O'Brien et al v. Caterpillar, Inc.
Plaintiff: Estate of Earnest Valentine through Everree Valentine, Gary Wells, Kenneth Burian, Ronald Garner, Robert Paterson, Paul Toth, Billie Robinson, Stephen Murphy, Gary Lucca, Moises Moreno, Timothy O'Brien, Glenn Boynton, Timothy Bernico, Jr., Estate of Paul Brown through Dian Brown, Horace Ebbert, Richard Baran, Barnett Gray, Rollin Mueller, Steven Westhoff, Bernard Sexton, William Swinke, James Murdie, Samuel Bridges, David Key, Robert Lee Morgan, John Blasdel, Estate of Richard Krug through Margaret Krug, James Langs, Wayne Wright, Curtis Clark, Will Terry, John Olznoi, Leonard Parish, Jr., Charles Washington, Randel Luckey, Thomas Platt, Richard Scott, Carlos Sanchez, William Brady, Pedro Reyes, Walter Sayers, John Williamson, William Rathbun, Kenneth Noble, Frank Carroll III, Richard Wicker, Victoriano Martinez and Richard Sargent
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv07229
Filed: September 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 621
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Filing 91 CERTIFIED COPY OF USCA JUDGMENT dated 8/20/2018 regarding notice of appeal #81 ; USCA No. 17-2956 : The judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED, with costs, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (sxb, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 90 CERTIFIED COPY OF OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Argued 3/28/2018; Decided 8/20/2018 in USCA case no. 17-2956. (sxb, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 89 MANDATE of USCA dated 9/11/2018 regarding notice of appeal #81 ; USCA No. 17-2956 ; No record to be returned. (sxb, )
February 22, 2018 Filing 88 USCA RECEIVED on 2/22/18 the Long record regarding notice of appeal,,, #81 (gcy, )
February 22, 2018 Filing 87 ENTERED IN ERROR. (gcy, ) Modified on 2/22/2018 (gcy, ).
February 22, 2018 Filing 86 CERTIFIED and transmitted to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal #81 (USCA no. 17-2956). (gcy, )
February 22, 2018 Filing 85 NOTICE to Transmit Record on Appeal regarding notice of appeal #81 ; USCA Case No. 17-2956. (jk, )
September 21, 2017 Filing 84 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal,,, #81 . Notified counsel (ek, )
September 21, 2017 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal, #81 (ek, )
September 21, 2017 Filing 82 DOCKETING Statement by Richard Baran, Timothy Bernico, Jr., John Blasdel, Glenn Boynton, William Brady, Samuel Bridges, Kenneth Burian, Frank Carroll III, Curtis Clark, Horace Ebbert, Estate of Earnest Valentine through Everree Valentine, Estate of Paul Brown through Dian Brown, Estate of Richard Krug through Margaret Krug, Ronald Garner, Barnett Gray, David Key, James Langs, Gary Lucca, Randel Luckey, Victoriano Martinez, Moises Moreno, Robert Lee Morgan, Rollin Mueller, James Murdie, Stephen Murphy, Kenneth Noble, Timothy O'Brien, John Olznoi, Leonard Parish, Jr., Robert Paterson, Thomas Platt, William Rathbun, Pedro Reyes, Billie Robinson, Carlos Sanchez, Richard Sargent, Walter Sayers, Richard Scott, Bernard Sexton, William Swinke, Will Terry, Paul Toth, Charles Washington, Gary Wells, Steven Westhoff, Richard Wicker, John Williamson, Wayne Wright regarding notice of appeal,,, #81 (Galland, George)
September 21, 2017 Filing 81 NOTICE of appeal by Richard Baran, Timothy Bernico, Jr., John Blasdel, Glenn Boynton, William Brady, Samuel Bridges, Kenneth Burian, Frank Carroll III, Curtis Clark, Horace Ebbert, Estate of Earnest Valentine through Everree Valentine, Estate of Paul Brown through Dian Brown, Estate of Richard Krug through Margaret Krug, Ronald Garner, Barnett Gray, David Key, James Langs, Gary Lucca, Randel Luckey, Victoriano Martinez, Moises Moreno, Robert Lee Morgan, Rollin Mueller, James Murdie, Stephen Murphy, Kenneth Noble, Timothy O'Brien, John Olznoi, Leonard Parish, Jr., Robert Paterson, Thomas Platt, William Rathbun, Pedro Reyes, Billie Robinson, Carlos Sanchez, Richard Sargent, Walter Sayers, Richard Scott, Bernard Sexton, William Swinke, Will Terry, Paul Toth, Charles Washington, Gary Wells, Steven Westhoff, Richard Wicker, John Williamson, Wayne Wright regarding orders #80 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-13602476. (Galland, George)
August 31, 2017 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/31/2017. Mailed notice (jk, )
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached memorandum opinion and order, this Court grants summary judgment in favor of Caterpillar and denies summary judgment for plaintiffs. Civil case terminated. Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/31/2017. Mailed notice (jk, )
March 10, 2017 Filing 78 NOTICE by Heather Suzanne Lehman of Change of Address (Name Change) (Lehman, Heather)
January 19, 2017 Filing 77 RESPONSE by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Additional Authority #74 (Torres, Joseph)
