In Re: Testosterone Replacement Therapy Products Liability Litigation
Plaintiff: Larry Brasel, Eduardo Acosta, Jennifer S. Adams, Ronald J. Adams, Samra Adel, John Adkins, Milton Akridge, Paul Alexander, Gail Allegar, Joe Amaya, Benjamin Lewis Amerson, Jr., Rhonda Amerson, Cheylee G. Anderson, Ronald Andras, Harold Aranda, Joe Arline, James Armstrong, Peter John Armstrong, Richard Ascher, Rex M Ashby, Kenneth Aurecchia, Michael Bailey, Tahera Bakhtary, David J. Bamberg, Keith Banner, Michael Barnes, Robert Bartholic, Tammy Bartles, Roland Bass, Richard Bateman, Timothy M Bellay, Valeria S Bellay, Andrew Bender, Stephen Benn, Donald J. Bennett, Jr., Alan Benz, Henry Bias, Steven Frank Billotti, Leon Binion, Billy Blacketer, Catherine Blades, William Blades, Donald Bland, Ladiner Blaylock, Prentiss Blaylock, Gerald Boddie, Barry Boles, Dale Boone, John Boone, Gilda Bourgeois, Michael D Bourgeois, Neil Bourgeois, Stephanie Bowers, Elizabeth Boyd, Steven Boyd, Betty Boyko, LaVerne Boyko, Regina Bozentka, Reginald M Brannan, Thelma Brasel, David A. Breeden, Sr., William Brousseau, Charles Brown, Wilson Ben Brown, Annette Brumfield, Terry Brumfield, William Bryant, Jackie Budwitis, Thomas Budwitis, Stephen Buffkin, Larry Burk, Thomas Burnejko, Yamira Burnejko, Cynthia M. Burns, Donald Burns, James Benton Burns, Jr., Ellen Burton, Elmon Burton, Walter Burton, Patricia R. Bush, Patrick H. Bush, Robert Campbell, Edmund J. Campion, Mary E. Campion, Patricia Cantu, Tomas Cantu, Gary Carpenter, Nancy Carpenter, Hector Carrasco, Anthony Carroll, Alfred L Casals, David Cashes, Eric Cassius, Simona Cassius, Natale Cataudella, Albert D. Cates, Darion Lee Chambers, Robert Champeau, Martin Champion, Robin Chapman, Roy E. Chapman, William Chavez, George M. Chesser, Linda Chesser, Joan Christ, Richard Christ, Charles Claypool, Earline Denise Cobb, Stephen Cobb, George F Coffey, Paula L Coffey, Anthony Coker, Danny Coker, Craig J Cole, Nancy C Cole, Debi Connolly, Lewis Cook, Meredith J. Cook, Carol Cooper, Frank Cooper, Kevin W Cooper, Willie Cooper, David Cordisco, Deborah Cottle, Wayne Cottle, Darrell Cove, Bobby Covey, Mark D. Cox, Kristen Crabtree, Michael Crabtree, Alvin Craft, John Crawford, John A Crawford, Victoria Marie Crawford, Michael Creasy, Robert Cripe, Timothy Crissinger, Cheryl Cunningham, Joseph Dane, Krista Dane, Abner Daniels, Lizbeth Darby, Mark Darby, Markcleda Darby, Terry Lynn David, Wyatt David, Kirk L. Davidson, Jimmy C. Davis, Lisa Davis, Patricia Davis, Paula Davis, Ricky J Davis, Thomas Davis, Marco DeLeon, Brian DeMatteo, Jeffrey A. Debusk, Gregory Decker, Jeffrey Deforest, Vickie Deforest, Mark Denney, Christopher Dent, Sr., Philip Depasquale, Kim Dewey, Ronald Dewey, Theodor Diesslin, Kent D. Dillin, Keith Dobbins, Thomas Dobbs, Beverley F Domingues, Denise Domingues, Diane Domingues, David Dowdy, Edward Downes, Glenn Drury, Julie Drury, Brett C. DuBroja, Martin L Dubroc, III, James Duchock, Perry Dudley, Gerald Duet, Kimberly Dula, Robert Demetrius Dunbar, Charles Duncan, Richard Duncan, Alfred J Dunning, Deborah A Dunning, Joseph Dzura, Juli Elrod, Ronnie Elrod, Gary Emberton, John Emmons, Freddy J. Escoe, Estate of Gary Alan Garner, Don Estep, Bruce Eudy, Cecelia Eudy, Clarence Evans, Charles Fair, Randy Felder, William R. Ferrer, Barbara Ferri, Ronald L Ferri, Amanda K. Fields, Marsha C Fiol, Ramon I Fiol, Jeffry Fitzpatrick, Dennis B. Fletcher, Jaime Florez, David Florio, Margaret Florio, Chester Flowers, Eileen Flynt, William Michael Flynt, Cynthia Ford, Joseph Forestieri, Charlesanna Foucher, Richard Fowler, Wesley Fowler, Brian T Francione, Andrew Freas, Diane Freeman, John C. French, Bruce Frey, Scott Fulkerson, William Fullerton, Glenn Fultz, Bertram Furman, Michael Gallagher, Ana Garcia, Sandra R. Garner, Cheri Gee, William Gee, Frank Gegunde, Barbara Gennusa, Michael Gennusa, Mark A. George, Tony Gerritsen, Angela Gianni, James Gianni, Christopher Giargiari, Ronnie Gibbs, Angela Gibby, Roger Gibby, Tim Gibreal, James M. Ginn, Joseph Giovinco, Joyce Giovinco, Carol Glover, James Glover, David R. Godsey, Mary Godsey, David Goins, Mary Sue Goins, Kim A. Gorden, Ann Gordon, James Gordon, Larry Gordon, Michael Gordon, George Gose, Tammy Gose, Roger Gosnell, Holsey Gray, Michael Greenbauer, Gregory Grissette, Stephen Gross, Henry Guidry, Belva Guy, Michael Guy, Janice Gwin, Gary L. Hagler, Myrna Hagler, Paul Haidak, Richard Hale, Thaddeus Hale, Jr., John C. Hall, Audrey Ham, Cindy Ham, Joe Ham, Robert Ham, Robert Hammerman, John Hammond, Bryan Hansen, Joseph Hardee, Rebecca Hardee, Ed Hardinger, Barry Harkness, Barry Harness, Douglas Harris, Edwin Clay Harris, Mary Anne Roberts Harris, Richard L. Haslar, Mr. William Hatcher, Gus D. Hatfield, Ilka Hatfield, George C. Hatton, David Hauser, Francine Hauser, Claudia Hayes, Edgar Hayes, Mildred Hayes, William Hayes, Thomas Headley, Clyde W Heath, Edward George Heath, Linda Hebert, Steven Hebert, Herman Tydell Hendrix, Thomas Henning, John Joseph Herubin, Roger Hess, Yvonne Hess, Charles F. Hill, Jr., Larry Hines, Michael Hobbs, David P. Holland, James Horner, Edward Houston, Gladys A Hudnall, William D Hudnall, Donald Hufstetler, Christopher Hughes, Judy Hughes, Roger Hull, Howard Hulon, Donald Humble, Robert L Humble, Buddy Humphries, Kathy Humphries, Horace Hunt, Craig Hunter, Larry D. Hupp, Kevin Hutcherson, Timmy Hyde, Eugene J. Iannaccone, Terry William Ingland, Wardell Isom, Jr., Cathy Jackson, William Jackson, Joseph Jauregui, Maxine Jauregui, Michael Jennings, Betty Jessup, Eddie Johnese, Barbara Johnson, Bonnie Johnson, Don A Johnson, Eric Johnson, Gary Johnson, Harold Johnson, Jack Johnson, Lowell Johnson, Anthony Jones, Donna Jones, Herbert C Jones, Jr, Joseph Jones, Laura Jones, Yvonne M Jones, Willie J Jones, Jr., Lionell Joseph, Lola Joseph, Shirley Joyner, Ricky C Judd, Kirby Justice, Patiance Justice, Murray Kahl, Ghazala Kahn, Muhammad Kahn, Dustin J Kanady, Lorraine S. Kane, Thomas D. Kane, Sr., Michael Kapusciak, Phillip Keister, Richard C Kelly Sr, George Edward Kerr, Jody Lee Kerr, Mark King, Robert L. King, Shannon King, Kelly Kinkead, Gary Kious, Vickie Kious, Christopher Kirchmer, Otis Kirkland, Robert Knapik, Robert Knott, Suana Knott, Janet Knotts, Michael L Knotts, Robert G. Kocak, Gena M Komrada, Thomas Kost, Billie Kouns, William Kouns, John Krapcha, Heather Kruger, Kevin Kruger, Stephen P Kuhn, Thomas Kusmirek, Farrell Kyser, Jennifer Kyser, Teresa LaRoche, Carlton LaSalle, James LaVolpe, Rachel Landers, Randy Landers, Richard Lane, Charles D Lane Sr, Darin Langford, W. Mark Lanier, Duane P. Lanoue, Andrea Laquerre, Louis Latka, Frank Lau, Cyril Laundreaux, Nancy Lawson, Michele Lay, Scott E Lay, Ralph Ledford, Sandra Ledford, Aron Lewington, Christine Lewington, Calvin Lewis, Charles Lewis, Patricia Lewis, Peter Liangos, Daniel Licon, Inge Lihs, Albert Tooley Lint, Lawanda Littlepage, Lum Littlepage Sr, Robert Litzinger, John Logan, Mona Loisel, Donald Loisel, Sr., Anthony Long, Jerry Long, Steve Longobardo, James Ludovicz, Teresa Ludovicz, Thomas Luebke, Lori Lueck, Christopher J. Luiso, Joy Lukacs, David Lyon, Judy Lyons, Leamon Lyons, Ainslie MacEachran, Judy MacLean, Wayne MacLean, Gary MacLeod, Joseph Machak, Donna Mahrous, Mohamed Mahrous, Johnelle Majesty, Rickey Majesty, Sr., Victor Malabe, Dolores Mancini, John Mancini, Larry Manning, Sara Manning, Charles Wayne Mantooth, Stephen Marino, Charles Marsee, Emily Marston, Bobby Martin, Bobby J Martin, Hazel Martin, Randy Martina, Brenda Mask, Charles Mask, Richard Allen Mask, Floyd E Mason, Jr., Kevin Mason, Susan Mason, Terry E. Mason, Vincent Mattei, Steven May, Darrell Mayo, Nicholas Mazzola, John McCann, Mary Ann McCann, James McCarty, Brad McClure, Walter McClure, Patrick McCoppin, Sue McCoppin, Cecil McCoy, Shelvy Jean McCoy, David McFadden, Gerald T McFadden, Lorraine A. McFadden, Robert E. McGill, Thomas McKee, Molly McKinley, Timothy McKinley, Michael McLaughlin, Susan McLaughlin, Penny McMurry, Gary McNease, Pamela McNease, Thomas Michael Meagher, Michael Mecikalski, Medical Mutual of Ohio, Charlotte Meitner, Gerald Meitner, Frances Metz, Richard Meyer, Sam Micalizzi and Jeffrey Mierau
Case Number: 1:2014cv01748
Filed: March 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 2998 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER 156 ORDER TO ESTABLISH ENDO TRT QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND, signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/21/2019. (mk)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2997 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 155 (Appointment of Certified Public Accountant to Manage Common Benefit Funds), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/21/2019. (mk)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2996 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 154 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASES SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 126, signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/21/2019. (mk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2995 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court directs the Common Benefit Fee Committee to file, by 7/22/2019, a status report regarding its review of common benefit fees and expenses. (mk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2994 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 6/19/2019. Motion for order to show cause #2985 is granted; draft order to be submitted to Judge Kennelly's proposed order email address. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 2993 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 153 (Memorandum Opinion and Order on Plaintiff Smith's Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) or for a 90-Day Extension of the Deadline to Comply with CMO 126 in Smith v. Auxilium Pharmaceuticals, Inc., No. 15 C 1340), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/17/2019. (mk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2992 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Paul Miller (Fodera, Leonard)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2991 WITHDRAWING David W. Bauman as counsel for Plaintiffs George Anderson, Jesse Anderson, Timothy Barefoot, Robert Bowden, Jr., Pretty Boyd, Sr, David Brandenburg, Steven Burman, Gary Carver, Robert Chimel, Randall Cook, Peter Dennis, John Diffley, William Feeney, Gilbert Field, James Fredrickson, Jeffrey Frugia, James Gerrity, Alan Goodyke, Eric Gottlieb, Ernest Howell, Roger Hutchinson, Andre Jordan, Tommy Joyner, Jerry Kuhl, Bobby Locklear, Jarvis McCaden, Hillary McCargo, Charles McDaniel, Charles McDaniel, Charles McDaniel, Craig Montgomery, Timothy Pease, Christopher Polselli, Dale Read, Peter Reynard, Ralph Richey, Barry Rose, John Roy, Ronald Russo, Roderick Taylor, Dino Theodore, Walter Wright and substituting Matthew Padberg as counsel of record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Padberg, Matthew)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2990 MOTION by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee for order (Corrected) Unopposed Motion to Establish Endo TRT Qualified Settlement Fund (Smith, Brendan)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2989 MOTION by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee for order (Unopposed) to Establish Endo TRT Qualified Settlement Fund (Smith, Brendan)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2988 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 152 (clarifying applicability of CMOs 126, 143 and 144 to plaintiffs whose claims are not resolved under settlement programs, including those deemed ineligible), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/4/2019. (mk)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2987 NOTICE of Motion by David Edward Stanley for presentment of motion for order to show cause, #2985 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/19/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stanley, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2986 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Eli Lilly and Company, Lilly USA, Inc., Acrux Commercial Pty Ltd., Acrux DDS Pty Ltd regarding MOTION by Defendants Eli Lilly and Company, Lilly USA, Inc., Acrux Commercial Pty Ltd., Acrux DDS Pty Ltd to seal Exhibit A to Eli Lilly Defendants' Motion for an Order to Show Cause Why Cases Should Not Be Dismissed with Prejudice For Failure #2984 , MOTION by Defendants Eli Lilly and Company, Lilly USA, Inc., Acrux Commercial Pty Ltd., Acrux DDS Pty Ltd for order to show cause Why Cases Should Not Be Dismissed With Prejudice For Failure To Comply With CMO No. 126 #2985 (Stanley, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2985 MOTION by Defendants Eli Lilly and Company, Lilly USA, Inc., Acrux Commercial Pty Ltd., Acrux DDS Pty Ltd for order to show cause Why Cases Should Not Be Dismissed With Prejudice For Failure To Comply With CMO No. 126 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B)(Stanley, David)
May 31, 2019 Filing 2984 MOTION by Defendants Eli Lilly and Company, Lilly USA, Inc., Acrux Commercial Pty Ltd., Acrux DDS Pty Ltd to seal Exhibit A to Eli Lilly Defendants' Motion for an Order to Show Cause Why Cases Should Not Be Dismissed with Prejudice For Failure to Comply With CMO 126 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stanley, David)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2983 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Craig Howard, Frank Miles to status report #2979 (Sims, Thomas)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2982 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Morgan, Scott)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2981 STIPULATION of Dismissal Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice (Bottar, Michael)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2980 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Counsel to status report #2979 (Perkins, Brian)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2979 STATUS Report (Endo Defendants' Status Report Pursuant to Corrected CMO 150) by Auxilium Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC (Solow, Andrew)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2978 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion by Samuel Wendt to withdraw as attorney for plaintiff Victor Miles #2969 is terminated without prejudice to refilling on the individual docket for Mr. Miles's case (1:15-cv-9003). (mk)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2977 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 151 - CLARIFYING THE DEADLINE TO COMPLY WITH CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 126 FOR PLAINTIFFS DEEMED INELIGIBLE FOR THE CONFIDENTIAL MASTER SETTLEMENT BY SPECIAL MASTER RANDI ELLIS signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/30/2019. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 2976 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 4/30/2019. Motion to clarify #2974 is granted; Case Management Order No. 151 to follow. Counsel for defendants and plaintiff's steering committee are directed to review Case Management Orders within 10 days. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 2975 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Keith Solow for presentment of motion to clarify, #2974 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/30/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Solow, Andrew)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2974 MOTION by Defendants Auxilium Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC to clarify / ENDO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER CLARIFYING THE DEADLINE TO COMPLY WITH CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 126 FOR PLAINTIFFS DEEMED INELIGIBLE FOR THE CONFIDENTIAL MASTER SETTLEMENT BY SPECIAL MASTER RANDI ELLIS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Solow, Andrew)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2973 (CORRECTED) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 150 - Order to show cause why the case should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to comply with case management order no. 126 signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/19/2019: It is hereby ordered that counsel of record for each Plaintiff identified on Exhibit A below shall either file a stipulation dismissing the Endo Defendants with prejudice before May 10, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. (twenty-one (21) days from this Order) or show cause in writing by no later than May 10, 2019 why this case should not be dismissed under CMO 126, paragraph B.11 for failure to comply with the CMO 126 obligations of paragraphs B.9. and B.10. Plaintiffs counsel are directed to immediately advise their clients in writing of t his order and to verify their compliance in writing in the individual case docket. Status report regarding whether something was filed by each plaintiff, as discussed in open court, is to be filed by counsel for Endo by May 16, 2019. Mailed notice.(pjg, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 2972 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 150 - Order to show cause why the case should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to comply with case management order no. 126 signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/19/2019: It is hereby ordered that counsel of record for each Plaintiff identified on Exhibit A below shall either file a stipulation dismissing the Endo Defendants with prejudice before May 7, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. (twenty-one (21) days from this Order) or show cause in writing by no later than May 9, 2019 why this case should not be dismissed under CMO 12, paragraph B.11 for failure to comply with the CMO 126 obligations of paragraphs B.9. and B.10. Plaintiffs counsel are directed to immediately advise their clients in writing of this order and to verify their compliance in writing in the individual case docket. Status report regarding whether something was filed by each plaintiff, as discussed in open court, is to be filed by counsel for Endo by May 16, 2019. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 2971 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 4/18/2019. Motion for order to show cause #2964 is granted in part and denied in part; rulings made on docket for each member case listed on Exhibit A of the motion. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 2970 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Victor Miles regarding MOTION by Attorney Samuel Wendt to withdraw as attorney for Victor Miles. #2969 (Wendt, Samuel)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2969 MOTION by Attorney Samuel Wendt to withdraw as attorney for Victor Miles. (Attachments: #1 Notification of Party Contact)(Wendt, Samuel)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2968 EXHIBIT by Defendants Auxilium Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC / CORRECTED EX. G - DECLARATION OF DANIEL MEYERS regarding declaration #2966 , MOTION by Defendants Auxilium Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC for order to show cause / ENDO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO #2964 (Solow, Andrew)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2967 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Keith Solow for presentment of motion for order to show cause, #2964 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/18/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Solow, Andrew)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2966 DECLARATION of Daniel Meyers regarding motion for order to show cause, #2964 (Solow, Andrew)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2965 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendants Auxilium Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC regarding MOTION by Defendants Auxilium Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC for order to show cause / ENDO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO #2964 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F)(Solow, Andrew)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2964 MOTION by Defendants Auxilium Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC for order to show cause / ENDO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 126 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Solow, Andrew)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2963 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Unopposed motion to substitute party in Case No. 1:14-cv-1272 (Marsee v. Auxilium Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) is granted. (mk)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2962 SUGGESTION of Death as to Upon the Record and Unopposed Motion to Substitute Proper Party (Chavez, Kathleen)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2961 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 149 (Order on Plaintiff Carlos Guffey's Motion to Reinstate in Guffey v. AbbVie, Inc., No. 16 C 4723), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/29/2019. (mk)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2960 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 148 (Order on Plaintiff Austin Amobi's Motion to Reinstate in Amobi v. Eli Lilly & Co., No. 15 C 4200), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/29/2019. (mk)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2959 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 147 (Memorandum Opinion and Order on Plaintiff Armando Roberto and Plaintiff Elizabeth Roberto's Motion to Vacate Dismissalin Roberto v. AbbVie, Inc., No 15 C 7085), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/29/2019. (mk)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2958 ORDER to establish Axiron Qualified Settlement Fund signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/15/2019. (pjg, )
March 15, 2019 Filing 2957 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Unopposed motion for approval of Axiron qualified settlement fund #2952 is granted. Order to follow. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
March 13, 2019 Filing 2956 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The docket entry just made #2955 contained an error and is corrected to read as follows: Plaintiffs Armando and Elizabeth Roberto having filed a reply to the plaintiff's steering committee's submission with regard to their motion to vacate, the motion #2946 is taken under advisement, and the hearing date of 3/19/2019 is vacated. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
March 13, 2019 Filing 2955 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiffs Armando and Elizabeth Roberto having advised Judge Kennelly's courtroom deputy clerk that they do not wish to reply to the plaintiff's steering committee's submission with regard to their motion to vacate and instead will rely on their materials already filed, the motion #2946 is taken under advisement, and the hearing date of 3/19/2019 is vacated. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 2954 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Donald Smith, Donald Smith by Samantha K. Gold (Gold, Samantha)
March 8, 2019 Filing 2953 REPLY by Armando J Roberto, Elizabeth E Roberto to MOTION by Plaintiffs Armando J Roberto, Elizabeth E Roberto to vacate order #2612 #2946 , response to motion #2951 (Rilee, Cyrus)
March 8, 2019 Filing 2952 MOTION by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' CounselUnopposed Motion for Approval of Axiron Qualified Settlement Fund (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Brendan)
March 8, 2019 Filing 2951 RESPONSE by Plaintiff's Steering Committee to MOTION by Plaintiffs Armando J Roberto, Elizabeth E Roberto to vacate order #2612 #2946 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Brendan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2950 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 146, dated 2/14/2019 (Memorandum Opinion and Order on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment in Med Mutual of Ohio v. AbbVie Inc., No. 14 C 8857), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/5/2019. (mk)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2949 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephone conference held with lead MDL plaintiffs' counsel and counsel for AbbVie. Defendants' bill of costs in Rowley v. AbbVie, No. 1:15-cv-2760, is hereby withdrawn. (mk)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2948 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiffs Armando and Elizabeth Roberto (individual case no. 1:15-cv-7085) have moved to reinstate their case and, in their motion (dkt. no. 2946), contend that they did not receive communications from the PSC on a particular topic. The PSC is directed to respond to that contention, by no later than 3/12/2019. (mk)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2947 NOTICE of Motion by Cyrus F Rilee, Iii for presentment of motion to vacate #2946 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/19/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Rilee, Cyrus)
March 3, 2019 Filing 2946 MOTION by Plaintiffs Armando J Roberto, Elizabeth E Roberto to vacate order #2612 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Cyrus F. Rilee, III, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Rilee, Cyrus)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2945 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Fee Committee Regarding the March 22, 2019 Common Benefit Submission Deadline (Smith, Brendan)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2944 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Mccorvey, Derriel)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2943 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-102) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transferring case to become part of MDL number. (ek, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 2942 MOTION for attorney representation by Alan Leschyshyn. (kp, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 2941 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court recently entered a show cause order regarding the plaintiff's attorney in a member case in this MDL proceeding, Case No. 1:15-cv-9550. The deadline for the attorney's response was 1/9/2019, but no response was filed. The Court has confirmed that the order was e-mailed via CMECF to the attorney and thus finds the non-response somewhat surprising. Having noted that the attorney in question is the only attorney of record for the individual plaintiff in the case, the Court is concerned that something may be amiss and thus requests that lead counsel investigate the matter and provide a status report by 1/15/2019, to be filed only in the individual case. (mk)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2940 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion to substitute attorney #2911 is granted; Attorney Mary Simon Timmerman for Calvin Berkley Ford, added. Attorney Anne Brockland terminated. (pjg, )
January 2, 2019 MAILED a copy of the "Motion for Attorney Representation" form to plaintiff Alan Leschyshyn, at his address listed on the docket in Case No. 17 C 1778. (kp, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 2939 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 145 (Order on Plaintiff Alan Leschyshyn's Request to be Given a Court Appointed Attorney in Leschyshyn v. AbbVie, Inc., No. 17 C 1778) signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/2/2019: For the reasons stated, the Clerk is directed to mail to plaintiff Alan Leschyshyn, at his address listed on the docket in Case No. 17 C 1778, a copy of the "Motion for Attorney Representation" form. Leschyshyn is directed to file the completed form and the other materials specified below by January 23, 2019. Defendants are directed to provide copies of Leschyshyn's plaintiff fact sheet and plaintiff profile form for the Court's in camera inspection by January 9, 2019. (pjg, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 2938 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Kevin Wayne Dunn (Hargroder, Casey) (Docket Text has been modified by the Clerk's Office) (sxb, ).
