Berrios v. ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Berrios and Neidy Berrios
Defendant: ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc, ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc. and Donna Kljucanin
Case Number: 1:2015cv01406
Filed: February 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Referring Judge: James B Zagel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 122 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 07/27/2016 before the Honorable James B. Zagel. Order Number: 38565. Court Reporter Contact Information: Rosemary Scarpelli, Rosemary_Scarpelli@ilnd.uscourts.gov, (312)435-5885, on behalf of Blanca Lara. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/20/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/30/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2020. (Scarpelli, Rosemary)
June 26, 2020 Filing 121 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 8/28/18 before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Order Number: 38597. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kathleen_Fennell@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 7/17/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2020. (Fennell, Kathleen)
February 24, 2020 Filing 120 LETTER from Barbara Ann Susman dated 2/24/2020 regarding Notice of Appeal #115 . (Exhibits) (pj, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 119 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #115 ; USCA Case No. 20-1309 (pj, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 118 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #115 . Notified counsel (pj, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #115 (pj, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 115 NOTICE of appeal by Neidy Berrios regarding orders #113 , #114 Filing fee $ 505. Receipt number: 4624238374 (pj, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 114 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Notices mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: The Court grants defendants' motion 188 for summary judgment. Defendant ABM is granted summary judgment on Counts I, II, III, IV, V and VI in case no. 16-cv-8295. Civil case terminated. Defendant ABM is granted summary judgment on Counts I and III in case no. 15-cv-1406. Defendant Kljucanin is granted summary judgment on Counts II and IV in case no. 15-cv-1406. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 1/21/2020. Notices mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER. Defendants' motion #110 is granted. Defendants are given leave to file a statement of facts containing 129 numbered paragraphs. Defendants are granted leave to file four exhibits under seal. Motion hearing date of 3/7/19 is stricken. [For further details see order.] Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/6/2019. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE of Motion by Stacie Elaine Barhorst for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages,,, motion to file instanter,,, motion to seal document,, #110 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/7/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Barhorst, Stacie)
March 1, 2019 Filing 110 MOTION by Defendants ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc., Donna Kljucanin for leave to file excess pages 9 ADDITIONAL PARAGRAPHS IN DEFENDANTS' JOINT L.R. 56.1(a) STATEMENT OF FACTS, MOTION by Defendants ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc., Donna Kljucanin to file instanter , MOTION by Defendants ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc., Donna Kljucanin to seal document order on motion to consolidate cases,,,, order on motion to set a briefing schedule,,,, motion hearing,,,, set case scheduling order,,,, set/clear flags,,, #108 SEAL 2 DOCUMENTS &2 DEPOSITIONS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Joint L.R. 56.1 Statement of Facts)(Barhorst, Stacie)
January 17, 2019 Filing 109 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 1/15/19 before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Order Number: 33409. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy LaBella, 312-435-6890, NLaBella.ilnd@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/7/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/17/2019. (Labella, Nancy)
January 16, 2019 Filing 108 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendants' motion to consolidate and for summary judgment schedule #104 is granted in part as follows: The motion to consolidate cases 15 C 1406 and 16 C 8295 is granted. Defendants' motion for summary judgment shall be filed by 2/15/19. Plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment and response to Defendants' motion for summary judgment shall be filed by 3/15/19. Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment and reply in support of their motion for summary judgment shall be filed by 4/5/19. Plaintiffs' reply in support of their motion for summary judgment shall be filed by 4/19/19. Movants are given leave to file 120 statements of fact and Respondents are given leave to file 60 statements of additional fact. Parties are given leave to file briefs up to 20 pages. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 107 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: All matters relating to the referral of this matter having been resolved, this case is returned to the District Judge. Referral terminated. Mailed notice (ber, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 106 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held. Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's counsel failed to appear. Defendants' motion to consolidate and for summary judgment schedule #104 is entered and continued to 1/15/19 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 105 NOTICE of Motion by Stacie Elaine Barhorst for presentment of motion to consolidate cases,, motion by filer to set a briefing schedule, #104 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/28/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Barhorst, Stacie)
