Beverly et al v. Chicago State University Board of Trustees et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Beverly and Robert Bionaz
Defendant: Chicago State University Board of Trustees, Wayne D. Watson, Patrick Cage and Janelle Carter
Case Number: 1:2014cv04970
Filed: July 1, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Joan B. Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 9/29/2017. Mailed notice(mjc, )
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan on 7/7/2016. Mailed notice(sxw, )
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan on 8/28/2015: Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel 101 is denied. [For further details see memorandum opinion and order.] Mailed notice. (is, )
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 1/13/2015.Mailed notice(ef, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beverly et al v. Chicago State University Board of Trustees et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Beverly
Represented By: Robert Corn-Revere
Represented By: Ronald Gary London
Represented By: Jessica Tovrov
Represented By: Lisa Beth Zycherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bionaz
Represented By: Robert Corn-Revere
Represented By: Ronald Gary London
Represented By: Jessica Tovrov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago State University Board of Trustees
Represented By: Michael T. Dierkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne D. Watson
Represented By: Michael T. Dierkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Cage
Represented By: Michael T. Dierkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janelle Carter
Represented By: Michael T. Dierkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?