December 12, 2018 Filing 2937 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 144 (DOCKET CONTROL ORDER FOR FUTURE CASES AGAINST ACTAVIS ENTITIES), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/12/2018. (mk)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2936 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The motion to expand the common benefit fee committee and to appoint Stephanie O'Connor to the committee #2929 is denied, and the hearing date of 12/13/2018 is vacated. The Court does not see the need to expand the committee, and the request to be named to the committee is untimely. (mk)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2935 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee to MOTION by Plaintiff Stephanie O'Connor for order To Expand The Common Benefit Fee Committee And For Appointment of Stephanie OConnor To The Common Benefit Fee Committee #2929 (Smith, Brendan)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2934 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc. by Edward James Dumoulin (Dumoulin, Edward)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2933 NOTICE by Rachel Beth Abrams of Change of Address Rachel Abrams and Levin Simes Abrams LLP (Abrams, Rachel)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2932 NOTICE by In Re: Testosterone Replacement Therapy Products Liability Litigation re response to motion, #2931 (Maury A. Herman's Response to Motion of Stephanie O'Connor to Expand the Common Benefit Committee and for the Appointment of Stephanie O'Connor to the Common Benefit Fee Committee), [Dkt. 2929] (Herman, Maury)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2931 RESPONSE by In Re: Testosterone Replacement Therapy Products Liability Litigation to MOTION by Plaintiff Stephanie O'Connor for order To Expand The Common Benefit Fee Committee And For Appointment of Stephanie OConnor To The Common Benefit Fee Committee #2929 (Maury A. Herman's Response to Motion of Stephanie O'Connor to Expand the Common Benefit Committee and for the Appointment of Stephanie O'Connor to the Common Benefit Fee Committee) (Herman, Maury)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2930 NOTICE of Motion by Stephanie O'Connor for presentment of motion for order #2929 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/13/2018 at 09:30 AM. (O'Connor, Stephanie)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2929 MOTION by Plaintiff Stephanie O'Connor for order To Expand The Common Benefit Fee Committee And For Appointment of Stephanie OConnor To The Common Benefit Fee Committee (O'Connor, Stephanie)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2928 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 143 (Application of CMO 126 to Future Cases Against AbbVie Defendants), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/28/2018. (mk)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2927 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court having been advised that a master settlement agreement covering products liability claims AbbVie has been executed, the telephone status conference set for 11/28/2018 is vacated. (mk)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2926 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court wishes to have a telephone conference with plaintiffs' lead counsel and counsel for AbbVie to discuss the status of the master settlement agreement and, to that end, asks lead counsel to set up a telephone conference number for 11/28/2018 at 11:30 a.m. and advise Judge Kennelly's assistant Denise Slappey of the details. The Court does not expect the call to take more than 10 minutes. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 2925 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/16/18 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Joseph Rickhoff, 312-435-5562, joseph_rickhoff@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 12/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/24/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2019. (Rickhoff, Joseph)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2924 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER 142 (Distribution of common benefit fees/expenses and settlement funds), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/21/2018. (mk)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2923 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER 141 (appointment of Common Benefit Fee Committee), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/21/2018. (mk)
November 19, 2018 Entered in error (las, ) Modified on 11/20/2018 (las, ).
November 19, 2018 Filing 2922 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court wishes to have a telephone conference with plaintiffs' lead counsel to discuss the common benefit committee and, to that end, asks lead counsel to set up a telephone conference number for 11/20/2018 at 2:00 PM and advise Judge Kennelly's assistant Denise Slappey of the details. The Court does not expect the call to take more than 10 minutes. (mk)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2921 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The motion #2600 by plaintiffs' attorneys to withdraw from representation in Case No. 16-cv-1090 (plaintiff Patrick Rex) and Case No. 16-cv-4966 (plaintiff Charles Stokes) is denied without prejudice. The sealed affidavit filed with the motion appears to reflect that plaintiffs have engaged in a continuing failure to prosecute their cases. But previous filings by the same law firm [2563, 2563-1] appear to reflect the opposite. If plaintiffs' attorneys wish to refile their motion to withdraw from representation, they must explain this discrepancy. (mk)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2920 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The motion of Donald Linn to appear pro hac vice #2654 is granted. The motion to withdraw the appearance of Sarah Wolter as attorney for Patricia Wickline (Case No. 17-cv-7596) is granted #2910 . Plaintiffs' motion for sanctions as to the Actavis defendants #2712 , AbbVie's motion to exclude testimony #2739 , and AbbVie's motion to deem filings timely #2747 are terminated as moot. (mk)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2919 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The motion of Asa R. Danes to withdraw as attorney for Jeffrey Konrad #2834 is granted. (mk)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2918 ATTORNEY Appearance for David H. Schmidt (Shakib, Christopher)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2917 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Case management conference held on 11/16/2018. All items on the joint status report discussed. Lead counsel confirmed that common benefit fees are to come out of each plaintiff's individual attorney's contracted fee percentage, not out of the plaintiff's net recovery. The Court intends to rule on pending motions to withdraw and stipulations of dismissal in due course as well as appoint a common benefit fee committee. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 2916 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The motions by plaintiffs' attorneys to withdraw from representation #2545 and #2837 are denied without prejudice. The sealed affidavits filed with the motions appear to reflect that the plaintiffs in the cases identified in the motions have engaged in a continuing failure to prosecute their case or that good cause exists for plaintiffs' counsel's withdrawal. The plaintiffs in the cases identified in the motions are ordered to show cause in writing by 12/7/2018 why their case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Plaintiffs' counsel are directed to promptly send a copy of this order to all plaintiffs listed on the motions (except for plaintiffs Jeffery Janiga (15 C 11496), Ramona Mendez (16 C 906), and Michael Roberts (15 C 11788)), and to certify to the Court that they have done so. The certification is to be filed in each particular plaintiff's individual case, rather than on the master docket. A separate entry will be made in each particular plaintiff's case repeating the present order. (mk)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2915 MAIL RETURNED, for document #2900 sent to Christopher Jude Horowitz returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (kp, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 2914 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 140 (Memorandum Opinion and Order on thirty-nine plaintiffs' motions for relief from dismissals with prejudice pursuant to Case Management Order No. 118) written by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/15/2018: For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants the following motions for relief [Case No. 14 C 1748, dkt. nos. 2641, 2657, 2665] [Case No. 15 C 3858, dkt. nos. 17, 18] [Case No. 14 C 1748, dkt. no 2664] [Case No. 16 C 0298, dkt. no. 19] [Case No. 14 C 1748, dkt. nos. 2613, 2614, 2615, 2616, 2617, 2618, 2619, 2620, 2622, 2623, 2624, 2627, 2629, 2634, 2642, 2646, 2647, 2648, 2649, 2655, 2676, 2677, 2683, 2684, 2685, 2772, 2799] [Case No. 16 C 2369, dkt. no. 5] [Case No. 16 C 7230, dkt. no. 5] [Case No. 17 C 0727, dkt. no. 10] [Case No. 16 C 7172, dkt. no. 5] [Case No. 16 C 8319, dkt. no. 6] [Case No. 17 C 7522, dkt. no. 6] [Case No. 15 C 6330, dkt. no. 6] [Case No. 16 C 2987, dkt. no 13] [Case No. 16 C 2703, dkt. no. 13] [Case No. 16 C 2993, dkt. no. 13] [Case No. 16 C 2206, dkt. no. 13] [Case No. 16 C 1834, dkt. nos. 14, 16, 17] [Case No. 16 C 6440, dkt. no. 8] [Case No. 17 C 4099, dkt. no. 8] [Case No. 17 C 1778, dkt. nos.17, 18, 20, 21]. The Court denies the following motions for relief: [Case No. 16 C 2657, dkt. no. 6] [Case No. 16 C 10185, dkt. no. 6]. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 2913 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court notes that no master settlement agreement regarding AbbVie has yet been executed. The Court is concerned about the delay. At the case management conference on 11/16/2018, the responsible negotiating member(s) of the plaintiffs' steering committee and the outside and inside responsible attorneys for AbbVie are to be prepared to discuss with the Court in detail what issues remain to be negotiated or ironed out and what the timeline is for completing the agreement. (mk)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2912 STATUS Report (Joint) for the November 16, 2018 Case Management Conference by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Smith, Brendan)
November 12, 2018 Filing 2911 MOTION by Plaintiff Calvin Berkley Ford to substitute attorney (Timmerman, Mary)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2910 MOTION by Attorney Sarah A. Wolter to withdraw as attorney for Patricia Wickline. No party information provided (wolter, sarah)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2909 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 139 (Memorandum Opinion and Order on Non-Party Gemini Insurance Company's Motion to Intervene in Settlement Allocation Proceedings), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/8/2018. (mk)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2908 Application of Maury A. Herman Seeking Appointment to the Common Benefit Fee Committee by In Re: Testosterone Replacement Therapy Products Liability Litigation (Herman, Maury)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2907 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Pursuant to the parties' request, the 11/15/2018 case management conference is vacated and reset to 11/16/2018 at 1:30 p.m.Mailed notice (clw, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 2906 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court asks counsel to be prepared to discuss the following at the upcoming case management conference: (1) Whether the arrangement and order currently in place for award of common benefit fees contemplates that any common benefit fee award made by the Court will come out of the originating/participating attorney's contingent fee percentage, rather than, effectively, out of the client's net recovery; (2) if the answer to question (1) is yes, what can and should be done to make sure that this is carried out in individual cases; (3) if the answer to question (1) is no: (a) what can and should be done to accomplish this result and to assure compliance; and (b) what effect, if any, this should have on the overall percentage the Court ultimately awards for common benefit fees; and (4) the same questions regarding any award for common benefit expenses. Any attorney who wishes to attend the case management conference and address these or other tooucs in person may do so. There is no practical way, however, to permit persons participating by telephone to speak on the record. (mk)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2905 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/25/18 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Order Number: 32609. Court Reporter Contact Information: Joseph Rickhoff, 312-435-5562, joseph_rickhoff@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 11/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2019. (Rickhoff, Joseph)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2904 Application of Seth A. Katz Seeking Appointment to the Common Benefit Fee Committee by In Re: Testosterone Replacement Therapy Products Liability Litigation (Katz, Seth)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2903 PSC's Submission Regarding Common Benefit Fee Committee Appointments by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Smith, Brendan)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2902 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 16 (Establishing Common Benefit Fee and Expense Funds), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/26/2018. (mk)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2901 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court sets this matter for a case management conference on 11/15/2018 at 2:00 PM. The topics for the case management conference will include reports on the status of the pending settlements in the products liability cases, as well as procedures for determination of common benefit fees and expenses (including, if it is still an open matter at that point, appointment of the common benefit fee committee). A joint status report is to be filed by 11/13/2018. Per its usual practice, the Court will arrange a call-in number to permit those not present at the case management conference to listen in. (mk)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2900 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 10/25/2018. Motion to intervene #2892 is taken under advisement. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 2899 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #2896 is granted. The Court directs counsel to establish e-filing accounts in this district. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 2898 MEMORANDUM by Auxilium Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC in Opposition to motion to intervene #2892 ENDO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO NON-PARTY GEMINI INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION TO INTERVENE IN SETTLEMENT ALLOCATION PROCEEDINGS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Solow, Andrew)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2897 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Response to Gemini Insurance Company's Motion to Intervene (Smith, Brendan)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2896 Nonparty and MOTION by Intervenor Gemini Insurance Company for leave to appear as Nonparty and, MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15076802. (Hiller, Eric)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2895 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Patrick M. Grand for presentment of motion to intervene #2892 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/25/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Grand, Patrick)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2894 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 138 (Memorandum Opinion and Order on PSC's Motion to Amend Case Management Order No. 16, establishing common benefit fee and expense funds), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/15/2018: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memoarndum Opinion and Order, the Court grants the PSC's motion to amend Case Management Order No. 16, establishing common benefit fee and expense funds[dkt. no. 2868]. The PSC is directed to submit an appropriate draft amended version of CMO 16 for signature by the Court. In addition, nominations for the Common Benefit Fee Committee are to be made by October 26, 2018. (mk)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2893 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick M. Grand for presentment of motion to intervene #2892 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/23/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Grand, Patrick)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2892 MOTION by Intervenor Parties Gemini Insurance Company, Gemini Insurance Company to intervene in Settlement Allocation Proceedings (Grand, Patrick)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2891 ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor Gemini Insurance Company by Patrick M. Grand (Grand, Patrick)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2890 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc. by Andrew J Rima (Rima, Andrew)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2889 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc. by Shayna Susanne Cook (Cook, Shayna)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2888 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER # 137 (BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN MEDICAL MUTUAL CASE AND MODIFICATIONS TO AMENDED CMO 1 IN THAT CASE), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/9/2018. (mk)
October 7, 2018 Filing 2887 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motions to exclude testimony #2846 #2847 #2848 are terminated in light of the previously announced global settlement. The motions will be reinstated upon request if the settlement is not completed or if the cases in question are not resolved by the settlement. (mk)
October 7, 2018 Filing 2886 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Pfizer defendants' joint motions for dismissal #2343 #2379 are terminated as pending motions because they have been ruled upon. (mk)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2885 Plaintiffs' Steering Committee's Consolidated Response to Objections to Motion to Amend CMO 16 by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Smith, Brendan)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2884 OBJECTIONS To PSC Motion to Amend CMO No. 16 (Spence, Janet)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2883 OBJECTIONS OBJECTION TO MOTION TO AMEND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 16 AND REQUEST FOR FURTHER INFORMATION PERTINENT TO THIS OBJECTION (Cleary, Sean)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2882 RESPONSE by Bernstein Liebhard LLP (Burke, Daniel)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2881 ORDER: Motion for leave to withdraw as counsel #2875 is granted. Attorney Rebecca A.G. Robertson is withdrawn as attorney of record in Case No. 14 C 1748 and all cases listed on Exhibit A. The Clerk is directed to enter this order in Case No. 14 C 1748 and all cases included in Exhibit A. The Clerk is further directed to terminate Attorney Rebecca A.G. Robertson as counsel for plaintiffs in Case No. 14 C 1748 and all cases listed on Exhibit A. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/21/2018. Mailed notice(las, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 2880 LETTER from Johnny C. Pope dated 6/29/2018. (pjg, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 2879 LETTER from Carlos D. Guffey, Sr. dated 5/15/2018. (pjg, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 2878 LETTER from Carrie B. Martino dated 12/14/2017. (pjg, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 2876 MAIL RETURNED, for document #2872 sent to John Leiper Bell returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (kp, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 2877 MAIL RETURNED, for document #2871 sent to Frederick L Berry returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (jk, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 2875 MOTION by Attorney Rebecca A.G. Robertson to withdraw as attorney for John Zuecca, Susan Zuecca. No party information provided (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Presentment, #2 Exhibit A)(Rothweiler, Kenneth)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2874 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #2873 sent to Attorney Chantell Marie Boutte returned as: Other mail system problem. Mailed to attorney Chantell Marie Boutte a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@ilnd.uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (jk, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 2873 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 136 (Schedule on PSC's motion to amend Case Management Order No. 16, establishing common benefit fee and expense funds), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/14/2018. The Court notes that this is an important order that should be reviewed by all plaintiffs / plaintiffs' counsel in the MDL. (mk)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2872 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Scheduling conference regarding Medical Mutual of Ohio v. AbbVie, et al. case held by telephone with attorneys for all parties. All parties have agreed to briefing defendants' anticipated summary judgment motion before doing expert discovery. All parties understand and agree that they will have only one opportunity to seek summary judgment. The schedule for Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures and expert depositions is vacated. Defendants' summary judgment motion and supporting materials are to be filed by 10/15/2018; response is due by 11/20/2018; reply is due by 12/14/2018. The parties are to provide proposed page limits to Judge Kennelly's courtroom deputy by no later than 9/18/2018. The case is set for a jury trial of no more than 7 or 8 days on 7/15/2019 at 9:45 AM. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 2871 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #2870 , #2869 sent to Attorney Frederick L Berry returned as: Bad destination host. Mailed to attorney Frederick L Berry a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@ilnd.uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (jk, ) Modified on 9/12/2018 (jk, ).
September 11, 2018 Filing 2870 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 135 (Memorandum Opinion and Order on MMO's Motion for Leave to Amend the Third Amended Complaint in Med. Mutual of Ohio v. AbbVie Inc., No. 14 C 8857), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/11/2018: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies in part and grants in part MMO's motion for leave to amend [dkt. no. 389]. MMO is given leave to delete its allegations regarding the drug Testopel. MMO's motion is otherwise denied. The case is set for a case management conference, to be conducted by telephone, on September 13, 2018 at 11:15 a.m. Chicago time. Defense counsel are to set up a call-in number and are to advise all counsel and the Court by the close of business on September 12, 2018. Counsel should be prepared to discuss all remaining discovery and pretrial deadlines as well as the trial date. (mk)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2869 STATUS Report Joint Interim Status Report regarding CMO 26 and CMO 9 Dismissal Lists by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Brendan)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2868 MOTION by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee to amend/correct order #486 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A - Re Guidant Corp Implantable Defibrillators Products Liability Litigation, #2 Exhibit EX B - Re NuvaRing Products Liability Litigation, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting CMO 16 Changes)(Johnson, Ronald)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2867 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Based on the Court's entry of an order earlier today staying proceedings with regard to products liability cases involving AbbVie, the case management conference scheduled for 9/13/2018 is vacated. The Court will set, in due course, a new case management conference date as well as a separate status hearing date, if necessary, relating to the Medical Mutual v. AbbVie case (individual case no. 14-cv-8857). (mk)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2866 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 134 (STAY OF CASES INVOLVING CLAIMS AGAINST ABBVIE DEFENDANTS), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/10/2018. (mk)
September 2, 2018 Filing 2865 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendants' motion for leave to file additional briefing #2857 on defendants' motions in limine is denied. The Court's schedule for briefing motions in limine does not contemplate reply briefs. If the Court believes that further argument is required beyond the motion in limine and response, it will hear argument at the final pretrial conference. (mk)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2864 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The trial scheduling conference call set for 2:30 PM today is vacated and converted to a conference call regarding the status of settlement discussions. Counsel have been provided a call-in number. (mk)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2863 AMENDED Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Silvia Pineiro-Garbin (Abrams, Rachel)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2862 AMENDED Notice of Videotaped deposition of Stephen Tindell (Abrams, Rachel)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2861 RESPONSE by Plaintiff's Steering Committeein Opposition to MOTION by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratoriesin limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument in Bechtholdt #2847 Plaintiffs' Steering Committee's Omnibus Response in Opposition to AbbVie's "Requests to Adopt Prior Motion in Limine Rulings" (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Seeger, Christopher)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2860 RESPONSE by AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratoriesin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Plaintiff's Steering Committeein limine for all Bellwether Plaintiffs #2848 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Global Motions In Limine for All Bellwether Plaintiffs and Case-Specific Motions In Limine in Frost (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 1 - Sealed, #2 Exhibit No. 2 - Sealed, #3 Exhibit No. 3 - Sealed, #4 Exhibit No. 4 - Sealed, #5 Exhibit No. 5 - Sealed, #6 Exhibit No. 6 - Sealed, #7 Exhibit No. 7 - Sealed, #8 Exhibit No. 8 - Sealed, #9 Exhibit No. 9 - Sealed, #10 Exhibit No. 10 - Sealed, #11 Exhibit No. 11 - Sealed, #12 Exhibit No. 12 - Sealed, #13 Exhibit No. 13 - Sealed, #14 Exhibit No. 14 - Sealed, #15 Exhibit No. 15 - Sealed, #16 Exhibit No. 16 - Sealed, #17 Exhibit No. 17 - Sealed, #18 Exhibit No. 18 - Sealed, #19 Exhibit No. 19 - Sealed, #20 Exhibit No. 20 - Sealed, #21 Exhibit No. 21 - Sealed, #22 Exhibit No. 22 - Sealed)(Donahue, Alicia)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2859 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephone conference call regarding trial schedule set for 8/31/2018 at 2:30 p.m. Conference call-in number to be circulated to required participants and to the Court. (pjg, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 2858 NOTICE of Motion by Alicia Donahue for presentment of motion for leave to file #2857 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/4/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Donahue, Alicia)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2857 MOTION by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc. for leave to file additional briefing (Donahue, Alicia)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2856 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiffs' motion to exceed page limits #2851 is granted. (mk)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2855 MEMORANDUM by AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc. in Opposition to motion for leave to file excess pages #2851 (Donahue, Alicia)
August 26, 2018 Filing 2853 STATUS Report Interim Joint Status Report Regarding CMO 26 Dismissal List by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Brendan)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2852 NOTICE of Motion by Brendan A Smith for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #2851 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/29/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Smith, Brendan)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2851 MOTION by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee for leave to file excess pages to Response to Motions in Limine (Smith, Brendan)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2854 MAIL RETURNED, for document #2840 sent to John Leiper Bell returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form (sxb, )
August 23, 2018 Filing 2850 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 133 (Memorandum Opinion and Order on AbbVie's motion to exclude (1) plaintiffs' general causation opinion testimony in view of studies issued after February 2017, (2) general causation testimony of Dr. Henry Rinder, Dr. Morton Rinder, Dr. Ronald Ziman, and Dr. Douglas Zipes, and (3) supplemental testimony of doctors David Kessler, Peggy Pence, and Martin Wells), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/23/2018. (mk)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2849 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 132 (Memorandum Opinion and Order on AbbVie's motion to exclude specific causation testimony of Dr. Hossein Ardehali and motion for summary judgment in Papandrea v. AbbVie, Case No. 14 C 8948), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/23/2018. For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies AbbVie's motion to exclude Dr. Ardehali's specific causation testimony, grants AbbVie's motion for summary judgment on Papandrea's claims for negligence, breach of implied warranty, fraud, and negligent misrepresentation, and denies AbbVie's motion for summary judgment on Papandrea's claims for strict liability failure to warn, strict liability design defect, breach of express warranty, and loss of consortium [dkt. no. 20]. (mk)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2848 MOTION by Plaintiff Plaintiff's Steering Committeein limine for all Bellwether Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Leckman, T.)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2847 MOTION by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratoriesin limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument in Bechtholdt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 1, #2 Exhibit No. 2, #3 Exhibit No. 3, #4 Exhibit No. 4, #5 Exhibit No. 5, #6 Exhibit No. 6, #7 Exhibit No. 7, #8 Exhibit No. 8, #9 Exhibit No. 9, #10 Exhibit No. 10, #11 Exhibit No. 11)(Wajert, Sean)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2846 MOTION by Plaintiff Cecile Frostin limine for all Bellwether Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Leckman, T.)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2845 ENTERED JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the Court's order of 8/17/2018 in the MDL 2545 master file, Case No. 14 C 1748 (dkt. no. 2841) final judgment is entered in favor of Besins. Besins Healthcare, Inc and Besins Healthcare, S.A. terminated. Mailed notice. (rp, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 2844 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The plaintiffs' steering committee is directed to supplement its in camera "common benefit" submissions to the Court by providing a breakdown and description of each firm's expenditures, as well as an accounting, with descriptions, of the general expenses that have incurred. The submission previously made provides only a bottom-line total for each firm and an overview of monies collected for common benefit expenses. The supplement should break down, for each firm and for the general expenses, the categories of expenditures and the amount for each category. This is to be provided for in camera review by no later than the close of business 9/3/2018. (mk)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2843 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AbbVie Inc. by Eric Michael Kraus (Kraus, Eric)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2842 MAIL RETURNED, for document #2833 sent to John Leiper Bell returned as unable to forward, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (sxb, )
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2841 ORDER ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT FOR BESINS, signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/17/2018. (mk)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2840 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Due to the plaintiffs' steering committee's compliance with the common benefit submission, the 8/20/2018 status hearing is vacated. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 2839 NOTICE of Motion by Brian John Perkins for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #2545 , motion to withdraw as attorney #2837 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/13/2018 at 01:30 PM. (Perkins, Brian)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2838 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Counsel (Perkins, Brian)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2837 MOTION by Attorney Brian J. Perkins to withdraw as attorney for Plaintiffs' Counsel. New address information: Bryan Adams, et al (Attachments: #1 Notification of Party Contact Information Forms)(Perkins, Brian)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2836 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: No common benefit submission by the plaintiffs' steering committee was made by 8/15/2018 as previously directed by the Court. This must be rectified immediately. The case is set for a status hearing on 8/20/2018 at 9:30 AM at which all lead plaintiffs' counsel must appear in person. The Court will vacate the hearing if and only if the required common benefit submission is made by 4:30 pm today. (mk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2835 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on August 9, 2018 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn Cox, Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2018. (Cox, Carolyn)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2834 MOTION by Attorney Asa R. Danes to withdraw as attorney for Jana Konrad, Jeffrey Konrad. No party information provided (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Service)(Danes, Asa)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2833 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Case management conference held on 8/9/2018. All unresolved items on the joint agenda are discussed. (1) Further discussions held regarding the Papandrea case. The case will not be set for a trial date before November 2018 but may be set for the first Monday in November 2018. Defendants have until 8/31/2018 to advise plaintiffs whether the expert in question will testify or whether defendants wish to make a substitution. The parties should attempt to work out an appropriate schedule for whatever further discovery is necessitated. (2) Defendants Besins Healthcare Inc., Besins Healthcare, S.A. for entry of judgment under Rule 54(b) #2793 is granted. Order to follow. (3) Regarding the Frost and Konrad cases, counsel are to confer regarding supplementation of expert disclosures. (4) The terms of all current members of the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee are extended through 10/1/2018. Applications for reappointment should be submitted in connection with the next case management conference. The next case management conference is set for 9/13/2018 at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 2831 Joint Agenda for the August 9, 2018 Case Management Conference by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Smith, Brendan)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2830 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on June 28, 2018 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn Cox, Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/29/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/6/2018. (Cox, Carolyn)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2829 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on June 14, 2018 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn Cox, Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/29/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/6/2018. (Cox, Carolyn)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2828 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on May 31, 2018 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn Cox, Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/29/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/6/2018. (Cox, Carolyn)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2832 MAIL RETURNED, for document # sent to Stephanie C. Kucera returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (smm) ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2018: #1 Documents in Envelope) (jk, ).
