Vega v. Chicago Park District
Plaintiff: Lydia Vega
Defendant: Chicago Park District
Case Number: 1:2013cv00451
Filed: January 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: James B. Zagel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 374 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: The Court awards plaintiff a tax-component award of $49,224.30. Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees 313 is granted in part: the Court awards plaintiff $1,006,592.75 in attorneys' fees. Plaintiff& #039;s bill of costs 323 is granted, and the Court taxes costs against defendant and in favor of plaintiff in the amount of $30,745.27. Defendant's motion for sanctions 318 is denied. Defendant's motion to strike plaintiff' s ex parte submission of an unredacted invoice 324 is denied as moot. Schedule 371 remains set for submission of plaintiff's supplemental fee petition and associated briefing. The parties are directed to exhaust settlement prospects. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/20/2020. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 280 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. The Court orders defendant to reinstate plaintiff to a park supervisor position by December 31, 2018. If defendant is unable to reinstate plaintiff by December 31, 2018, then it will owe plaintiff back pay, at a rate eq ual to a park supervisor with the same number of years of service plaintiff would have enjoyed if she had not been terminated, until the date plaintiff is actually reinstated. The Court will defer entering judgment at this time. By January 15, 2019 , or fifteen days from the date plaintiff is reinstated if plaintiff is reinstated before December 31, 2018, plaintiff will (1) file a supplemental memorandum of law explaining and calculating any amounts she seeks as back pay in addition to the amou nts the Court approves today, such as additional back pay accrued in 2018, a tax-component award, or pre-judgment interest, to the extent they are supported by appropriate data and computed according to a transparent, reliable methodology; (2) prepar e a draft final judgment order, which plaintiff will both attach as an exhibit to her memorandum and submit, in Microsoft Word format, to the Courts proposed order email inbox, and (3) submit a motion for attorney's fees, properly noticed for presentment. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/16/2018. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Defendant's motion for judgment as a matter of law and a new trial 225 is granted in part and denied in part. The motion for judgment as a matter of law is granted as to the municipal liability claim and denied as to the Title VII claim; the motion for a new trial is denied. Defendant's motion for remittitur 226 is granted and the Court reduces plaintiff's damages award to $300,000. A status hearing is set for August 17, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. to discuss the back pay and front pay proceedings. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/31/2017. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: In accordance with the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 126 is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff may proceed with her race discrimination and retaliation claims. All other claims are dismissed with prejudice. See Memorandum Opinion and Order for further details. Signed by the Honorable James B. Zagel on 3/2/2016. Mailed notice(ep, )
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable James B. Zagel on 7/25/2013. (ep, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vega v. Chicago Park District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Park District
Represented By: Nelson A. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca L Reierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Vega
Represented By: Catherine Simmons-Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?