January 12, 2017 Filing 76 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to cite additional authority #74 is granted. Defendant granted 7 days to file a maximum 2 page response addressing only the Karlo case. No appearance necessary on 1/18/2017.Mailed notice (rth, )
January 11, 2017 Filing 75 NOTICE of Motion by George Freeman Galland, Jr for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief,,, #74 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/18/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Galland, George)
January 11, 2017 Filing 74 MOTION by Plaintiffs Richard Baran, Timothy Bernico, Jr., John Blasdel, Glenn Boynton, William Brady, Samuel Bridges, Kenneth Burian, Frank Carroll III, Curtis Clark, Horace Ebbert, Estate of Earnest Valentine through Everree Valentine, Estate of Paul Brown through Dian Brown, Estate of Richard Krug through Margaret Krug, Ronald Garner, Barnett Gray, David Key, James Langs, Gary Lucca, Randel Luckey, Victoriano Martinez, Moises Moreno, Robert Lee Morgan, Rollin Mueller, James Murdie, Stephen Murphy, Kenneth Noble, Timothy O'Brien, John Olznoi, Leonard Parish, Jr., Robert Paterson, Thomas Platt, William Rathbun, Pedro Reyes, Billie Robinson, Carlos Sanchez, Richard Sargent, Walter Sayers, Richard Scott, Bernard Sexton, William Swinke, Will Terry, Paul Toth, Charles Washington, Gary Wells, Steven Westhoff, Richard Wicker, John Williamson, Wayne WrightCITE ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY (Galland, George)
October 31, 2016 Filing 73 RESPONSE by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to Rule 56 statement #65 Response to Plaintiffs Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Additional Facts (Torres, Joseph)
October 31, 2016 Filing 72 REPLY by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to motion for summary judgment #61 Reply in Support of Caterpillar's Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek Barella, #2 Unpublished Cases)(Torres, Joseph)
October 31, 2016 Filing 71 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re appendix, #70 -- NOTICE TO THE COURT OF FILING OF APPENDIX OF UNREPORTED DECISIONS (Galland, George)
October 31, 2016 Filing 70 APPENDIX response in support of motion,,,, #69 , memorandum in opposition to motion,,, #64 , memorandum in support of motion,,, #59 -- PLS.' APPENDIX OF UNREPORTED DECISIONS CITED IN ITS THREE MEMORANDA OF LAW ADDRESSING THE PARTIES' CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Galland, George)
October 31, 2016 Filing 69 RESPONSE by Richard Baran, Timothy Bernico, Jr., John Blasdel, Glenn Boynton, William Brady, Samuel Bridges, Kenneth Burian, Frank Carroll III, Curtis Clark, Horace Ebbert, Estate of Earnest Valentine through Everree Valentine, Estate of Paul Brown through Dian Brown, Estate of Richard Krug through Margaret Krug, Ronald Garner, Barnett Gray, David Key, James Langs, Gary Lucca, Randel Luckey, Victoriano Martinez, Moises Moreno, Robert Lee Morgan, Rollin Mueller, James Murdie, Stephen Murphy, Kenneth Noble, Timothy O'Brien, John Olznoi, Leonard Parish, Jr., Robert Paterson, Thomas Platt, William Rathbun, Pedro Reyes, Billie Robinson, Carlos Sanchez, Richard Sargent, Walter Sayers, Richard Scott, Bernard Sexton, William Swinke, Will Terry, Paul Toth, Charles Washington, Gary Wells, Steven Westhoff, Richard Wicker, John Williamson, Wayne Wrightin Support of MOTION by Plaintiffs Billie Robinson, Pedro Reyes, Moises Moreno, Estate of Paul Brown through Dian Brown, Kenneth Noble, James Langs, Richard Baran, Timothy O'Brien, Gary Lucca, Thomas Platt, Estate of Richard Krug through Margaret Krug, Steven W #58 (Galland, George)
October 17, 2016 Filing 68 RESPONSE by Caterpillar, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Billie Robinson, Pedro Reyes, Moises Moreno, Estate of Paul Brown through Dian Brown, Kenneth Noble, James Langs, Richard Baran, Timothy O'Brien, Gary Lucca, Thomas Platt, Estate of Richard Krug through Margaret Krug, Steven W #58 For Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek G. Barella, #2 Exhibit 1)(Torres, Joseph)
October 17, 2016 Filing 67 RESPONSE by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Local Rule 56.1 Statement Of Uncontested Facts (Torres, Joseph)
October 17, 2016 Filing 66 RULE 56.1 Statement of Additional Facts In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Summary Judgment (Torres, Joseph)
October 17, 2016 Filing 65 RULE 56 Statement -- PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL FACTS AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S LOCAL RULE 56.1 STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Galland, George)