November 20, 2018 Filing 104 MOTION by Defendants ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc., Donna Kljucanin to consolidate cases , MOTION by Defendants ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc., Donna Kljucanin to set a briefing schedule ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Barhorst, Stacie)
September 24, 2018 Filing 103 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant's motion to refer motion to Magistrate Judge Gilbert #101 is granted. The referral to Magistrate Judge Gilbert is expanded to include discovery supervision, with authority to extend deadlines. Motion hearing date of 9/27/18 is stricken. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 102 NOTICE of Motion by Stacie Elaine Barhorst for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #101 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/27/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Barhorst, Stacie)
September 18, 2018 Filing 101 MOTION by Defendant ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc.TO REFER MOTION TO MAGISTRATE GILBERT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Berrios II Motion, #2 Exhibit B - ABM RTP Response Excerpt, #3 Exhibit C - Barhorst Dec)(Barhorst, Stacie)
September 17, 2018 Filing 100 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing previously set for 9/18/18 is stricken and reset to 11/28/18 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 99 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing previously set for 8/21/18 is stricken and reset to 9/18/18 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
July 9, 2018 Filing 98 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing previously set for 7/10/18 is stricken and reset to 8/21/18 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
May 8, 2018 Filing 97 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc. re notification of affiliates pursuant to local rule 3.2 #74 , notification of affiliates pursuant to local rule 3.2 #16 FIRST AMENDED (Barhorst, Stacie)
April 10, 2018 Filing 96 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing previously set for 4/12/18 is stricken and reset to 7/10/18 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
March 13, 2018 Filing 95 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Status hearing held on 3/13/18. Mailed notice (ber, )
February 14, 2018 Filing 94 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: At the Court's instance, the status hearing set for 2/15/18 is reset to 3/13/18 at 11:15 a.m. Mailed notice (ber, )
January 31, 2018 Filing 93 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Status hearing held on 1/31/18 and continued to 2/15/18 at 11:00 a.m. Defendant's Motion #92 is stricken as moot. The motion was correctly filed in case 16-cv-8295. Defendant will tender its settlement letter to Magistrate Judge Gilberts chambers. Defendant is excused from the 5-page settlement letter limit for the reasons stated on the record. Mailed notice (ber, )
January 26, 2018 Filing 92 MOTION by Defendant ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc. for protective order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SEB Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order (w/ Tracked Changes))(Barhorst, Stacie)
January 18, 2018 Filing 91 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Plaintiff delivered her settlement demand to chambers on 1/17/18. Therefore, per the Court's prior order #88 , Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's demand by 1/31/18, with a copy of their response delivered to Judge Gilbert's chambers. The status hearing previously set for 1/31/18 at 10:00 a.m. will proceed as scheduled. Mailed notice (ber, )
December 21, 2017 Filing 90 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held and continued to 4/12/18 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
December 19, 2017 Filing 89 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: By agreement of the parties, status hearing previously set for 12/20/17 is stricken and reset to 12/21/17 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
December 15, 2017 Filing 88 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Status hearing held on 12/15/17 and continued to 1/31/18 at 10:00 a.m. For the reasons stated on the record, the settlement conference set for 2/15/18 is stricken. It has been more than 2 months since the Court first set a date for Plaintiff to deliver her settlement demand letter #82 . Despite repeated extensions of that date, Plaintiff still has not made a settlement demand and, therefore, Defendant has not yet responded to that demand or made a settlement offer #84 #87 . When Plaintiff delivers her settlement letter to Defendants, a copy should be delivered to Magistrate Judge Gilbert's chambers. Defendants should respond to that demand within 14 days of receipt, also with a copy of their response delivered to Judge Gilbert's chambers. If it makes sense to set an in-person settlement conference after these letters are exchanged, the Court can do so at that time. Mailed notice (ber, )
December 5, 2017 Filing 87 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Plaintiff still has not submitted her settlement letter despite multiple extensions of time. Defendant's settlement letter is due 12/8/17 but Defendant is not required to submit any letter at that time given Plaintiff's failure to make a settlement demand. The status hearing set for 12/15/17 at 9:30 a.m. will proceed as scheduled. Mailed notice (ber, ) Modified on 12/5/2017 (ber, ).
November 16, 2017 Filing 86 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: At Defendant's request, and without objection from Plaintiff, the settlement conference set for 2/5/18 at 1:30 p.m. is stricken and reset to 2/15/18 at 1:30 p.m. Modified on 11/16/2017 (ber, ).
