Klinger v. Conan Doyle Estate, Ltd Featured Case

Plaintiff: Leslie S Klinger
Defendant: Conan Doyle Estate, Ltd
Case Number: 1:2013cv01226
Filed: February 14, 2013
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 23, 2013 41 ENTERED JUDGMENT. (mgh, )
December 23, 2013 40 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/23/2013. Mailed notice (mgh, )
December 23, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/23/2013: Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Declaratory judgment is entered in favor of the plaintiff and against the defendant only to the extent stated in the Court's opinion. Mailed notice(mgh, )
November 21, 2013 38 Featured Case ORDER Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 11/21/2013: Motion to withdraw as counsel 35 is granted. Kourtney A. Mulcahy is granted leave to withdraw her appearance on behalf of the plaintiff. The motion hearing set for 11/26/2013 is vacated. The Clerk of Court is also directed to correct the address and phone number of attorney Scott M. Gilbert pursuant to his Notice of Change of Address 33 filed on 11/12/13. Mailed notice (mgh, )
November 21, 2013 37 NOTICE of Motion by Kourtney A Mulcahy for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 35 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 11/26/2013 at 09:45 AM. (Mulcahy, Kourtney)
November 21, 2013 36 NOTICE of Motion by Kourtney A Mulcahy for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 35 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 11/26/2013 at 09:45 AM. (Mulcahy, Kourtney)
November 21, 2013 35 MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff Leslie S Klinger to withdraw as attorney (Mulcahy, Kourtney)
November 12, 2013 34 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Leslie S Klinger by John A. Leja (Leja, John)
November 12, 2013 33 NOTICE by Scott M Gilbert of Change of Address (Gilbert, Scott)
October 8, 2013 32 Correspondence by Leslie S Klinger to Judge Castillo Regarding Oral Argument Request (Gilbert, Scott)
October 7, 2013 31 Correspondence by Conan Doyle Estate, Ltd to Honorable Ruben Castillo (Allison, Benjamin)
September 30, 2013 30 REPLY by Leslie S Klinger to MOTION by Plaintiff Leslie S Klinger for summary judgment 11 (Gilbert, Scott)
September 30, 2013 29 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Leslie S Klinger to Rule 56 statement, 27 of Additional Material Facts by Plaintiff (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Gilbert, Scott)
September 11, 2013 28 RESPONSE by Conan Doyle Estate, Ltdin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Leslie S Klinger for summary judgment 11 AMENDED only to attach Westlaw case opinions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Westlaw Stallone Decision, # 2 Exhibit Westlaw Pannonia Farms Decision)(Zieske, William)
September 10, 2013 27 RULE 56 56(c)(1) Statement in Response to Material Facts and of Additional Material Facts (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Jon Lellenberg, # 2 Affidavit Loren Estleman, # 3 Affidavit H. George Fletcher, # 4 Affidavit Larry Woiwode, # 5 Affidavit Valerie Sayers)(Zieske, William)
September 10, 2013 26 RESPONSE by Conan Doyle Estate, Ltdin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Leslie S Klinger for summary judgment 11 (Zieske, William)
August 14, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER: Lynn E. Mostoller's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the defendant 22 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 8/14/2013: (lp, )
August 14, 2013 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Conan Doyle Estate, Ltd by William Frederick Zieske as local counsel (Zieske, William)
August 14, 2013 23 MOTION by Defendant Conan Doyle Estate, Ltd for leave to appear as counsel for Defendant (Mostoller, Lynn)
August 14, 2013 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-8636583. (Mostoller, Lynn e.)
August 14, 2013 21 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ruben Castillo:Defendant's motion for extension of time 18 is granted. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 11 is due on or before 9/10/2013. Plaintiff's reply brief will be due on or before 9/30/2013. The Court will rule by mail. The motion hearing set for 8/20/2013 is vacated.Mailed notice (rao, )
August 13, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER: Benjamin Allison's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the defendant 16 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 8/13/2013: (lp, )
August 13, 2013 19 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Allison for presentment of extension of time 18 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 8/20/2013 at 09:45 AM. (Allison, Benjamin)
August 13, 2013 18 MOTION by Defendant Conan Doyle Estate, Ltd for extension of time Motion for Extension of Time (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Allison, Benjamin)
August 13, 2013 17 MOTION by Defendant Conan Doyle Estate, Ltd for leave to appear as Entry of Appearance (Allison, Benjamin)
August 13, 2013 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-8630858. (Allison, Benjamin)
August 6, 2013 15 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ruben Castillo:Motion hearing held on 8/6/2013, regarding Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment. 11 . Defendant is to respond to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment (11) by 8/27/2013. Plaintiff is to reply by 9/10/13. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
July 29, 2013 14 MEMORANDUM by Leslie S Klinger in support of motion for summary judgment 11 (Gilbert, Scott)
July 29, 2013 13 RULE 56.1 Statement by Leslie S Klinger regarding motion for summary judgment 11 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Gilbert, Scott)
July 29, 2013 12 NOTICE of Motion by Scott M Gilbert for presentment of motion for summary judgment 11 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 8/6/2013 at 09:45 AM. (Gilbert, Scott)
July 29, 2013 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Leslie S Klinger for summary judgment (Gilbert, Scott)
June 25, 2013 10 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ruben Castillo:Status hearing held on 6/25/2013. Counsel for the plaintiff appeared. The Court hereby enters a default against the defendant for failure to timely appear, answer or otherwise plead to the complaint. Plaintiff is free to proceed with a motion for summary judgment or a motion for default judgment.Mailed notice (rao, )
June 14, 2013 9 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ruben Castillo:The status hearing is reset to 6/25/2013 at 9:45 AM. The status hearing set for 6/20/2013 is vacated.Mailed notice (rao, )
May 15, 2013 8 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ruben Castillo:Status hearing held on 5/15/2013 and continued to 6/20/2013 at 9:45 a.m. The plaintiff is directed to submit a written settlement demand to the defendant within 14 days. The parties are granted leave to proceed with all discovery. All discovery must be completed on or before 10/9/2013. Mailed notice (rao, )
May 10, 2013 7 STATUS Report by Leslie S Klinger (Gilbert, Scott)
March 15, 2013 6 MINUTE entry before Honorable Ruben Castillo:The parties are directed to file a joint status report on or before 5/9/2013. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 5/15/2013 at 9:45 AM.Mailed notice (rao, )
March 12, 2013 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Leslie S Klinger. Conan Doyle Estate, Ltd waiver sent on 3/5/2013, answer due 5/6/2013. (Gilbert, Scott)
February 20, 2013 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Conan Doyle Estate, Ltd (cft, )
February 14, 2013 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. (cft, )
February 14, 2013 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Leslie S Klinger by Kourtney A Mulcahy (Mulcahy, Kourtney)
February 14, 2013 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Leslie S Klinger by Scott M Gilbert (Gilbert, Scott)
February 14, 2013 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gilbert, Scott)
February 14, 2013 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment filed by Leslie S Klinger; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-8049966. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Gilbert, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klinger v. Conan Doyle Estate, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie S Klinger
Represented By: Kourtney A Mulcahy
Represented By: Scott M Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conan Doyle Estate, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?