October 17, 2016 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM by Richard Baran, Timothy Bernico, Jr., John Blasdel, Glenn Boynton, William Brady, Samuel Bridges, Kenneth Burian, Frank Carroll III, Curtis Clark, Horace Ebbert, Estate of Earnest Valentine through Everree Valentine, Estate of Paul Brown through Dian Brown, Estate of Richard Krug through Margaret Krug, Ronald Garner, Barnett Gray, David Key, James Langs, Gary Lucca, Randel Luckey, Victoriano Martinez, Moises Moreno, Robert Lee Morgan, Rollin Mueller, James Murdie, Stephen Murphy, Kenneth Noble, Timothy O'Brien, John Olznoi, Leonard Parish, Jr., Robert Paterson, Thomas Platt, William Rathbun, Pedro Reyes, Billie Robinson, Carlos Sanchez, Richard Sargent, Walter Sayers, Richard Scott, Bernard Sexton, William Swinke, Will Terry, Paul Toth, Charles Washington, Gary Wells, Steven Westhoff, Richard Wicker, John Williamson, Wayne Wright in Opposition to motion for summary judgment #61 (Galland, George)
September 16, 2016 Filing 63 RULE 56.1 Statement by Caterpillar, Inc. regarding motion for summary judgment #61 (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1- Declaration of David Stevens, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit 2- Declaration of Derek G. Barella, #21 Exhibit A Part 1, #22 Exhibit A Part 2, #23 Exhibit B, #24 Exhibit C, #25 Exhibit D, #26 Exhibit E, #27 Exhibit F, #28 Exhibit G, #29 Exhibit 3- Unpublished Decisions)(Torres, Joseph)
September 16, 2016 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM by Caterpillar, Inc. in support of motion for summary judgment #61 (Torres, Joseph)
September 16, 2016 Filing 61 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for summary judgment (Torres, Joseph)
September 16, 2016 Filing 60 RULE 56.1 Statement (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of George F. Galland, Jr., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Certificate of Service)(Galland, George)
September 16, 2016 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM by Richard Baran, Timothy Bernico, Jr., John Blasdel, Glenn Boynton, William Brady, Samuel Bridges, Kenneth Burian, Frank Carroll III, Curtis Clark, Horace Ebbert, Estate of Earnest Valentine through Everree Valentine, Estate of Paul Brown through Dian Brown, Estate of Richard Krug through Margaret Krug, Ronald Garner, Barnett Gray, David Key, James Langs, Gary Lucca, Randel Luckey, Victoriano Martinez, Moises Moreno, Robert Lee Morgan, Rollin Mueller, James Murdie, Stephen Murphy, Kenneth Noble, Timothy O'Brien, John Olznoi, Leonard Parish, Jr., Robert Paterson, Thomas Platt, William Rathbun, Pedro Reyes, Billie Robinson, Carlos Sanchez, Richard Sargent, Walter Sayers, Richard Scott, Bernard Sexton, William Swinke, Will Terry, Paul Toth, Charles Washington, Gary Wells, Steven Westhoff, Richard Wicker, John Williamson, Wayne Wright in support of motion for partial summary judgment,,, #58 (Galland, George)
September 16, 2016 Filing 58 MOTION by Plaintiffs Billie Robinson, Pedro Reyes, Moises Moreno, Estate of Paul Brown through Dian Brown, Kenneth Noble, James Langs, Richard Baran, Timothy O'Brien, Gary Lucca, Thomas Platt, Estate of Richard Krug through Margaret Krug, Steven Westhoff, John Olznoi, Stephen Murphy, Leonard Parish, Jr., Paul Toth, Victoriano Martinez, Barnett Gray, James Murdie, Frank Carroll III, William Rathbun, Richard Sargent, Curtis Clark, Will Terry, Charles Washington, Robert Lee Morgan, John Williamson, Ronald Garner, Rollin Mueller, Robert Paterson, William Brady, William Swinke, Walter Sayers, Timothy Bernico, Jr., Samuel Bridges, Estate of Earnest Valentine through Everree Valentine, Horace Ebbert, Wayne Wright, David Key, Bernard Sexton, Kenneth Burian, John Blasdel, Carlos Sanchez, Richard Wicker, Richard Scott, Gary Wells, Randel Luckey, Glenn Boynton for partial summary judgment (Galland, George)
August 5, 2016 Filing 57 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Jury Trial set for 10/23/2017 at 10:00 AM. Status hearing set to 8/29/2016 is hereby stricken. New dates, as necessary, will be set forth at a later date.Mailed notice (rth, )
August 3, 2016 Filing 56 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: The parties jointly advise the court that a settlement conference will not be productive at this time. Settlement conference set for 8/16/16 at 2:00 p.m. is stricken. All matters relating to the referral of this case having been resolved, this matter is returned to the District Judge. Referral terminated. Mailed notice (ao,)
July 27, 2016 Filing 55 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: Magistrate Judge Status hearing held. The parties have confirmed a settlement conference for 8/16/16 at 2:00 p.m. In light of the particular circumstances of this case, the Court grants both parties leave for counsel to appear at the settlement conference without their respective clients being present, provided counsel has secured full settlement authority or is able to readily contact the client with full settlement authority by phone. Plaintiff's settlement letter shall be delivered to Defendant, with a copy delivered to the Court, in chambers, on or before 8/3/16. Defendant's settlement letter shall be delivered to Plaintiff, with a copy delivered to the Court, in chambers, on or before 8/10/16. The parties can submit their respective documents by email to Proposed_Order_Weisman@ilnd.uscourts.gov. However, please note that settlement letters are not to be filed on the CM-ECF system. Mailed notice (ao,)
