Feit Electric Company, Inc. v. Beacon Point Capital, LLC
Plaintiff: Feit Electric Company, Inc.
Defendant: Beacon Point Capital, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv09339
Filed: December 31, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: The Court, in its discretion, denies Feit's motion to certify an interlocutory appeal under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) 267 . Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/7/202. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 261 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: The Court grants defendant's motion for summary judgment in its entirety 227 and denies plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 237 . Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 6/17/2021. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: While interlocutory appeals are rarely granted, the Court, in its discretion, finds that this is a case where clarification on the law from the Federal Circuit at this point in the case is in the interest of justice. Acc ordingly, and given that Feit's motion is timely and it has met all the statutory requirements under §1292(b), its motion for leave to file an interlocutory appeal 179 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 12/20/2019. Mailed notice.(ym, )
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/22/2017: Mailed notice (rth)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/30/2015:Mailed notice(rth, )
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/9/2015:Mailed notice(rth, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feit Electric Company, Inc. v. Beacon Point Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feit Electric Company, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony F. Blum
Represented By: Kalpesh K Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon Point Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?