TimesLines, Inc v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: TimesLines, Inc
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv06867
Filed: September 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John W. Darrah
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2013 Filing 185 MAILED Trademark report with certified copy of minute order dated 5/8/20113 to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (kj, )
July 8, 2013 Filing 184 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 04/17/13 before the Honorable John W. Darrah. Court Reporter Contact Information: Mary M. Hacker, (312) 435-5564, Mary_Hacker@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/29/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/7/2013. (Hacker, Mary)
July 8, 2013 Filing 183 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 03/13/13 before the Honorable John W. Darrah. Court Reporter Contact Information: Mary M. Hacker, (312) 435-5564, Mary_Hacker@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/29/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/7/2013. (Hacker, Mary)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER regarding order on motion to dismiss 181 . Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 5/8/2013. (jmm-r, )
May 8, 2013 Filing 181 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: Agreed motion by the parties to dismiss with prejudice 179 is granted. Civil case closed. Any pending dates or motions are moot. Enter order. (For further detail see separate orders.) Electronic notices. (jmm-r, )
May 7, 2013 Filing 180 NOTICE of Motion by Douglas Alan Albritton for presentment of motion to dismiss 179 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 5/9/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Albritton, Douglas)
May 7, 2013 Filing 179 MOTION by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc to dismiss case, by agreement of the parties (Albritton, Douglas)
April 23, 2013 Filing 178 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: Jury trial set for 4/23/13 is vacated. Status hearing set for 5/9/13 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
April 22, 2013 Filing 177 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: Jury trial set for 4/22/13 is re-set to 4/23/13 at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice(maf)
April 21, 2013 Filing 176 MEMORANDUM by Facebook, Inc. in support of motion to strike 175 Plaintiff's Jury Demand (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Willsey, Peter)
April 21, 2013 Filing 175 MOTION by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc. to strike Plaintiff's Jury Demand (Willsey, Peter)
April 19, 2013 Filing 174 EXHIBIT by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc. Exhibit A regarding memorandum in opposition to motion 173 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 2, # 2 Exhibit A - Part 3, # 3 Exhibit A - Part 4, # 4 Exhibit A - Part 5)(Willsey, Peter)
April 19, 2013 Filing 173 MEMORANDUM by Facebook, Inc. in Opposition to motion in limine 171 No. 9 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lori Mayall, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Willsey, Peter)
April 18, 2013 Filing 172 MEMORANDUM by TimesLines, Inc in support of motion in limine 171 No. 9 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Van Baren, Bruce)
April 18, 2013 Filing 171 MOTION by Plaintiff TimesLines, Incin limine No. 9 (Van Baren, Bruce)
April 18, 2013 Filing 170 SEALED RESPONSE by Facebook, Inc. to supplement 169 Motion in Limine No. 7 (Willsey, Peter)
April 18, 2013 Filing 169 SUPPLEMENT to Sealed motion 140 In Limine No. 7 (Van Baren, Bruce)
April 18, 2013 Filing 168 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: Plaintiff's Motion to File Supplemental Authority regarding its Motion In Limine No. 7 166 is granted, and the right to file supplemental authority on this issue is reciprocal. Mailed notice(maf)
April 18, 2013 Filing 166 MOTION by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc for leave to file Instanter the Attached Supplemental Authority in Support of Timelines, Inc.'s Motion in Limine No. 7 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Authority)(Van Baren, Bruce)
April 17, 2013 Filing 167 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: Pretrial conference held on 4/17/13. Order to follow. Mailed notice(maf)
April 15, 2013 Filing 165 RESPONSE by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc to motion in limine 148 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Albritton, Douglas)
April 15, 2013 Filing 164 SEALED RESPONSE by TimesLines, Inc to MOTION by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc.in limine No. 6: To Exclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Regarding A Statement 146 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Albritton, Douglas)
April 15, 2013 Filing 163 RESPONSE by TimesLines, Inc to MOTION by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc.in limine No. 5: To Exclude Evidence, Testimony, and Argument Relating to Facebook, Inc.'s Overall Financial Condition and Net Worth 139 (Albritton, Douglas)