July 18, 2016 Filing 54 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 7/18/2016. Dispositive motions with supporting memoranda due by 9/16/2016. Responses due by 10/17/2016. Replies due by 10/31/2016. Extensions if this schedule will be disfavored. Status hearing set for 8/29/2016 at 09:00 AM to set a trial date. Parties shall consider September or late October of 2017 for trial. If parties can agree on a date, contact the courtroom deputy to set the date. Civil trial dates are firm and may only be moved for a criminal trial.Mailed notice (rth, )
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: In order to maintain continuity of case management, the date of 7/27/16 for status, previously set by Magistrate Judge Schenkier remains. Status hearing set for 7/27/16 at 9:30 a.m., will be held before the newly assigned Magistrate Judge M. David Weisman, in courtroom 1300. Mailed notice (ao,)
June 16, 2016 Filing 52 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that M. David Weisman has entered on duty as a Magistrate Judge for the Northern District of Illinois, with a duty station in Chicago, Illinois, effective June 16, 2016; therefore Pursuant to Internal Operating Procedure 17 and the Executive Committee order signed on May 31, 2106, the attached list of civil referrals are hereby transferred to the initial calendar of Magistrate Judge Weisman. Case referred to the Honorable M. David Weisman. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/16/2016. Mailed notice. (tt, )
June 1, 2016 Filing 51 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Status hearing held. The parties report on the status of expert discovery. The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 7/27/16 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
May 26, 2016 Filing 50 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant's agreed motion for extension of time to complete expert discovery #48 is granted. No appearance required on 5/31/2016. Disclosure of Defendant's expert(s) and production of expert report(s) by 6/9/2016. Deposition of Defendant's expert(s) by 7/8/2016. All expert discovery to be completed by 7/29/2016. Status hearing set to 7/18/2016 shall stand.Mailed notice (rth, )
May 23, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE of Motion by Derek Grady Barella for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #48 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 5/31/2016 at 08:45 AM. (Barella, Derek)
May 23, 2016 Filing 48 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for extension of time to complete discovery (Expert Discovery Dates) AGREED (Barella, Derek)
April 11, 2016 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing set to 6/17/2016 is hereby stricken.Mailed notice (rth, )
April 11, 2016 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant's joint motion to extend expert discovery #44 is granted. Plaintiffs' production of Mr. Soule's amended report due by April 15, 2016. Resumption and completion of Mr. Soules deposition by April 26, 2016. Disclosure of Defendant's expert(s) and production of expert report(s) by May 26, 2016. Deposition of Defendant's expert(s) by June 24, 2016. All expert discovery to be completed by July 15,2016. No appearance required on 4/14/2016. Status hearing set for 7/18/2016 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (rth, )
April 8, 2016 Filing 45 NOTICE of Motion by Derek Grady Barella for presentment of extension of time #44 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 4/14/2016 at 08:45 AM. (Barella, Derek)
April 8, 2016 Filing 44 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for extension of time in Schedule for Expert Discovery (JOINT) (Barella, Derek)
March 8, 2016 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Magistrate Judge status hearing held and continued to 6/1/2016 at 9:00 a.m. Parties reported that they are on track to complete expert discovery by the deadlines set by the district judge. Mailed notice (meg, )
February 22, 2016 Filing 42 NOTICE by George Freeman Galland, Jr of Change of Address (Galland, George)
February 22, 2016 Filing 41 NOTICE by David Paul Baltmanis of Change of Address (Baltmanis, David)
January 7, 2016 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing set for 1/8/2016 is stricken and reset to 6/17/2016 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (rth, )
