Resicom Custom Painting and Maintenance, Inc. v. Professional Retail Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Resicom Custom Painting and Maintenance, Inc.
Defendant: Professional Retail Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv09190
Filed: November 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Will
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 AMENDED Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Michael T. Mason on 9/8/2017. Mailed notice(sxw, )
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM Order: For the reasons stated in this memorandum order, plaintiff's motion for leave to file a First Amended Complaint 67 is denied. This action will continue to go forward on the single theory of recovery that has survived in the original Complaint. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/1/2017:Mailed notice(clw, )
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM Order: For the reasons stated in this memorandum order, 1. Resicom is not required to produce the "Requested Documents" referred to in PRS' "Motion To Compel the Production of Requested Documents" (Dkt. No. 72). 2. This Court's discovery deadline is extended beyond August 1, 2017 to a date, to be determined later, to allow the depositions sought by Resicom to be taken (if indeed those depositions are to be required at all). Accordingly this Court orders those two steps to be taken pending further notice. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/19/2017:Mailed notice(clw, )
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: This Court strikes the entire Answer and Affirmative Defenses without prejudice to defendant's prompt filing of a proper responsive pleading that will move the case forward in an appropriate fashion. (For further detail see Memorandum Opinion and Order) Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 3/16/2015:Mailed notice(clw, )
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM Order: Defendant's current pleading is stricken in its entirety, obviously without prejudice to its filing of an appropriate self-contained Amended Answer, including any appropriate ADs, on or before February 12, 2015. No change is made in the previously scheduled April 8 status hearing date. (For further details see Memorandum Order) Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 1/30/2015:Mailed notice(clw, )
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM Order: This Court hereby orders: 1. that the missing copy of the Answer be delivered to this Court's chambers forthwith and 2. that such delivery be accompanied by a check for $100 payable to the "Clerk of the District Court" by reason of the LR 5.2(f) violation, a requirement foreshadowed by the opening provision in this Court's website. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 1/21/2015:Mailed notice(clw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Resicom Custom Painting and Maintenance, Inc. v. Professional Retail Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Resicom Custom Painting and Maintenance, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Ashley
Represented By: Brian W. Ledebuhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Retail Services, Inc.
Represented By: Vesselin Venelinov Mitev
Represented By: John William Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?