November 14, 2017 Filing 85 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: For clarification, the only paragraphs of the Court's Order entered on 11/13/17 #84 that apply to the 2015 case are paragraphs 4 and 5. Mailed notice (ber, )
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: 1. Motion hearing held on 11/13/17. Defendant's Motion to Strike November 2, 2017 "Joint" Status Report (DE #47 in Case No. 16 C 8295) is granted for the reasons stated on the record. The Status Report #45 is stricken. The parties will file a joint discovery plan by 11/17/17. Defendant will prepare the text for the discovery plan and send it to Plaintiff in an email. Plaintiff will comment on it. Defendant will then finalize the agreed document and file it with both parties' signatures. Defendant's request for attorney fees is denied for the reasons stated on the record. The motion hearing noticed for 11/16/17 at 9:15 a.m. is stricken with no appearance required. 2. Plaintiff's responses to Defendant's written discovery requests were due 10/30/17. No responses were received. Plaintiff will serve her responses to Defendants' written discovery requests today, 11/13/17. To the extent there are disputes about Plaintiff's responses, counsel promptly shall meet and confer about those. Plaintiff will serve her written discovery to Defendant by 11/17/17. 3. The Court sets the following discovery dates: Fact discovery will close on 3/30/18. The party with the burden of proof will disclose any Rule 26(a)(2) expert with any required report or disclosure by 4/20/18. The opposing party will disclose its Rule 26(a)(2) expert(s) in the same manner by 5/11/18. 4. Settlement conference set for 2/5/18 at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiff's settlement letter shall be delivered to Defendant, with a copy delivered to the Court, in chambers, on or before 11/17/17. Defendant's settlement letter shall be delivered to Plaintiff, with a copy delivered to the Court, in chambers, on or before 12/8/17. Settlement letters are not to be filed on the CM-ECF system. All parties are reminded to review Magistrate Judge Gilbert's Standing Order for Settlement Conference posted on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges. 5. A continued status hearing on settlement is set for 12/15/17 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert on 11/13/2017. Mailed notice(ber, )
November 2, 2017 Filing 83 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: The parties were file a joint report on the discovery by 11/1/17, although Plaintiff's counsel contacted the Court's courtroom deputy to explain she was having computer difficulties and would file the joint report on 11/2/17. A report has not yet been filed. At the Court's instance, the status hearing set for 11/7/17 is stricken and reset to 11/13/17 at 10:00 a.m. The parties should file their joint report on discovery as soon as possible. Mailed notice (ber, ) (
October 11, 2017 Filing 82 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Initial status hearing held on 10/11/17 and continued to 11/7/17 11:00 a.m. By 11/1/17 counsel will meet and confer and file a joint report on the discovery that each side intends to take. The report also shall state what is agreed and what is not agreed by the parties. If she can do so, Plaintiff will make her settlement demand by 11/3/17, with a copy delivered to Magistrate Judge Gilbert's chambers. A date for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's letter will be set at the next status hearing if Plaintiff has made a settlement demand. Mailed notice (ber, )
October 4, 2017 Filing 81 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Gilbert to conduct a settlement conference. Status hearing scheduled for 10/11/17 at 11:30 a.m. Prior to the status hearing, the parties shall familiarize themselves with the subjects referenced in Magistrate Judge Gilbert's Standing Order for Settlement Conference posted on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges as applicable to referral cases. Mailed notice (ber, )
September 27, 2017 Filing 80 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert f or the purpose of holding proceedings related to: settlement conference. (ntf, )Notice mailed by judge's staff
September 27, 2017 Filing 79 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held and continued to 12/20/17 at 9:30 a.m. Discovery remains closed. This case is referred to the magistrate judge for a settlement conference. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
August 31, 2017 Filing 78 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing set for 9/27/17 at 9:30 a.m. Parties shall file a joint status report by 9/22/17. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
August 21, 2017 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on March 24, 2016 before the Honorable James B. Zagel. Court Reporter Contact Information: blanca I. Lara, 219 South Dearborn, Room 2504, Chicago, Illinois 60604, blanca_lara@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 9/11/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (Lara, Blanca)
August 21, 2017 Filing 76 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on September 21, 2016 before the Honorable James B. Zagel. Court Reporter Contact Information: Blanca I. Lara, 219 South Dearborn, Room 2504, Chicago, Illinois 60606, blanca_lara@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 9/11/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (Lara, Blanca)
August 21, 2017 Filing 75 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on August 30, 2016 before the Honorable James B. Zagel. Court Reporter Contact Information: Blanca I. Lara, 219 South Dearborn, Room 2504, Chicago, Illinois 60604, blanca_lara@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 9/11/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2017. (Lara, Blanca)
April 3, 2017 Filing 74 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc. re notification of affiliates pursuant to local rule 3.2 #16 AMENDED (Barhorst, Stacie)
