Midwest Trading Group, Inc. v. GlobalTranz Enterprises, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Midwest Trading Group, Inc.
Defendant: GlobalTranz Enterprises, Inc., American Freight Network, Inc., AKOP Karapetan d/b/a V & R Trucking, Inc. and Evertek, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv09313
Filed: November 20, 2012
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Du Page
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Durkin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 12/10/2012:Mailed notice(srn, )
July 23, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: GlobalTranz's motion for summary judgment, 18 is granted as to Midwest's negligence claim in Count II. The motion is denied as to the fraud claim in Count I and the breach of contract claim in Count III. The parties are directed to appear at a status hearing on 8/5/2014 at 09:00 a.m. to discuss a prompt trial date. Lead trial counsel should be present. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/23/2014:Mailed notice(srn, )
March 5, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order:For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants GlobalTranz's motion to reconsider 51 in part, and denies it in part. A status hearing is set for 3/17/2015 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/5/2015:Mailed notice(srn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midwest Trading Group, Inc. v. GlobalTranz Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Trading Group, Inc.
Represented By: James Andrew Bosco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlobalTranz Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Carl Koch
Represented By: Robert Lee Reeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Freight Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKOP Karapetan d/b/a V & R Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evertek, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.