Golla v. Circuit Court of Cook County Illinois
Plaintiff: Francis Joseph Golla
Defendant: Circuit Court of Cook County Illinois
Case Number: 1:2011cv08149
Filed: November 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Harry D. Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1985
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/18/2015:Mailed notice(wp, )
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint 104 is granted. Status hearing set for 12/18/2014 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/13/2014:Mailed notice(wp, )
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/8/2012: Case Terminated.Mailed notice(wp, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golla v. Circuit Court of Cook County Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Joseph Golla
Represented By: Joel Abbott D'Alba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circuit Court of Cook County Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?