April 15, 2013 Filing 162 RESPONSE by TimesLines, Inc to MOTION by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc.in limine No. 4: To Exclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Regarding Non-Actionable Alleged "Confusion" 135 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Albritton, Douglas)
April 15, 2013 Filing 161 SEALED RESPONSE by Facebook, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Incin limine No. 8 to Bar Reference or Evidence Relating to Christopher J. Bokhart's Deduction Computations 144 (Willsey, Peter)
April 15, 2013 Filing 160 RESPONSE by TimesLines, Inc to MOTION by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc.in limine No. 3: to Exclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Regarding Facebook's Unrelated Trademark Prosecution and Enforcement Efforts 130 (Albritton, Douglas)
April 15, 2013 Filing 159 SEALED RESPONSE by TimesLines, Inc to MOTION by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc.in limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Regarding Facebook's Temporary Redirection of Plaintiff's Facebook Page 121 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Albritton, Douglas)
April 15, 2013 Filing 158 RESPONSE by TimesLines, Inc to MOTION by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc.in limine No. 1 to Exclude Dr. Eli Seggev's Survey and Related Expert Report and Testimony 119 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Albritton, Douglas)
April 15, 2013 Filing 157 MEMORANDUM by Facebook, Inc. in Opposition to motion in limine 133 No. 5 to Bar Arguments or Reference to Advice of Counsel Defense (Willsey, Peter)
April 15, 2013 Filing 156 MEMORANDUM by Facebook, Inc. in Opposition to motion in limine 123 No. 1 to Exclude Dr. Deborah Jay's Survey and Related Expert Testimony (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dr. Deborah Jay)(Willsey, Peter)
April 15, 2013 Filing 155 SEALED RESPONSE by Facebook, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Inc No. 4 129 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brendan Hughes, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration)(Willsey, Peter)
April 15, 2013 Filing 154 MEMORANDUM by Facebook, Inc. in Opposition to motion in limine 137 No. 6 to Bar Dr. Itamar Simonson from Introducing Evidence or Testifying that "Timeline" is Generic (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brendan Hughes, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration)(Willsey, Peter)
April 15, 2013 Filing 153 SEALED RESPONSE by Facebook, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Inc in limine No. 7 140 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lori Mayall, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration)(Willsey, Peter)
April 15, 2013 Filing 152 SEALED RESPONSE by Facebook, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Incin limine No. 3 to Bar Reference or Evidence of Timelines, Inc.'s Actual Damages 127 (Willsey, Peter)
April 15, 2013 Filing 151 MEMORANDUM by Facebook, Inc. in Opposition to motion in limine 125 No. 2 Seeking Cancellation of the Timelines Marks (Hughes, Brendan)
April 11, 2013 Filing 150 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: Ruling on motion hearing held. Parties' agreed motion to extend the deadline for motions in limine and responses 117 is granted nunc pro tunc to 4/8/13. Responses by 4/15/13. Mailed notice(maf)
April 8, 2013 Filing 149 MEMORANDUM by Facebook, Inc. in support of motion in limine 148 to Exclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Regarding Allegations (Willsey, Peter)
April 8, 2013 Filing 148 MOTION by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc.in limine No. 7: to Exclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Regarding Allegations (Willsey, Peter)
April 8, 2013 Filing 147 SEALED DOCUMENT by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine No. 6 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A)(Willsey, Peter)
April 8, 2013 Filing 146 MOTION by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc.in limine No. 6: To Exclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Regarding A Statement (Willsey, Peter)
April 8, 2013 Filing 145 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Inc Memorandum in Support of Motion In Limine No. 8 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Albritton, Douglas)
April 8, 2013 Filing 144 MOTION by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Incin limine No. 8 to Bar Reference or Evidence Relating to Christopher J. Bokhart's Deduction Computations (Albritton, Douglas)
April 8, 2013 Filing 143 SEALED DOCUMENT by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc. Exhibit B (Willsey, Peter)
April 8, 2013 Filing 142 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Inc Memorandum in Support of Sealed Motion In Limine No. 7 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Albritton, Douglas)
April 8, 2013 Filing 141 MEMORANDUM by Facebook, Inc. in support of motion in limine 139 to Exclude Evidence, Testimony, and Argument Relating to Facebook, Inc.'s Overall Financial Condition and Net Worth (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brendan Hughes, # 2 Exhibit A)(Willsey, Peter)
April 8, 2013 Filing 140 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Inc in limine No. 7 (Albritton, Douglas)
