United Airlines, Inc. et al v. Zaman Featured Case

Plaintiff: United Airlines, Inc., Orbitz Worldwide, LLC and Orbitz, LLC
Defendant: Aktarer Zaman
Case Number: 1:2014cv09214
Filed: November 17, 2014
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Charles P. Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2015 40 MAILED closing trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (tlm)
April 30, 2015 39 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 4/30/2015. Mailed notice(gel, ) (Main Document 39 replaced on 5/1/2015) (gel, ).
April 30, 2015 38 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Per the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, Defendant's motion to dismiss 24 is granted and this case is dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction. This dismissal does not preclude Plaintiff from refiling and litigating its claims in a proper forum. Manex v. Bridgestone Firestone North American Tire, LLC, 533 F.3d 578, 584 (7th Cir. 2008). Mailed notice (gel, )
February 24, 2015 37 REPLY by Aktarer Zaman to MOTION by Defendant Aktarer Zaman to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction the claims of United Airlines, Inc. 24 (Schwartz, Irwin)
February 17, 2015 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Pursuant to Orbitz' notice of dismissal 35 , plaintiff Orbitz' claims against defendant are dismissed. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 12, 2015 35 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Orbitz Worldwide, LLC, Orbitz, LLC of the Claims Asserted by the Orbitz Plaintiffs (Blechschmidt, Frank)
February 10, 2015 34 RESPONSE by United Airlines, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Aktarer Zaman to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction the claims of United Airlines, Inc. 24 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Blechschmidt, Frank)
February 2, 2015 33 STATUS Report (Joint Reassignment Status Report) by Orbitz Worldwide, LLC, Orbitz, LLC, United Airlines, Inc. (Blechschmidt, Frank)
January 26, 2015 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The parties' joint motion for extension of time 28 is granted. The previously set schedule is revised as follows: defendant's answer (or other responsive pleading) is due 2/10/15; plaintiffs' response to defendant's motion to dismiss is due 2/10/15; and defendant's reply in support of its motion to dismiss is due 2/24/15. The Court will set additional dates in a future order. But, for now, the parties are still expected to file their joint Reassignment Status Report by 2/2/15. Mailed notice (gel, )
January 23, 2015 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey:Minute order dated 1/22/2015 is corrected as follows: This case has been reassigned to form the initial calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Unless otherwise ordered by the court, all previously set discovery and briefing schedules and deadlines remain intact, and all existing referrals to the assigned magistrate judge remain in place. All previously set status hearing and motion hearing dates are stricken. To assist the court with its initial review of the case, the parties are directed, within 10 calendar days of this order's entry, to confer and then prepare and file a joint Reassignment Status Report, not to exceed five pages. A template of the Reassignment Status Report is available on Judge Blakey's homepage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The parties are directed not to file or notice any motions, with the exception of emergency motions, prior to filing the joint Reassignment Status Report. For all emergency motions arising prior to the due date for the Reassignment Status Report, the parties are directed to contact chambers at (312) 435-6058, or Judge Blakey's courtroom deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. Additional dates will be set in a future order, as needed. Mailed notice (gel, )
January 22, 2015 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey:The following case has been reassigned to form the initial calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Unless otherwise ordered by the court, all previously-set discovery and briefing schedules and deadlines remain intact, and all existing referrals to the assigned magistrate judge remain in place. All previously-set status and motion hearing dates are stricken. The court may, in due course, set the case for a reassignment status conference. The parties are directed not to file or notice any motions, with the exception of emergency motions, prior to appearing at the reassignment status conference. For all emergency motions arising prior to the date scheduled for the reassignment status conference, the parties are directed to contact chambers at (312) 435-6058, or Judge Blakey's courtroom deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699.To assist the court with its review of the case, the parties are directed, within 10 calendar days of this order's entry, to confer and then prepare and file a joint Reassignment Status Report, not to exceed five pages. A template of the Reassignment Status Report is available on Judge Blakey's homepage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Additional dates will be set in a future order, as needed.Mailed notice (gel, )
January 21, 2015 29 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on January 13, 2015 before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Court Reporter Contact Information: Ms. Joene Hanhardt, Official Court Reporter, 219 S. Dearborn St., Suite 1744-A, Chicago, Illinois 60604, 312-435-6874. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/11/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/21/2015. (Hanhardt, Joene)
January 16, 2015 28 MOTION by Plaintiffs Orbitz Worldwide, LLC, Orbitz, LLC, United Airlines, Inc. for extension of time UNOPPOSED (Blechschmidt, Frank)
January 15, 2015 27 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that, pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on December 30, 2014, the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 306 cases be reassigned to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order shall become effective on January 15, 2015. Case reassigned to the Honorable John Robert Blakey for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/15/2015. Mailed Notices. (mgh, )
