Almblad v. Scotsman Industries, Inc. et al

Defendant: Kevin Fink and Scotsman Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Almblad
Case Number: 1:2013cv01297
Filed: February 19, 2013
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John W. Darrah
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on June 18, 2014.(mr, )
March 26, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 3/26/2014.(mr, )
August 28, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 8/28/2013. (nf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almblad v. Scotsman Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Fink
Represented By: Matthew B Mock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotsman Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew B Mock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Almblad
Represented By: Nicholas J. Motherway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?