January 6, 2016 Filing 39 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Joint motion to revise expert discovery schedule #36 is granted. No appearance required on 1/12/2016. Disclosure of Plaintiffs' expert report(s) by February 15, 2016. Deposition of Plaintiffs' expert(s) by March 16, 2016. Disclosure of Defendant's expert report(s) by April 16, 2016. Deposition of Defendant's expert(s) by May 16, 2016. All expert discovery to be completed by June 16, 2016.Mailed notice (rth, )
January 5, 2016 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: At the parties' request, the status hearing with the magistrate judge set for 1/08/16 is stricken. The status hearing with the magistrate judge is reset to 3/08/16 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
January 5, 2016 Filing 37 NOTICE of Motion by David Paul Baltmanis for presentment of extension of time,,, #36 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/12/2016 at 08:45 AM. (Baltmanis, David)
January 4, 2016 Filing 36 MOTION by Plaintiffs Richard Baran, Timothy Bernico, Jr., John Blasdel, Glenn Boynton, William Brady, Samuel Bridges, Kenneth Burian, Frank Carroll III, Curtis Clark, Horace Ebbert, Estate of Earnest Valentine through Everree Valentine, Estate of Paul Brown through Dian Brown, Estate of Richard Krug through Margaret Krug, Ronald Garner, Barnett Gray, David Key, James Langs, Gary Lucca, Randel Luckey, Victoriano Martinez, Moises Moreno, Robert Lee Morgan, Rollin Mueller, James Murdie, Stephen Murphy, Kenneth Noble, Timothy O'Brien, John Olznoi, Leonard Parish, Jr., Robert Paterson, Thomas Platt, William Rathbun, Pedro Reyes, Billie Robinson, Carlos Sanchez, Richard Sargent, Walter Sayers, Richard Scott, Bernard Sexton, William Swinke, Will Terry, Paul Toth, Charles Washington, Gary Wells, Steven Westhoff, Richard Wicker, John Williamson, Wayne Wright for extension of time Joint Motion To Revise Expert Discovery Schedule (Herman, Athena)
December 10, 2015 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Status hearing held. The parties report on the status of discovery. The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 1/08/16 at 9:00 a.m. for a report on whether the parties are interested in a settlement conference prior to the commencement of expert discovery. Mailed notice. (jj, )
November 10, 2015 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Status hearing held. Defendant's counsel does not appear. Plaintiff's counsel reports on the status of discovery. The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 12/10/15 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Status hearing held. The parties report on the status of discovery. The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 11/10/15 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
September 4, 2015 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman:Agreed Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines #30 is granted. Fact discovery extended to December 14, 2015 and disclosure of expert reports extended to January 13, 2016. Status hearing set for 9/11/2015 at 9:00 a.m. is reset to 1/8/2016 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
September 2, 2015 Filing 31 NOTICE of Motion by Derek Grady Barella for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #30 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/9/2015 at 08:45 AM. (Barella, Derek)
September 2, 2015 Filing 30 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for extension of time to complete discovery (AGREED) (Barella, Derek)
August 13, 2015 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Status hearing held. Plaintiffs' counsel does not appear. Defendant's counsel reports on the status of discovery. The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 9/24/15 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
June 25, 2015 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Status hearing held. The parties report on the status of discovery. The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 8/13/15 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
June 18, 2015 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing set for 6/19/2015 is stricken and reset to 9/11/2015 at 09:00 AM. in light of proceedings before Magistrate Judge Schenkier.Mailed notice (rth, )
May 18, 2015 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Agreed motion for extension of time to complete discovery #24 is granted. No appearance required on 5/19/2015. Fact Discovery deadline extended to 9/15/2015. The date for disclosure of expert reports extended to October 15, 2015.Mailed notice (rth, )
May 12, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by George Freeman Galland, Jr for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery,,, #24 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 5/19/2015 at 08:45 AM. (Galland, George)