April 8, 2013 Filing 139 MOTION by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc.in limine No. 5: To Exclude Evidence, Testimony, and Argument Relating to Facebook, Inc.'s Overall Financial Condition and Net Worth (Willsey, Peter)
April 8, 2013 Filing 138 MEMORANDUM by TimesLines, Inc in support of motion in limine 137 No. 6 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Albritton, Douglas)
April 8, 2013 Filing 137 MOTION by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Incin limine No. 6 to Bar Dr. Itamar Simonson from Introducing Evidence or Testifying that "Timeline" is Generic (Albritton, Douglas)
April 8, 2013 Filing 136 MEMORANDUM by Facebook, Inc. in support of motion in limine 135 to Exclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Regarding Non-Actionable Alleged "Confusion" (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brendan Hughes, # 2 Exhibit A - F)(Willsey, Peter)
April 8, 2013 Filing 135 MOTION by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc.in limine No. 4: To Exclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Regarding Non-Actionable Alleged "Confusion" (Willsey, Peter)
April 8, 2013 Filing 134 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Inc Memorandum in Support of Motion In Limine No. 5 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Albritton, Douglas)
April 8, 2013 Filing 133 MOTION by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Incin limine No. 5 to Bar Evidence or Reference to Advice of Counsel Defense (Albritton, Douglas)
April 8, 2013 Filing 132 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Inc Memorandum in Support of Sealed Motion in Limine No. 4 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Albritton, Douglas)
April 8, 2013 Filing 131 MEMORANDUM by Facebook, Inc. in support of motion in limine 130 to Exclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Regarding Facebook's Unrelated Trademark Prosecution and Enforcement Efforts (Willsey, Peter)
April 8, 2013 Filing 130 MOTION by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc.in limine No. 3: to Exclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Regarding Facebook's Unrelated Trademark Prosecution and Enforcement Efforts (Willsey, Peter)
April 8, 2013 Filing 129 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Inc No. 4 (Albritton, Douglas)
April 8, 2013 Filing 128 MEMORANDUM by TimesLines, Inc in support of motion in limine 127 No. 3 (Van Baren, Bruce)
April 8, 2013 Filing 127 MOTION by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Incin limine No. 3 to Bar Reference or Evidence of Timelines, Inc.'s Actual Damages (Van Baren, Bruce)
April 8, 2013 Filing 126 MEMORANDUM by TimesLines, Inc in support of motion in limine 125 No. 2 (Van Baren, Bruce)
April 8, 2013 Filing 125 MOTION by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Incin limine No. 2 to Bar Reference or Evidence that Facebook Seeks Cancellation of Timelines, Inc.'s Trademarks (Van Baren, Bruce)
April 8, 2013 Filing 124 MEMORANDUM by TimesLines, Inc in support of motion in limine 123 No. 1 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Van Baren, Bruce)
April 8, 2013 Filing 123 MOTION by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Incin limine No. 1 to Exclude Dr. Deborah Jay's Survey and Related Expert Testimony (Van Baren, Bruce)
April 8, 2013 Filing 122 MEMORANDUM by Facebook, Inc. in support of motion in limine 121 to Exclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Regarding Facebook's Temporary Redirection of Plaintiff's Facebook Page (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brendan Hughes, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Willsey, Peter)
April 8, 2013 Filing 121 MOTION by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc.in limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Regarding Facebook's Temporary Redirection of Plaintiff's Facebook Page (Willsey, Peter)
April 8, 2013 Filing 120 MEMORANDUM by Facebook, Inc. in support of motion in limine 119 to Exclude Dr. Eli Seggev's Survey and Related Expert Report and Testimony (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brendan Hughes, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Willsey, Peter)
April 8, 2013 Filing 119 MOTION by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc.in limine No. 1 to Exclude Dr. Eli Seggev's Survey and Related Expert Report and Testimony (Willsey, Peter)
April 5, 2013 Filing 118 NOTICE of Motion by Bruce Robert Van Baren for presentment of motion to amend/correct,, extension of time,, motion for relief,,,,, 117 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 4/11/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Van Baren, Bruce)
April 5, 2013 Filing 117 MOTION by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Inc to amend/correct order on motion in limine,,, ruling on motion hearing,,, set deadlines/hearings,, 113 the Schedule entered by the court on March 13, 2013, MOTION by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Inc for extension of time for filing Motions in Limine and Responses thereto (Van Baren, Bruce)
April 1, 2013 Filing 116 ENTER MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 4/1/2013: Mailed notice (jmp, )