August 7, 2018 Filing 2827 STATUS Report (Joint) for the August 9, 2018 Case Management Conference by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Brendan)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2826 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: AbbVie's request for an in camera conference regarding the availability of an expert is granted #2797 #2800 #2801 . The conference will be held at 1:15 PM on 8/9/2018, in chambers (Room 2188). (mk)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2825 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court anticipates having a discussion regarding settlement with the settlement master and representatives of the plaintiffs' steering committee and AbbVie on 8/9/2018 before the 1:30 PM case management conference. Counsel should report to chambers for this discussion at 1:00 PM. This will be followed by a brief in-chambers meeting with lead and trial counsel and other interested counsel at or about 1:15 PM, consistent with the Court's usual practice. This may include a discussion of how the cases to be tried in October-November-December 2018 should be prioritized and/or assigned out. (mk)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2824 NOTICE by Jennifer Nolte of Change of Address and Firm Name (Nolte, Jennifer)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2823 SEALED RESPONSE by Dominick Papandrea, Joanne Papandrea to SEALED MOTION by Defendant AbbVie Inc. ABBVIE'S CORRECTED MOTION REGARDING EXPERT AVAILABILITY AND REQUEST FOR IN CAMERA CONFERENCE #2800 (Mulligan, Edward)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2822 QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/1/2018. (mk)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2821 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion for entry of qualified protective orders #2818 is granted. (mk)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2820 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Exhibit A to Dkt. No. 2818-2 (Smith, Brendan)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2819 NOTICE of Motion by Brendan A Smith for presentment of motion for protective order #2818 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/2/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Smith, Brendan)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2818 MOTION by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee for protective order Motion for Qualified Protective Orders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Smith, Brendan)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2817 CERTIFICATE of Service Supplemented Expert Witness Testimony Disclosures by Brian A. Goldstein on behalf of Barbara Flippo, Roy Flippo (Goldstein, Brian)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2816 CERTIFICATE of Service Expert Witness Testimony Disclosures by Brian A. Goldstein on behalf of Barbara Flippo, Roy Flippo (Goldstein, Brian)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2815 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 131 (Order on defendants' motion to enforce the March 15, 2018 discovery order in MMO v. AbbVie), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/27/2018. (mk)
July 26, 2018 Filing 2814 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #2809 , #2808 , #2813 , #2811 , #2804 , #2805 , #2807 , #2810 , #2812 sent to Attorney Stephanie C Kucera returned as: Unknown address error. Mailed to attorney Stephanie C Kucera a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerks Office at Docketing_ILND@ilnd.uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (jk, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2018: #1 Letter with Email) (jk, ).
July 26, 2018 Filing 2813 REPLY by Defendant AbbVie Inc. to motion in limine #2739 Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Charleston J. Gbur, Jr. M.D. and for Summary Judgment in Kibat (Attachments: #1 Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Wajert, Sean)
July 26, 2018 Filing 2812 REPLY by Defendant AbbVie Inc. to motion in limine #2734 Motion to Exclude the Specific Causation Testimony of Dr. Ronald B. Ziman and for Summary Judgment in Harris (Attachments: #1 Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts, #2 L, #3 M, #4 N, #5 O, #6 P, #7 Q, #8 R, #9 S, #10 T, #11 U, #12 V, #13 W)(Wajert, Sean)
July 26, 2018 Filing 2811 REPLY by Defendants Unimed Pharmaceuticals LLC, AbbVie Products LLC, AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories to motion for miscellaneous relief, #2733 to Exclude Supplemental Testimony of Doctors David Kessler, Peggy Pence, and Martin Wells (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Wajert, Sean)
July 26, 2018 Filing 2810 REPLY by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories to motion for miscellaneous relief, #2738 Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the General Causation Testimony of Morton Rinder, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Donahue, Alicia)
July 26, 2018 Filing 2809 REPLY by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories to motion for miscellaneous relief, #2743 Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Exclude the General Causation Testimony of Dr. Ziman (Donahue, Alicia)
July 26, 2018 Filing 2808 REPLY by Defendants Unimed Pharmaceuticals LLC, AbbVie Inc., AbbVie Products LLC, Abbott Laboratories to motion for miscellaneous relief, #2737 Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' General Causation Opinion Testimony in View of Studies Issued After February 2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Donahue, Alicia)
July 26, 2018 Filing 2807 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 130 (Memorandum Opinion and Order on MMO's Motion for Class Certification, MMO's Daubert Motions, and Defendants' Daubert Motions in Med. Mutual of Ohio v. AbbVie Inc., No. 14 C 8857), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/26/2018. (mk)
July 26, 2018 Filing 2805 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The parties having reported that a master settlement agreement involving claims against Actavis, Inc. (n/k/a Allergan Finance LLC), Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., and Anda, Inc. has been fully executed, the bellwether trial date of 8/6/2018 is vacated. (mk)
July 26, 2018 Filing 2804 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The parties having reported that a master settlement agreement involving claims against Actavis, Inc. (n/k/a Allergan Finance LLC), Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., and Anda, Inc. has been fully executed, the bellwether trial date of 8/6/2018 is vacated. (mk)
July 25, 2018 Filing 2806 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #2803 sent to Attorney Rebecca A.G. Robertson returned as: Unknown address error. Mailed to attorney Rebecca Robertson a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerks Office at Docketing_ILND@ilnd.uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (jk, )
July 25, 2018 Filing 2803 REPLY by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories to motion for miscellaneous relief, #2742 In Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the General Causation Testimony of Dr. Douglas P. Zipes (Donahue, Alicia)
July 24, 2018 Filing 2802 NOTICE OF MOTION NOTICE of Motion by Alicia Donahue for presentment of motion to amend/correct #2801 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/9/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Donahue, Alicia)
July 24, 2018 Filing 2801 MOTION by Defendant AbbVie Inc. to amend/correct ABBVIE'S CORRECTED MOTION REGARDING EXPERT AVAILABILITY AND REQUEST FOR IN CAMERA CONFERENCE (Donahue, Alicia)
July 24, 2018 Filing 2800 SEALED MOTION by Defendant AbbVie Inc. ABBVIE'S CORRECTED MOTION REGARDING EXPERT AVAILABILITY AND REQUEST FOR IN CAMERA CONFERENCE (Donahue, Alicia)
July 23, 2018 Filing 2799 MOTION for reconsideration of dismissal under CMO 118 Filed on May 11, 2018 #2612 (Envelope postmarked 7/16/18) (las, ) Modified on 7/25/2018 (las, ).
July 23, 2018 Filing 2798 NOTICE OF MOTION NOTICE of Motion by Alicia Donahue for presentment of Sealed motion #2797 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/9/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Donahue, Alicia)
July 23, 2018 Filing 2797 SEALED MOTION by Defendant AbbVie, Inc. ABBVIE'S MOTION REGARDING EXPERT AVAILABILITY AND REQUEST FOR IN CAMERA CONFERENCE (Donahue, Alicia)
July 23, 2018 Filing 2796 NOTICE of Motion by Michelle H. Yeary for presentment of motion for entry of judgment under Rule 54(b) #2793 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/9/2018 at 01:30 PM. (Yeary, Michelle)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2795 REPLY - Plaintiffs' Ominibus Reply to Defendant's Objection to Dismissal Without Prejudice (Teague, Matthew)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2794 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The final pretrial conference set for 8/2/2018 is vacated based on the settlement of Actavis cases. (mk)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2793 MOTION by Defendants Besins Healthcare Inc., Besins Healthcare, S.A. for entry of judgment under Rule 54(b) (Yeary, Michelle)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2792 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The motion of Brian J. Perkins and Meyers & Flowers, LLC to withdraw as attorney for plaintiffs Carl Ratliff (1:16-cv-583) and David Ward (1:15-cv-11468) is denied, because the accompanying sealed affidavit states no grounds justifying withdrawal. (mk)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2791 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion of the AbbVie Defendants to Exclude Supplemental Testimony of Doctors David Kessler, Peggy Pence, and Martin Wells (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13-1, #14 Exhibit 13-2, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15-1, #17 Exhibit 15-2, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26)(Seeger, Christopher)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2790 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion of the AbbVie Defendants to Exclude the General Causation Testimony of Dr. Douglas P. Zipes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 16, #3 Exhibit 17, #4 Exhibit 18)(Seeger, Christopher)
July 12, 2018 Filing 2789 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs' Steering Committeein Opposition to MOTION by Defendant AbbVie Inc. to Exclude Supplemental Testimony of Doctors David Kessler, Peggy Pence, and Martin Wells #2733 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Index of Exhibits)(Seeger, Christopher)
July 12, 2018 Filing 2788 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs' Steering Committeein Opposition to MOTION by Defendant AbbVie Inc. to Exclude the General Causation Testimony of Dr. Douglas P. Zipes #2742 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - To Be Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16 - To Be Filed Under Seal, #18 Exhibit 17 - To Be Filed Under Seal, #19 Exhibit 18 - To Be Filed Under Seal, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21)(Seeger, Christopher)
July 12, 2018 Filing 2787 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee to response in opposition to motion, #2785 Plaintiff George Kibat's Local Rule 56.1 Response to Defendants' Statement of Facts in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgement (Miracle, Trent)
July 12, 2018 Filing 2786 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant AbbVie's Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Charleston J. Gbur, Jr., M.D. and for Summary Judgement - Exhibits 1-5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5)(Miracle, Trent)
July 12, 2018 Filing 2785 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs' Steering Committeein Opposition to MOTION by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratoriesin limine to Exclude Specific Causation Testimony of Charleston J. Gbur, Jr., MD and for Summary Judgment #2739 (Miracle, Trent)
July 12, 2018 Filing 2784 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Exclude Causation Opinion Testimony In View of Studies Issued After February 2017 #2737 Exhibits 1-4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4)(Miracle, Trent)
July 12, 2018 Filing 2783 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs' Steering Committeein Opposition to MOTION by Defendant AbbVie Inc. Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' General Causation Opinion Testimony in View of Studies Issued After February 2017 and Memorandum in Support #2737 (Miracle, Trent)
July 12, 2018 Filing 2782 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the AbbVie Defendants' Motion to Exclude the General Causation Testimony of Morton Rinderer, M.D. Exhibits 1-3 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3)(Miracle, Trent)
July 12, 2018 Filing 2781 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs' Steering Committeein Opposition to MOTION by Defendant AbbVie Inc. Motion to Exclude General Causation Testimony of Morton Rinder M.D. #2738 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4)(Miracle, Trent)
July 12, 2018 Filing 2780 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee to memorandum in support of motion #2732 Plaintiffs' Opposition to AbbVie's Motion to Exclude Henry Rinder's General Causation Testimony in the Harris and Natale Caes #2732 (Miracle, Trent)
July 12, 2018 Filing 2779 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition To AbbVie Defendants' Motion to Exclude General Causation Expert Opinions of Dr. Ronald Ziman Exhibits 1-3 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3)(Miracle, Trent)
July 12, 2018 Filing 2778 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs' Steering Committeein Opposition to MOTION by Defendant AbbVie Inc. to Exclude the General Causation Testimony of Dr. Ronald B. Ziman #2743 (Miracle, Trent)
July 11, 2018 Filing 2777 NOTICE by Scott D. Levensten of Change of Address (Levensten, Scott)
July 6, 2018 Filing 2776 MAIL RETURNED, for document #2768 sent to John Leiper Bell returned as undeliverable, return to sender. Mail resent to address on envelop. (las, )
July 5, 2018 Filing 2775 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #2774 sent to Attorney Matthew B. Moreland returned as: Unknown address error. Mailed to attorney Matthew B. Moreland a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerks Office at Docketing_ILND@ilnd.uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (jk, )
July 5, 2018 Filing 2774 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 129 (Memorandum Opinion and Order on post-trialmotions in Konrad v. AbbVie, No. 15 C 966): For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies AbbVie's motion for judgment as a matter of law but grants its motion for a new trial [dkt. no. 118]. The Court vacates the judgment entered on October 5, 2017 and orders a new trial on all claims. The case will be retried in the fall of this year (October, November, or December 2018) on a specific date to be set after discussion with counsel. (mk)
June 29, 2018 Filing 2771 NOTICE of Motion by Brian John Perkins for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney, #2769 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/17/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Perkins, Brian)
June 29, 2018 Filing 2770 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Counsel (Perkins, Brian)
June 29, 2018 Filing 2769 MOTION by Attorney Brian J. Perkins to withdraw as attorney for Plaintiffs' Counsel. New address information: Carl Ratliff, 380 Howard Hill Drive, Wilsonville, AL 35185 & David Ward, 37776 County Road 49, Piedmont, AL 36272 (Attachments: #1 Notification of Party Contact Information Forms)(Perkins, Brian)
June 29, 2018 Filing 2767 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 128 (STAY OF CASES INVOLVING CLAIMS AGAINST ACTAVIS DEFENDANTS), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/29/2018. (mk)
June 28, 2018 Filing 2773 MOTION by Alan M Leschyshyn for attorney representation (las, )
June 28, 2018 Filing 2772 RESPONSE by Alan M. Leschyshyn to case management order(CMO) No. 110- order to show cause pursuant to CMO no. 85 (las, )
June 28, 2018 Filing 2768 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Case management conference held on 6/28/2018. All unresolved items on the joint agenda are discussed. (1) Further discussions held regarding orders to show cause regarding notices of deficiency, which the Court will issue in due course for reasons stated in open court. No additional responses to the notices of deficiency need to be or should be filed at this time. (2) Plaintiffs' counsel for the Beasley Allen Firm who filed motions to dismiss without prejudice are to file an omnibus reply to defendants' response, as a single document filed under the main MDL docket number. (3) Order to show cause pursuant to CMO 85 and (4) motions for reconsideration and reinstatement of cases dismissed by CMO are taken under advisement. (5) Plaintiff's motion for a new trial #69 and AbbVie's bill of costs #73 in Myers v. AbbVie are taken under advisement. Motion to deem summary judgment and Daubert filing timely #274 is granted. Finally, the PSC is to submit information on common benefit fees and expenses to the Court under seal by 8/15/2018. The next case management conference is set for 8/9/2018 at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
June 27, 2018 Filing 2766 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Lead and settlement counsel are directed to report to chambers on 6/28/2018 at 01:00 PM for settlement-related and pre-CMC meetings. (mk)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2765 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Peyton Haggan to notice of filing #2669 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Tanase, Blake)
June 25, 2018 Filing 2764 STATUS Report (Joint) for the June 28, 2018 CMC by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Brendan)
June 25, 2018 Filing 2763 Joint Agenda for the June 28, 2018 CMC by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Smith, Brendan)
June 22, 2018 Filing 2762 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion to substitute attorney #2756 is granted and the 7/19/2018 hearing date is vacated. The Clerk is directed to substitute Attorney Carrie R. Capoullez for Attorney Andrew W. Knox as attorney of record for all plaintiffs listed in all cases on Exhibit A of the motion. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
June 22, 2018 Filing 2761 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The joint status report and agenda for the 6/28/2018 case management conference is to be filed by the close of business on 6/25/2018. The Court requests that the parties include a listing of matters (motions, etc.) submitted by any party that are under advisement and awaiting ruling by the Court. This listing may omit matters that are included in the separately-submitted CMO 9 and CMO 26 dismissal lists. (mk) (Duplicate of 2759 for noticing purposes.) (pjg, ) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
June 21, 2018 Filing 2760 REPLY by Defendant AbbVie Inc. to other, #2728 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to AbbVie's Reply, #2 Exhibit Ex. B to AbbVie's Reply)(Donahue, Alicia)
June 21, 2018 Filing 2759 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The joint status report and agenda for the 6/28/2018 case management conference is to be filed by the close of business on 6/25/2018. The Court requests that the parties include a listing of matters (motions, etc.) submitted by any party that are under advisement and awaiting ruling by the Court. This listing may omit matters that are included in the separately-submitted CMO 9 and CMO 26 dismissal lists. (mk)
June 21, 2018 Filing 2758 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Christopher DePetro, Sydney Phillips to notice of filing #2751 (Johnson, Ronald)
June 21, 2018 Filing 2757 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew W. Knox for presentment of before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/19/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Knox, Andrew)
June 21, 2018 Filing 2756 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Akins to substitute attorney Motion by multiple plaintiffs to substitute attorney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Knox, Andrew)
June 21, 2018 Filing 2755 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Akins to substitute attorney Motion by multiple plaintiffs to substitute attorney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Knox, Andrew) Incorrect PDF linked. Docket text modified by Clerk's Office on 6/21/2018 (mma, )
June 20, 2018 Filing 2754 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patricia Wickline by sarah ann wolter (wolter, sarah)
June 20, 2018 Filing 2753 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Clair Crawford, Richard Craig Davis, Larry A Griffith, Philip Michael Haag, Mark A Roy, James Edward Smelley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Hoffman, Mark)
June 20, 2018 Filing 2752 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Clair Crawford, Richard Craig Davis, Larry A Griffith, Philip Michael Haag, Mark A Roy, James Edward Smelley to notice of filing #2751 (Hoffman, Mark)
June 18, 2018 Filing 2751 NOTICE by AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories Defendants' Third Corrected Notice of Deficiency Pursuant to Case Management Order No. 115 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Yeary, Michelle)
June 18, 2018 Filing 2750 NOTICE of Correction regarding MOTION #2747 (las, )
June 15, 2018 Filing 2749 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Robert A. Francis, Billy R Shinn, Michael P Smith, Martie Williams To Second Notice of Deficiency Pursuant to CMO 115 by Brent Coon & Associates (Morris, James)
June 15, 2018 Filing 2748 CERTIFICATE of Service for Written Discovery by Brian A. Goldstein on behalf of Barbara Flippo, Roy Flippo (Goldstein, Brian)
June 15, 2018 Filing 2747 Motion to Deem Filings Timely and Memorandum in Support by AbbVie Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer S. Hill)(Donahue, Alicia) Text Modified on 6/18/2018 (las, ).
June 15, 2018 Filing 2746 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: This entry concerns the settlement conference call regarding Actavis to take place at 11:00 AM Chicago time today. The Court requests and directs that litigation counsel for Actavis also participate in the conference call, which the Court does not expect to take more than 10 or 15 minutes. Actavis's settlement counsel are to immediately get word to litigation counsel. (mk)
June 15, 2018 Filing 2745 SUPPLEMENT to Joint Status Report on Trial Group 1 (Wajert, Sean)
June 15, 2018 Filing 2744 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: AbbVie is directed to file, by 10:00 AM Chicago time this morning, a supplement to the parties' joint status report regarding CMO 87 trial group 1 cases (dkt. 2731) explaining in detail its statement in the status report that "the Abraham case may implicate a statute of limitations defense at trial." (mk)
June 15, 2018 Filing 2743 MOTION by Defendant AbbVie Inc. to Exclude the General Causation Testimony of Dr. Ronald B. Ziman (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q)(Wajert, Sean)
June 15, 2018 Filing 2742 MOTION by Defendant AbbVie Inc. to Exclude the General Causation Testimony of Dr. Douglas P. Zipes (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(Wajert, Sean)
June 15, 2018 Filing 2741 STATEMENT by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratoriesin Support of MOTION by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratoriesin limine to Exclude Specific Causation Testimony of Charleston J. Gbur, Jr., MD and for Summary Judgment #2739 (Donahue, Alicia)
June 15, 2018 Filing 2740 MEMORANDUM by AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories in support of motion in limine #2739 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Sealed, #2 Exhibit B Sealed, #3 Exhibit C Sealed, #4 Exhibit D Sealed, #5 Exhibit E Sealed, #6 Exhibit F Sealed, #7 Exhibit G Sealed, #8 Exhibit Exhibit List)(Donahue, Alicia)
June 15, 2018 Filing 2739 MOTION by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratoriesin limine to Exclude Specific Causation Testimony of Charleston J. Gbur, Jr., MD and for Summary Judgment (Donahue, Alicia)
June 15, 2018 Filing 2738 MOTION by Defendant AbbVie Inc. Motion to Exclude General Causation Testimony of Morton Rinder M.D. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Wajert, Sean)
June 15, 2018 Filing 2737 MOTION by Defendant AbbVie Inc. Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' General Causation Opinion Testimony in View of Studies Issued After February 2017 and Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Wajert, Sean)
June 14, 2018 Filing 2736 STATEMENT by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratoriesin Support of MOTION by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratoriesin limine to Exclude The Specific Causation Testimony of Dr. Ronald Ziman and Motion for Summary Judgment #2734 (Donahue, Alicia)
June 14, 2018 Filing 2735 MEMORANDUM by AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories in support of motion in limine #2734 to Exclude Specific Causation Testimony of Dr. Ronald B. Ziman and Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Sealed, #2 Exhibit B Sealed, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit k, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Donahue, Alicia)
June 14, 2018 Filing 2734 MOTION by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratoriesin limine to Exclude The Specific Causation Testimony of Dr. Ronald Ziman and Motion for Summary Judgment (Donahue, Alicia)
June 14, 2018 Filing 2733 MOTION by Defendant AbbVie Inc. to Exclude Supplemental Testimony of Doctors David Kessler, Peggy Pence, and Martin Wells (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Wajert, Sean)
June 14, 2018 Filing 2732 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Exclude Henry Rinder's General Causation Testimony (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 2 (Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 3 (Under Seal))(Donahue, Alicia)
June 14, 2018 Filing 2731 STATUS Report (Joint) Relating to Trial Group 1 Cases by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Smith, Brendan)
June 14, 2018 Filing 2730 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on plaintiffs' motion for sanctions #2712 and plaintiffs' motion to compel #2687 . Motion to compel #2687 is granted in part. Custodial files for Reggio, Cassarino, and Kipness are to be produced promptly by a mutually ageed upon date. Plaintiffs may take the deposition of Reggio but not Cassarino or Kipness. The deposition is to take place by no later than 6/29/2018. Motion for sanctions #2712 is entered and continued to MDL case management conference set for 6/28/2018 at 1:30 pm. Parties are to confer and exchange information and attempt to arrive at stipulations regarding the net worth of all four Actavis-related entities, reserving their positions on the relevance and admissibility of the stipulations. A status report is to be included in the status report for the 6/28/2018 case management conference. If stipulations have not been concluded, further argument will be heard at that conference. Mailed notice (ags, )
June 13, 2018 Filing 2729 Regarding PSC's Motion for Sanctions (Dkt. No. 2728) NOTICE of Motion by Brendan A Smith for presentment of before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/28/2018 at 01:30 PM. (Smith, Brendan)
June 13, 2018 Filing 2728 PSC's Response in Opposition to AbbVie's Second and Third Notices of Deficiency Pursuant to CMO 115 and Motion for Sanctions by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Smith, Brendan)
June 13, 2018 Filing 2727 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Actavis defendants' motion for an order providing them until 6/22/2018 to file a response to the PSC's motion for sanctions is terminated as moot, because the Actavis defendants have filed a response to the motion for sanctions. The motion for sanctions was noticed for hearing tomorrow, 6/14/2018, at 9:30 AM. The hearing will proceed as scheduled. The Court expects counsel to appear and present argument and answer the Court's questions at that time. (mk)
June 13, 2018 Filing 2726 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Christopher DePetro, Ernesto Del Favero, Michael Gordon, Thomas Headley, Steven Kokotos, Edward Nawrot, Sydney Phillips, John Reinbolt, Jr. to notice of filing #2720 (Attachments: #1 1)(Johnson, Ronald)
June 13, 2018 Filing 2725 MEMORANDUM by Anda, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc. in Opposition to motion for sanctions,,,, #2712 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Jeffrey D. Geoppinger)(Geoppinger, Jeffrey)
June 13, 2018 Filing 2724 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Charles Camp, Charles Johns, Daniel Johnston, Bruce Longson, Charles McDonald to notice of filing #2723 (Johnson, Ronald)
June 12, 2018 Filing 2723 NOTICE by AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc. Second Corrected Notice of Deficiency Pursuant to Case Management Order No. 115 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Yeary, Michelle)
June 12, 2018 Filing 2722 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court sets a telephone conference for Friday June 15, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. Chicago time regarding the status of settlement discussions relating to Actavis cases. Settlement counsel for plaintiffs and Actavis and Actavis's in-house settlement representative shall participate. The Court will provide dial-in instructions. (mk)
June 12, 2018 Filing 2721 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 127 (Summary judgment and Daubert briefing for AbbVie Trial Group 1 cases), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/12/2018: The Court rules on AbbVie's motion for leave to file separate motions including for general and case-specific experts and to exceed page limits as stated in the accompanying order. (mk)
June 11, 2018 Filing 2720 NOTICE by AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc. Defendants' Third Notice of Deficiency Pursuant to Case Management Order No. 115 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Yeary, Michelle)
June 11, 2018 Filing 2719 MOTION by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories for leave to file separate motions including for general and case-specific experts and to exceed page limits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Donahue, Alicia)
June 11, 2018 Filing 2718 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Daniel Geoppinger for presentment of motion for order, #2717 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/14/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Geoppinger, Jeffrey)
June 11, 2018 Filing 2717 MOTION by Defendants Anda, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc. for order Providing Actavis Defendants to June 22, 2018, to brief their response to Plaintiff Steering Committee's Motion for Sanctions and vacating the hearing noticed for June 14, 2018, on the PSC's motion (Geoppinger, Jeffrey)
June 11, 2018 Filing 2716 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 126 (Docket Control Order For Future Cases Against Eli Lilly, Endo, Auxilium, & GSK), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/11/2018. (mk)
June 11, 2018 Filing 2715 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court has reviewed the parties' submissions regarding prioritization of the AbbVie Trial Group 1 cases (dkt. nos. 2709 & 2710). At this point, given the fact that the cases will all be tried by the undersigned judge and several other judges of this Court over a relatively short period, the Court does not believe it necessary to prioritize them. Assignments of specific cases to particular judges for purposes of trial on the schedule previously set will be made at a later date. The Court nonetheless considers the short summaries provided by AbbVie helpful. In addition, the Court directs the parties to immediately advise the Court, by way of a joint status report, if either side believes that any of the cases in Trial Group 1 is a case that: (a) involves prescription of AndroGel to a patient with a medical condition specifically listed in the label; and/or (b) is subject to an defense applicable to the particular plaintiff, including but not limited to a statute of limitations or statute of repose. (mk)
June 11, 2018 Filing 2714 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Based on the status reports filed by the parties in the cases of Franklin Turner v. AbbVie Inc., No. 1:15-9684, and Leo Kolheim v. AbbVie Inc., No. 1:15-cv-1802 (see dkt. nos. 2698, 2707), the Turner case is removed from the mixed-use bellwether trial case pool, and the Kolheim case is moved from Trial Group 2 to Trial Group 3. With regard to the request for imposition of costs relating to the plaintiff's deposition in the Turner case, the submission (dkt. no. 2698) does not sufficiently support an award of costs as, in effect, a sanction. The plaintiffs' steering committee is directed to provide to the Court and lead defense counsel a revised spreadsheet listing all remaining AbbVie trial cases in their respective groups in light of these revisions. This should be sent to the Court by e-mail to the Court's proposed order e-mail address. (mk)
June 8, 2018 Filing 2713 NOTICE of Motion by James Griffin O'Brien for presentment of motion for sanctions,,,, #2712 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/14/2018 at 09:30 AM. (O'Brien, James)
June 8, 2018 Filing 2712 MOTION by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee for sanctions against Actavis Defendants (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James G. O'Brien, #2 Exhibit A - November 28, 2017 email transmitting the initial Rule 30(b)(6) deposition notice and document request, #3 Exhibit B - Initial Rule 30(b)(6) deposition notice and document request, #4 Exhibit C - February 27, 2018 letter to Actavis requesting updates on a number of pending discovery requests, #5 Exhibit D - April 27, 2018 letter reminding Actavis of multiple unresolved discovery issues, #6 Exhibit E - May 10, 2018 letter detailing the PSCs attempts to obtain a date for the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition, #7 Exhibit F - First Amended Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Actavis Defendants, #8 Exhibit G - letter sent by Actavis Defendants at 6:19 p.m. on May 31, 2018, #9 Exhibit H - Actavis Defendants Objections to the deposition notice, #10 Exhibit I - letter sent by the PSC on the morning of June 1, 2018, #11 Exhibit J - transcript of Statement on the Record made by the PSC on June 1, 2018, #12 Exhibit K - objections to the document requests)(O'Brien, James)
June 8, 2018 Filing 2711 NOTICE by Robert K Jenner of Change of Address and Firm Name (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jenner, Robert)
June 7, 2018 Filing 2710 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee to other #2709 PSC's Response to AbbVie's Submission Regarding Trial Group One Cases (Smith, Brendan)
June 7, 2018 Filing 2709 AbbVie Defendants' Submission Regarding Trial Group One Cases by AbbVie, Inc. (Donahue, Alicia)
June 7, 2018 Filing 2708 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Bruce Owens (Koluncich, Nicholas)
June 6, 2018 Filing 2707 STATUS Report Joint Status Report on Developments in Kolheim Case by AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories (Kim, Mary)
June 6, 2018 Filing 2706 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Attorney William Harold Anderson terminated. (pjg, )
June 6, 2018 Filing 2705 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion to seal document #2699 is granted. The "Confidential Declaration in Support of Bruce Owen's Motion for Relief from Court's Order Dismissing Plaintiff's Claim with Prejudice for Failure to Comply with Show Cause Order No. 85" shall be filed under seal and the docket entry for the sealed document shall show only that a sealed document was filed, without any notation indicating its nature. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
June 6, 2018 Filing 2704 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Actavis defendants' motion to quash the notice of deposition of Jessica Dziedzic is denied #2681 . The Actavis defendants are directed to file, by 6/8/2018, a response to plaintiffs' motion to compel the depositions of Christopher Cassarino, Megan Kipness, and William Reggio (the motion was filed on 5/29/2018). Ruling is set for 6/14/2018 at 9:30 AM. This morning's hearing date is vacated. (mk)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2703 NOTICE by AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories Defendants' Second Notice of Deficiency Pursuant to Case Management Order No. 115 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Yeary, Michelle)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2702 REPLY by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories to notice of filing #2669 Defendants' Reply in Support of Their First Corrected Notice of Deficiency Pursuant to Case Management Order No. 115 (Yeary, Michelle)
June 5, 2018 Filing 2701 MEMORANDUM by Anda, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc. in Opposition to motion to compel,,, #2687 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Kelham v. CSX Transportation, Inc., #2 Exhibit B-Anderson v. Procter & Gamble Paper Products Co.)(Geoppinger, Jeffrey)
June 4, 2018 Filing 2700 MAIL RETURNED, for document #2606 sent to John Leiper Bell returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (ew, )
June 4, 2018 Filing 2699 MOTION by Plaintiff Bruce Owens to seal Confidential Declaration, MOTION by Plaintiff Bruce Owens to seal document (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(Koluncich, Nicholas)
June 4, 2018 Filing 2698 STATUS Report Joint Status Report on Developments in Turner Case by AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories (Kim, Mary)
June 1, 2018 Filing 2697 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff, Robert Christopher Williams, Jr. (Shakib, Christopher)
June 1, 2018 Filing 2696 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER 125 (SELECTION OF ACTAVIS CASES FOR WORK-UP GROUP 2), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/1/2018. (mk)
June 1, 2018 Filing 2695 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: It does not appear to the Court that it has a draft order corresponding to the Joint Status Report Regarding Selection of Actavis-Only Cases For Remand (dkt. 2635). Counsel are directed to immediately provide a Word version of a draft order to Judge Kennelly's proposed order e-mail address. (mk)
May 31, 2018 Filing 2694 NOTIFICATION of Party Contact Information (Abrams, Rachel)
May 31, 2018 Filing 2693 AFFIDAVIT of E. Scott Verhine, Esq. regarding motion for miscellaneous relief #2627 (Schumacher, Matthew)
May 31, 2018 Filing 2692 REPLY to Defendants' Opposition to Motions for Reconsideration and Reinstatement by Peter Catanese, III, Douglas Hele, Gail Horky, Sandor Horky, Carlos Iglesias, Kathleen Iglesias, Robert Lewis, Michael Pruitt, Linda Saxon, Paul Saxon, Alexandra Vigue, Ronald Vigue #2666 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Lawrence, Jennifer) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 6/1/2018 (jh, ).