May 12, 2015 Filing 24 MOTION by Plaintiffs Richard Baran, Timothy Bernico, Jr., John Blasdel, Glenn Boynton, William Brady, Samuel Bridges, Kenneth Burian, Frank Carroll III, Curtis Clark, Horace Ebbert, Estate of Earnest Valentine through Everree Valentine, Estate of Paul Brown through Dian Brown, Estate of Richard Krug through Margaret Krug, Ronald Garner, Barnett Gray, David Key, James Langs, Gary Lucca, Randel Luckey, Victoriano Martinez, Moises Moreno, Robert Lee Morgan, Rollin Mueller, James Murdie, Stephen Murphy, Kenneth Noble, Timothy O'Brien, John Olznoi, Leonard Parish, Jr., Robert Paterson, Thomas Platt, William Rathbun, Pedro Reyes, Billie Robinson, Carlos Sanchez, Richard Sargent, Walter Sayers, Richard Scott, Bernard Sexton, William Swinke, Will Terry, Paul Toth, Charles Washington, Gary Wells, Steven Westhoff, Richard Wicker, John Williamson, Wayne Wright for extension of time to complete discovery -- AGREED MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DATES (Galland, George)
May 6, 2015 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Status hearing held. The parties report on the status of ESI discovery. The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 6/25/15 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
April 22, 2015 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: At the request of the parties, the status hearing set for 4/28/15 before the magistrate judge is RESET to 5/06/15 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
April 1, 2015 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Status hearing held. The parties report on the status of discovery. The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 4/28/15 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
March 10, 2015 Filing 20 AGREED Confidentiality Order. Signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 3/10/2015. Mailed notice. (jl, )
January 14, 2015 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Status hearing held. The parties report on the status of the case. The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 4/01/15 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
December 22, 2014 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: The Court, sua sponte, sets the matter for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 1/14/15 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
December 19, 2014 Filing 17 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision, settlement conference.(rth, )Mailed notice.
December 19, 2014 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 12/19/2014. Rule 26(a) disclosure by 1/16/2015. Fact Discovery ordered closed by 5/15/2015. Disclosure of expert reports due by 6/15/2015. Status hearing set for 6/19/2015 at 09:00 AM. The case is referred to Magistrate Judge Schenkier for discovery supervision as well as settlement discussions.Mailed notice (rth, )
December 12, 2014 Filing 15 STATUS Report -- JOINT STATUS REPORT by Richard Baran, Timothy Bernico, Jr., John Blasdel, Glenn Boynton, William Brady, Samuel Bridges, Kenneth Burian, Frank Carroll III, Curtis Clark, Horace Ebbert, Estate of Earnest Valentine through Everree Valentine, Estate of Paul Brown through Dian Brown, Estate of Richard Krug through Margaret Krug, Ronald Garner, Barnett Gray, David Key, James Langs, Gary Lucca, Randel Luckey, Victoriano Martinez, Moises Moreno, Robert Lee Morgan, Rollin Mueller, James Murdie, Stephen Murphy, Kenneth Noble, Timothy O'Brien, John Olznoi, Leonard Parish, Jr., Robert Paterson, Thomas Platt, William Rathbun, Pedro Reyes, Billie Robinson, Carlos Sanchez, Richard Sargent, Walter Sayers, Richard Scott, Bernard Sexton, William Swinke, Will Terry, Paul Toth, Charles Washington, Gary Wells, Steven Westhoff, Richard Wicker, John Williamson, Wayne Wright (Galland, George)
November 14, 2014 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing set for 12/19/2014 at 09:00 AM. Parties shall meet, confer and be prepared to file a joint, written status report, including a proposed discovery scheduling plan in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge.Mailed notice (rth, )
October 9, 2014 Filing 13 ANSWER to amended complaint by Caterpillar, Inc.(Torres, Joseph)
October 9, 2014 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Caterpillar, Inc. (Torres, Joseph)
September 26, 2014 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. by Heather Suzanne Lehman (Lehman, Heather)
September 26, 2014 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. by Derek Grady Barella (Barella, Derek)
September 26, 2014 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. by Joseph James Torres (Torres, Joseph)
