Rude Music Inc v. Newt 2012, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Rude Music Inc
Defendant: Newt 2012, Inc., Newt Gingrich and American Conservative Union
Case Number: 1:2012cv00640
Filed: January 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2012 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion to strike affirmative defenses 24 is granted in part and denied in part. Affirmative defenses 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, and 11 in the amended answer are stricken because they consist only of bare legal conclusions. Plaintiff's motion is denied as to affirmative defense 3, which is better dealt with based on a more complete factual record, and as to affirmative defense 13, which may be duplicative of defense 12, but if so plaintiff is not unduly prejudiced by that. (mk)
April 4, 2012 Filing 45 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Motion to supplement 41 is granted. Status hearing held and continued to 7/9/2012 at 09:00 AM. with parties by telephone. Motion to strike is taken under advisement. Discovery ordered closed 10/4/2012. Deadline for requesting leave to amend pleadings and add parties is 8/15/2012. (or, )
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/4/12: For the reasons stated in this order, the Court grants defendant American Conservative Union's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction [dkt. no. 26]. The case remains pending against defendants Newt 2012, Inc. and Newt Gingrich. (mk)
April 3, 2012 Filing 43 RESPONSE by Newt Gingrich, Newt 2012, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Rude Music Inc to supplement its Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses 41 (Braun, Karl)
March 29, 2012 Filing 42 NOTICE of Motion by Annette Michele McGarry for presentment of motion to supplement 41 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/4/2012 at 09:30 AM. (McGarry, Annette)
March 29, 2012 Filing 41 MOTION by Plaintiff Rude Music Inc to supplement its Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McGarry, Annette)
March 28, 2012 Filing 40 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/28/12. (mk)
March 28, 2012 Filing 39 REPLY by American Conservative Union to response in opposition to motion 34 to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental (Keller))(Kirby, Thomas)
March 27, 2012 Filing 38 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand And Affirmative Defenses by Newt Gingrich, Newt 2012, Inc.(Rosenblatt, Brian)
March 23, 2012 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's agreed motion for entry of a protective order is granted. Plaintiff is directed to provide an electronic copy of the proposed order for signature, following the instructions on Judge Kennelly's web page. The motion hearing date of 3/27/12 is vacated. Mailed notice (nf, )
March 21, 2012 Filing 36 NOTICE of Motion by Marianne C. Holzhall for presentment of motion for protective order 35 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/27/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Holzhall, Marianne)
March 21, 2012 Filing 35 MOTION by Plaintiff Rude Music Inc for protective order (agreed) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Holzhall, Marianne)
March 21, 2012 Filing 34 RESPONSE by Rude Music Incin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant American Conservative Union to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 26 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-14)(McGarry, Annette)
March 14, 2012 Filing 32 RULE 3.2 Disclosure by Newt Gingrich, Newt 2012, Inc. (Braun, Karl)
March 13, 2012 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Hearing held on motion to strike[ affirmative defenses 24]. Motion is continued to 4/4/2012 at 09:30 AM. Amended answer by Newt defendant to be filed by 3/27/2012. (or, )
March 12, 2012 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: It has come to the Court's attention that plaintiff has noticed for hearing on 3/13/12 a motion to strike affirmative defenses. Counsel should appear as scheduled on that motion. The Court wishes to discuss it with counsel rather than setting a briefing schedule. (mk)
March 12, 2012 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: It has come to the Court's attention that plaintiff has noticed for hearing on 3/13/12 a motion to strike affirmative defenses. Counsel should appear as scheduled on that motion. The Court wishes to discuss it with counsel rather than setting a briefing schedule. (mk)
March 12, 2012 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant ACU's motion to dismiss is taken under advisement. A briefing schedule has already been set. The motion hearing date of 3/13/12 is vacated. (or, )
March 7, 2012 Filing 28 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by American Conservative Union (Kirby, Thomas)
March 7, 2012 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM by American Conservative Union in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 26 (Kirby, Thomas)
March 7, 2012 Filing 26 MOTION by Defendant American Conservative Union to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gregg Keller)(Kirby, Thomas)
March 7, 2012 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by Annette Michele McGarry for presentment of motion to strike 24 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/13/2012 at 09:30 AM. (McGarry, Annette)
March 7, 2012 Filing 24 MOTION by Plaintiff Rude Music Inc to strike affirmative defenses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(McGarry, Annette)
March 5, 2012 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Rule 16(b) status hearing held with attorneys for all parties. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures for all parties other than ACU are due 3/28/2012. ACU's disclosures are due 4/5/12. Motion to dismiss by ACU is to be filed by 3/7/12; response is due by 3/21/12; reply is due by 3/28/12. Ruling set for 4/4/12 at 9:30 AM. Status hearing continued to 4/4/2012 at 09:30 AM. (or, )
March 5, 2012 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The motions to appear pro hac vice filed by Karl Bruan, Byron Lindberg, and Thomas Kirby are granted [docket nos. 10, 11 & 18]. These attorneys are directed to promptly contact the Clerk of Court to establish an e-filing account in this district. The motion hearing date of 3/6/12 is vacated. Mailed notice (lp, )
March 5, 2012 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Newt Gingrich, Newt 2012, Inc.(Rosenblatt, Brian)
February 29, 2012 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas W. Kirby for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 18 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/6/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Kirby, Thomas)
February 29, 2012 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The initial status hearing on 3/5/12 will be held at 8:45 a.m., not 9:00 a.m., in chambers (Room 2188). (mk)
February 29, 2012 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant American Conservative Union for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Receipt number 0752-6888083. (Kirby, Thomas)(Docket text modified by Clerk's Office.) Modified on 2/29/2012 (kj, ).
February 29, 2012 Filing 17 PAYMENT by American Conservative Union of Pro Hac Fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6888083. (Kirby, Thomas)
February 28, 2012 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Conservative Union by Steven F. Pflaum (Pflaum, Steven)
February 28, 2012 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Conservative Union by Brian E. Cohen (Cohen, Brian)
February 14, 2012 Filing 14 LETTER from Marianne C. Holzhall dated 2/9/2012 with Copyright information. (nf, )
February 7, 2012 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The agreed motion of defendants Newt 2012 and Newt Gingrich to enlarge time is granted. Response to complaint is to be filed by 3/5/12. The motion hearing date of 2/8/12 is vacated. Mailed notice (nf, )
February 6, 2012 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 3/5/12 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Judges.aspx. (mk)
February 2, 2012 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Newt Gingrich, Newt 2012, Inc. by Darren Patrick Grady (Grady, Darren)
February 2, 2012 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendants Newt Gingrich, Newt 2012, Inc. for extension of time to file answer Agreed Motion to Enlarge Time to Answer and/or Otherwise Plead (Rosenblatt, Brian)
February 1, 2012 MAILED Copyright Request Letter to Plaintiffs counsel. (nf, )
January 30, 2012 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (McGarry, Annette)
January 30, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rude Music Inc; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-6785514.(McGarry, Annette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rude Music Inc v. Newt 2012, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rude Music Inc
Represented By: Marianne C. Holzhall
Represented By: Annette Michele McGarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newt 2012, Inc.
Represented By: Karl Braun
Represented By: Kyra Elizabeth Flores
Represented By: Darren Patrick Grady
Represented By: Byron K. Lindberg
Represented By: Brian Allen Rosenblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newt Gingrich
Represented By: Karl Braun
Represented By: Kyra Elizabeth Flores
Represented By: Darren Patrick Grady
Represented By: Byron K. Lindberg
Represented By: Brian Allen Rosenblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Conservative Union
Represented By: Brian E. Cohen
Represented By: Steven F. Pflaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?