Cascades Computer Innovation, LLC v. Sony-Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc.
Plaintiff: Cascades Computer Innovation, LLC
Defendant: Sony-Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv07223
Filed: October 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John W. Darrah
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/2/2014: The Court rules on the disputed claim terms as set forth in the accompanying decision. These cases are set for a further status hearing before the undersigned jud ge on January 21, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to confer prior to that date regarding whether there are additional common issues that might warrant expansion of the IOP 13 pretrial consolidation and are to submit a status report contai ning their positions in this regard by no later than January 17, 2014. The status report should include each party's positions on what, if any, further fact discovery is appropriate under Local Patent Rule 1.3 as well as each party's intentions with regard to the disclosure of expert witnesses. (mk)
July 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/5/2013: Defendants' motions to dismiss are denied for the reasons stated in this decision. Status hearing set for 7/15/2013 at 9:30 AM. Prior to 7/15/2013, counsel are to confer regarding a joint schedule for claim construction in this and the other cases assigned to Judge Kennelly for joint determination of that issue. (mk)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 4/18/2012. (ma,)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cascades Computer Innovation, LLC v. Sony-Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony-Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cascades Computer Innovation, LLC
Represented By: Arthur Anthony Gasey
Represented By: Paul Christopher Gibbons
Represented By: Raymond P. Niro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?