September 19, 2014 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Billie Robinson, Pedro Reyes, Moises Moreno, Estate of Paul Brown through Dian Brown, Kenneth Noble, James Langs, Richard Baran, Timothy O'Brien, Gary Lucca, Thomas Platt, Estate of Richard Krug through Margaret Krug, Steven Westhoff, John Olznoi, Stephen Murphy, Leonard Parish, Jr., Paul Toth, Victoriano Martinez, Barnett Gray, James Murdie, Frank Carroll III, William Rathbun, Richard Sargent, Curtis Clark, Will Terry, Charles Washington, Robert Lee Morgan, John Williamson, Ronald Garner, Rollin Mueller, Robert Paterson, William Brady, William Swinke, Walter Sayers, Timothy Bernico, Jr., Samuel Bridges, Estate of Earnest Valentine through Everree Valentine, Horace Ebbert, Wayne Wright, David Key, Bernard Sexton, Kenneth Burian, John Blasdel, Carlos Sanchez, Richard Wicker, Richard Scott, Gary Wells, Randel Luckey, Glenn Boynton against Caterpillar, Inc. (Galland, George)
September 18, 2014 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Billie Robinson, Pedro Reyes, Moises Moreno, Estate of Paul Brown through Dian Brown, Kenneth Noble, James Langs, Timothy O'Brien, Gary Lucca, Thomas Platt, Estate of Richard Krug through Margaret Krug, Steven Westhoff, Stephen Murphy, John Olznoi, Leonard Parish, Jr., Paul Toth, Barnett Gray, Victoriano Martinez, James Murdie, William Rathbun, Richard Sargent, Curtis Clark, Will Terry, Charles Washington, Robert Lee Morgan, John Williamson, Ronald Garner, Rollin Mueller, Robert Paterson, William Swinke, Walter Sayers, Estate of Earnest Valentine through Everree Valentine, Horace Ebbert, Wayne Wright, David Key, Bernard Sexton, Carlos Sanchez, Richard Wicker, Richard Scott, Gary Wells, Randel Luckey as to All Defendants. (Galland, George)
September 18, 2014 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Richard Baran, Timothy Bernico, Jr., John Blasdel, Glenn Boynton, William Brady, Samuel Bridges, Kenneth Burian, Frank Carroll III, Curtis Clark, Horace Ebbert, Estate of Earnest Valentine through Everree Valentine, Estate of Paul Brown through Dian Brown, Estate of Richard Krug through Margaret Krug, Ronald Garner, Barnett Gray, David Key, James Langs, Gary Lucca, Randel Luckey, Victoriano Martinez, Moises Moreno, Robert Lee Morgan, Rollin Mueller, James Murdie, Stephen Murphy, Kenneth Noble, Timothy O'Brien, John Olznoi, Leonard Parish, Jr., Robert Paterson, Thomas Platt, William Rathbun, Pedro Reyes, Billie Robinson, Carlos Sanchez, Richard Sargent, Walter Sayers, Richard Scott, Bernard Sexton, William Swinke, Will Terry, Paul Toth, Charles Washington, Gary Wells, Steven Westhoff, Richard Wicker, John Williamson, Wayne Wright by Athena Marie Herman (Herman, Athena)
September 18, 2014 Filing 5 EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Curtis Clark, Horace Ebbert, Estate of Earnest Valentine through Everree Valentine, Estate of Paul Brown through Dian Brown, Estate of Richard Krug through Margaret Krug, Ronald Garner, Barnett Gray, David Key, James Langs, Gary Lucca, Randel Luckey, Victoriano Martinez, Moises Moreno, Robert Lee Morgan, Rollin Mueller, James Murdie, Stephen Murphy, Kenneth Noble, Timothy O'Brien, John Olznoi, Leonard Parish, Jr., Robert Paterson, Thomas Platt, William Rathbun, Pedro Reyes, Billie Robinson, Carlos Sanchez, Richard Sargent, Walter Sayers, Richard Scott, Bernard Sexton, William Swinke, Will Terry, Paul Toth, Charles Washington, Gary Wells, Steven Westhoff, Richard Wicker, John Williamson, Wayne Wright -- EXHIBIT B TO COMPLAINT regarding complaint,,, #1 (Galland, George)
September 18, 2014 Filing 4 EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Curtis Clark, Horace Ebbert, Estate of Earnest Valentine through Everree Valentine, Estate of Paul Brown through Dian Brown, Estate of Richard Krug through Margaret Krug, Ronald Garner, Barnett Gray, David Key, James Langs, Gary Lucca, Randel Luckey, Victoriano Martinez, Moises Moreno, Robert Lee Morgan, Rollin Mueller, James Murdie, Stephen Murphy, Kenneth Noble, Timothy O'Brien, John Olznoi, Leonard Parish, Jr., Robert Paterson, Thomas Platt, William Rathbun, Pedro Reyes, Billie Robinson, Carlos Sanchez, Richard Sargent, Walter Sayers, Richard Scott, Bernard Sexton, William Swinke, Will Terry, Paul Toth, Charles Washington, Gary Wells, Steven Westhoff, Richard Wicker, John Williamson, Wayne Wright -- EXHIBIT A TO COMPLAINT regarding complaint,,, #1 (Galland, George)
September 17, 2014 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Richard Baran, Timothy Bernico, Jr., John Blasdel, Glenn Boynton, William Brady, Samuel Bridges, Kenneth Burian, Frank Carroll III, Curtis Clark, Horace Ebbert, Estate of Earnest Valentine through Everree Valentine, Estate of Paul Brown through Dian Brown, Estate of Richard Krug through Margaret Krug, Ronald Garner, Barnett Gray, David Key, James Langs, Gary Lucca, Randel Luckey, Victoriano Martinez, Moises Moreno, Robert Lee Morgan, Rollin Mueller, James Murdie, Stephen Murphy, Kenneth Noble, Timothy O'Brien, John Olznoi, Leonard Parish, Jr., Robert Paterson, Thomas Platt, William Rathbun, Pedro Reyes, Billie Robinson, Carlos Sanchez, Richard Sargent, Walter Sayers, Richard Scott, Bernard Sexton, William Swinke, Will Terry, Paul Toth, Charles Washington, Gary Wells, Steven Westhoff, Richard Wicker, John Williamson, Wayne Wright by David Paul Baltmanis (Baltmanis, David)
