Torres v. Nation One Landscaping, Inc.,
Plaintiff: Aureliano Torres
Defendant: Nation One Landscaping, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv09723
Filed: December 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable M. David Weisman on 11/13/2017. Mailed notice (ao,)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 12/5/2016: Torres's motion for summary judgment, 117 , is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted as to defendants' liability in Counts I through V. The motion is granted as to the theory of how to calculate damages for Torres and the opt-ins under the FLSA, for Torres under the IMWL, and for Torres and the class under the IWPCA. The motion is denied as to the calculation of class damages under the IMWL. [For further detail see attached order.] Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, )
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 10/21/2014: Plaintiff's motion to authorize notice pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b) and for class certification pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23 55 is granted in part, denied in part. [For further detail see attached order.] Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Nation One Landscaping, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aureliano Torres
Represented By: Alvar Ayala
Represented By: Flor Yesenia Sandoval
Represented By: Christopher J Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nation One Landscaping, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?