Beaton v. SpeedyPC Software
Plaintiff: Archie Beaton
Defendant: SpeedyPC Software
Case Number: 1:2013cv08389
Filed: November 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Kane
Presiding Judge: Andrea R. Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 327 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 3/31/2021. Mailed notice (dal, )
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 12/21/2017. Mailed notice(ef, )
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MEMORANDUM Opinion signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 10/19/2017. Mailed notice(ef, )
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/2/2014. Mailed notice (ac, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beaton v. SpeedyPC Software
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archie Beaton
Represented By: Rafey S. Balabanian
Represented By: Chandler Randolph Givens
Represented By: David Ira Mindell
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpeedyPC Software
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?