April 1, 2013 Filing 115 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: For the reasons in the attached memorandum opinion and order, defendant's motion for summary judgment 79 is denied as to plaintiff's amended complaint and defendant's counterclaims, with the exception of defendant's second cause of action in its counterclaim, which seeks, in part, an entry of the express abandonment of plaintiff's PTO application, Serial No. 85/432,026. Plaintiff concedes the PTO deemed this application is abandoned; therefore, summary judgment is entered in favor of defendant with regards to the abandonment of plaintiff's application, Serial No. 85/432,026. Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order. [For further detail see separate order(s).] Mailed notice (jmp, )
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 3/13/2013. Mailed notice. (np, )
March 13, 2013 Filing 113 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: Ruling on motion hearing held. Defendant's motion in limine 96 is granted. Enter Order. Motions in limine shall be filed by 04/05/13, responses by 04/12/2013. Ruling at the pretrial conference. Pretrial conference set for 04/18/2013 is re-set to 04/17/2013 at 2:00 p.m. Ruling on motion hearing set for 04/18/2013 is re-set to 04/17/2013 at 2:00 p.m. Status hearing set for 04/04/2013 is vacated. [For further detail see separate order(s).] Mailed notice.(np, )
March 6, 2013 Filing 112 MEMORANDUM by TimesLines, Inc in Opposition to Sealed motion, 85 Motion for Summary Judgment (Redacted Version) (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Timelines, Inc.'s Local Rule 56.1(b)(3) Response to Facebook, Inc.'s Local Rule 56.1(a)(3) Statement of Material Facts, and Timelines' Local Rule 56.1(b)(3)(C) Statement of Additional Material Facts that Require the Denial of Summary Judgment)(Van Baren, Bruce)
March 5, 2013 Filing 111 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 02/28/13 before the Honorable John W. Darrah. Court Reporter Contact Information: Mary M. Hacker, (312) 435-5564, Mary_Hacker@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/26/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2013. (Hacker, Mary)
March 5, 2013 Filing 110 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 02/06/13 before the Honorable John W. Darrah. Court Reporter Contact Information: Mary M. Hacker, (312) 435-5564, Mary_Hacker@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/26/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2013. (Hacker, Mary)
March 4, 2013 Filing 109 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: Defendant's motion in limine 96 set for 3/5/13 will be heard on 3/13/13 at 9:30 a.m. No appearance is needed on 3/5/13. Mailed notice (maf)
March 4, 2013 Filing 108 DECLARATION of Susan Li regarding motion in limine 96 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hughes, Brendan)
February 28, 2013 Filing 107 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: Defendant's motion in limine 96 set for 3/6/13 will be heard on 3/5/13 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (maf)
February 28, 2013 Filing 106 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: Ruling on motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file Additional Facts in its Local Rule 56.1(b)(3)(C) Statement of Additional Facts in Opposition to Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment 102 is granted. Mailed notice(maf)
February 22, 2013 Filing 105 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: D efendant's motion in limine 96 to be presented on 3/6/2013 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (jmp, )
February 22, 2013 Filing 104 MEMORANDUM by TimesLines, Inc in support of motion for leave to file 102 Additional Facts in its Local Rule 56.1(b)(3)(C) Statement of Additional Facts in Opposition to Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (Van Baren, Bruce)
February 22, 2013 Filing 103 NOTICE of Motion by Bruce Robert Van Baren for presentment of motion for leave to file 102 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 2/28/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Van Baren, Bruce)
February 22, 2013 Filing 102 MOTION by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc for leave to file Additional Facts in its Local Rule 56.1(b)(3)(C) Statement of Additional Facts in Opposition to Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (Van Baren, Bruce)
February 22, 2013 Filing 101 DECLARATION of Brendan Hughes regarding reply 99 , reply to response to motion 98 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 2)(Hughes, Brendan)
February 21, 2013 Filing 100 SEALED RESPONSE by Facebook, Inc. to sealed response 92 LR 56.1 Statement of Facts (Hughes, Brendan)
February 21, 2013 Filing 99 SEALED REPLY by Facebook, Inc. to MOTION by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc. for summary judgment 79 , sealed response 95 (Willsey, Peter)
February 21, 2013 Filing 98 REPLY by Facebook, Inc. to MOTION by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc. for summary judgment 79 , sealed response 95 (Willsey, Peter)
February 20, 2013 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM by Facebook, Inc. in support of motion in limine 96 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hughes, Brendan)
February 20, 2013 Filing 96 MOTION by Defendant Facebook, Inc.in limine (Hughes, Brendan)