May 31, 2018 Filing 2691 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The 5/31/2018 "mini" case management conference will be broadcasted. Participants may dial in using toll free number (888) 684-8852 and use participant code 7461053 (followed by the # sign). Please note that during the conference you will not be able to participate verbally. (pjg, )
May 30, 2018 Filing 2690 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Emily Bailey, Lloyd Bailey, Carolyn Price, Odis Price, Lori Wisdom, Nicholas Wisdom by Timothy A. Burke (Burke, Timothy)
May 30, 2018 Filing 2689 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The motions for reconsideration of dismissal filed by plaintiffs Santo Lococo #2676 , Robert McCullough #2677 , Marc Modkowitz #2683 , Fred Paige #2684 , and Richard Ross #2685 are set for hearing on 5/31/2018 at 2:00 PM, as ordered pursuant to CMO 119 in MDL 2545 (Case No. 14-cv-1748). Moving counsel must appear in person; no telephone appearances will be permitted. (mk)
May 29, 2018 Filing 2688 NOTICE of Motion by James Griffin O'Brien for presentment of motion to compel,,, #2687 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/6/2018 at 09:30 AM. (O'Brien, James)
May 29, 2018 Filing 2687 MOTION by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee to compel and Opposition to Actavis Defendants' Motion to Quash (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James G. O'Brien, #2 Exhibit A - PSCs February 2, 2018 request for the custodial file of Megan Kipness, #3 Exhibit B - PSCs April 17, 2018 request for the custodial file and deposition of William Reggio, #4 Exhibit C - PSCs April 26, 2018 request for the Christopher Cassarino custodial file and depositions of Mr. Cassarino and Megan Kipness, #5 Exhibit D - May 10, 2018 email from Actavis Defendants counsel, #6 Exhibit E - September 20, 2017 letter from the PSC, #7 Exhibit F - Wendy DeSpain Certificate of Completeness, #8 Exhibit G - December 9, 2017 email from Actavis Defendants counsel, #9 Exhibit H - April 27, 2018 PSC letter detailing unfulfilled discovery requests)(O'Brien, James)
May 29, 2018 Filing 2686 Plaintiffs' Steering Committee's Response in Opposition to the AbbVie Defendants' First Corrected Notice of Deficiency Pursuant to Case Management Order No. 115 by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Smith, Brendan)
May 29, 2018 Filing 2685 MOTION by Plaintiff Richard C. Ross for reconsideration regarding order #2612 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit A_Proposed Order)(Sinnott, Kristen)
May 29, 2018 Filing 2684 MOTION by Plaintiff Fred Paige for reconsideration regarding order #2612 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit A_Proposed Order)(Sinnott, Kristen)
May 29, 2018 Filing 2683 MOTION by Plaintiff Marc R. Moskowitz for reconsideration regarding order #2612 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit A_Proposed Order)(Sinnott, Kristen)
May 29, 2018 Filing 2682 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Daniel Geoppinger for presentment of motion to quash, #2681 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/6/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Geoppinger, Jeffrey)
May 29, 2018 Filing 2681 MOTION by Defendants Anda, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc. to quash Notice of Oral Videotaped Deposition of Jessica Dziedzic (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jeffrey D. Geoppinger)(Geoppinger, Jeffrey)
May 29, 2018 Filing 2680 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Marc R. Moskowitz, Fred Paige, Richard C. Ross by Kristen Nicole Sinnott (Sinnott, Kristen)
May 29, 2018 Filing 2679 LETTER from Austin Amobi dated 5/19/2018. (ags, )
May 29, 2018 Filing 2678 Attorney Appearance Form by Santo LoCoco, II, Robert McCullough, Jr. (Morrison, Walter)
May 29, 2018 Filing 2677 MOTION by Plaintiff Robert McCullough, Jr. From This Court's Order Dismissing Plaintiffs' Case with Prejudice for Failing to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Morrison, Walter)
May 29, 2018 Filing 2676 MOTION by Plaintiff Santo LoCoco, II From This Court's Order Dismissing Plaintiffs' Case with Prejudice for Failing to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Morrison, Walter)
May 29, 2018 Filing 2675 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 124 (Ruling on Besins defendants' motion for summary judgment, dkt. no. 2425), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/29/2018: For the reasons stated in the accompanying order, the Court grants the Besins defendants' motion for summary judgment on all remaining claims by all plaintiffs in the MDL proceeding [dkt. no. 2425]. (mk)
May 29, 2018 Filing 2674 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Paul Ziaja by David Todd Mathews and Amy Gabriel. (Mathews, David) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 5/30/2018 (jh, ).
May 29, 2018 Filing 2673 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ronnie Kennedy by Matthew J Schumacher (Schumacher, Matthew)
May 28, 2018 Filing 2672 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 123 (rulings on certain motions in limine in Rowley v. AbbVie Inc. et al., Case No. 15 C 2760), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/28/2018. (mk)
May 25, 2018 Filing 2670 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 122 (Extension of previous stay of Endo, Auxilium & GSK cases), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/25/2018. (mk)
May 25, 2018 Filing 2669 NOTICE by AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories Defendants' First Corrected Notice of Deficiency Pursuant to Case Management Order No. 115 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Yeary, Michelle)
May 25, 2018 Filing 2668 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Clifford J. Anderson, Shawn Armstrong, David K Bennett, Mark Buchinsky, Jack Cleveland, Charlton R Coker, Jr, Patricia Durning, John Gallagher, Robert G. Greiner, James High, Howard W Hughes, Walter McGill, Jonathan Piehl, Eugene Pilecki, Joseph Smagala, Donald Sumner, Gary Uptain by Fred S. Longer (Longer, Fred)
May 25, 2018 Filing 2667 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Clifford J. Anderson, Shawn Armstrong, David K Bennett, Mark Buchinsky, Jack Cleveland, Charlton R Coker, Jr, Patricia Durning, John Gallagher, Robert G. Greiner, James High, Howard W Hughes, Walter McGill, Jonathan Piehl, Eugene Pilecki, Joseph Smagala, Donald Sumner, Gary Uptain by Michael M. Weinkowitz (Weinkowitz, Michael)
May 24, 2018 Filing 2666 MEMORANDUM by AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc. in Opposition to motion for reconsideration #2647 , motion for miscellaneous relief #2629 , motion for reconsideration #2613 , motion for reconsideration #2649 , motion for reconsideration #2619 , motion for reconsideration #2617 , motion for reconsideration #2648 , motion for reconsideration #2620 , motion for reconsideration #2646 , motion for reconsideration #2634 , motion for reconsideration #2618 , motion to reopen case #2655 , motion for reconsideration #2642 , motion to alter judgment,, motion to amend/correct, #2664 , motion for reconsideration #2616 , motion for miscellaneous relief #2627 , motion for reconsideration #2615 , motion for miscellaneous relief #2622 , motion for reconsideration #2614 , motion for miscellaneous relief #2624 , motion for miscellaneous relief #2623 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Donahue, Alicia)
May 24, 2018 Filing 2665 MOTION by Plaintiff Larry Starnes to reopen case (Rockforte, Nicholas)
May 23, 2018 Filing 2671 MAIL RETURNED, for document #2584 sent to Ricky Evans returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (smm)
May 23, 2018 Filing 2664 MOTION by Plaintiffs Dennise Ziaja, Paul Ziaja to alter judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e), or Alternatively, Rule 60(b), MOTION by Plaintiffs Dennise Ziaja, Paul Ziaja to amend/correct order #2612 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Mathews, David)
May 23, 2018 Filing 2662 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court's order of 5/17/2018 (dkt. no. 2632) is vacated to the extent it set the case of Bracetti-Ayala v. AbbVie Inc., individual case no. 15-cv-7791, for hearing on 5/31/2018 with respect to reconsideration of dismissal. Mr. Bracetti-Ayala's case has not been dismissed, so reconsideration of dismissal is unnecessary. Mr. Bracetti-Ayala's counsel need not appear on 5/31/2018. (mk)
May 22, 2018 Filing 2663 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 5/22/2018. Motion to strike #2603 is terminated based on ruling. Briefing schedule for Harris v. AbbVie (14 C 7963) and Natale v. AbbVie (16 C 5706) as follows: Plaintiffs' Daubert motions due by 6/25/2018; responses due by 7/12/2018; replies due by 7/25/2018. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
May 22, 2018 Filing 2661 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 87A (substitution of cases for trial groups 1, 2, and 3 and mixed-use cases voluntarily dismissed by plaintiffs after selection), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/22/2018. (mk)
May 22, 2018 Filing 2660 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER # 121 (ORDER CONCERNING DEPOSITIONS OF CASE-SPECIFIC WITNESSES IN ABBVIE CASES), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/22/2018. (mk)
May 22, 2018 Filing 2659 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Dorothy Sisneros, Johnny Sisneros to notice of filing #2583 (Echsner, Stephen)
May 22, 2018 Filing 2658 NOTICE by Stephen C. Ball of Change of Address (Ball, Stephen)
May 22, 2018 Filing 2657 MOTION by Plaintiff Larry Starnes to reopen case (Rockforte, Nicholas)
May 22, 2018 Filing 2656 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The motions of plaintiffs Donald Linn (Case No. 14-4527), Joann Parrish (Case No. 16-cv-2206), Ruth Plenty-Walls (Case No. 16-2987), and George and Charlene Stroemer (Case No. 16-2993) for reconsideration of the dismissal of their cases are set for hearing on 5/31/2018 at 2:00 PM, pursuant to CMO 119 in MDL 2545. Moving counsel must appear in person; no telephone appearances will be permitted. The parties are to consult CMO 119 for more details. (mk) (Kennelly, Matthew)
May 21, 2018 Filing 2655 MOTION by Plaintiff Donald Linn to reopen case (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Singleton, W. James)
May 21, 2018 Filing 2654 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14494096. (Singleton, W. James)
May 21, 2018 Filing 2653 STATUS Report Joint Status Report Regarding Stipulations of Dismissal by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Smith, Brendan)
May 21, 2018 Filing 2652 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc. by Thomas Joseph Dammrich, II ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (Dammrich, Thomas)
May 21, 2018 Filing 2651 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 120 (Preliminary Order on motions to strike expert reports in Harris and Natale cases), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/21/2018. The parties should note that the motions to strike remain set for hearing and final ruling on 5/22/2018 at 9:30 AM. (mk)
May 21, 2018 Filing 2650 STATUS Report Interim Status Report Regarding CMO 26 Dismissal List by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Brendan)
May 21, 2018 Filing 2649 MOTION by Plaintiff Ruth Plenty-Walls for reconsideration regarding order #2612 Dismissal of cases (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tankard, George)
May 21, 2018 Filing 2648 MOTION by Plaintiffs Deborah Schwartz, Henry Schwartz for reconsideration regarding order #2612 Dismissal of cases (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tankard, George)
May 21, 2018 Filing 2647 MOTION by Plaintiffs Charlene Stroemer, George Stroemer, III for reconsideration regarding order #2612 Dismissal of cases (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tankard, George)
May 21, 2018 Filing 2646 MOTION by Plaintiff Joann Parrish for reconsideration regarding order #2612 Dismissal of cases (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tankard, George)
May 20, 2018 Filing 2645 THIRD AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 9 (Plaintiff Fact Sheets and Records Authorizations), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/20/2018. (mk)
May 20, 2018 Filing 2644 MOTION by Plaintiff Jose A Bracetti for order to show cause CMO 110, CMO 119 (Irizarry-Baez, Veronica)
May 20, 2018 Filing 2643 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Pursuant to CMO 119, 7he motion of plaintiffs James and Gloria Million for reconsideration #2642 (individual case number 1:17-cv-1188) is set for hearing on 5/31/2018 at 2:00 PM. Moving counsel must appear in person; no telephone appearances will be permitted. The parties are to consult CMO 119 for more details. (mk)
May 18, 2018 Filing 2642 MOTION by Plaintiffs Gloria Million, James Million for reconsideration regarding order #2612 Dismissing Plaintiffs' case (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jaymeski, Pullins-Gorham)
May 18, 2018 Filing 2641 MOTION by Plaintiffs EMILY BAILEY, LLOYD BAILEY, Carolyn Price, Odis Price, Lori Wisdom, Nicholas Wisdom for order granting the Joint Motion to Reinstate Plaintiffs' Complaints (Leh, Michael)
May 18, 2018 Filing 2640 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: A "mini" case management conference is set for 5/31/2018 at 2:00 PM, to coincide with the hearings on motions seeking reconsideration of dismissals with prejudice under CMO 118. The two additional topics that the Court wishes to discuss at the conference (subject to any additions the Court may make later) are (1) the defendants' "first notice of deficiency pursuant to CMO 115" (dkt. no. 2630), and (2) recently filed motions by a number of plaintiffs seeking voluntary dismissal of cases without prejudice. In addition, by no later than 5/24/2018, defendants are to file a memorandum, not to exceed 15 pages total, setting forth whether they oppose any or all of the motions seeking reconsideration of dismissals with prejudice under CMO 118 and the factual and legal basis for their opposition. (mk)
May 18, 2018 Filing 2639 REPLY by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee to motion to strike, #2603 (Smith, Brendan)
May 18, 2018 Filing 2638 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on May 2, 2018 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn Cox, Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/8/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2018. (Cox, Carolyn)
May 18, 2018 Filing 2637 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on April 25, 2018 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn Cox, Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/8/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2018. (Cox, Carolyn)
May 18, 2018 Filing 2636 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff Robert C. Williams, Jr. (individual case no. 17-cv-4099), has filed under the main MDL file number a motion for reconsideration of the dismissal of his case. Pursuant to CMO 119, the motion is set for hearing in court on 5/31/2018 at 2:00 PM. Moving counsel must appear in person; no telephone appearances will be permitted. The parties are to consult CMO 119 for more details. (mk)
May 17, 2018 Filing 2635 STATUS Report (Joint) Regarding Selection of Actavis Only Cases for Remand Pursuant to CMO No. 102 by Anda, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed CMO)(Geoppinger, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2018 Filing 2634 MOTION by Plaintiff Robert Christopher Williams, Jr for reconsideration of Order Dismissing Plaintiff's Case (Shakib, Christopher)
May 17, 2018 Filing 2633 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The parties have filed a list of cases to be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to stipulation (dkt. 2610) and a list of cases with particular defendants to be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to stipulation (dkt. 2609). The lists do not explain the reasons for the dismissals, and although the Court has an idea what the reasons likely are, there should be a written explanation. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 5/23/2018 providing an explanation for these dismissals. (mk)
May 17, 2018 Filing 2632 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Pursuant to CMO 119, all motions for reconsideration of dismissal that have been filed under the main MDL file number (No. 14-1748) or under individual case numbers are set for hearing in court on 5/31/2018 at 2:00 PM. Moving counsel must appear in person; no telephone appearances will be permitted. The parties are to consult CMO 119 for more details. This includes the following plaintiffs who filed their motions under the main MDL file number (with the corresponding individual case number): 15-7412, Robert Lewis; 15-7589 (Douglas Hele); 15-7445 (Sandor Horky); 15-7494 (Peter Catanese); 15-6327 (Carl Iglesias); 15-7569 (Michael Pruitt); 15-7423 (Paul Saxon); 15-10379 (Ronald Vigue); 16-7172 (Joseph Dyane); 16-8319 (Richard Jepson); 17-7522 (Sushma Narula); 15-7791 (Jose Bracetti-Ayala); 15-3512 (Ronnie Kennedy); 16-4407 (Bruce Owens). This also includes the following plaintiffs who filed their motions only under their individual case number: 15-6330 (Martin Ramos); 16-1834 (Arthur Lapenotiere); 16-2369 (Joseph McCabe); 16-7230 (Thaddeus Thompson); 17-727 (Charles Deming); 16-6440 (John Rivera). It will also include any such motions filed on 5/17/2018 or thereafter, whether under the main MDL case number or the individual docket number. The plaintiffs' steering committee is directed to immediately confirm with the plaintiffs' attorneys in these cases their awareness of CMO 118 and this order. (mk)
May 16, 2018 Filing 2630 NOTICE by AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories Defendants' First Notice of Deficiency Pursuant to Case Management Order No. 115 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Yeary, Michelle)
May 16, 2018 Filing 2629 MOTION by Plaintiff Bruce OwensRelief from Order of Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Koluncich, Nicholas)
May 15, 2018 Filing 2628 RESPONSE by AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratoriesin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee to strike Plaintiffs Harris and Natale's Joint Motion to Strike Untimely Expert Reports by Dr. George Newman and Dr. William White #2603 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Donahue, Alicia)
May 14, 2018 Filing 2631 MAIL RETURNED, for document #2584 sent to John Leiper Bell returned as undeliverable, return to sender. Re-mailed to 91 Rolling Hills Road. (las, )
May 14, 2018 Filing 2627 MOTION by Plaintiff Ronnie Kennedy Relief from Case Management Order No.118 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Verhine, Everette)
May 14, 2018 Filing 2626 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 119 (Motions seeking reconsideration of dismissal under CMO 118), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/14/2018: As stated in the accompanying order, an in-court hearing on all filed and hereafter filed motions seeking reconsideration of dismissals under CMO 118 is set for 5/31/2018 at 2:00 PM. (mk)
May 12, 2018 Filing 2625 MOTION by Plaintiff Jose A Bracetti for order CMO 110, MOTION by Plaintiff Jose A Bracetti for discovery PFF (Irizarry-Vaez, Veronica)
May 11, 2018 Filing 2624 MOTION by Plaintiff Sushma Narula Relief from Case Management Order No. 118 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Plymale, Douglas)
May 11, 2018 Filing 2623 MOTION by Plaintiffs Richard C. Jepson, Sandra S. Jepson Relief from Case Management Order No. 118 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Plymale, Douglas)
May 11, 2018 Filing 2622 MOTION by Plaintiff Joseph C. Diani, SrRelief From Case Management Order No. 118 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Plymale, Douglas)
May 11, 2018 Filing 2621 RESPONSE by Plaintiff James Borough to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robins, Bill)
May 11, 2018 Filing 2620 MOTION by Plaintiff Ronald Vigue for reconsideration regarding order #2612 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum In Support, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Lawrence, Jennifer)
May 11, 2018 Filing 2619 MOTION by Plaintiff Paul Saxon for reconsideration regarding order #2612 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum In Support, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Lawrence, Jennifer)
May 11, 2018 Filing 2618 MOTION by Plaintiff Michael Pruitt for reconsideration regarding order #2612 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum In Support, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Lawrence, Jennifer)
May 11, 2018 Filing 2617 MOTION by Plaintiff Carlos Iglesias for reconsideration regarding order #2612 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum In Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Lawrence, Jennifer)
May 11, 2018 Filing 2616 MOTION by Plaintiff Peter Catanese, III for reconsideration regarding order #2612 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum In Support, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Lawrence, Jennifer)
May 11, 2018 Filing 2615 MOTION by Plaintiff Sandor Horky for reconsideration regarding order #2612 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum In Support, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Lawrence, Jennifer)
May 11, 2018 Filing 2614 MOTION by Plaintiff Douglas Hele for reconsideration regarding order #2612 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum In Support, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Lawrence, Jennifer)
May 11, 2018 Filing 2613 MOTION by Plaintiff Robert Lewis for reconsideration regarding order #2612 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum In Support, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Lawrence, Jennifer)
May 11, 2018 Filing 2612 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 118 (Dismissal of cases for noncompliance with CMO 85, signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/11/2018. (mk)
May 11, 2018 Filing 2611 RESPONSE to notice of filing #2583 Regarding Court's Order to Show Cause per CMO 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Perkins, Brian)
May 11, 2018 Filing 2610 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice (Omnibus) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Miracle, Trent)
May 11, 2018 Filing 2609 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Omnibus) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Miracle, Trent)
May 9, 2018 Filing 2608 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The law firm of Myers & Flowers filed, without obtaining leave of court, an omnibus response [dkt. no. 2563] to the Court's recent order to show cause regarding plaintiff's profile forms, on behalf of over 130 plaintiffs in six different categories. The manner in which this was filed and in which the attachments (exhibits A-F) are organized makes it virtually impossible for the Court to sort out and catalog the response(s). Myers & Flowers is directed to submit to the Court's proposed order e-mail address, by no later than 12:00 pm on 5/10/2018, Excel versions of Exhibits A through F (i.e. 6 separate Excel spreadsheets), with each case on a separate line, identifying each case by its case number in one cell and the plaintiff's name (last name first, first name last) in the adjacent cell. (mk)
May 9, 2018 Filing 2607 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories by Andrew L. Goldman (Goldman, Andrew)
May 9, 2018 Filing 2606 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion to strike expert reports #2603 is taken under advisement. The hearing date of 5/15/2018 is vacated and reset to 5/22/2018 at 9:30 AM. Defendants are directed to file a response to the motion by 5/15/2018. Plaintiffs are directed to file a reply by 5/18/2018. The Court reserves the right to vacate the hearing date if it deems it unnecessary. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
May 8, 2018 Filing 2605 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Exhibit B, C, D, and E (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E)(Miracle, Trent)
May 8, 2018 Filing 2604 NOTICE of Motion by Brendan A Smith for presentment of motion to strike, #2603 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/15/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Smith, Brendan)
May 8, 2018 Filing 2603 MOTION by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee to strike Plaintiffs Harris and Natale's Joint Motion to Strike Untimely Expert Reports by Dr. George Newman and Dr. William White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Brendan)
May 8, 2018 Filing 2602 SEALED EXHIBIT Motion to Withdraw regarding MOTION by Attorney Brian Perkins to withdraw as attorney. #2600 (Flowers, Peter)
May 8, 2018 Filing 2601 NOTICE of Motion by Peter J. Flowers for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney before Judge Kennelly on June 28, 2018 at 1:30 pm (Flowers, Peter) Text Modified on 5/9/2018 (las, ).
