Klyzek v. The City of Chicago et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Jianqing Klyzek
Defendant: The City of Chicago, Illinois, Frank Messina, Gerald Di Pasquale, Sandra Stoppa, Daniel Sako, Michael Iglesias, Sergio Flores, T. Jackson, Eugene Sledge, Kenneth Corcoran and D. Puhar
Case Number: 1:2014cv03547
Filed: May 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 29, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER dismissing case, signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/24/2014. (mk)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/24/2014:Motion for entry of final agreed order of dismissal 39 is granted as set forth in the accompanying order. (mk)
September 19, 2014 Filing 40 NOTICE of Motion by Joseph M. Polick for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, 39 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/25/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Polick, Joseph)
September 19, 2014 Filing 39 MOTION by Defendants Kenneth Corcoran, Gerald Di Pasquale, Sergio Flores, Michael Iglesias, T. Jackson, Frank Messina, D. Puhar, Daniel Sako, Eugene Sledge, Sandra Stoppa, The City of Chicago, Illinoisfor Entry of Final Agreed Order of Dismissal (Agreed Motion) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Polick, Joseph)
September 2, 2014 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The case is dismissed without costs or attorney's fees pursuant to the terms of the parties' stipulation, with leave to reinstate solely if the Chicago City Council fails to approve the proposed settlement. The status hearing set for 9/25/2014 is vacated. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
August 29, 2014 Filing 37 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Leave to Reinstate (Polick, Joseph)
August 29, 2014 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephone status hearing held with attorneys for both sides. Based on counsels' report of a settlement subject to City Council approval, the settlement conference set for 9/5/2014 is vacated. A status hearing is set for 9/25/2014 at 9:30 AM. (mk)
August 28, 2014 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court sets the case for a telephone status report on 8/29/2014 at 9:45 AM. Defense counsel is to get plaintiff's counsel on the telephone and then call chambers (312-435-5618). The Court understands that lead plaintiff's counsel is unavailable but is hopeful that one of the other attorneys with an appearance on file for plaintiff will be able to participate. (mk)
August 15, 2014 Filing 34 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kenneth Corcoran by Victoria Rose Benson (Benson, Victoria)
August 8, 2014 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Settlement conference held on 8/8/2014 and continued to 9/5/2014 at 9:00 AM. (mk)
August 8, 2014 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Daniel Sako, Sandra Stoppa by Victoria Rose Benson (Benson, Victoria)
July 21, 2014 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Rule 16(b) status hearing held on 7/21/2014 with attorneys for all parties. Settlement Conference, with parties to be present, is set for 8/8/2014 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
July 21, 2014 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motions for extension of time are granted. The Court will set a due date for responses to the complaint following the settlement conference set for 8/8/2014. (mk)
July 17, 2014 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Gerald Di Pasquale, Frank Messina by Joseph M. Polick (Polick, Joseph)
July 15, 2014 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Sergio Flores, Michael Iglesias, T. Jackson, D. Puhar, Eugene Sledge by Julian Michael Johnson (Johnson, Julian)
July 15, 2014 Filing 27 NOTICE of Motion by Caroline Jane Fronczak for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief 26 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/22/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Fronczak, Caroline)
July 15, 2014 Filing 26 MOTION by Defendants Gerald Di Pasquale, Sergio Flores, Michael Iglesias, T. Jackson, Frank Messina, D. Puhar, Eugene Sledge for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint 1 AMENDED (Fronczak, Caroline)
July 15, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by Caroline Jane Fronczak for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief 24 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/22/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Fronczak, Caroline)
July 15, 2014 Filing 24 MOTION by Defendants Gerald Di Pasquale, Sergio Flores, Michael Iglesias, T. Jackson, Frank Messina, D. Puhar, Eugene Sledge for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint 1 (Fronczak, Caroline)
July 15, 2014 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Gerald Di Pasquale, Frank Messina by Caroline Jane Fronczak (Fronczak, Caroline)
July 15, 2014 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Sergio Flores, Michael Iglesias, T. Jackson, D. Puhar, Eugene Sledge by Victoria Rose Benson (Benson, Victoria)
July 2, 2014 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant City of Chicago's unopposed motion for extension of time 19 is granted; response to complaint is to be filed by 7/28/2014. Today's motion hearing is vacated, but the case remains set for the initial status hearing on 7/21/2014 as previously ordered. (mk)
June 27, 2014 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Marion Claire Moore for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 19 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/2/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Moore, Marion)
June 27, 2014 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendant The City of Chicago, Illinois for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead, Unopposed (Moore, Marion)
June 27, 2014 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The City of Chicago, Illinois by Marion Claire Moore (Moore, Marion)
June 20, 2014 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 7/21/2014 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Judges.aspx. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk)
May 27, 2014 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jianqing Klyzek as to Sandra Stoppa on 5/23/2014, answer due 6/13/2014. (Turkcan, Kevin)
May 27, 2014 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jianqing Klyzek as to Eugene Sledge on 5/23/2014, answer due 6/13/2014. (Turkcan, Kevin)
May 27, 2014 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jianqing Klyzek as to Daniel Sako on 5/23/2014, answer due 6/13/2014. (Turkcan, Kevin)
May 27, 2014 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jianqing Klyzek as to D. Puhar on 5/23/2014, answer due 6/13/2014. (Turkcan, Kevin)
May 27, 2014 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jianqing Klyzek as to Frank Messina on 5/23/2014, answer due 6/13/2014. (Turkcan, Kevin)
May 27, 2014 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jianqing Klyzek as to T. Jackson on 5/23/2014, answer due 6/13/2014. (Turkcan, Kevin)
May 27, 2014 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jianqing Klyzek as to Michael Iglesias on 5/23/2014, answer due 6/13/2014. (Turkcan, Kevin)
May 27, 2014 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jianqing Klyzek as to Sergio Flores on 5/23/2014, answer due 6/13/2014. (Turkcan, Kevin)
May 27, 2014 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jianqing Klyzek as to Gerald Di Pasquale on 5/23/2014, answer due 6/13/2014. (Turkcan, Kevin)
May 27, 2014 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jianqing Klyzek as to Kenneth Corcoran on 5/23/2014, answer due 6/13/2014. (Turkcan, Kevin)
May 27, 2014 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jianqing Klyzek as to The City of Chicago, Illinois on 5/23/2014, answer due 6/13/2014. (Turkcan, Kevin)
May 22, 2014 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jianqing Klyzek by Elizabeth Roslyn Uribe (Uribe, Elizabeth)
May 20, 2014 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jianqing Klyzek by Kevin Thomas Turkcan (Turkcan, Kevin)
May 15, 2014 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Kenneth Corcoran, Gerald Di Pasquale, Sergio Flores, Michael Iglesias, T. Jackson, Frank Messina, D. Puhar, Daniel Sako, Eugene Sledge, Sandra Stoppa, The City of Chicago, Illinois (pg, )
May 15, 2014 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. (rc, )
May 14, 2014 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jianqing Klyzek by Torreya Lyn Hamilton (Hamilton, Torreya)
May 14, 2014 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hamilton, Torreya)
May 14, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jianqing Klyzek; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9484458.(Hamilton, Torreya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klyzek v. The City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jianqing Klyzek
Represented By: Torreya Lyn Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Turkcan
Represented By: Elizabeth Roslyn Uribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Chicago, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Messina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Di Pasquale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Stoppa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Sako
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Iglesias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Sledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Puhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?