September 17, 2014 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Galland, George)
September 17, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Billie Robinson, Pedro Reyes, Moises Moreno, Estate of Paul Brown through Dian Brown, Kenneth Noble, James Langs, Richard Baran, Timothy O'Brien, Gary Lucca, Thomas Platt, Estate of Richard Krug through Margaret Krug, Steven Westhoff, John Olznoi, Stephen Murphy, Leonard Parish, Jr., Paul Toth, Victoriano Martinez, Barnett Gray, James Murdie, Frank Carroll III, William Rathbun, Richard Sargent, Curtis Clark, Will Terry, Charles Washington, Robert Lee Morgan, John Williamson, Ronald Garner, Rollin Mueller, Robert Paterson, William Brady, William Swinke, Walter Sayers, Timothy Bernico, Jr., Samuel Bridges, Estate of Earnest Valentine through Everree Valentine, Horace Ebbert, Wayne Wright, David Key, Bernard Sexton, Kenneth Burian, John Blasdel, Carlos Sanchez, Richard Wicker, Richard Scott, Gary Wells, Randel Luckey, Glenn Boynton; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9869244.(Galland, George)
September 17, 2014 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Inc. Caterpillar, (pg, )
September 17, 2014 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (nsf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Brien et al v. Caterpillar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Earnest Valentine through Everree Valentine
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Wells
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Burian
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Garner
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Paterson
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Toth
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie Robinson
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Murphy
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Lucca
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moises Moreno
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy O'Brien
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Boynton
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Bernico, Jr.
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Paul Brown through Dian Brown
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horace Ebbert
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Baran
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barnett Gray
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rollin Mueller
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Westhoff
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Sexton
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Swinke
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Murdie
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Bridges
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Key
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Morgan
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Blasdel
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Richard Krug through Margaret Krug
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Langs
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Wright
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Clark
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Will Terry
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Olznoi
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Parish, Jr.
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Washington
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randel Luckey
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Platt
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Scott
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Sanchez
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Brady
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Reyes
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Sayers
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Williamson
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Rathbun
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Noble
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Carroll III
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Wicker
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoriano Martinez
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Sargent
Represented By: David Paul Baltmanis
Represented By: Athena Marie Herman
Represented By: George Freeman Galland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph James Torres
Represented By: Derek Grady Barella
Represented By: Heather Lehman Kriz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?