Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. DolGenCorp LLC
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: DolGenCorp LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv04307
Filed: June 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 4/10/2017. Mailed notice. (aw,)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 11/17/2015. Mailed notice(ef, )
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 6/19/2015. Mailed notice(ef, )
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 5/5/2015. Mailed notice(ef, )
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 7/29/2014. Mailed notice (ac, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. DolGenCorp LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: AUSA
Represented By: Brandi Lorraine Davis
Represented By: John C. Hendrickson
Represented By: Richard John Mrizek
Represented By: Diane Ilene Smason
Represented By: Jeanne B. Szromba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DolGenCorp LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?