February 14, 2013 Filing 95 SEALED RESPONSE by TimesLines, Inc to memorandum 80 of law by Facebook for summary judgment (Albritton, Douglas)
February 14, 2013 Filing 94 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc (Exs. 23-30) regarding sealed response 92 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Exs. 31-40), # 2 Exhibit (Exs. 41-50), # 3 Exhibit (Exs. 51-60), # 4 Exhibit (Exs. 61-70), # 5 Exhibit (Exs. 71-80), # 6 Exhibit (Exs. 81-84, 90-92), # 7 Exhibit (Exs. 93-94))(Albritton, Douglas)
February 14, 2013 Filing 93 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc (Exs. 2, 3) regarding sealed response 92 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Exs. 5, 6, 7, 9), # 2 Exhibit (Exs. 14, 16, 17, 18), # 3 Exhibit (Exs. 19, 20, 21, 22), # 4 Exhibit (Exs. 85-89))(Albritton, Douglas)
February 14, 2013 Filing 92 SEALED RESPONSE LR 56.1 STATEMENT OF FACTS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exs. 1, 4, 8, 10-13, 15)(Albritton, Douglas)
February 6, 2013 Filing 91 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: Ruling on motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to excuse James T. Hultquist from attending the pretrial conference is granted 74 . Plaintiff's Motion For Narrow Relief From The Protective Order is granted 76 . Defendants motion for leave to file a document under seal is granted 82 . Plaintiffs motion to withdraw the appearance of Raven Moore is granted 87 . Leave is granted to substitute counsel. No appearance is needed on 2/7/13 or 2/12/13. Motion in limine to be filed by 2/20/13, reply by 2/27/13. Ruling at the pretrial conference on 4/18/13 at 1:30 PM. Mailed notice (jmp, )
February 6, 2013 Filing 90 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Inc by Michael Lawrence Demarino (Demarino, Michael)
February 6, 2013 Filing 89 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Inc by Bruce Robert Van Baren (Van Baren, Bruce)
February 5, 2013 Filing 88 NOTICE of Motion by Raven Moore for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 87 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 2/12/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Moore, Raven)
February 5, 2013 Filing 87 MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Inc to withdraw as attorney Appearance of Raven Moore (Moore, Raven)
February 5, 2013 Filing 86 SEALED DOCUMENT by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc. Exhibit 64 and Exhibit 69 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 69)(Willsey, Peter)
February 5, 2013 Filing 85 SEALED MOTION by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc. Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)(Willsey, Peter)
February 5, 2013 Filing 84 MEMORANDUM by Facebook, Inc. in Opposition to motion for miscellaneous relief 76 from the Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Willsey, Peter)
January 31, 2013 Filing 83 NOTICE of Motion by Brendan J. Hughes for presentment of motion for leave to file 82 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 2/7/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Hughes, Brendan)
January 31, 2013 Filing 82 MOTION by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc. for leave to file a Document Under Seal (Hughes, Brendan)
January 31, 2013 Filing 81 DECLARATION of Brendan J. Hughes regarding motion for summary judgment 79 , memorandum 80 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 13, # 2 Exhibit 14 - 17, # 3 Exhibit 18 - 19, # 4 Exhibit 20 - 31, # 5 Exhibit 32 - 35, # 6 Exhibit 36 - 40, # 7 Exhibit 41 - 43, # 8 Exhibit 44 - 46, # 9 Exhibit 47 - 51, # 10 Exhibit 52 - 57, # 11 Exhibit 58 - 59, # 12 Exhibit 60 - 62, # 13 Exhibit 63.1, # 14 Exhibit 63.2, # 15 Exhibit 64 - 71)(Hughes, Brendan)
January 31, 2013 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM motion for summary judgment 79 by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Statement of Undisputed Material Facsts)(Willsey, Peter)
January 31, 2013 Filing 79 MOTION by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc. for summary judgment (Willsey, Peter)
January 30, 2013 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM by TimesLines, Inc in support of motion for miscellaneous relief 76 [Plaintiff Timelines, Inc.'s Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Its Motion For Narrow Relief From The Protective Order] (Albritton, Douglas)
January 30, 2013 Filing 77 NOTICE of Motion by Douglas Alan Albritton for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 76 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 2/6/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Albritton, Douglas)
January 30, 2013 Filing 76 MOTION by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Inc[Plaintiff Timelines, Inc.'s Motion For Narrow Relief From The Protective Order] (Albritton, Douglas)
January 30, 2013 Filing 75 NOTICE of Motion by Douglas Alan Albritton for presentment of before Honorable John W. Darrah on 2/6/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Albritton, Douglas)
January 30, 2013 Filing 74 MOTION by [Timelines, Inc.'s To Excuse James T. Hultquist From Attending The Pretrial Conference] by TimesLines, Inc (Albritton, Douglas) (Docket text modified by Clerks Office Staff)
