Chicago Marine Towing v. Boat/U.S., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Chicago Marine Towing
Defendant: Boat/U.S., Inc., Great Lakes Repair, Inc. d/b/a Great Lakes Towing & Repair and Richard N. Lenardson
Case Number: 1:2013cv05551
Filed: August 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 10/24/2019. Mailed notice(cdh, )
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 3/27/2019. For the foregoing reasons, the Court concludes in favor of Defendants and against Chicago Marine on Counts I, II, & IV. This case is set for further status hearing on April 18, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. unless the remaining counterclaims are voluntarily dismissed before that date. Mailed notice(cdh, )
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 11/9/2017. For the reasons that follow, Boat U.S.'s motion 84 is denied. This case is set for further status hearing on November 29, 2017 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice(cdh, )
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 1/3/2017. Mailed notice(cdh, )
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 3/29/2016. Mailed notice(cdh, )
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: the Court concludes that Boat U.S. fails to state a claim for trademark dilution under the Illinois Trademark Registration and Protection Act (Count IX). The Court finds that the other counterclaims at issue in Chicag o Marine's motion to dismiss (Count I and Counts III through VIII) are sufficient under Rule 12(b)(6) and should not be dismissed. The Court therefore denies in part and grants in part Chicago Marine's motion to dismiss 35 . The case is set for a status on January 8, 2015 at 9 a.m. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 12/12/2014. Mailed notice(tbk, )
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: the Court denies Defendant Boat/U.S. Inc.'s motion to dismiss 12 and denies the Great Lake Defendants' motion to dismiss 15 . This case is set for further status hearing on 5/6/2014 at 9:00 a.m.; the parties are directed to meet and confer and to file a joint status report with a proposed discovery plan no later than 5/2/2014. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 4/23/2014. Mailed notice(tbk, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chicago Marine Towing v. Boat/U.S., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago Marine Towing
Represented By: Jason Ryan Klinowski
Represented By: Garry L Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boat/U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Peter K. Moroh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Repair, Inc. d/b/a Great Lakes Towing & Repair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard N. Lenardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?