May 8, 2018 Filing 2600 MOTION by Attorney Brian Perkins to withdraw as attorney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notification of Party Contact)(Flowers, Peter)
May 8, 2018 Filing 2599 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 117 (Trial time allocation for Rowley v. AbbVie bellwether trial), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/8/2018. (mk)
May 8, 2018 Filing 2598 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion to withdraw as attorney #2591 is granted. Attorney David Markevitch will be terminated terminated from this case as well as all cases listed in Exhibit A of the motion. The 5/10/2018 hearing for this motion is vacated. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
May 7, 2018 Filing 2597 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AbbVie, Inc. by Eva Canaan (Canaan, Eva)
May 7, 2018 Filing 2596 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AbbVie, Inc. by Tamar P Halpern (Halpern, Tamar)
May 7, 2018 Filing 2595 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AbbVie, Inc. by Kimberly S. Penner (Penner, Kimberly)
May 7, 2018 Filing 2594 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AbbVie Inc. by Thomas J Sheehan (Sheehan, Thomas)
May 5, 2018 Filing 2593 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 116 (rulings on motions in limine in Myers v. AbbVie Inc. et al., Case No. 15 C 1085), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on May 5, 2018. (mk)
May 4, 2018 Filing 2592 NOTICE of Motion by David Markevitch for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #2591 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/10/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Markevitch, David)
May 4, 2018 Filing 2591 MOTION by Attorney David Markevitch to withdraw as attorney for Lum Littlepage Sr. No party information provided (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Notice of Filing)(Markevitch, David)
May 4, 2018 Filing 2590 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories by Margaret Catherine O'Connor (O'Connor, Margaret)
May 3, 2018 Filing 2589 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Diamond, David)
May 3, 2018 Filing 2588 REPLY by Defendants Besins Healthcare Inc., Besins Healthcare S.A. to motion for summary judgment #2425 (Yeary, Michelle)
May 3, 2018 Filing 2586 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Danny Fred Cloud, Patricia D. Cloud, Brian Gary Coston, Bettyjane Flores, Stanley B. Latty, Donna B. Latty, Jay S. McCabe, Clyde Newbury, Sheryl Newbury, Charles Michael Page, Cheryl Ann Robinson, Loyd C. Sanders, Frank Sligh, James Edward Williams to notice of filing #2583 Notice by Defendants Regarding the Court's Order to Show Cause Pursuant to Case Management Order No. 85 (Lowry, Stephen)
May 2, 2018 Filing 2587 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #2584 , #2585 sent to Attorney Stephanie Lynn Gardner returned as: Unknown Address Error. The Clerk telephoned Stephanie Lynn Gardner, no contact made. Mailed to attorney Stephanie Lynn Gardner a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerks Office at Docketing_ILND@ilnd.uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
May 2, 2018 Filing 2585 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs James L. Beason, Mary L. Beason to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Plymale, Douglas)
May 2, 2018 Filing 2584 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Case management conference held on 4/25/2018. All unresolved items on the joint agenda are discussed. (1) Further discussions held regarding responses to the order to show cause for CMO 85 filed on the main MDL and member cases. Defendants are to file a status report by 5/1/2018 listing the cases that are subject to the order to show cause as well as any responses or other documents filed by the plaintiffs in those cases after entry of the order to show cause, as well as other relevant information. (2) Parties are to confer and submit an amended proposed order regarding AbbVie's motion regarding amending CMO 87. (3) Henceforth, no cases in group 1 as established in CMO 87 may be dismissed without prior leave of the Court. (4) Parties are to confer further regarding deposition priority for non-party healthcare provider witnesses and submit a proposed agreement on a protocol. (5) A conference call is set for 5/3/2018 at 8:00 a.m. to discuss the remaining two depositions for the wave 1 cases. Parties are to advise Judge Kennelly's courtroom deputy whether this conference call will be needed by 4/30/2018. (6) An updated Actavis dismissal list is to be submitted by 5/17/2018. (7) An updated list regarding Myers and Flowers' motions to withdraw #2213 and #2264 is to be provided to Judge Kennelly's courtroom deputy. (8) The 5/31/2018 case management conference is vacated. The next case management conference previously set for 6/28/2018 at 1:30 p.m. shall remain. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
May 1, 2018 Filing 2583 NOTICE by AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories Regarding the Court's Order to Show Cause Pursuant to Case Management Order No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kim, Mary)
April 29, 2018 Filing 2582 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mccarley, Matthew)
April 28, 2018 Filing 2581 MOTION by Plaintiff Jose A Bracetti for order to show cause to CMO 110 (Irizarry-Vaez, Veronica)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2580 RESPONSE by Plaintiff James Edward Williams to order,, #2434 CMO 110 (McNeeley, Madeline)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2579 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Frank Sligh to order,, #2434 CMO 110 (McNeeley, Madeline)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2578 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Loyd C. Sanders to order,, #2434 CMO 110 (McNeeley, Madeline)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2577 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Stanley Latty to order,, #2434 CMO 110 (McNeeley, Madeline)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2576 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Alston Sterling to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bauman, David)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2575 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Ralph Rankin to order,, #2434 (Pang, Natalie)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2574 RESPONSE by Plaintiff William Brenner to order,, #2434 (Pang, Natalie)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2573 RESPONSE by Plaintiff John Betts to order,, #2434 (Pang, Natalie)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2572 RESPONSE by Plaintiff James Borough to order,, #2434 (Robins, Bill)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2571 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Matthew Weyuker to order,, #2434 (Robins, Bill)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2570 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Ricky Evans to order,, #2434 (Robins, Bill)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2569 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Russell Nelson to order,, #2434 (Robins, Bill)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2568 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Robert Klinedinst to order,, #2434 (Robins, Bill)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2567 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Terrell Prinkley to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robins, Bill)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2566 RESPONSE by Plaintiff William Simpson to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robins, Bill)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2565 RESPONSE by Plaintiff James Herman to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robins, Bill)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2564 RESPONSE by Plaintiff John Casper to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robins, Bill)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2563 RESPONSE to order,, #2434 CMO 110 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Perkins, Brian)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2562 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Paul Alexander to order,, #2434 CMO No. 110 (Stanoch, David)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2561 NOTICE of Motion by Brian John Perkins for presentment of (Perkins, Brian)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2560 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Eric Ragis to order,, #2434 CMO No. 110 (Stanoch, David)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2559 SEALED EXHIBIT Affidavit regarding MOTION by Attorney Brian Perkins to withdraw as attorney. #2545 (Perkins, Brian)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2558 RESPONSE by Plaintiff David Lyon to order,, #2434 CMO No. 110 (Stanoch, David)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2557 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs James Vander Hoek, Patricia Vander Hoek to order,, #2434 CMO No. 110 (Stanoch, David)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2556 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Jeffrey Schuur to order,, #2434 CMO No. 110 (Stanoch, David)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2555 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Stella Lewis to order,, #2434 CMO 110 - Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(London, Michael)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2554 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Anthony Shelton to order,, #2434 CMO No. 110 (Stanoch, David)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2553 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Karen Logan to order,, #2434 CMO 110 - Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(London, Michael)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2552 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Stephen Motylinski to order,, #2434 CMO No. 110 (Stanoch, David)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2551 RESPONSE by Plaintiff William J Fullerton to order,, #2434 CMO No. 110 (Stanoch, David)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2550 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Rodney Howard to order,, #2434 CMO No. 110 (Stanoch, David)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2549 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Rebecca Fowler, Steven Fowler to order,, #2434 CMO No. 110 (Stanoch, David)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2548 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Marion Wildeboer to order,, #2434 CMO No. 110 (Stanoch, David)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2547 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Phillip Keister to order,, #2434 CMO No. 110 (Stanoch, David)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2546 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Laura Smith, Michael Smith to order,, #2434 (Stanoch, David)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2545 MOTION by Attorney Brian Perkins to withdraw as attorney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notification of Party Contact)(Perkins, Brian)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2544 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Mary Jane Benninger, Richard A Benninger to order,, #2434 (Stanoch, David)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2543 RESPONSE by Plaintiff J. Robin Powell to order,, #2434 (Seeger, Christopher) Modified on 4/27/2018 (pjg, ).
April 27, 2018 Filing 2542 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Matthew Whisenhunt to order,, #2434 (Bergin, Christopher)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2541 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Gus N. Theros to order,, #2434 (Bergin, Christopher)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2540 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Charles McDaniel to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bauman, David)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2539 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Steven P. Kovach to order,, #2434 (Bergin, Christopher)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2538 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Ronald Yeager to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bauman, David)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2537 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Tommy Joyner to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bauman, David)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2536 RESPONSE by Plaintiff David Hadaway to order,, #2434 (Bergin, Christopher)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2535 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Gilbert Field to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bauman, David)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2534 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Peter Dennis to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bauman, David)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2533 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Luther Ayres to order,, #2434 (Bergin, Christopher)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2532 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Danny McCarty to order,, #2434 (Bergin, Christopher)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2531 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Bobby Giles to order,, #2434 (Bergin, Christopher)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2530 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Clinton Watson to order,, #2434 (Bergin, Christopher)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2529 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Aaron Asperheim, Timothy Bergmayr, David A. Breeden, Sr., Joseph N Edgeworth, Everett T Head, Robert Daniel Joplin, Jr., Michael Pressley, Barbara Wells to notice of filing #2428 Case Management Order No. 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Becker, Timothy)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2528 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Marc Breau Plaintiff's Response to Case Management Order No. 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Flaherty, Yvonne)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2527 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Keith D. Unterseher to order,, #2434 (Bergin, Christopher)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2526 DESIGNATION of Karl Egnar Pearson as Attorney for Plaintiffs Stuart Wein, Susan Wein (Pearson, Karl) Modified on 4/30/2018 (las, ).
April 27, 2018 Filing 2525 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Stuart Wein, Susan Wein by Karl Egnar Pearson (Pearson, Karl)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2524 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Stuart Wein, Susan Wein to order #2295 , order,, #2434 to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pearson, Karl)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2523 RESPONSE Plaintiff's Response To Case Management Order No. 110 - Order To Show Cause Pursuant To CMO No. 85 (McGoldrick, Marilyn)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2522 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Carlos Feliciano to order,, #2434 (Bergin, Christopher)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2521 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Gary Gall to order,, #2434 (Bergin, Christopher)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2520 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Kraft, Kristine)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2519 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 115 (Cut-off Date for Supplemental Plaintiff Profile Form With Respect to AbbVie Defendants), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/27/2018: The joint motion for entry of a case management order revising Case Management Order No. 85, regarding Supplemental Plaintiff Profile Forms, is granted. The Court notes that it modified the parties' proposed order by adding one day to the meet-and-confer period and one day to the period for responding to the Court's anticipated order to show cause. All plaintiffs' counsel are advised that this is a highly important order that imposes a cutoff date for submission of Supplemental Plaintiff Profile Forms under Case Management Order No. 85. (mk)
April 27, 2018 Filing 2518 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause to order,, #2434 (LoPalo, Christopher)
April 27, 2018 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 115 (Cut-off Date for Supplemental Plaintiff Profile Form With Respect to AbbVie Defendants), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/27/2018: The joint motion for entry of a case management order revising Case Management Order No. 85, regarding Supplemental Plaintiff Profile Forms, is granted. The Court notes that it modified the parties' proposed order by adding one day to the meet-and-confer period and one day to the period for responding to the Court's anticipated order to show cause. All plaintiffs' counsel are advised that this is a highly important order that imposes a cutoff date for submission of Supplemental Plaintiff Profile Forms under Case Management Order No. 85. (mk)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2517 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Judson C. Kidd, Sr. to order,, #2434 Case Management Order No. 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Echsner, Stephen)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2516 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Lionel M Riley to order,, #2434 Case Management Order No. 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Echsner, Stephen)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2515 SUGGESTION of Death as to Lionel M. Riley AMENDED (Echsner, Stephen)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2514 SUGGESTION of Death as to Lionel M. Riley (Echsner, Stephen)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2513 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Cheryl Pavel, Timothy L. Pavel to order,, #2434 Case Management Order No. 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Echsner, Stephen)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2512 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Anthony S. Mercer to order,, #2434 Case Management Order No. 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Echsner, Stephen)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2511 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Robert M. Mendez to order,, #2434 Case Management Order No. 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Echsner, Stephen)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2510 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Chadwick D. Jones to order,, #2434 Case Management Order No. 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Echsner, Stephen)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2509 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Dorothy Sisneros, Johnny Sisneros to order,, #2434 Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Echsner, Stephen)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2508 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Richard Strickland to order,, #2434 (Root, Richard)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2507 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Maxwell Shumake to order,, #2434 (Root, Richard)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2506 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Gregory Wilde to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Centola, Lawrence)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2505 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Richard Denny to order,, #2434 to Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Levensten, Scott)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2504 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Robert B Walter to Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, James)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2503 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Joe E Vaughan to Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, James)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2502 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Aron Lewington to order,, #2434 Response to Case Management Order No. 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Winthrop, Griffith)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2501 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Billy R Shinn to Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, James)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2500 Joint Motion to Enter Case Management Order by AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Yeary, Michelle)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2499 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Larry Maresh to Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, James)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2498 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Jonathan Wilkins to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Seeger, Christopher)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2497 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Rhondell Saintsing to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Seeger, Christopher)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2496 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Reynaldo Rodriguez to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Seeger, Christopher)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2495 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Luis Martinez to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Seeger, Christopher)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2494 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Herman Tydell Hendrix to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Seeger, Christopher)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2493 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Damon Aaron to order #2295 , order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Bruera, Sofia)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2492 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Robert Phillips to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Root, Richard)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2491 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Wayne Smith to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Root, Richard)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2490 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Karon Syracuse to Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, James)
April 26, 2018 Filing 2489 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Karen Lonon to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gallant, Michael)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2488 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Haven Whitear to order,, #2434 TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 110 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CMO NO. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Levensten, Scott)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2487 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Brenda Adams to Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2486 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Michael Argondizzo to Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2485 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Charles E. Dews to Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2484 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Robert A. Francis to Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2483 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Howard Jordan to Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2482 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Daniel A. Hughes To CMO 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO 85 (Gallucci, Daniel)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2481 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Carl W. Littlejohn to Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2480 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Larry S Madson to Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2479 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Kenneth Patterson to Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2478 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Juan B Perez to Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2477 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Christopher R Ray to Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2476 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Michael P Smith to Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2475 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Ronald Massey, James Weimers to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Ex. A)(Hilton, Todd)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2474 RESPONSE by Plaintiff David Aken to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kathryn, Snapka)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2473 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Daniel Louis Tellez to Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2472 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Andrew Villademoros to Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2471 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Martie Williams to Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2470 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Robert Wilson to Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 2469 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Albert T. Yarrington to Case Management Order No 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, James)
April 24, 2018 Filing 2468 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Exhibit 14 (Smith, Brendan)
April 24, 2018 Filing 2467 RESPONSE by Plaintiff David Sullivan to order,, #2434 to Case Management Order No. 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proof of Service of PPF, #2 Exhibit B: Email from Counsel)(Fitzgerald, Kevin)
April 24, 2018 Filing 2466 NOTICE by Rachel Beth Abrams of Change of Address (Abrams, Rachel)
April 24, 2018 Filing 2465 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion by plaintiff's counsel in Case No. 15 C 11846 to withdraw is hereby withdrawn. (mk)
April 23, 2018 Filing 2464 STATUS Report (Joint) for the April 25, 2018 Case Management Conference by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Smith, Brendan)
April 23, 2018 Filing 2463 Joint Agenda for the April 25, 2018 Case Management Conference by Plaintiff's Steering Committee (Smith, Brendan)
April 20, 2018 Filing 2462 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 13)(Miracle, Trent)
April 20, 2018 Filing 2461 Plaintiffs' Steering Commitee's Response to Besins Healthcare, S.A. and Besins Healthcare Inc.'s Statement of Facts STATEMENT by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 11)(Smith, Brendan)
April 20, 2018 Filing 2460 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs' Steering Committeein Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Besins Healthcare Inc., Besins Healthcare S.A. for summary judgment #2425 (Smith, Brendan)
April 20, 2018 Filing 2459 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Terry William Ingland to order,, #2434 To Case Management Order No. 110-Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Crump, Martin)
April 20, 2018 Filing 2458 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Esstil Lee Westrick to order,, #2434 To Case Management Order No. 110 - Order to Show Cause Pursuant to CMO No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Crump, Martin)
April 19, 2018 Filing 2457 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER 114 (Trials of AbbVie cases under CMOs 75 & 87), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/19/2018. (mk)
April 19, 2018 Filing 2455 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: It appears that some responses to the Court's order to show cause regarding the submission of plaintiff profile forms are being filed under the individual case number and that some are being filed under the main MDL case number. The parties are requested to compile, in spreadsheet form, a list of the cases that are subject to the order to show cause, including columns identifying whether a response has been filed by the plaintiff, the date of filing, and the docket number under which the filing has been made, as well as any other relevant information (such as, for example, whether a notice of dismissal or stipulation for dismissal has been filed in the particular case). This should be included as an attachment to the joint status report for the upcoming case management conference. (mk)
April 18, 2018 Filing 2456 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #2452 , #2451 , #2453 , #2454 sent to Attorney John M. Parisi returned as: Unknown Address Error. Mailed to attorney John M. Parisi a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerks Office at Docketing_ILND@ilnd.uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
April 18, 2018 Filing 2454 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Leo Cree Ziminsky to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sawin, John)
April 18, 2018 Filing 2453 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause to order #2295 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service of PPF for Plaintiff Elmer Harmon)(Bates, Robert)
April 18, 2018 Filing 2452 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause to order #2295 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service of PPF for Plaintiff Elmer Harmon)(Bates, Robert)
April 18, 2018 Filing 2451 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause to status report, #2296 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service of PPF for Plaintiff Danny Chandler)(Bates, Robert)
April 17, 2018 Filing 2450 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Derek Lawfield to CMO 110 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lumaghi, Laura)
April 17, 2018 Filing 2449 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 113 (APPOINTING NEGOTIATING PLAINTIFF COUNSEL LILLY DEFENDANTS), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/17/2018. (mk)
April 17, 2018 Filing 2448 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Dan Castro to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Jorde, Brian)
April 17, 2018 Filing 2447 MOTION by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering CommitteeMotion to Appoint Negotiating Plaintiff Counsel as to Lilly defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Brendan)
April 16, 2018 Filing 2446 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Ruby McConnell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(West, Bradley)
April 16, 2018 Filing 2445 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Actavis defendants' motion for an order to exceed page limits, filed in Case Nos. 15-cv-426 and 15-cv-4292, is granted in part. The Actavis defendants may file summary judgment briefs that may not exceed 50 pages in the aggregate, divided however defendants wish but with no single brief exceeding 20 pages, and a single combined Daubert motion with a brief that may not exceed 45 pages. Plaintiffs' opposing memoranda are to follow these same requirements. Defendants' reply memoranda on the summary judgment and Daubert motions may not exceed 40 pages in the aggregate, divided however defendants wish but with no single brief exceeding 15 pages. (mk)
April 16, 2018 Filing 2444 RESPONSE by Plaintiff George F Landry (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(West, Bradley)
April 13, 2018 Filing 2442 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice)(Pantazis, Dennis)
April 13, 2018 Filing 2441 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause to order,, #2434 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification in Support of Order to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service)(Pantazis, Dennis)
April 12, 2018 Filing 2443 MAIL RETURNED, for document #2421 sent to John Leiper Bell returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form (las, )
April 11, 2018 Filing 2440 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice for Warren Wolfe (Pantazis, Dennis)
April 11, 2018 Filing 2439 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Deanna Lasky, James L Lasky (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lundy, Matthew)
April 10, 2018 Filing 2438 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER 112 (SELECTION OF ACTAVIS CASES FOR WORK-UP GROUP 1), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/10/2018. (mk)
April 10, 2018 Filing 2437 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Lamont Godfrey, Paula Godfrey to order,, #2434 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 110 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CMO NO. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McSweeney, Rhett)
April 10, 2018 Filing 2436 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Scott Farrell, Stephanie Farrell to order,, #2434 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CMO NO. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(McSweeney, Rhett)
April 9, 2018 Filing 2435 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 111 (Extension of previous stay of Endo, Auxilium & GSK cases), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/9/2018. (mk)
April 6, 2018 Filing 2434 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 110 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PURSUANT TO CMO NO. 85, signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/6/2018: As stated in the accompanying order, it is hereby ordered that Plaintiffs identified on Exhibits A and B below shall have twenty-one (21) days to respond to show good cause as to why the Court should not dismiss the Plaintiff's case with prejudice, or impose another appropriate sanction. The Plaintiff's Steering Committee is directed to make best efforts to ensure that this order is brought to the attention of counsel in the identified cases. (mk)
April 6, 2018 Filing 2433 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Keith Solow for presentment of extension of time #2432 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/12/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Solow, Andrew)
April 6, 2018 Filing 2432 MOTION by Defendants Auxilium Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC for extension of time / Joint Motion To Extend Stay of Endo, Auxilium, & GSK Cases (Solow, Andrew)
April 5, 2018 Filing 2431 STATUS Report (Joint) Regarding Selection of Actavis Only Cases for Remand Pursuant to CMO No. 102 by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Brendan)
April 5, 2018 Filing 2430 SUGGESTION of Death as to Marc Breau (Flaherty, Yvonne)
April 5, 2018 Filing 2429 STIPULATION of Dismissal William J. Ham (Miracle, Trent)
April 4, 2018 Filing 2428 NOTICE by AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories First Amended Notice for Entry of an Order to Show Cause Pursuant to Case Management Order No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Mary)
April 3, 2018 Filing 2427 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Cheryl Hoholek Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants', ABBVIE Inc. and Abbott Laboratories, Inc., First Notice for Entry of an Order to Show Cause Pursuant to Case Management Order No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Alvarado, Brock)
April 3, 2018 Filing 2426 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on March 29, 2018 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn Cox, Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/24/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2018. (Cox, Carolyn)
April 3, 2018 Filing 2425 MOTION by Defendants Besins Healthcare Inc., Besins Healthcare S.A. for summary judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Yeary, Michelle)
April 2, 2018 Filing 2424 Amended Master Short Form Complaint by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Brendan)
April 2, 2018 Filing 2423 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion by plaintiff's steering committee for leave to file amended short form complaint #2415 is granted. A fillable PDF of the amended short form complaint to be posted on the MDL 2545 website is to be submitted to Judge Kennelly's proposed order email address. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
April 1, 2018 Filing 2422 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 109 (Trial time allocation for Myers v. AbbVie bellwether trial), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/1/2018. (mk)
March 29, 2018 Filing 2421 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Case management conference held on 3/29/2018. All unresolved items on the joint agenda are discussed. Discussion held regarding Auxilium/Endo's pending motions for summary judgment and to bar expert testimony in the two previously-designated bellwether cases. The Court will determine whether it is appropriate to rule on all or parts of the motions. The deadline for the summary judgment motion regarding claims against Besins is extended to 4/3/2018; response and reply deadlines are also extended an additional 3 days. The motion by defendants Anda, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis Inc. to dismiss with prejudice pursuant to amended case management order no. 9 in Dowdy v. Actavis Inc. et al., case no. 14 C 9319, [dkt. no. 16] is withdrawn. Motion to make addendum to CMO 87 #2397 is taken under advisement. Parties are to discuss the possibility of amending CMO 87 to include the possibility of a sanction when a case is voluntarily dismissed more than a certain number of days after being put on the list. AbbVie's motion to streamline live trial testimony #2400 is denied as to the currently scheduled bellwether trials and taken under advisement as to the Wave 1, Wave 2, and mixed-use trials. The parties are to confer further regarding this motion and are to report back to the Court. By the close of business on 4/4/2018, AbbVie is to submit a draft Order to Show Cause Pursuant to Case Management Order No. 85 consistent with the Court's comments made at the conference. The next case management conferences will be held on 4/25/2018 at 1:30 p.m., 5/31/2018 at 1:30 p.m., and 6/28/2018 at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
March 29, 2018 Filing 2420 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause to notice of filing #2419 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Goldstein, Brian)
March 28, 2018 Filing 2419 NOTICE by AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories First Notice for Entry of an Order to Show Cause Pursuant to Case Management Order No. 85 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Mary)
March 28, 2018 Filing 2418 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Counsel are to be prepared to start the pre-case management conference settlement and general meetings in chambers at 12:45 PM, though the actual starting time may be a bit after that. (mk)
March 27, 2018 Filing 2417 STATUS Report (Joint) for the Marcy 29, 2018 Case Management Conference by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Brendan)
March 27, 2018 Filing 2416 Joint Agenda for the March 29, 2018 Case Management Conference by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Smith, Brendan)
March 27, 2018 Filing 2415 MOTION by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee for leave to file Amended Short Form Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Brendan)
March 24, 2018 Filing 2414 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the case management conference set for 3/29/2018, counsel for Auxilium/Endo and the PSC are to be prepared to address certain questions the Court has with regard to the pending motions for summary judgment and to bar expert testimony in the two previously-designated bellwether cases, including: (1) Do the parties expect the Court to rule on all of the motions that have been filed and all of the issues that have been raised in those motions? (2) (a) If the answer to question 1 is no, which motions and/or issues do the parties expect the Court to rule on? (b) If the parties want a ruling only on particular issues that may or may not be necessarily determined in the particular case(s) in which they are argued, how should the Court deal with the typical improvidence of ruling on issues that are unnecessary to a determination of a particular case or motion? (3) If the answer to question 1 is yes, to what extent would rulings on all of the motions and issues presented constitute an advisory opinion given the parties' memorandum of understanding? Counsel should also expect the Court to ask follow-up questions related to these points. (mk)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2413 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee to motion for miscellaneous relief #2400 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Streamline Live Testimony (Dkt. No. 2400) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Brendan)
March 23, 2018 Filing 2412 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee to memorandum #2397 Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to AbbVie's Proposed Addendum to CMO 87 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Brendan)
March 22, 2018 Filing 2411 STIPULATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bernick, David)
March 21, 2018 Filing 2410 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 108 (Timeline for Pre-Trial Materials for CMO 75 and CMO 87 Wave 1 and 2 Cases), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/21/2018. (mk)
March 16, 2018 Filing 2409 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: AbbVie's request to excuse its designated in-house counsel from attending the settlement-related meeting at the case management conference on 3/29/2018 is granted because AbbVie has not made a prior request of this type. AbbVie is advised that no further such requests will be entertained, as the Court has previously advised. (mk)
March 15, 2018 Filing 2408 Request by Designated In-House Counsel for the Abbvie Defendants to be Excused From Attendance at the In Camera Settlement-Related Meeting on March 29, 2018 by Solvay Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Unimed Pharmaceuticals, LLC, AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Products, Inc. (Cavanaugh, William)
March 15, 2018 Filing 2407 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 107 (Order on defendants' motion to compel spoliation discovery from plaintiff), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/15/2018. (mk)
March 15, 2018 Filing 2406 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 106 (Order on plaintiff's motion to compel regarding promotional expenditures and memberships/sponsorships in Med. Mut. of Ohio v. AbbVie), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/15/2018: The order issued late yesterday under an incorrect case management order number (105) is re-entered under the correct number (106). (mk)
March 14, 2018 Filing 2405 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 105 (Order on plaintiff's motion to compel regarding promotional expenditures and memberships/sponsorships in Med. Mut. of Ohio v. AbbVie), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/14/2018. (mk)
March 14, 2018 Filing 2404 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 105 (Memorandum Opinion and Order on plaintiff's motion to exclude cumulative expert testimony in Mitchell v. AbbVie, No. 14 C 9178), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on March 14, 2018. (mk)
March 14, 2018 Filing 2403 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 104 (Memorandum Opinion and Order on defendants' motion for order that plaintiff may not claw back documents in Med. Mutual of Ohio v. AbbVie Inc., No. 14 C 8857), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/14/2018. (mk)
March 13, 2018 Filing 2402 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The plaintiffs' steering committee is directed to file, by 3/23/2018, a response to defendants' motion to streamline live trial testimony (dkt. no. 2400). The response should include comment on the possibility of conducting a new video deposition of the subject witnesses to be used for trial purposes, rather than relying on prior deposition testimony. (mk)
March 13, 2018 Filing 2401 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The plaintiffs' steering committee is directed to file, by 3/23/2018, a response to AbbVie's request for a modification to Case Management Order 87 (see dkt. no. 2397). (mk)
March 12, 2018 Filing 2400 MOTION to Streamline Live Trial Testimony by AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yeary, Michelle) Docket text modified on 3/13/2018 (ags, ).