January 8, 2013 Filing 73 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: Ruling on motion hearing held. Defendant's motion in limine to Exclude Dr. Eil Seffev's Survey and Related Expert Report and Testimony 69 is denied as set forth on the record. Dispositive motions to be filed by 01/31/2013, responses by 02/14/2013, replies by 02/21/2013. Briefs shall not exceed 20 pages in length. Status hearing/ruling set for 04/04/2013 at 9:30 a.m. Two copies of the pretrial order to be delivered to chambers by noon on 04/15/2013. Mailed notice. (np, )
December 20, 2012 Filing 72 NOTICE of Motion by Brendan J. Hughes for presentment of motion in limine 69 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 1/8/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Hughes, Brendan)
December 19, 2012 Filing 71 NOTICE of Motion by Brendan J. Hughes for presentment of motion in limine 69 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 12/27/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Hughes, Brendan)
December 19, 2012 Filing 70 MEMORANDUM by Facebook, Inc. in support of motion in limine 69 to Exclude Dr. Eli Seggev's Survey and Related Expert Report and Testimony (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lori F. Mayall, Esq., # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Hughes, Brendan)
December 19, 2012 Filing 69 MOTION by Counter Claimant Facebook, Inc., Defendant Facebook, Inc.in limine to Exclude Dr. Eli Seggev's Survey and Related Expert Report and Testimony (Hughes, Brendan)
October 22, 2012 Filing 68 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 6/27/12 before the Honorable John W. Darrah. Court Reporter Contact Information: Tracey D. McCullough, 312-435-5570, tracey_mccullough@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/13/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2013. (Mccullough, Tracey)
September 11, 2012 Filing 67 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc by William Seth Weltman (Weltman, William)
August 30, 2012 Filing 66 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah:Ruling on motion hearing held. Parties' agreed motion for an extension of time to complete fact discovery to 9/28/12 64 is granted. Mailed notice(maf)
August 24, 2012 Filing 65 NOTICE of Motion by Raven Moore for presentment of extension of time 64 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 8/30/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Moore, Raven)
August 24, 2012 Filing 64 MOTION by Defendant Facebook, Inc., Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc for extension of time of the Deadline for the Close of Fact Discovery (Moore, Raven)
July 31, 2012 Filing 63 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 01/24/12 before the Honorable John W. Darrah. Court Reporter Contact Information: Mary M. Hacker, (312) 435-5564, Mary_Hacker@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2012. (Hacker, Mary)
June 28, 2012 Filing 62 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: Ruling on motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to clarify and compel is denied 58 . Motions by attorneysBrendan Hughes and Vincent Badolato for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the defendant are granted 56 , 57 . Attorney Brendan J. Hughes, Vincent J. Badolato for TimesLines, Inc added. Mailed notice (jmp, )
June 26, 2012 Filing 61 REPLY by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Inc to motion to clarify 58 , notice of motion 59 (Moore, Raven)
June 26, 2012 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM by Facebook, Inc. in Opposition to motion to clarify 58 and compel (Willsey, Peter)
June 21, 2012 Filing 59 NOTICE of Motion by Raven Moore for presentment of motion to clarify 58 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 6/27/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Moore, Raven)
June 21, 2012 Filing 58 MOTION by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc to clarify [Plaintiff Timelines, Inc.'s Motion To Clarify And Compel] (Moore, Raven)
May 21, 2012 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7171236. (Badolato, Vincent)
May 21, 2012 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7171189. (Hughes, Brendan)
April 27, 2012 Filing 51 MINUTE entry before Honorable Nan R. Nolan:Settlement conference held on 4/17/2012, agreement not reached. All matters relating to the referral of this action having been concluded, the referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned judge. Judge Honorable Nan R. Nolan no longer referred to the case.Mailed notice (lxs, )
April 24, 2012 Filing 55 ENTER PROTECTIVE Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 4/24/2012: Mailed notice (jmp, )
April 24, 2012 Filing 54 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah:The incorrect protective order having been entered, docket entry # 53 , the Court issues the correct protectiveorder. Enter order. [For further detail see separate order(s).] Mailed notice (jmp, )
April 24, 2012 Filing 53 ENTER PROTECTIVE Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 4/24/2012: Mailed notice (jmp, )
April 24, 2012 Filing 52 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: Ruling on motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for protective order 44 is granted. Enter order. [For further detail see separate order(s).] Mailed notice (jmp, ) Modified on 5/2/2012 (maf, ).