January 13, 2015 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held on 1/13/2015. Motion hearing held. Defendant's motion to the response date to Orbits claims only by 1/20/2015 22 is granted. Defendant's motion to dismiss the claims of plaintiff United Airlines, Inc. is due by 1/13/2015. Plaintiff's response is due by 1/20/2015; reply is due by 2/3/2015. Court will rule by mail. Status hearing set for 1/27/2015 is stricken. Mailed notice (vcf, )
January 13, 2015 25 MEMORANDUM by Aktarer Zaman in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 24 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Aktarer Zaman)(Schwartz, Irwin)
January 13, 2015 24 MOTION by Defendant Aktarer Zaman to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction the claims of United Airlines, Inc. (Schwartz, Irwin)
January 8, 2015 23 NOTICE of Motion by Fitzgerald Timothy Bramwell for presentment of motion to continue 22 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 1/13/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Bramwell, Fitzgerald)
January 8, 2015 22 MOTION by Defendant Aktarer Zaman to continue (Bramwell, Fitzgerald)
January 7, 2015 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Parties informed the Court that an resolution of service has been reached, Defendant is to answer or otherwise plead by 1/13/2015. Plaintiff's reply is due by 1/13/2015. Status hearing set for 1/27/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (vcf, )
December 29, 2014 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Airlines, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Orbitz Worldwide, LLC as to Aktarer Zaman on 12/23/2014, answer due 1/13/2015. (Letchinger, John)
December 23, 2014 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Motion to quash service 16 is granted. Defendant's counsel is to provide plaintiff's counsel with Defendant's current address. Defendant is to answer or otherwise plead by 1/6/2015. Plaintiff's reply is due by 1/13/2015. Court will rule by mail on 1/20/2015. In the event that parties resolve voluntarily, please contact the courtroom deputy Vettina Franklin by phone at 312-435-5689, then follow up with an email at Vettina_Franklin@ilnd.uscourts.gov. Status hearing set for 1/15/2015 is stricken. Mailed notice (vcf, )
December 22, 2014 18 RESPONSE by Orbitz Worldwide, LLC, Orbitz, LLC, United Airlines, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Aktarer Zaman to quash service of process 16 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blechschmidt, Frank)
December 15, 2014 17 NOTICE of Motion by Fitzgerald Timothy Bramwell for presentment of motion to quash 16 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 12/23/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Bramwell, Fitzgerald)
December 15, 2014 16 MOTION by Defendant Aktarer Zaman to quash service of process (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in support of motion to quash)(Bramwell, Fitzgerald)
December 15, 2014 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Attorneys' Irwin B. Schwartz and Nicholas R. Cassie Applications to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendant Aktarer Zaman 12 and 13 are granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
December 12, 2014 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Aktarer Zaman by Fitzgerald Timothy Bramwell Local Counsel (Bramwell, Fitzgerald)
December 11, 2014 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10144870. Unopposed (Cassie, Nicholas)
December 11, 2014 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10144831. Unopposed (Schwartz, Irwin)
December 1, 2014 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Airlines, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Orbitz Worldwide, LLC as to Aktarer Zaman on 11/22/2014, answer due 12/15/2014. (Blechschmidt, Frank)
November 24, 2014 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 1/15/2015 at 09:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, )
November 19, 2014 9 MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (as, )
November 18, 2014 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Aktarer Zaman (pg, )
November 17, 2014 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (nsf, )
November 17, 2014 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Orbitz Worldwide, LLC, Orbitz, LLC, United Airlines, Inc. by Matthew J Caccamo (Caccamo, Matthew)
November 17, 2014 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Orbitz Worldwide, LLC, Orbitz, LLC, United Airlines, Inc. by Frank T. Blechschmidt (Blechschmidt, Frank)
November 17, 2014 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Orbitz, LLC (Letchinger, John)
November 17, 2014 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Orbitz Worldwide, LLC (Letchinger, John)
November 17, 2014 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by United Airlines, Inc. (Letchinger, John)
November 17, 2014 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Orbitz Worldwide, LLC, Orbitz, LLC, United Airlines, Inc. by John Sheldon Letchinger (Letchinger, John)
November 17, 2014 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Letchinger, John)
November 17, 2014 1 COMPLAINT filed by United Airlines, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Orbitz Worldwide, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-10069670. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Letchinger, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Airlines, Inc. et al v. Zaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Frank T. Blechschmidt
Represented By: Matthew J Caccamo
Represented By: John Sheldon Letchinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orbitz Worldwide, LLC
Represented By: Frank T. Blechschmidt
Represented By: Matthew J Caccamo
Represented By: John Sheldon Letchinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orbitz, LLC
Represented By: Frank T. Blechschmidt
Represented By: Matthew J Caccamo
Represented By: John Sheldon Letchinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aktarer Zaman
Represented By: Fitzgerald Timothy Bramwell
Represented By: Nicholas R. Cassie
Represented By: Irwin B. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?