Santangelo v. Comcast Corporation
Plaintiff: Keith Santangelo
Defendant: Comcast Corp.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00293
Filed: January 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John Z. Lee
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/17/18.Mailed notice(ca, )
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/6/17. Mailed notice(ca, )
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 2/8/16Mailed notice(ca, ).
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 5/28/15Mailed notice(ca, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santangelo v. Comcast Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Santangelo
Represented By: Katherine Marie Bowen
Represented By: Michael S. Hilicki
Represented By: Keith James Keogh
Represented By: Timothy J. Sostrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Corp.
Represented By: Justin O'Neill Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?