April 16, 2012 Filing 50 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: At the parties' request, plaintiff's motion for a protective order 44 , noticed for presentment on 4/17/12 will be heard on 4/24/12 at 9:30 a.m. No appearance is needed on 4/17/12. Mailed notice(maf)
April 16, 2012 Filing 49 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: Docket entry #48 is vacated as entered in error. Mailed notice(maf)
April 16, 2012 Filing 48 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: At the partoes' request, plaintiff's motion for a protective order 44 , noticed for presentment on 4/17/12 will be heard on 4/24/12 at 9:30 a.m. No appearance is needed on 4/17/12. Mailed notice(maf)
April 12, 2012 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before Honorable Nan R. Nolan:Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 4/12/2012. Settlement conference set for 4/17/20/12 at 10 a.m. to stand.Mailed notice (lxs, )
April 11, 2012 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before Honorable Nan R. Nolan:Telephonic status hearing set for 4/12/2012 at 11:00 a.m. The Court will initiate the call to counsel.Mailed notice (lxs, )
April 9, 2012 Filing 45 NOTICE of Motion by James Terrence Hultquist for presentment of motion for protective order 44 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 4/17/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Hultquist, James)
April 9, 2012 Filing 44 MOTION by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc for protective order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit s A - B)(Hultquist, James)
March 22, 2012 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before Honorable Nan R. Nolan:In light of the 4/17/2012 settlement conference set to begin at 10:00 a.m., counsels' settlement letters should be faxed to (312) 554-8540, no later than 4:00 p.m. on 4/10/2012.Mailed notice (lxs, )
February 14, 2012 Filing 42 MINUTE entry before Honorable Nan R. Nolan:At counsels' request, Settlement Conference set for 3/4/2012 is stricken and reset for 4/17/2012 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice (lxs, )
February 13, 2012 Filing 41 MINUTE entry before Honorable Nan R. Nolan:In light of the 3/5/2012 settlement conference set to begin at 9:00 a.m., counsels' settlement letters should be faxed to (312) 554-8540, no later than 4:00 p.m. on 2/27/2012.Mailed notice (lxs, )
January 26, 2012 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: The Court's 1/24/12 is amended to reflect the following: Jury Trial set for 4/22/2013 at 9:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2013 at 1:30 PM. Discovery ordered closed by 12/28/2012.Mailed notice(maf)
January 24, 2012 Filing 39 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: Status hearing held. All discovery ordered closed on 12/28/11. Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2012 at 01:30 PM. Jury Trial set for 4/22/2013 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (jmp, )
January 24, 2012 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before Honorable Nan R. Nolan: Settlement Conference set for 3/5/2012 at 09:00 AM. Prior to the settlement conference, counsel shall review the following Seventh Circuit cases which discuss the retention of federal jurisdiction to enforce the terms of a settlement agreement: Blue Cross and Blue Shield Ass'n v. American Express Co., 467 F.3d 634 (7th Cir. 2006) and Shapo v. Engle, 463 F.3d 641 (7th Cir. 2006). Parties are reminded that Magistrate Judge Nolan requires compliance with her Standing Order Setting Settlement Conference, which is available on the courts website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov.Mailed notice (lxs, )
January 24, 2012 Filing 37 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Nan R. Nolan for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: a settlement conference.Mailed notice. (maf)
January 20, 2012 Filing 36 STATUS Report - Joint Initial Status Report by Facebook, Inc., TimesLines, Inc (Albritton, Douglas)
January 11, 2012 Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc, Counter Defendant TimesLines, Inc by Raven Moore (Moore, Raven)
December 27, 2011 Filing 34 Timelines ANSWER to counterclaim asserted by Facebook, by TimesLines, Inc(Albritton, Douglas)
December 6, 2011 Filing 33 ANSWER to amended complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Facebook, Inc. against All Plaintiffs. by Facebook, Inc.(Norberg, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2011 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: Agreed motion to continue initial status conference 30 is granted. Status hearing set for 12/6/11 is re-set to 1/24/12 at 9:30 a.m. No appearance is needed on 11/17/11. Mailed notice(maf)
November 14, 2011 Filing 31 Agreed NOTICE of Motion by Douglas Alan Albritton for presentment of motion to continue 30 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 11/17/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Albritton, Douglas)
November 14, 2011 Filing 30 MOTION by Defendant Facebook, Inc., Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc to continue Initial Status Conference (Albritton, Douglas)