March 12, 2018 Filing 2399 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 103 (Clarification of stay of Endo, Auxilium & GSK cases), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/12/2018. (mk)
March 12, 2018 Filing 2398 NOTICE of Motion by Michelle H. Yeary for presentment of before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/29/2018 at 01:30 PM. (Yeary, Michelle)
March 12, 2018 Filing 2397 MEMORANDUM by AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories in Support of Proposed Addendum to Case Management Order No. 87 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed CMO 87A)(Yeary, Michelle)
March 11, 2018 Filing 2396 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER # 102 (SELECTION AND WORK-UP OF ACTAVIS CASES), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/11/2018. (mk)
March 11, 2018 Filing 2395 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Final pretrial conference in August 2018 Actavis bellwether trial is set for 8/2/2018 at 3:30 PM. (mk)
March 11, 2018 Filing 2394 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 101 (Timeline for Pre-Trial Materials and Conferences for Existing Bellwether Cases), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/11/2018. (mk)
March 8, 2018 Filing 2393 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Clerk is directed to remove the image of #2392 from the docket because plaintiff's profile forms are not to be filed on the record but rather are to be served upon opposing counsel. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
March 8, 2018 Filing 2392 Removed per court order dated 03/08/2018 . (Alvarado, Brock) (Main Document 2392 replaced on 3/8/2018) (jjr, ). Modified on 3/8/2018 (jjr, ).
March 8, 2018 Filing 2391 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Actavis's request to excuse its corporate representative from the settlement meeting connected with the 3/29/2018 case management conference is granted. Consistent with the Court's prior admonitions, this represents Actavis's one and only excuse; in other words, no further requests for excuse will be entertained. The in-house representative is to be available by telephone as offered. (mk)
March 6, 2018 Filing 2390 Request by Anda, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc. for Designated In-House Counsel to be Excused from In Person Attendance at the March 29, 2018 Case Management Conference (Geoppinger, Jeffrey)
March 4, 2018 Filing 2389 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Plaintiff's Steering Committee Related to Dkt. No. 2388 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Rafferty, Troy)
March 4, 2018 Filing 2388 NOTICE by Plaintiff's Steering Committee of Filing of Deposition Designations (Canzler) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rafferty, Troy)
March 4, 2018 Filing 2387 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Plaintiff's Steering Committee Related to Dkt. No. 2386 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D)(Rafferty, Troy)
March 4, 2018 Filing 2386 NOTICE by Plaintiff's Steering Committee of Filing of Deposition Designations (Comer) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rafferty, Troy)
March 2, 2018 Filing 2385 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 100 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH RESPECT TO PFIZER DEFENDANTS AND ANY OTHER NON-DIVERSE DEFENDANTS FOR CASES REMANDED BY U.S. COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE SEVENTH CIRCUIT, signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/2/2018. (mk)
March 1, 2018 Filing 2384 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion of plaintiff Loria Robinson to substitute party #2382 is granted. For future reference, motions like this that involve only a single case within the MDL should be filed in that case only, not under the main MDL case number. (mk)
March 1, 2018 Filing 2383 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The motions by plaintiffs' attorney to withdraw from representation #2213 and #2264 are denied without prejudice. The sealed affidavits filed with the motions appear to reflect that Plaintiffs have engaged in a continuing failure to prosecute their case or that good cause exists for Plaintiffs' counsel's withdrawal. Plaintiffs are ordered to show cause in writing by 3/22/2018 why their case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to promptly send a copy of this order to all Plaintiffs listed on the motions and to certify to the Court that he has done so. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
February 28, 2018 Filing 2382 MOTION by Plaintiff Loria Robinson to substitute party (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Clinton)
February 28, 2018 Filing 2381 SUGGESTION of Death as to Plaintiff Loria Robinson (Kelly, Clinton)
February 26, 2018 Filing 2380 JOINT NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Aaron Holian for presentment of (Holian, Matthew)
February 26, 2018 Filing 2379 MOTION by Defendants Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC to dismiss Joint Motion for Dismissal of Cases Remanded by U.S. Court of Appeals for Seventh Circuit on Jurisdictional Grounds (Holian, Matthew)
February 24, 2018 Filing 2378 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 99 (Scope of new trial in Mitchell v. AbbVie;rulings on Mitchell motions in limine; trial time allocation for Mitchell retrial), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/24/2018. (mk)
February 23, 2018 Filing 2377 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 98 (stay of Endo, Auxilium & GSK cases), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/23/2018. (mk)
February 22, 2018 Filing 2376 STATUS Report Plaintiffs' Status Report Regarding Lexecon Waivers for CMO 75 Mixed Use Cases and CMO 87 Trial Group 1 and 2 Cases by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Brendan)
February 21, 2018 Filing 2375 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee re: Mitchell, 14-cv-9178, Dkt. No. 121 (Omnibus Motion in Limine Response) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 8)(Smith, Brendan)
February 16, 2018 Filing 2374 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Jesse Mitchell to AbbVie's Submission on Whether a New Trial is Required on All Claims (Rafferty, Troy)
February 16, 2018 Filing 2373 STATUS Report (Joint) Regarding Pretrial Matters for Scheduled Bellwether Trials and CMO 75 and 87 Cases by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Brendan)
February 16, 2018 Filing 2372 NOTICE by Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Anda, Inc. of Filing Proposed Case Management Order for the Selection and Work-Up of Actavis Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed CMO)(Geoppinger, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2018 Filing 2371 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The joint motion for extension of time #2368 is denied due to the lack of sufficient notice under this District's rules. The Court also advises that the parties in this case cannot expect to run right up to a deadline, file a motion to extend on the eve of the deadline, and get an extension as a matter of course. (mk)
February 14, 2018 Filing 2370 STATUS Report / JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING THE SECOND AUXILIUM BELLWETHER TRIAL CASE by Auxilium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Solow, Andrew)
February 14, 2018 Filing 2369 NOTICE of Motion by Michelle H. Yeary for presentment of extension of time #2368 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/15/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Yeary, Michelle)
February 14, 2018 Filing 2368 MOTION by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories for extension of time Joint Motion for an Extension of Time for the Parties to File Their Proposed Case Management Orders (Yeary, Michelle)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2367 MANDATE of USCA dated 2/12/2018 regarding notice of appeal #1934 ;USCA No.17-2056 ; Entire record returned consisting of 5 vol. (ags, )
February 12, 2018 Filing 2366 MEMORANDUM by AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories in Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause on Why This Case Does not Require a New Trial on All Claims (Yeary, Michelle)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2365 NOTICE by Actavis Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Anda, Inc. of Filing of Joint List of Pending Cases Involving Actavis Defendants Venued for Trial in the Seventh Circuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cases Venued in the Seventh Circuit)(Geoppinger, Jeffrey)
February 12, 2018 Filing 2364 USCA JUDGMENT dated 1/19/2018 regarding notice of appeal #1934 ; USCA No. 17-2056. The district court's decisions with respect to both the defendants' preemption defense and the denial of discovery on the preemption defense are AFFIRMED. Due to a lack of complete diversity of citizenship, the final judgments or partial final judgments entered by the district court in the cases listed below are VACATED and REMANDED for proceedings. (ags, )
February 12, 2018 Filing 2363 NONPRECEDENTIAL DISPOSITION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Argued 10/23/2017; Decided 1/19/2018 in USCA case no. 17-2056 (ags, )
February 12, 2018 Filing 2362 CERTIFIED copy of order dated 1/19/2018 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal #1934 ; Appellate case no. : 17-2056. Accordingly, due to a lack of complete diversity of citizenship, the final judgments or partial final judgments entered by the district court in the cases listed below are VACATED and REMANDED for proceedings consistent with this order and the accompanying opinion issued in this appeal, No. 17-2056. (ags, )
February 12, 2018 Filing 2361 MANDATE of USCA dated 2/12/2018 regarding notice of appeal #1934 ;USCA No.17-2056 ; Record to be returned at a later date. (ags, )
February 7, 2018 Filing 2360 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on February 1, 2018 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn Cox, Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/28/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2018. (Cox, Carolyn)
February 6, 2018 Filing 2359 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: As requested at the recent case management conference, the stay of proceedings as to the Lilly defendants is extended to and including 3/31/2018. (mk)
February 6, 2018 Filing 2358 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Anda, Inc. by John R Ipsaro (Ipsaro, John)
February 2, 2018 Filing 2355 Final Text CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER # 97 (extending non-expert generic fact discovery deadline for Testopel, Striant, and Delatestryl), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/2/2018. The Court notes that this order was submitted by agreement of the plaintiffs' steering committee and counsel for defendants Auxilium and Endo. (mk)
February 1, 2018 Filing 2357 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 96 - Order of dismissal as to case naming Pfizer Inc. and Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC only pursuant to Case Management Order No. 19B (amended) signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/1/2018. (pjg, )
February 1, 2018 Filing 2356 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 95 - Order of dismissal as to the cases naming Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, and additional co-defendants pursuant to Case Management Order No. 19B (Amended) signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/1/2018. (pjg, )
February 1, 2018 Filing 2354 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Case management conference held on 2/1/2018. All unresolved items on the joint agenda are discussed. (1a, c, d) The parties are to confer and submit proposed case management orders for the following by 2/16/2018: the submission of pretrial materials (motions in limine, deposition designations and objections, exhibit designations and objections, jury instructions, and voir dire questions) in existing bellwether cases; the submission of pretrial materials for the CMO 75 cases and the CMO 87 "group 1" and "group 2" cases; a plan to select and work up 100 Actavis cases for all pretrial purposes. The parties are also to discuss and submit, for inclusion in the anticipated pretrial materials case management orders, proposals regarding supplementation of expert reports and any other recurring trial-related issues. In addition, a joint list of all pending Actavis cases that would be venued for trial within this District or elsewhere within this Circuit is to be submitted by 2/12/2018, and the Court will schedule a conference call thereafter to discuss the possibility of adding such cases to the CMO "group 1" and "group 2" schedules. (1b) The parties are to work promptly to address the potential subject matter jurisdiction issues identified by the court of appeals and are also to immediately prepare a revised draft short form complaint form identifying the citizenship of the plaintiff and each defendant to replace the current form. (1c) Summary judgment motion regarding claims against Besins is due by 3/30/2018; response is due by 4/20/2018; reply is due by 4/30/2018. These submissions should include identification of any cases under CMO 75 and CMO 87 group 1 in which Besins is a defendant. (1g) The Court also addressed disputed points in the joint status report regarding dismissals of cases designated under CMO 75 and CMO 87; depositions of district and regional sales managers; and obtaining medical records on plaintiffs in cases designated under CMO 75 and CMO 87. Finally, the case management conferences set for 2/15/2018 and 3/22/2018 are vacated. The next case management conference will be held on 3/29/2018 at 1:30 pm. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
January 31, 2018 Filing 2353 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jeffrey Ard, Michael D Bourgeois, Michael J. Cullen, Francis M. Dennewitz, Josiane Lafortune DesMarais, Ronald W Dodge, Gary Esolen, Robert Faubion, William Grizzell, Bill Earl Jenkins, Nita E. Jenkins, Anthony Lafortune, Dennis M Martin, Janice M Martin, Floyd E Mason, Jr, Terry E. Mason, Thomas Michael Meagher, Timothy E Miles, Joseph E Nich, Susan Nich, Matthew W Ormsby, William Pauling, Larry Polk, David Ray Poston, Kathy Poston, Brian D Tolbert, Craig L Tribken by Mikalia Kott (Kott, Mikalia)
January 31, 2018 Filing 2352 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Gary McKee by Soren E. Gisleson (Gisleson, Soren)
January 31, 2018 Filing 2351 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jeffrey Ard, Michael D Bourgeois, Michael J. Cullen, Francis M. Dennewitz, Josiane Lafortune DesMarais, Robert Faubion, Bill Earl Jenkins, Nita E. Jenkins, Anthony Lafortune, Dennis M Martin, Janice M Martin, Floyd E Mason, Jr, Terry E. Mason, Timothy E Miles, Joseph E Nich, Susan Nich, Matthew W Ormsby, William Pauling, Larry Polk, David Ray Poston, Kathy Poston, Brian D Tolbert, Craig L Tribken by Soren E. Gisleson (Gisleson, Soren)
January 31, 2018 Filing 2350 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: This entry concerns the case management conference and related meetings set for 2/1/2018. The Court is in the middle of a criminal jury trial and thus will have limited in-court time available on 2/1/2018. For this reason: (1) The monthly settlement meetings will start in chambers at 12:30 PM rather than 1:00 PM. The Court will meet with the PSC and Lilly representatives first and then will have separate meetings with the representatives of the PSC, AbbVie, Auxilium/Endo, and Actavis. The PSC and Lilly representatives should come straight to chambers at 12:30 PM, and all others should be waiting in the courtroom. (2) Following the conclusion of the settlement meetings, if time is available, the Court will hold the usual pre-case management conference meeting with lead counsel and others who wish to be present (to the extent space permits). At this meeting, the Court intends to discuss, informally, scheduling and case management-related matters concerning the CMO 75 and CMO 87 cases and other bellwether trials; CMOs concerning trial demonstratives and supplementation of expert reports; issues regarding the monthly dismissal lists (items 1a, 1c, 1d, and 1e on the agenda for the case management conference). (3) The Court does not intend to hear argument on any of the discovery-related motions in the Medical Mutual case (items 2a, 2b, and 2c) and will separately set briefing schedules on the two recently-filed motions that have not yet been briefed. (4) The Court will not have time to hear argument on the Konrad case at the conference but reserves the right to set it for brief argument sometime next week. The Court also advises that if it ends up granting a new trial on some or all claims in the Konrad case, it reserves the right to substitute that case for the Mitchell case in the March 7 trial slot. (5) Counsel should be prepared to address in open court agenda items 1b (subject matter jurisdiction issues), 1e (Besins), and 1g (other matters that have come to counsel's attention), as well as any of the above-listed items to be discussed at the pre-conference meeting that merit discussion in open court. (mk)
January 30, 2018 Filing 2349 MEMORANDUM by Jeffrey Konrad Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Abbvie's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, or Alternatively for a New Trial or Remittitur (Buchanan, David)
January 30, 2018 Filing 2348 STATUS Report (Joint) for the February 1, 2018 Case Management Conference by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Smith, Brendan)
January 30, 2018 Filing 2347 Joint Agenda for the February 1, 2018 Case Management Conference by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Smith, Brendan)
January 30, 2018 Filing 2346 MEMORANDUM by AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories in Further Support of Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, or Alternatively for a New Trial or Remittitur (Yeary, Michelle)
January 26, 2018 Filing 2345 NOTICE by Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Anda, Inc. re other #2337 of Withdrawal of Request by Designated In-House Counsel for Actavis Defendants to be Excused from In-Person Attendance at the In-Camera Settlement-Related Meeting on February 1, 2018 (Geoppinger, Jeffrey)
January 23, 2018 Filing 2344 JOINT NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Aaron Holian for presentment of (Holian, Matthew)
January 23, 2018 Filing 2343 MOTION by Defendants Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC to dismiss Joint Motion for Dismissal and Entry of Final Judgment and Partial Final Judgment Pursuant to Amended CMO 19B (Holian, Matthew)
January 23, 2018 Filing 2342 CORRECTED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER # 87 (TRIAL SELECTION PLAN AND SCHEDULE), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/23/2018: This corrected order corrects a date error (see Par. IV.B.8) as well as a formatting error. (mk)
January 22, 2018 Filing 2339 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The parties are directed to confer and include in the status report for the 2/1/2018 case management conference a proposal for dealing with the subject matter jurisdiction issue identified in the Guilbeau v. Pfizer appeal, both with respect to the cases identified in that appeal and with respect to other cases in the MDL proceeding. (mk)
January 19, 2018 Filing 2341 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #2338 sent to Attorney David Michael Melancon returned as: Unknown Address Error. Mailed to attorney David Michael Melancon a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
January 19, 2018 Filing 2340 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #2338 sent to Attorney Corey G. Lorenz returned as: Unknown Address Error. The Clerk telephoned Corey G. Lorenz, no contact made. Document Mailed to attorney Corey G. Lorenz a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
January 19, 2018 Filing 2338 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephone status hearing held including lead counsel for all parties. The conference involved a discussion of the next phase of the litigation, in particular pretrial proceedings and trials in the mixed-use cases addressed in CMO 75 and the "group 1" and "group 2" cases addressed in CMO 87. The Court directs each party to set forth, in the joint status report due in advance of the 2/1/2018 case management conference, its position regarding application of Lexecon / waivers of Lexecon for these cases. In addition, the Court advised that the start date for the Mitchell retrial likely will be 3/7/2018, not 3/5/2018. (mk)
January 18, 2018 Filing 2337 Request by Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Anda Inc. for Designated In-House Counsel to be Excused from In Person Attendance at the February 1, 2018 Case Management Conference (Geoppinger, Jeffrey)
January 18, 2018 Filing 2336 STATUS Report (Joint) for the January 19, 2018 Preliminary Case Management Conference by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Smith, Brendan)
January 18, 2018 Filing 2335 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: After reviewing the parties' submissions regarding the selection of the first Actavis bellwether trial case, the Court selects the Martin case (15-cv-4292) as the case to be tried on the currently scheduled date of 8/6/2018, with the Brubaker case (15-cv-426) as the backup case. (mk)
January 18, 2018 Filing 2334 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories by Alicia Donahue (Donahue, Alicia)
January 18, 2018 Filing 2333 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories by Sean P Wajert (Wajert, Sean)
January 17, 2018 Filing 2332 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: In preparation for the telephone conference set for 1/19/2018, lead counsel are directed to provide the Court, by 1:00 pm on 1/18/2017, a brief status report that identifies the mixed-use bellwether discovery cases selected pursuant to CMO 75 and the cases selected for Group 1 pursuant to CMO 87. (mk)
January 17, 2018 Filing 2331 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: In preparation for the telephone conference set for 1/19/2018, lead counsel are directed to provide the Court, by 1:00 pm on 1/18/2017, a brief status report that identifies the mixed-use bellwether discovery cases selected pursuant to CMO 75 and the cases selected for Group 1 pursuant to CMO 87. (mk)
January 11, 2018 Filing 2330 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dale LeCompte, Felesia N. LeCompte (Pope, Neal)
January 10, 2018 Filing 2329 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, the case management conference set for 1/25/2018 is vacated and reset to 2/1/2018 at 1:30 pm, to avoid undue interference with timely completion of the Nolte v. AbbVie bellwether trial. The hearings on all motions noticed for presentment or argument at the case management conference are continued to 2/1/2018 at 1:30 pm. A preliminary case management conference, to be conducted by telephone, is set for 1/19/2018 at 8:15 am. The plaintiffs' steering committee is directed to set up a call-in number and advise the court and other participating counsel. Lead counsel are to participate in the 1/19/2018 preliminary case management conference, along with any other attorneys that lead counsel believe appropriate to include (including in-house counsel if they wish). The primary topic for the preliminary case management conference will be to discuss scheduling of post-summary judgment pretrial matters in the additional bellwether trial cases to be selected pursuant to Case Management Order 87. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
January 10, 2018 Filing 2328 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Lilly-related final pretrial conference set for 1/25/2018 is vacated, and the Lilly-related motions noticed for presentment on 1/25/2018 are terminated without prejudice in light of the vacating of the 1/29/2018 Lilly bellwether trial. (mk)
January 9, 2018 Filing 2327 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion to withdraw as attorney #2321 is granted. Attorney Jason P. Britt terminated. The 1/10/2018 motion hearing is vacated. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
January 6, 2018 Filing 2326 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 94 (rulings on motions in limine in Nolte v. AbbVie, Inc. et al., Case No. 14 C 8135), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/6/2018. (mk)
January 5, 2018 Filing 2325 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratories Exhibit A to Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Their Motion in Limine No. 10 - Nolte v. AbbVie 14-cv-8135 (Yeary, Michelle)
January 5, 2018 Filing 2324 MOTION by Defendants AbbVie, Inc., Abbott Laboratoriesin limine Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Their Motion in Limine No. 10 - Nolte v. AbbVie 14-cv-8135 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Under Seal, #2 Exhibit B)(Yeary, Michelle)
December 28, 2017 Filing 2323 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Besins Healthcare Inc., Besins Healthcare S.A. by Peter James O'meara (O'meara, Peter)
December 26, 2017 Filing 2322 NOTICE of Motion by Jason P. Britt for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #2321 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/10/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Britt, Jason)
December 26, 2017 Filing 2321 MOTION by Attorney Jason P. Britt to withdraw as attorney for Besins Healthcare Inc., Besins Healthcare S.A.. No party information provided (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Britt, Jason)
December 22, 2017 Filing 2320 Actavis Defendants' Proposal Regarding Selection of the Actavis-Only Bellwether Trial Case for the August 6, 2018 Trial Setting by Actavis Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Anda Inc. (Geoppinger, Jeffrey)
December 22, 2017 Filing 2319 Brief Regarding the Sequence of the Actavis Bellwether Trials by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Smith, Brendan)
