Knapp v. Evgeros, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kitty Knapp
Defendant: Evgeros, Inc. and Olympic Star Restaurant
Case Number: 1:2015cv00754
Filed: January 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Geraldine Soat Brown
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 8/24/2017.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 8/21/2017.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/9/2016.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 5/12/2016. Mailed notice. (lw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knapp v. Evgeros, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kitty Knapp
Represented By: Jason R. Craddock, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evgeros, Inc.
Represented By: Frank John Andreou
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Lindbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olympic Star Restaurant
Represented By: Frank John Andreou
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Lindbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?