October 19, 2011 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by TimesLines, Inc. Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 10/7/2011, answer due 12/6/2011. (Hultquist, James)
October 18, 2011 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: Status hearing set for 12/6/2011 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (jmp, )
October 8, 2011 Filing 27 AMENDED complaint by TimesLines, Inc against Facebook, Inc. (Albritton, Douglas)
October 7, 2011 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Facebook, Inc. by Michael G Rhodes (Rhodes, Michael)
October 5, 2011 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: Application by Anne H. Peck to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the defendant 22 is granted. The application by Peter Joel Willsey to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the defendant 23 is also granted. Attorney Anne H. Peck, Peter Joel Willsey for defendant Facebook, Inc. added. Mailed notice (jmp, )
October 5, 2011 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6442252. (Willsey, Peter)
October 4, 2011 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before Honorable John W. Darrah: Application by Gavin Charleston to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the defendant 20 is granted. Gavin L. Charleston added. Mailed notice (jmp, )
October 4, 2011 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6441712. (Peck, Anne)
October 3, 2011 Filing 21 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Facebook, Inc. (Norberg, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2011 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6434179. (Charlston, Gavin)
October 2, 2011 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Facebook, Inc. by Jordan Mitchell Heinz (Heinz, Jordan)
October 1, 2011 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: There is a typographical error on page 7 of the 09/30/11 Order, R. 16: in the third line from the top, the phrase "with a registered trademark symbol" should read "without a registered trademark symbol." Mailed notice (Chang, Edmond)
September 30, 2011 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Application by Jeffrey Norberg to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the defendant is granted. Application by Michael Rhodes to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the defendant is granted. Mailed notice (slb, )
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 9/30/2011:Mailed notice(slb, )
September 30, 2011 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Emergency hearing held on plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order. Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order 7 is denied. Mailed notice (slb, )
September 30, 2011 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6432440. (Rhodes, Michael)
September 30, 2011 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6432418. (Norberg, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2011 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Facebook, Inc. by Steven Douglas McCormick (McCormick, Steven)
September 30, 2011 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by Facebook, Inc. in Opposition to motion for temporary restraining order 7 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Monagan, Thomas)
September 30, 2011 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Facebook, Inc. by Thomas M Monagan, III (Monagan, Thomas)
September 30, 2011 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by TimesLines, Inc in support of motion for temporary restraining order 7 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hultquist, James)
September 30, 2011 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc for temporary restraining order (Hultquist, James)
September 29, 2011 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John W. Darrah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Nan R. Nolan. (daj, )
September 29, 2011 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc by Douglas Alan Albritton (Albritton, Douglas)
September 29, 2011 Filing 5 Plaintiff Local Rule 3.4 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by TimesLines, Inc (Hultquist, James)
September 29, 2011 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TimesLines, Inc re complaint 1 (Hultquist, James)
September 29, 2011 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TimesLines, Inc by James Terrence Hultquist (Hultquist, James)
September 29, 2011 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hultquist, James)
September 29, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by TimesLines, Inc; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-6427615.(Hultquist, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TimesLines, Inc v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TimesLines, Inc
Represented By: Douglas Alan Albritton
Represented By: James Terrence Hultquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Gavin L. Charlston
Represented By: Jordan Mitchell Heinz
Represented By: Steven Douglas McCormick
Represented By: Thomas M Monagan, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Norberg
Represented By: Anne H. Peck
Represented By: Michael G Rhodes
Represented By: Peter Joel Willsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?