December 22, 2017 Filing 2318 REPLY by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories to motion for judgment #2231 Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, or Alternatively for a New Trial or Remittitur (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Yeary, Michelle)
December 22, 2017 Filing 2317 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 92 (Memorandum Opinion and Order on post-trialmotions in Mitchell v. AbbVie, No. 14 C 9178) Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/22/2017: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court grants in part and denies in part AbbVie's motion to strike the punitive damages award and for entry of judgment as a matter of law [dkt. no. 92], and grants in part and denies in part Mitchell's motion to amend the judgment or in the alternative for a new trial [dkt. no. 93]. The Court vacates the judgment in part, specifically the finding entered in favor of Mitchell on the claim for fraudulent misrepresentation and the award of punitive damages. The Court orders a new trial on Mitchell's claim for fraudulent misrepresentation, including damages relating to that claim. The trial is set for March 5, 2018 at 9:45 a.m. The final pretrial conference is set for February 28, 2018 at 3:30 p.m. (mk)
December 21, 2017 Filing 2316 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories Defendants' Omnibus Memorandum Supporting Their Motions in Limine to Exclude Evidence for the Nolte, 1:14-cv-08135 case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6052, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Yeary, Michelle)
December 21, 2017 Filing 2315 MOTION by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratoriesin limine Defendants' Omnibus Memorandum Supporting Their Motions in Limine to Exclude Evidence for the Nolte, 1:14-cv-08135 case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 60, #2 Exhibit 71, #3 Exhibit 75, #4 Exhibit 112, #5 Exhibit 154, #6 Exhibit 250, #7 Exhibit 270, #8 Exhibit 271, #9 Exhibit 272, #10 Exhibit 304, #11 Exhibit 306, #12 Exhibit 307, #13 Exhibit 308, #14 Exhibit 309, #15 Exhibit 310, #16 Exhibit 311, #17 Exhibit 312, #18 Exhibit 313, #19 Exhibit 314, #20 Exhibit 315, #21 Exhibit 324, #22 Exhibit 887, #23 Exhibit 888, #24 Exhibit 925, #25 Exhibit 1025, #26 Exhibit 3104, #27 Exhibit 3132, #28 Exhibit 3270, #29 Exhibit 6051 - Under Seal, #30 Exhibit 6052 - Under Seal, #31 Exhibit A - Under Seal, #32 Exhibit B - Under Seal, #33 Exhibit C - Under Seal, #34 Exhibit D - Under Seal, #35 Exhibit E, #36 Exhibit F - Under Seal, #37 Exhibit G - Under Seal, #38 Exhibit H, #39 Exhibit I, #40 Exhibit J)(Yeary, Michelle)
December 21, 2017 Filing 2314 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Steering Committee re: Omnibus Motion in Limine for the Nolte, 1:14-cv-08135 case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15)(Miracle, Trent)
December 21, 2017 Filing 2313 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 92 (settlement of Eli Lilly cases), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/21/2017. (mk)
December 19, 2017 Filing 2312 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: This order applies to Nolte v. AbbVie, Inc., No. 1:14-cv-8135. Joint motion for leave to file excess pages #22 is granted; each side may file motions in limine totaling 25 pages in the aggregate and responses totaling 25 pages in the aggregate. (mk)
December 17, 2017 Filing 2311 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 91 - ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO CASE NAMING PFIZER INC. AND PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC ONLY PURSUANT TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 19B (AMENDED) signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/17/2017. Motion to dismiss #2288 is granted and the 12/19/2017 motion hearing is vacated. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
December 15, 2017 Filing 2310 NOTICE of Motion by Michelle H. Yeary for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #2309 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/21/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Yeary, Michelle)
December 15, 2017 Filing 2309 MOTION by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbott Laboratories for leave to file excess pages (Yeary, Michelle)
December 15, 2017 Filing 2308 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Case management conference held on 12/15/2017. Motions to withdraw #2213 and #2264 are entered and continued to the 1/25/2018 case management conference. Plaintiff's Steering Committee, in consultation with defendants, is directed to submit a proposal on how such motions should be addressed going forward. Plaintiff's Steering Committee shall communicate with Judge Kennelly's courtroom deputy to ensure the correct new short form and combined short form complaints are added to the Court's web page. A joint status report regarding the 1/25/2018 conference shall be filed by 1/16/2018. Additional case management conferences set for 2/15/2018 at 1:30 p.m and 3/22/2018 at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2307 ORDER: Motion to withdraw #2294 (filed in lead case 14 C 1748) is granted. Attorney Michael D. Lurie is withdrawn as attorney of record for plaintiffs on all cases on Exhibit A attached hereto. The Clerk is directed to enter this order in case no. 14 C 1748 and all cases listed on Exhibit A. The Clerk is further directed to terminate Attorney Michael D. Lurie as counsel for plaintiffs in case no. 14 C 1748 and all cases included in Exhibit A. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/15/2017. Mailed notice (rp, )
December 14, 2017 Filing 2306 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 90 (Pending motions to compel in Medical Mutual case), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/14/2017. (mk)
December 13, 2017 Filing 2305 Joint Agenda for the December 15, 2017 Case Management Conference by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Smith, Brendan)
December 13, 2017 Filing 2304 STATUS Report (Joint) for the December 15, 2017 Case Management Conference by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Smith, Brendan)
December 13, 2017 Filing 2303 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 89 (Allocation of trial time for January 8, 2018 AbbVie bellwether trial), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/13/2017. (mk)
December 13, 2017 Filing 2302 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER # 88 (Order Selecting Actavis Bellwether Trial Cases Pursuant to CMO No. 37), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/13/2017. The parties should note that their submissions are due within 9 days of today's day, i.e., by 12/22/2017. (mk)
December 12, 2017 Filing 2301 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The request by Lilly's settlement counsel and corporate representative to participate by telephone on 12/15/2017 is granted, but as previously advised this is the one and only such request that the Court will grant for the Lilly defendants. (mk)
December 11, 2017 Filing 2300 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #2298 , #2299 sent to Attorney Jason L Drori returned as: Other mail system problem. The Clerk telephoned Jason L Drori, no contact made. Mailed to attorney Jason L Drori a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (jk, )
December 11, 2017 Filing 2299 REQUEST BY REPRESENTATIVES OF ELI LILLY DEFENDANTS TO PARTICIPATE IN IN CAMERA SETTLEMENT HEARING BY TELEPHONE by Acrux Commercial Pty Ltd., Acrux DDS Pty Ltd, Eli Lilly and Company (Stanley, David)
December 11, 2017 Filing 2298 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER # 87 (TRIAL SELECTION PLAN AND SCHEDULE), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/11/2017. (mk)
December 10, 2017 Filing 2297 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 86 (Supplemental trial selection plan), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/10/2017. The parties are directed to submit a proposed case management order, following the Court's earlier directives and those set forth in the present order, by 4:00 p.m. on 12/11/2017. (mk)
December 8, 2017 Filing 2296 STATUS Report (Joint) Regarding Selection of Actavis-Only Bellwether Trial Cases Pursuant to CMO No. 37 by Actavis Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed CMO)(Geoppinger, Jeffrey)
December 8, 2017 Filing 2295 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 85 (Supplemental Plaintiff Profile Form - PPF), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/8/2017. (mk)
December 8, 2017 Filing 2294 MOTION by Attorney Michael D Lurie to withdraw as attorney for Brian DeMatteo. No party information provided (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Notice of Filing)(Lurie, Michael)
December 8, 2017 Filing 2293 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 84 (Enhancements to plaintiffs' fact sheets; modifications to process for dealing with deficiencies), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/8/2017. (mk)
December 7, 2017 Filing 2292 STATUS Report (Joint) Regarding Enhanced Plaintiff Fact Sheets and Selection of Additional Bellwether Cases by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Smith, Brendan)
December 7, 2017 Filing 2291 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Eli Lilly and Company by Jennifer Lynn Saulino (Saulino, Jennifer)
December 7, 2017 Filing 2290 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Eli Lilly and Company by Michael X Imbroscio (Imbroscio, Michael)
December 6, 2017 Filing 2289 JOINT NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Aaron Holian for presentment of motion to dismiss #2288 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/19/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Holian, Matthew)
December 6, 2017 Filing 2288 MOTION by Defendants Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC to dismiss Joint Motion for Dismissal and Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Amended CMO 19B (Holian, Matthew)
December 4, 2017 Filing 2287 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AbbVie Inc. by Zachary D Holmstead (Holmstead, Zachary)
December 4, 2017 Filing 2286 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AbbVie Inc. by Rebecca Cauley Fitzpatrick (Fitzpatrick, Rebecca)
December 4, 2017 Filing 2285 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AbbVie Inc. by Hariklia Karis (Karis, Hariklia)
December 4, 2017 Filing 2284 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AbbVie Inc. by James F. Hurst (Hurst, James)
December 1, 2017 Filing 2283 RESPONSE by Jeffrey Konradin Opposition to MOTION for judgment as a Matter of Law, or Alternatively for a New Trial or Remittitur, and Memorandum in Support #2231 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Exhibit List)(Buchanan, David)
December 1, 2017 Filing 2281 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on November 30, 2017 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn Cox, Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2018. (Cox, Carolyn)
November 30, 2017 Filing 2282 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Case management conference held on 11/30/2017. (1) All unresolved items on the joint status report discussed. (2) The parties are to confer and submit, by 12/6/2017, draft orders regarding enhanced plaintiff's fact sheets and selection of additional bellwether cases, consistent with the Courts comments in chambers and in open court. This includes a schedule for pretrial and trial-related matters in those cases, including a plan for eight additional cases (in addition to currently scheduled and planned single-use and mixed-use bellwether trial cases) to be trial-ready by August 2018. Further case management conferences set for 12/15/2017 at 1:30 p.m. and 1/25/2018 at 1:30 p.m. remain as scheduled. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
November 29, 2017 Filing 2280 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Primary counsel appearing for the 11/30/2017 case management conference are requested to attend a pre-conference meeting in chambers at 11:15 AM. (mk)
November 28, 2017 Filing 2279 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, due to an unanticipated scheduling conflict, the case management conference set for 11/30/2017 for the purpose of dealing with the proposals called for by Case Management Order (CMO) 78 (dkt. no. 2244) is moved to 11:30 AM on 11/30/2017. (mk)
November 28, 2017 Filing 2278 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, due to an unanticipated scheduling conflict, the case management conference set for 11/30/2017 for the purpose of dealing with the proposals called for by Case Management Order (CMO) 78 (dkt. no. 2244) is moved to 11:30 AM on 11/30/2017. (mk)
November 22, 2017 Filing 2277 STATUS Report Joint Status Report for November 30, 2017 Case Management Conference by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Miracle, Trent)
November 22, 2017 Filing 2276 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER # 83 (Order Setting Sequence of Lilly Bellwether Trial Cases), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/22/2017: The Court calls to the parties' attention that it added a sentence at the end of the proposed draft order. (mk)
November 21, 2017 Filing 2275 NOTICE of Motion by Wesley Andrew Bowden for presentment of before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/25/2018 at 03:00 PM. (Bowden, Wesley)
November 21, 2017 Filing 2274 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Wesley A. Bowden in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Defendants Non-Retained Experts or in the Alternative Motion to Strike (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Bowden, Wesley)
November 21, 2017 Filing 2273 SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Defendants Non-Retained Experts or in the Alternative Motion to Strike (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Bowden, Wesley)
November 21, 2017 Filing 2272 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on October 18, 2017 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn Cox, Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2018. (Cox, Carolyn)
November 20, 2017 Filing 2271 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, the case management conference set for 11/30/2017 for the purpose of dealing with the proposals called for by Case Management Order (CMO) 78 (dkt. no. 2244) is moved to 12:00 PM on 11/30/2017. In addition, the next in camera settlement-related meetings contemplated by CMO 78, p. 5, will be held on 12/15/2017 at 1:00 PM, in chambers (Room 2188). (mk)
November 16, 2017 Filing 2270 STATUS Report Joint by Medical Mutual of Ohio (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Simmer, William)
November 16, 2017 Filing 2269 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James Sullivan (Fodera, Leonard)
November 15, 2017 Filing 2268 REPLY Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion to Amend Judgment to Conform the Damages to the Undisputed Evidence or in the Alternative for a New Trial on Compensatory Damages (Seeger, Christopher)
November 15, 2017 Filing 2267 REPLY Memorandum in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike the Punitive Damages Award and Enter Judgment for AbbVie as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 59(e) or, in the Alternative, Rule 50(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Yeary, Michelle)
November 14, 2017 Filing 2266 NOTICE of Motion by Brian John Perkins for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #2264 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/15/2017 at 01:30 PM. (Perkins, Brian)
November 14, 2017 Filing 2265 SEALED DOCUMENT (Perkins, Brian)
November 14, 2017 Filing 2264 MOTION by Attorney Brian J. Perkins to withdraw as attorney. New address information: Please See Attached Contact Forms (Attachments: #1 Notice of Party Contact Information)(Perkins, Brian) Modified on 3/1/2018 (pjg, ).
November 13, 2017 Filing 2263 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 82 (dismissal of additional Pfizer-only cases), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/13/2017. (mk)
November 13, 2017 Filing 2262 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 81 (dismissal of additional cases naming Pfizer defendants and co-defendants), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/13/2017. (mk)
November 9, 2017 Filing 2261 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 80 (Pretrial schedule for January 2018 bellwether trials) signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/9/2017. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
November 8, 2017 Filing 2260 NOTICE by Lawrence B. Finn of Change of Address (Finn, Lawrence)
November 8, 2017 Filing 2259 CORRECTED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 77 (rulings on motions in limine in Auxilium bellwether cases and case-specific motions in limine in Holtsclaw v. Auxilium Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Case No. 15 C 3941), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/8/2017: This order corrects editing errors in Section A.6, on page 7. The prior version (dkt. no. 2233) is vacated. (mk)
November 7, 2017 Filing 2258 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court, at its own instance, sets a telephone conference for 11/9/2017 at 12:30 PM for the purpose of addressing the dates for motions in limine and responses, the final pretrial order, and the final pretrial conference in the AbbVie-only bellwether trial set for 1/8/2019 as well as the dispositive motion schedule and dates for motions in limine and responses, the final pretrial order, and the final pretrial conference in the upcoming Lilly-only bellwether trials. (mk)
November 7, 2017 Filing 2257 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing date of 11/8/2017 is vacated. (mk)
November 7, 2017 Filing 2256 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: (This order relates to Konrad v. AbbVie, Inc., Case No. 1:15-cv-966) Defendants' renewed motion for judgment or for a new trial #2231 is taken under advisement. Response is due 12/1/2017 and may be up to 25 pages. Reply to response is due 12/22/2017 and is limited to 15 pages. (mk)
November 7, 2017 Filing 2255 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The joint application for re-appointment to the plaintiffs' steering committee #2153 is granted, retroactive to 10/15/2017. Peter Flowers, a current member of the PSC, will assume the position of co-liaison counsel to replace Brian Perkins. The Court has a few questions regarding the roles and work described in the attachments to the application but will hold those until the next case management conference. The term of the current appointment will run through 11/2/2018. Applications for appointment or reappointment are to be filed by no later than 9/30/2018. (mk)
November 6, 2017 Filing 2254 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 79 (Revised Schedule For Second Auxilium Bellwether Trial), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/6/2017. (mk)
November 6, 2017 Filing 2253 SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiff's Sealed Documents Related to Dkt. No 2252 (Kessig) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Katz, Seth)
November 6, 2017 Filing 2252 NOTICE of Filing of Deposition Desginations (Kessig) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Katz, Seth)
November 5, 2017 Filing 2251 NOTICE of Filing of Second List of Admissible Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Katz, Seth)
November 5, 2017 Filing 2250 SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiff's Sealed Documents Related to Dkt. No. 2249 (Sturgill) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Katz, Seth)
November 5, 2017 Filing 2249 NOTICE of Filing of Deposition Designations (Sturgill) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Katz, Seth)
November 5, 2017 Filing 2248 SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiff's Sealed Documents Related to Dkt. No. 2247 (Rosenberger) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D)(Katz, Seth)
November 5, 2017 Filing 2247 NOTICE of Filing of Deposition Designations (Rosenberger) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Katz, Seth)
November 4, 2017 Filing 2246 SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiff's Supplemental Sealed Documents Related to Dkt. No. 2245 (McLaughlin) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Katz, Seth)
November 4, 2017 Filing 2245 NOTICE of Filing of Supplemental Deposition Designations (McLaughlin) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Katz, Seth)
November 4, 2017 Filing 2244 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 78 (supplementation / enhancement of plaintiff's fact sheets; reconfiguration of bellwether trial schedules; meetings with settlement master), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/4/2017. (mk)
November 3, 2017 Filing 2243 SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiff's Sealed Documents Related to Dkt. No. 2242 (Smith) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Katz, Seth)
November 3, 2017 Filing 2242 NOTICE of Filing of Deposition Designations (Smith) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Katz, Seth)
November 3, 2017 Filing 2241 SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiff's Sealed Documents Related to Dkt. No. 2240 (McLaughlin) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Katz, Seth)
November 3, 2017 Filing 2240 NOTICE of Filing of Deposition Designations (McLaughlin) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Katz, Seth)
November 3, 2017 Filing 2239 SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiff's Sealed Documents Related to Dkt. No. 2238 (Grablutz) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D)(Katz, Seth)
November 3, 2017 Filing 2238 NOTICE of Filing of Deposition Designations (Grablutz) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Katz, Seth)
November 3, 2017 Filing 2237 SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiff's Sealed Documents Related to Dkt. No. 2236 (DelConte) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D)(Katz, Seth)
November 3, 2017 Filing 2236 NOTICE of Filing of Deposition Designations (DelConte) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Katz, Seth)
November 3, 2017 Filing 2235 SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiff's Sealed Documents Related to Dkt. No. 2234 (Hess) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D)(Katz, Seth)
November 3, 2017 Filing 2234 NOTICE of Filing of Deposition Designations (Hess) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Katz, Seth)
November 3, 2017 Filing 2233 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 77 (rulings on motions in limine in Auxilium bellwether cases and case-specific motions in limine in Holtsclaw v. Auxilium Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Case No. 15 C 3941), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/3/2017. (mk)
November 2, 2017 Filing 2232 NOTICE of Motion by Michelle H. Yeary for presentment of motion for judgment #2231 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/8/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Yeary, Michelle)
November 2, 2017 Filing 2231 MOTION for judgment as a Matter of Law, or Alternatively for a New Trial or Remittitur, and Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Yeary, Michelle)
November 1, 2017 Filing 2230 SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiff's Sealed Documents Related to Dkt. No. 2229 (McLaughlin) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Katz, Seth)
November 1, 2017 Filing 2229 NOTICE of Filing of Deposition Designations (McLaughlin) (Katz, Seth)
November 1, 2017 Filing 2228 SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiff's Sealed Documents Related to Dkt. No. 2227 (Smith) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Katz, Seth)
November 1, 2017 Filing 2227 NOTICE of Filing of Deposition Designations (Smith) (Katz, Seth)
November 1, 2017 Filing 2226 NOTICE of Correction regarding #2225 . (jk, )
November 1, 2017 Filing 2225 ENTERED in error (jk, ).
October 31, 2017 Filing 2224 NOTICE of Filing of Final Exhibit Lists (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Katz, Seth)
October 31, 2017 Filing 2223 SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiff's Sealed Documents Related to Dkt. No. 2222 (Hess) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Katz, Seth)
October 31, 2017 Filing 2222 NOTICE of Filing of Deposition Designations (Hess) (Katz, Seth)
October 30, 2017 Filing 2221 Statement Noting a Party's Death (Kevin Cunningham) (Robinson, Daniel)
October 27, 2017 Filing 2220 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: (This order concerns Konrad v. AbbVie, Inc., Case No. 15-cv-966.) Motion for leave to file excess pages #2218 is granted in part. Defendants have leave to file a memorandum in support of their post-trial motion of up to 25. (mk)(Kennelly, Matthew)
October 27, 2017 Filing 2219 NOTICE of Motion by Michelle H. Yeary for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #2218 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/2/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Yeary, Michelle)
October 27, 2017 Filing 2218 MOTION for leave to file excess pages (Yeary, Michelle)
October 25, 2017 Filing 2217 RESPONSE Plaintiffs' Response In Opposition to AbbVie's Motion to Strike Punitive Damages Award and Enter Judgment as a Matter of Law (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Miracle, Trent)
October 25, 2017 Filing 2216 MEMORANDUM of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Judgment or in the Alternative for a New Trial on Compensatory Damages (Yeary, Michelle)
October 25, 2017 Filing 2215 NOTICE of Motion by Brian John Perkins for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #2213 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/15/2017 at 01:30 PM. (Perkins, Brian)
October 25, 2017 Filing 2214 SEALED DOCUMENT Sealed Exhibit A (Perkins, Brian)
October 25, 2017 Filing 2213 MOTION by Attorney Brian J. Perkins to withdraw as attorney. New address information: Please See Attached Contact Forms (Attachments: #1 Notification of Party Contact Information Forms)(Perkins, Brian) Modified on 3/1/2018 (pjg, ).
