Suppressed v. Suppressed
Plaintiff: Suppressed
Defendant: Suppressed
Case Number: 1:2014cv09412
Filed: November 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 499 MOTION by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company for judgment as a matter of law under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 50(b), MOTION by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company for new trial under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59 (Watral, Diana)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 483 MOTION by Plaintiff Ronald J Streck for judgment Relator's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 50(a) (Miller, Daniel)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 374 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated herein, the Court rules as follows: 1. Denies Defendant Eli Lilly's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 314); 2. Denies in part and grants in part Relator's Motion for Summary Judgement (Dkt. No. 311); and 3. Grants in part and denies in part the Motions to Exclude Expert Opinions and Testimony. (Dkt. Nos. 293, 295, 297, 299, 301.) Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 2/28/2022:Mailed notice (maf)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated herein, Defendants' Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule 12(b)(6) Motions to Dismiss are denied. Defendants to answer by 4/25/19. Status hearing set for 5/2/19 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 4/3/19: Mailed notice(maf) (Main Document 122 replaced on 4/3/2019) (maf, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suppressed v. Suppressed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suppressed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suppressed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?