrial case management procedures. This information is located on the website: http//www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (mb, )
September 16, 2011 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Martin C. Ashman. (nsf, )
September 16, 2011 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC by Matthew G. McAndrews (McAndrews, Matthew)
September 16, 2011 5 Local Rule 3.4 Notice of Claims Involving Patent by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC (McAndrews, Matthew)
September 16, 2011 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC (McAndrews, Matthew)
September 16, 2011 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (McAndrews, Matthew)
September 16, 2011 2 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC regarding complaint 1 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit I, # 9 Exhibit J, # 10 Exhibit K, # 11 Exhibit L, # 12 Exhibit M, # 13 Exhibit N, # 14 Exhibit O, # 15 Exhibit P, # 16 Exhibit Q Part 1, # 17 Exhibit Q Part 2)(McAndrews, Matthew)
September 16, 2011 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-6385244.(McAndrews, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC v. Comfort Inn O'Hare et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn O'Hare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn (Orland Park)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn (Skokie)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn (Romeoville)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn (Sycamore)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn (Gurnee)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn (Palatine)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn (Rockford)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn (Downers Grove)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn (Waukegan)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn (Crystal Lake)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn (Hoffman Estates)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn (Bolingbrook)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn (Ottawa)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn (Dixon)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn (Rochelle)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn (Mundelein)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn (Oakbrook Terrace)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn & Suites (Markham)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn & Suites (Harvey)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn O'Hare South
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn & Suites (Geneva)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Inn & Suites (Antioch)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Brian Erik Haan
Represented By: Matthew G. McAndrews
Represented By: Gabriel I Opatken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?