Grecia v. Apple Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: William Grecia
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv08727
Filed: December 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: John W. Darrah
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2014 ELECTRONIC ACKNOWLEDGMENT of case transferred to the California Northern District as case 3:14-cv-00775, filed 02/20/2014. (lcw, )
February 18, 2014 Filing 37 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California, San Francisco the electronic record. Mailed letter to all counsel of record. (mr, )
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Ruling on motion hearing held. Agreed motion to transfer case to the Northern District of California is granted 34 . The clerk is directed to transfer this case forthwith. Any pending dates or motions are moot. Civil case closed. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 2/18/14. Mailed notice(mr, )
February 12, 2014 Filing 35 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen Charles Jarvis for presentment of motion to transfer case 34 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 2/18/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Jarvis, Stephen)
February 12, 2014 Filing 34 MOTION by Plaintiff William Grecia to transfer case to the Northern District of California (Agreed Motion) (Jarvis, Stephen)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Parties' Agreed Motion to Withdraw Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and for Extension of Time to Answer 30 is granted with respect to extension of time to answer. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss 26 was withdrawn without prejudice with leave to refile during February 4, 2014, hearing. Defendant Apple Inc. to answer by June 20, 2014. No appearances necessary on February 11, 2014. Status hearing set for June 10, 2014, remains as scheduled. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 2/7/2014. Mailed notice(mr, )
February 7, 2014 Filing 32 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Apple Inc. (Dauchot, Luke)
February 4, 2014 Filing 31 NOTICE of Motion by Luke L. Dauchot for presentment of motion to withdraw,, motion for extension of time to file answer, 30 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 2/11/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Dauchot, Luke)
February 4, 2014 Filing 30 MOTION by Defendant Apple Inc. to withdraw , MOTION by Defendant Apple Inc. for extension of time to file answer AGREED Motion to Withdraw Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (D.I. 26) and Extend Apple Inc.'s Deadline to Respond to the Complaint (Dauchot, Luke)
February 4, 2014 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: Status hearing and ruling on motion hearing held. Motions to reassign case 15 to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 26 are withdrawn without prejudice with leave to re-file. Defendant's motion to transfer 23 is entered and briefed as follows: response by 2/18/14, reply by 3/3/14. Status hearing set for 6/10/14 at 9:30 a.m. No appearance is needed on 2/11/14. Mailed notice(maf)
February 3, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion by Luke L. Dauchot for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 26 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 2/11/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Dauchot, Luke)
February 3, 2014 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM by Apple Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 26 Apple Inc.'s Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Grecia's Claims for Inducement and Contributory Infringement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Dauchot, Luke)
February 3, 2014 Filing 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Grecia's Claims for Inducement and Contributory Infringement (Dauchot, Luke)
January 29, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by Luke L. Dauchot for presentment of motion to transfer case 23 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 2/4/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Dauchot, Luke)
January 29, 2014 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM by Apple Inc. in support of motion to transfer case 23 to the Northern District of California (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Dauchot, Luke)
January 29, 2014 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendant Apple Inc. to transfer case to the Northern District of California (Dauchot, Luke)
January 29, 2014 Filing 22 NOTICE by Luke L. Dauchot of Change of Address (Dauchot, Luke)
January 23, 2014 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: In court hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to to reassign case 15 is entered and continued to 2/4/14 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
January 23, 2014 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Unknown Microsoft Corporation by Herman Fitzgerald Webley, Jr (Webley, Herman)
January 23, 2014 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Unknown Microsoft Corporation by Richard A. Cederoth (Cederoth, Richard)
January 21, 2014 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Jarvis, Stephen)
January 17, 2014 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff William Grecia by Kate Ryan O'Loughlin (O'Loughlin, Kate)
January 17, 2014 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen Charles Jarvis for presentment of motion to reassign case, 15 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 1/23/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Jarvis, Stephen)
January 17, 2014 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff William Grecia to reassign case Grecia v. Sony Network Entertainment International, LLC (Case No. 1:13-cv-08731); Grecia v. Google Inc. (Case No. 1:13-cv-08733); and Grecia v. Microsoft Corp. (Case No. 1:13-cv-08734) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Jarvis, Stephen)
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 11 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead by 2/3/14. Initial status is set for 2/4/14 at 9:30 a.m. No appearance is necessary on 1/7/14. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 12/31/2013. Mailed notice(mr, )
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 11 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead by 2/3/14. Initial status is set for 2/4/14 at 9:30 a.m. No appearance is necessary on 1/7/14. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 12/31/2013. Mailed notice(mr, )
December 20, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Luke L. Dauchot for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief 11 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 1/7/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Dauchot, Luke)
December 20, 2013 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Apple Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint 1 Unopposed Motion by Defendant Apple Inc. for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Dauchot, Luke)
December 20, 2013 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Apple Inc. by Bryan Thomas Hart (Hart, Bryan)
December 20, 2013 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Apple Inc. by Joel R. Merkin (Merkin, Joel)
December 20, 2013 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Apple Inc. by Luke L. Dauchot (Dauchot, Luke)
December 18, 2013 Filing 7 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable John W. Darrah for all further proceedings - 28:294(b) I transfer this case to the Executive Committee for reassignment to another judge pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 294(b). The receiving judge will receive equalization credit. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/18/2013. (ph, )
December 18, 2013 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Grecia as to Apple Inc. on 12/12/2013, answer due 1/2/2014. (Jarvis, Stephen)
December 9, 2013 Filing 5 MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (mr, )
December 9, 2013 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Apple Inc. (jp, )
December 9, 2013 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff William Grecia by Matthew Michael Wawrzyn (Wawrzyn, Matthew)
December 9, 2013 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff William Grecia by Stephen Charles Jarvis (Jarvis, Stephen)
December 9, 2013 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Jarvis, Stephen)
December 6, 2013 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Grady. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (lcw, )
December 6, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by William Grecia; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9001281. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jarvis, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grecia v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Grecia
Represented By: Stephen Charles Jarvis
Represented By: Matthew Michael Wawrzyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Luke L. Dauchot
Represented By: Bryan Thomas Hart
Represented By: Joel R. Merkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?