October 25, 2017 Filing 2212 MAIL RETURNED, for document #2129 sent to Curtis Sepulveda returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form (ags, )
October 25, 2017 Filing 2211 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on October 19, 2017 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn Cox, Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/15/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2018. (Cox, Carolyn)
October 23, 2017 Filing 2210 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 76 (Rulings on Auxilium's motions to exclude expert testimony and for summary judgment - dkt. 34, 38, & 39 in Holtsclaw v. Auxilium, Case No. 15 C 3941, and dkt. 29, 33, & 34 in Owens v. Auxilium, Case No. 14 C 5180), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/23/2017. (mk)
October 21, 2017 Filing 2209 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Joint motion for leave to file 20 page response briefs on the post-trial motions in the Mitchell case #2207 is granted. (mk)
October 20, 2017 Filing 2208 NOTICE of Motion by Michelle H. Yeary for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #2207 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/24/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Yeary, Michelle)
October 20, 2017 Filing 2207 MOTION for leave to file excess pages (Yeary, Michelle)
October 19, 2017 Filing 2206 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee's Response in Opposition to Auxilium's Motions in Limine (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 17, #16 Exhibit 18, #17 Exhibit 19, #18 Exhibit 20, #19 Exhibit 21, #20 Exhibit 22, #21 Exhibit 23, #22 Exhibit 24, #23 Exhibit 25, #24 Exhibit 26, #25 Exhibit 27, #26 Exhibit 28, #27 Exhibit 29, #28 Exhibit 30, #29 Exhibit 31, #30 Exhibit 32, #31 Exhibit 33, #32 Exhibit 34, #33 Exhibit 35, #34 Exhibit 36)(Miracle, Trent)
October 19, 2017 Filing 2205 RESPONSE Plaintiffs' Steering Committee's Response in Opposition to Auxilium's Motions in Limine (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 37)(Miracle, Trent)
October 19, 2017 Filing 2203 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court sets the case for an in-person conference in chambers on 11/2/2017 at 10:30 a.m., to discuss the status of settlement negotiations involving the plaintiffs and AbbVie. Settlement counsel for plaintiffs and AbbVie, as well as the general counsel for AbbVie, are directed to attend. (mk)
October 19, 2017 Filing 2202 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Docket entry 2198, dated 10/18/2017, contained an error and is corrected to read as follows: Case management conference held by telephone regarding bellwether selection process, as ordered in docket entry 2191 (10/13/2017). The parties are directed to discuss and propose what the Court has referred to as one or more "plan B" proposals to address, for defendants with only one or two bellwether trials scheduled, the need to select replacement case(s) if a bellwether trial case is resolved on summary judgment or otherwise. As indicated during the conference, this may include alternatives to the current bellwether trial plans for the various defendants. A joint status report on this topic is to be filed by no later than 11/9/2017. (mk)
October 19, 2017 Filing 2201 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Docket entry 2198, dated 10/18/2017, contained an error and is corrected to read as follows: Case management conference held by telephone regarding bellwether selection process, as ordered in docket entry 2191 (10/13/2017). The parties are directed to discuss and propose what the Court has referred to as one or more "plan B" proposals to address, for defendants with only one or two bellwether trials scheduled, the need to select replacement case(s) if a bellwether trial case is resolved on summary judgment or otherwise. As indicated during the conference, this may include alternatives to the current bellwether trial plans for the various defendants. A joint status report on this topic is to be filed by no later than 11/9/2017. (mk)
October 18, 2017 Filing 2204 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #2199 , #2198 , #2200 , #2197 sent to Attorney Thomas L. Wagstaff returned as: Unknown Address Error. The Clerk telephoned Thomas L. Wagstaff, no contact made. Mailed to attorney Thomas L. Wagstaff a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
October 18, 2017 Filing 2200 Notice of Motion to Withdraw NOTICE of Motion by Rebecca A.G. Robertson for presentment of (Robertson, Rebecca)
October 18, 2017 Filing 2199 MOTION by Attorney Rebecca A.G. Robertson to withdraw as attorney. No party information provided (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Robertson, Rebecca)
October 18, 2017 Filing 2198 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Case management conference held by telephone regarding bellwether selection process, as ordered in docket entry 2191 (10/13/2017). The parties are directed to discuss and propose what the Court has referred to as one or more "plan B" proposals to address what will occur if, for defendants with only one or two bellwether trials scheduled, to select replacement case(s) if a bellwether trial case is resolved on summary judgment or otherwise. As indicated during the conference, this may include one or more alternatives to the current plan(s). A joint status report on this topic is to be filed by no later than 11/9/2017. (mk)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2197 ORDER directing that a separate jury panel be summoned per request for a separate jury panel for the member case set for jury trial beginning on 1/29/2018, pursuant to Local Rule 47.1(b) by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 10/18/2017. Mailed notice (ags, )
October 14, 2017 Filing 2196 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion for reconsideration #2189 is moot. (mk)
October 14, 2017 Filing 2195 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The corrected entry for the 10/5/2017 case management conference #2185 contained an error and is modified to read as follows: Case management conference held on 10/5/2017. (1) All unresolved items on the agenda discussed. (2) The parties are to confer and submit a proposal for the filing of motions in limine and the final pretrial order for the 1/8/2018 AbbVie bellwether case. (3) For the upcoming Auxilium bellwether trial, the same page limits for motions in limine as set forth for previous bellwether trials shall apply. A red-lined version of the previously used juror questionnaire shall be submitted the day before the final pretrial conference in the Holtsclaw case. Based on reports in chambers that the Holtsclaw v. Auxilium case will not be disposed of prior to trial, the final pretrial order shall only be required in the Holtsclaw case and not in the Owens v. Auxillium case. (4) The Court overrules Lilly's proposal for sequential summary judgment and Daubert briefing in the upcoming Lilly-only bellwether trials. All summary judgment and Daubert motions shall be briefed simultaneously. (5) The Actavis Defendants and the PSC have agreed to voluntary dismiss the Etienne case, currently contained in the bellwether discovery pool, and replace it in the bellwether discovery pool with another DVT/PE case of Actavis Defendants' choosing, Laverne Boyko, et al. v. Actavis, Inc., subject to plaintiff in the Boyko case providing a waiver of Lexecon. (6) A revised proposal on the mixed use cases, consistent with the Court's comments in open court, is to be submitted by 10/10/2017. The 11/30/2017 case management conference is vacated. Further case management conferences are set for 12/15/2017 at 1:30 pm (on a Friday due to the Court's non-MDL trial schedule) and on 1/25/2018 at 1:30 pm. (mk)
October 13, 2017 Filing 2194 RESPONSE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rothweiler, Kenneth)
October 13, 2017 Filing 2193 RESPONSE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rothweiler, Kenneth)
October 13, 2017 Filing 2192 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER # 75 (mixed-use bellwether trial plan), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/13/2017. The Court calls the parties' attention to the fact that it added a paragraph to Section II of the CMO and inserted a date in Section V. (mk)
October 13, 2017 Filing 2191 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court has become concerned that the bellwether selection processes for certain defendants that result in the selection of only two cases for trial may be inadequate, particularly due to the possibility of one or both of the selected cases being resolved on summary judgment or otherwise prior to trial. This would arguably leave that defendant's bellwether process insufficiently representative or non-existent. The Court wishes to promptly discuss with lead counsel a back-up plan for the bellwether selection processes for these defendants. The case is set for a case management conference involving lead counsel and others whose participation is deemed appropriate by lead counsel, to be conducted by telephone at 12:30 PM on Wednesday, October 18, 2017. The call will not last more than 15 minutes (Judge Kennelly will be on trial). Lead counsel for plaintiffs are directed to set up a call-in number and provide the details to other counsel and to Judge Kennelly's courtroom deputy clerk. (mk)
October 13, 2017 Filing 2190 NOTICE of Motion by Brendan A Smith for presentment of motion for reconsideration #2189 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/19/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Smith, Brendan)
October 13, 2017 Filing 2189 MOTION for reconsideration of the Court's October 10, 2017 Minute Entry (Smith, Brendan)
October 12, 2017 Filing 2188 SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion in Limine Sealed Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6)(Miracle, Trent)
October 12, 2017 Filing 2187 MOTION in limine Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion in Limine (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Miracle, Trent)
October 10, 2017 Filing 2186 MAIL RETURNED, for document #2129 sent to Curtis Sepulveda returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; however the document will be mailed a second time. (eaa, )
October 6, 2017 Filing 2183 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 72 (Allocation of trial time for first Auxilium bellwether trial), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/6/2017. (mk)
October 6, 2017 Filing 2182 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 74 (Order Selecting Six Endo Bellwether Workup Cases), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/6/2017. (mk)
October 6, 2017 Filing 2181 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER 73 (Endo Non-Expert Generic Fact Discovery Deadline for Fortesta MDL Bellwether Trial Cases), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/6/2017. (mk)
October 5, 2017 Filing 2185 MINUTE entry #2184 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly is corrected as follows: Case management conference held on 10/5/2017. (1) All unresolved items on the agenda discussed. (2) The parties are to confer and submit a proposal for the filing of motions in limine and the final pretrial order for the 1/8/2018 AbbVie bellwether case. (3) For the upcoming Auxilium bellwether trial, the same page limits for motions in limine as set forth for previous bellwether trials shall apply. A red-lined version of the previously used juror questionnaire shall be submitted the day before the final pretrial conference in the Holtsclaw case. Based on reports in chambers that the Holtsclaw v. Auxilium case will not be disposed of prior to trial, the final pretrial order shall only be required in the Holtsclaw case and not in the Owens v. Auxillium case. (4) The Court overrules Lilly's proposal for sequential summary judgment and Daubert briefing in the upcoming Lilly-only bellwether trials. All summary judgment and Daubert motions shall be briefed simultaneously. (5) Due to the Actavis bellwether case Etienne v. Actavis, Inc., et al, being dismissed, the case to be tried will be Boyko. et al. v. Actavis, Inc. (6) A revised proposal on the mixed use cases, consistent with the Court's comments in open court, is to be submitted by 10/10/2017. The 11/30/2017 case management conference is vacated. Further case management conferences are set for 12/15/2017 at 1:30 pm (on a Friday due to the Court's non-MDL trial schedule) and on 1/25/2018 at 1:30 pm. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
October 5, 2017 Filing 2184 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Case management conference held on 10/5/2017. (1) All unresolved items on the agenda discussed. (2) The parties are to confer and submit a proposal for the filing of motions in limine and the final pretrial order for the 1/8/2018 AbbVie bellwether case. (3) For the upcoming Auxilium bellwether trial, the same page limits for motions in limine as set forth for previous bellwether trials shall apply. A red-lined version of the previously used juror questionnaire shall be submitted the day before the final pretrial conference in the Holtsclaw case. Based on reports in chambers that the Owens v. Auxilium case will not be disposed of prior to trial, the final pretrial order shall only be required in the Owens case and not in the Holtsclaw v. Endo case. (4) The Court overrules Lilly's proposal for sequential summary judgment and Daubert briefing in the upcoming Lilly-only bellwether trials. All summary judgment and Daubert motions shall be briefed simultaneously. (5) Due to the Actavis bellwether case Etienne v. Actavis, Inc., et al, being dismissed, the case to be tried will be Boyko. et al. v. Actavis, Inc. (6) A revised proposal on the mixed use cases, consistent with the Court's comments in open court, is to be submitted by 10/10/2017. The 11/30/2017 case management conference is vacated. Further case management conferences are set for 12/15/2017 at 1:30 pm (on a Friday due to the Court's non-MDL trial schedule) and on 1/25/2018 at 1:30 pm. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
October 4, 2017 Filing 2180 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Lead counsel and other trial counsel who will be present for the case management conference on 10/5/2017 are requested to appear in chambers at 1:15 PM on that date for a pretrial / scheduling conference in advance of the case management conference. (mk)
October 3, 2017 Filing 2179 Joint Agenda for the October 5, 2017 Case Management Conference (Smith, Brendan)
October 3, 2017 Filing 2178 STATUS Report (Joint) for the October 5, 2017 Case Management Conference by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Brendan)
October 2, 2017 Filing 2177 Plaintiffs' Local Rule 56.1 Response to Defendants' Statement of Material Facts in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment on State Law Grounds (Miracle, Trent)
October 2, 2017 Filing 2176 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 2-9 and 11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 11)(Miracle, Trent)
October 2, 2017 Filing 2175 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion of Defendant Auxilium for Summary Judgement on State Law Grounds (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 12, #4 Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit 14)(Miracle, Trent)
October 2, 2017 Filing 2174 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 13 and 14 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14)(Miracle, Trent)
October 2, 2017 Filing 2173 Plaintiffs' Steering Committee's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion of Auxilium Defendants to Exclude Testimony Under Federal Rules of Evidence 702 and 403 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 15)(Miracle, Trent)
October 2, 2017 Filing 2172 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 1, Exhibit 4, Exhibit 7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 7)(Miracle, Trent)
October 2, 2017 Filing 2171 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion of Auxilium Defendants for Summary Judgment on the Ground that Plaintiffs' State Law Failure-to-Warn and Design Defect Claims are Preempted by Federal Law (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9)(Miracle, Trent)
October 2, 2017 Filing 2170 Plaintiffs' Local Rule 56.1 Response to Defendants' Statement of Material Facts in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment on State Law Grounds (Miracle, Trent)
October 2, 2017 Filing 2169 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 8 (Miracle, Trent)
October 2, 2017 Filing 2168 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on State Law Grounds (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10)(Miracle, Trent)
October 2, 2017 Filing 2167 NOTICE of Motion by Brendan A Smith for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #2166 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/5/2017 at 01:30 PM. (Smith, Brendan)
October 2, 2017 Filing 2166 MOTION Plaintiffs' Steering Committee's Motion to Allow Trial Testimony by Contemporaneous Transmission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Smith, Brendan)
September 29, 2017 Filing 2165 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 71 Pretrial Schedule for Auxilium Bellwether Trial Cases), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/29/2017. The parties should note that the Court made changes to the last paragraph of the draft order submitted by counsel. (mk)
September 29, 2017 Filing 2164 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 17-2056 consisting of sealed envelopes: 2 docs #1766 and 1771. (ags, )
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2163 ORDER dated 9/28/2017 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal #1934 ; Appellate case no. : 17-2056. IT IS ORDERED that the parties' joint request to return sealed documents to the district court is GRANTED. The clerk of this court shall return all documents except for nos. 1175, 1176, 1189, 1190, and 1194 to the district court to be maintained under seal in that court. Document nos. 1175, 1176, 1189, 1190, and 1194 shall become part of the public record in this appeal. (ags, )
September 28, 2017 Filing 2162 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion to withdraw #2093 is granted. The Clerk is directed to terminate Attorney Victoria J. Langton as counsel for Actavis, Inc., Actavis Pharma, INc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., and Anda, Inc. (Actavis defendants) on all cases on Exhibit A attached to motion to withdraw #2093 and remove her from all service lists. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
September 28, 2017 Filing 2161 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion to withdraw as attorney #2091 is granted. The Clerk is directed to terminate Attorney Rick David Bailey as counsel for plaintiff on all cases listed on Exhibit A attached to motion to withdraw as attorney #2091 and remove him from all service lists. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
September 28, 2017 Filing 2160 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The joint status report dated 8/22/2017 (dkt. no. 2105) referenced the selection of 6 Activis-only bellwether discovery cases per CMO 37. CMO 37 contemplates that core discovery in those 6 cases will extend through 12/1/2017, followed by a selection process that is to result in 2 bellwether trial cases, from which the Court will select a single case for trial, scheduled for August 2018. However, the recently-filed joint status report for mixed-use cases (dkt. no. 2156) references a Lexecon waiver / non-waiver process that the parties seem to say resulted in "the one trial case." The Court is perplexed by this, because the selection of the 2 (not 1) Actavis cases is not supposed to have taken place yet. This, in turn, has led the Court to revisit the Lexecon waiver / non-waiver process, which evidently had a significantly different outcome for the Actavis cases than for single-use cases involving the other defendants. The Court wishes to have a discussion about this with counsel at both the pre-case management conference meeting on 10/5/2017 and at the case management conference itself, in part because it may have an impact on the process for mixed-use bellwether cases. Attorneys for the PSC and for each defendant with knowledge sufficient to have a full discussion about this are to be present at both the meeting and the conference. (mk)
September 28, 2017 Filing 2159 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 70 - ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO CASES NAMING PFIZER INC., PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, AND ADDITIONAL CO-DEFENDANTS PURSUANT TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 19B (AMENDED), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/28/2017. (mk)
September 28, 2017 Filing 2158 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 69 - ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO CASES NAMING PFIZER INC. AND PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC ONLY PURSUANT TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 19B (AMENDED), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/28/2017. (mk)
September 27, 2017 Filing 2157 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Application of Olga Viner to appear pro hac vice #2065 is granted. (mk)
September 26, 2017 Filing 2156 STATUS Report (Joint) Regarding Mixed Use Cases by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Smith, Brendan)
September 25, 2017 Filing 2155 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court advises that, consistent with Case Management Order No. 38, because both the Konrad and Mitchell cases are being tried to verdict, the Court anticipates that the next AbbVie bellwether trial will be the Nolte case (14-8135), and the Cribbs case (15-1056) will drop behind the Myers case (15-1085) in the sequence. The parties should put this question on the agenda for the upcoming case management conference. (mk)
September 24, 2017 Filing 2154 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 68 (Ruling on AbbVie's motion for sanctions in Rowley v. AbbVie, Inc.), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/24/2017. (mk)
September 22, 2017 Filing 2153 Joint Application for Re-Appointment to the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Brendan)
September 22, 2017 Filing 2152 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The joint motion for dismissals and entry of final judgments and partial final judgments pursuant to amended CMO 19B #2142 is granted. However, contrary to the statement in the motion, draft orders have not been provided. Counsel are directed to provide Word versions to Judge Kennelly's proposed order e-mail address forthwith. (mk)
September 22, 2017 Filing 2151 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 67 (Deadline for supplementation of expert reports in bellwether trial cases), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/22/2017. (mk)
September 20, 2017 Filing 2150 MAIL RETURNED, for document #2121 sent to Curtis Sepulveda returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form (ags, )
September 20, 2017 Filing 2149 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #2143 , #2144 , #2145 , #2147 , #2146 , #2142 , #2141 sent to Attorney Lina Melidonian returned as: Unknown Address Error. Mailed to attorney Lina Melidonian a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
September 20, 2017 Filing 2148 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #2143 , #2144 , #2145 , #2147 , #2146 , #2142 , #2141 sent to Attorney Drew R. Ferrandini returned as: Unknown Address Error. Mailed to attorney Drew R. Ferrandini a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ek, )
September 20, 2017 Filing 2147 SEALED DOCUMENT re: Dkt. No. 2145 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Miracle, Trent)
September 20, 2017 Filing 2146 SEALED DOCUMENT re: Dkt. No. 2144 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Miracle, Trent)
September 20, 2017 Filing 2145 NOTICE of Filing of Deposition Designations (Fields) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Buchanan, David)
September 20, 2017 Filing 2144 NOTICE of Filing of Deposition Designations (Morrow) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Buchanan, David)
September 20, 2017 Filing 2143 JOINT NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Aaron Holian for presentment of motion to dismiss, #2142 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/26/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pfizer Inc. and/or Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC Defendants Only, #2 Exhibit B - Multiple Defendants)(Holian, Matthew)
September 20, 2017 Filing 2142 MOTION by Defendants Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC to dismiss Joint Motion for Dismissals and Entry of Final Judgments and Partial Final Judgments Pursuant to Amended CMO 19B (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pfizer Inc. and/or Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC Defendants Only, #2 Exhibit B - Multiple Defendants, #3 Certificate of Service)(Holian, Matthew)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2141 ORDER directing that a separate jury panel be summoned per request for a separate jury panel for the member case set for jury trial beginning on 1/8/2018, pursuant to Local Rule 47.1(b) by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 9/19/2017. Mailed notice(pjg, )
September 19, 2017 Filing 2140 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court notes that it has not yet received a proposed case management order for mixed-use cases consistent with the Court's directive at the 8/23/2017 case management conference. The parties are directed to provide an agreed proposed order, or alternative proposals, by no later than 9/22/2017. (mk)
September 18, 2017 Filing 2139 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court denies defendants' motion #1974 to certify for interlocutory appeal the Court's ruling denying summary judgment on plaintiffs' failure to warn claims. Among other things, the Court is unpersuaded that an interlocutory appeal would expedite the ultimate resolution of the case. (mk)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2137 ORDER: Seventh Circuit Operating Procedure 10, dated 9/18/2017 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal #934 ; Appellate case no. : 17-2056; This Court has received 114 electronic files under seal from the district court. All documents filed in this Court, except those required to be sealed by statute or rule are considered public. Pursuant to 7th Circuit Operating Procedure 10(b), documents sealed in the district court will be maintained under seal in this Court for fourteen (14) days, to afford time to request the approval required by section (a) of this operating procedure. If any document received under seal did not form the basis of the parties' dispute and the district court's resolution, a party can request that this court return the document to the district court. Baxter International, Inc. v. Abbott Laboratories, 297 F.3d 544, 548 (7th Cir. 2002). Any motion to maintain documents under seal in this court must "analyze in detail, document by document, the propriety of secrecy, providing reasons and legal citations." Id. See also Union Oil Co. of California v. Leavell, 220 F.3d 562, 567-68 (7th Cir. 2000). Absent a motion from a party these sealed documents will be placed in the public record on October 3, 2017. (ags, )
September 17, 2017 Filing 2136 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 66 (Order setting sequence of two Auxilium bellwether trial cases), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/17/2017: The Court calls to the parties' attention that it has added a sentence to the order, consistent with earlier discussions and rulings in this MDL. (mk)
September 17, 2017 Filing 2135 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: It appears to the Court that plaintiffs' motion to compel discovery from Besins #1645 has been fully adjudicated, so the motion is terminated as moot. (mk)
September 16, 2017 Filing 2134 RESPONSE Letter to the Court from Plaintiff re: Preliminary Jury Instructions (Buchanan, David)
September 15, 2017 Filing 2138 USCA RECEIVED on 9/15/2017 the long record regarding notice of appeal #934 (ek, )
September 15, 2017 Filing 2133 LETTER to Judge Matthew F. Kennelly re Preliminary Instructions (Attachments: #1 Proposed Redline to Preliminary Instructions)(Yeary, Michelle)
September 15, 2017 Filing 2132 RESPONSE Letter to Court from Plaintiff Regarding Preliminary Jury Instructions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Proposed Revisions to Preliminary Instructions)(Buchanan, David)
September 15, 2017 Filing 2131 CERTIFIED and transmitted to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal #934 (USCA no. 17-2056) (ek, )
September 14, 2017 Filing 2130 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on September 13, 2017 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn Cox, Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/13/2017. (Cox, Carolyn)
September 13, 2017 Filing 2129 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion for reconsideration #2117 is denied for reasons stated in open court. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
September 13, 2017 Filing 2128 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on September 6, 2017 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn Cox, Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/4/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2017. (Cox, Carolyn)
September 12, 2017 Filing 2127 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits B, C, D, and E re: Dkt. No. 2126 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E)(Miracle, Trent)
September 12, 2017 Filing 2126 RESPONSE Plaintiffs' Opposition to AbbVie's Motion for Reconsideration of Certain in Limine Rulings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit F)(Miracle, Trent)
September 12, 2017 Filing 2125 NOTICE to Transmit Record on Appeal regarding notice of appeal #934 ; USCA Case No. 17-2056. (ags, )
September 11, 2017 Filing 2124 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Anda, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Jesse Lee Beringer (Beringer, Jesse)
September 11, 2017 Filing 2123 LETTER to Judge Matthew F. Kennelly (Attachments: #1 Redline of Preliminary Jury Instruction Excerpts)(Bernick, David)
September 8, 2017 Filing 2122 STIPULATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Solow, Andrew)
September 6, 2017 Filing 2121 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 9/6/2017. Motion for reconsideration #2119 is denied for reasons stated in open court. Proffer or statement regarding motion for reconsideration #2117 is to be submitted by 9/12/2017. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
August 30, 2017 Filing 2120 NOTICE of Motion by Michelle H. Yeary for presentment of motion for reconsideration #2119 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/6/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Yeary, Michelle)
August 30, 2017 Filing 2119 MOTION for reconsideration of the Court's Order Striking Statute of Repose and Statute of Limitations Defenses and Memorandum of Law in Support (Yeary, Michelle)
August 30, 2017 Filing 2118 NOTICE of Motion by Michelle H. Yeary for presentment of motion for reconsideration, #2117 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/6/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Yeary, Michelle)
August 30, 2017 Filing 2117 MOTION for reconsideration of the Court's in Limine Rulings regarding Marketing Materials and Post-Injury Regulatory Activity, and Memorandum of Law in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(Yeary, Michelle)
August 25, 2017 Filing 2116 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on August 24, 2017 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn Cox, Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/15/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/25/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2017. (Cox, Carolyn)
August 24, 2017 Filing 2115 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Case management conference held on 8/24/2017. (1) All unresolved items on the agenda discussed. (2) Additional bellwether jury trials for AbbVie cases are set for 5/7/2018 and 6/4/2018. (3) Simultaneous proposals regarding the sequence of the bellwether trials of Auxilium cases are due by the close of business of 9/13/2017. (4) The parties advise that they will submit a proposed revised summary judgment and Daubert briefing schedule on the Eli Lilly cases, subject to the Court's consideration and approval. (5) The parties are to confer and submit a proposed schedule regarding the "mixed use" cases consistent with the Court's comments. (6) Each sides' responses to post trial motions on the Mitchell case are to be filed by 10/18/2017; replies are to be filed by 11/8/2017. Responses and replies are to address the issue of an inconsistency in the jury's verdict. (7) Regarding the Allied Services case, No. 15 C 9525, the stay is lifted. Plaintiff has until 9/21/2017 to either file an amended complaint or to advise the Court that an amended complaint will not be filed. The response deadline will be discussed at the next CMC for Medical Mutual of Ohio case. (8) Regarding the Konrad case, any motions to strike the two supplemental defense expert reports referenced in the parties' joint status report are due by 8/31/2017; responses are due by 9/7/2017. (9) The next case management conference remains set for 10/5/2017 at 1:30 p.m., with an additional case management conference being set for 11/30/2017 at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
August 24, 2017 Filing 2114 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Anda Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Melissa Yaffa Lerner (Lerner, Melissa)
August 24, 2017 Filing 2113 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 65 (rulings on motions to strike affirmative defenses in Owens v. Auxilium Pharms, Inc., Case No. 14 C 5180 and Holtsclaw v. Auxilium Pharms, Inc., Case No. 15 C 3941), signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/24/2017. (mk)
August 23, 2017 Filing 2112 Plaintiffs' MEMORANDUM in Support of Bill of Costs (Mitchell, 14-cv-9178) (Smith, Brendan) Docket text modified on 8/24/2017 (ags, ).
August 23, 2017 Filing 2111 BILL of Costs (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Troy Rafferty, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Smith, Brendan)
August 23, 2017 Filing 2110 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: : Time for hearing on plaintiffs' motion to alter or amend is reset to the case management conference at 1:30 PM on 8/24/2017. (mk)
August 23, 2017 Filing 2109 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The date for presentment of the motions regarding the Mitchell case that defendant AbbVie noticed for 8/29/2017 is advanced to the case management conference on 8/24/2017, at 1:30 PM. (mk)
August 22, 2017 Filing 2108 EXHIBIT B [REVISED] - Multiple Defendants regarding notice of motion, #2098 (Holian, Matthew)
August 22, 2017 Filing 2107 EXHIBIT B [REVISED] - Multiple Defendants regarding MOTION by Defendants Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC to dismiss Joint Motion for Dismissals and Entry of Final Judgments and Partial Final Judgments Pursuant to Amended CMO 19B #2097 (Holian, Matthew)
August 22, 2017 Filing 2106 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Lead counsel and other trial counsel who will be present for the case management conference on 8/24/2017 are requested to appear in chambers at 1:10 PM on that date for a pretrial /scheduling conference in advance of the case management conference. (mk)
August 22, 2017 Filing 2105 STATUS Report (Joint) for the August 24, 2017 Case Management Conference by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Smith, Brendan)
August 22, 2017 Filing 2104 Joint Agenda for the August 24, 2017 Case Management Conference (Smith, Brendan)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2103 NOTICE of Motion by Brendan A Smith for presentment of motion to alter judgment, #2102 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/24/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Smith, Brendan)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2102 MOTION to alter judgment Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Judgment to Conform the Damages to the Undisputed Evidence or in the Alternative for a New Trial on Compensatory Damages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Smith, Brendan)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2101 MOTION to strike the Punitive Damages Award and Enter Judgment for AbbVie as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 59(e) or, in the Alternative, Rule 59(b), and Memorandum of Law in Support (Yeary, Michelle)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2100 Defendants' NOTICE of Motion by Michelle H. Yeary for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #2099 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/29/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Yeary, Michelle)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2099 MOTION for leave to file excess pages (Yeary, Michelle)
August 18, 2017 Filing 2098 JOINT NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Aaron Holian for presentment of motion to dismiss, #2097 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/29/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cases With Pfizer Inc. and/or Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC Defendants Only, #2 Exhibit B - Cases With Multiple Defendants)(Holian, Matthew)
August 18, 2017 Filing 2097 MOTION by Defendants Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC to dismiss Joint Motion for Dismissals and Entry of Final Judgments and Partial Final Judgments Pursuant to Amended CMO 19B (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pfizer Inc. and/or Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC Defendants Only, #2 Exhibit B - Multiple Defendants, #3 Certificate of Service)(Holian, Matthew)
August 7, 2017 Filing 2096 STIPULATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Solow, Andrew)
August 4, 2017 Filing 2095 Joint Dismissal List Pursuant CMO 26 (Smith, Brendan)
July 27, 2017 Filing 2094 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Daniel Geoppinger for presentment of motion to withdraw #2093 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/24/2017 at 01:30 PM. (Geoppinger, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2017 Filing 2093 MOTION to withdraw Victoria J. Langton as Counsel on behalf of Actavis, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., and Anda, Inc. (Geoppinger, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2017 Filing 2092 NOTICE of Motion by Meghan C. Quinlivan for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #2091 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/24/2017 at 01:30 PM. (Quinlivan, Meghan)
July 27, 2017 Filing 2091 MOTION by Attorney Rick David Bailey to withdraw as attorney. No party information provided (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Quinlivan, Meghan)
July 24, 2017 Filing 2090 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court clarifies minute entry #2089 . The previously set case management conference will still be held on 8/24/2017 at 1:30 p.m. An additional case management conference is set for 10/5/2017 at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
July 24, 2017 Filing 2089 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, because the current year's appointments to the plaintiffs' steering committee expire on 10/15/2017, applications for reappointment are to be filed by 9/22/2017. No case management conference will be held in September 2017 due to the bellwether trial that will begin on 9/18/2017. The next case management conference is set for 10/5/2017 at 1:30 pm, which should fall at about the end of the bellwether trial. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
July 20, 2017 Filing 2088 LETTER to Judge Kennelly re Jury Instructions and Verdict Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Yeary, Michelle)
July 19, 2017 Filing 2087 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Anda, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Redi Kasollja (Kasollja, Redi)
July 19, 2017 Filing 2086 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: As indicated in an entry made earlier today, the Court has been going through the most recent "dismissal lists" submitted in May 2017. It has come across a number of significant errors, for example, cases in which the list says a stipulation for dismissal was filed but there is actually none on the docket, and cases in which the list says that the dismissal concerns only some defendants but examination of the stipulation for dismissal reflects that it disposes of the whole case. In addition (to be fair, partly due to the Court's delay in addressing partial dismissals), there are cases in which the list reflects a stipulation for dismissal of only some defendants, but the intervening dismissals of the Pfizer defendants means that the stipulation will actually dispose of the remainder of the case. For this reason, the Court directs counsel for both sides to "scrub" the May 2017 lists and submit, by August 4, 2017, revised lists that are entirely accurate and, in particular, accurately describe whether the dismissal will result in dismissal of all remaining defendants. The revised lists must be verified by signature by an attorney for each side. The Court advises counsel to wait until Monday, July 24 to begin the scrub, because there are a number of entire-case dismissals from the list that are in the pipeline that should all be entered by Friday, July 21. This will eliminate many cases from the list, thus simplifying the parties' task. (mk)
July 19, 2017 Filing 2085 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court is in the process of reviewing the agreed and non-agreed "dismissal lists" most recently provided by the parties, which were provided in mid-May 2017, and attempting to catch up. The Court has identified, so far, two cases on the agreed dismissal list for which the list represents there is a stipulation of dismissal on file but in fact no such stipulation appears on the docket: Case No. 1:16-cv-1391, and Case No. 1:14-cv-10075. These cases are to be removed from future lists. (mk)
July 18, 2017