January 6, 2017 Filing 73 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Hon. James B. Zagel took senior status effective October 21, 2016 pursuant to 28 USC 294(b); and It further appearing that 15 CV 1406, Berrios v. ABM Janitorial Services North Central, Inc. et al, and 16 CV 8295, Berrios v. ABM Janitorial Services North Central, Inc. et al, are related cases currently assigned to the Hon. James B. Zagel; and It further appearing that Judge Zagel has requested that these related cases be reassigned to another judge of this Court pursuant to 28 USC 294(b); therefore It is hereby ordered that 15 CV 1406, Berrios v. ABM Janitorial Services North Central, Inc. et al, and 16 CV 8295, Berrios v. ABM Janitorial Services North Central, Inc. et al, are to be reassigned by lot to an active district judge of this Court, pursuant to IOP 13(c)(4). Case reassigned to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/6/2017.(mr, )
September 21, 2016 Filing 72 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Status hearing held. Defendants' Motion to Stay #69 is granted. This matter is stayed in light of briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in the Berrios II case (16cv8295). Mailed notice (ep, )
September 19, 2016 Filing 71 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Defendant's Motion to Deem Privilege Waived and to Compel Production of Unredacted Documents #51 is granted in part. During the deposition of SEIU representative Maria Pina, Plaintiff's counsel explicitly waived union-member privilege as to the grievance relating to Plaintiff's December 2013 termination. However, Plaintiff's counsel did not explicitly or implicitly waive privilege as to earlier grievances. "The widely applied standard for determining the scope of a waiver of attorney-client privilege is that the waiver applies to all other communications relating to the same subject matter." Fort James Corp., 412 F.3d 1340, 1349 (Fed. Cir. 2005) (applying Seventh Circuit law). "The Court determines the scope of a waiver based on fairness and consideration of the risk that 'a limited disclosure of privileged communications, if permitted, might result in a party's use of privileged communications supporting its position and simultaneous concealment of communications that do not.'" Medicines Co. v. Mylan Inc., 936 F. Supp. 2d 894, 903 (N.D. Ill. 2013). Here, in waiving the privilege, Plaintiff questioned Pina only on the December 2013 incident. Because Plaintiff herself has not seen the unredacted documents, I do not believe this was a strategic waiver to reveal helpful communications and conceal unhelpful ones. Therefore, the union shall produce to Defendant the unredacted grievance documents relating to SEIU Case # DIS-2014-0006, which corresponds to the December 2013 incident. The union-member privilege remains intact as to the other union documents. Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Stay #69 set for 9/22/16 is stricken. The Court will address this motion at the status hearing scheduled for 9/21/16 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ep, )
September 15, 2016 Filing 70 NOTICE of Motion by Stacie Elaine Barhorst for presentment of motion to stay #69 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 9/22/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Barhorst, Stacie)
September 15, 2016 Filing 69 MOTION by Defendants ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc., Donna Kljucanin to stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Berrios II Complaint)(Barhorst, Stacie)
September 13, 2016 Filing 68 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Defendant's Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Signature on her Interrogatory Responses and for Sanctions #63 is granted. As noted in Court, Plaintiff was already directed to produce the signed interrogatory responses on or before 8/31/16 at noon. Additionally, as a sanction, I am ordering Plaintiff's lawyers to pay ABM's attorneys' fees and expenses associated with filing the motion to compel. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(g)(3) ("If a certification violates this rule without substantial justification, the court... must impose an appropriate sanction... The sanction may include an order to pay the reasonable expenses, including attorney's fees, caused by the violation."); Rojas v. Town of Cicero, 775 F.3d 906, 908 (7th Cir. 2015) (clarifying that Rule 26(g)(3) sanctions are mandatory, not discretionary). Defendants' Motion to Transfer Case #66 is granted. Case no. 16cv8295, proceeding before Judge Durkin, will be transferred to this court. Reassignment Order to follow. Motion hearing set for 9/21/16 is stricken. Status hearing set for 9/21/16 will proceed at 10:00 a.m. rather than at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (ep, )
September 7, 2016 Filing 67 NOTICE of Motion by Stacie Elaine Barhorst for presentment of motion to transfer case, #66 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 9/21/2016 at 09:15 AM. (Barhorst, Stacie)
September 7, 2016 Filing 66 MOTION by Defendants ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc., Donna Kljucanin to transfer case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Berrios I Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Berrios II Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Berrios II Docket, #4 Exhibit D - Berrios II Civil Cover Sheet)(Barhorst, Stacie)
August 30, 2016 Filing 65 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Status and motion hearing held. Plaintiff shall produce the signed interrogatory responses on or before 8/31/16 at noon. Defendants' counsel shall re-submit the Union documents to the Court for an in camera review. Status hearing set for 9/21/16 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (ep, )
August 25, 2016 Filing 64 NOTICE of Motion by Stacie Elaine Barhorst for presentment of motion to compel, motion for sanctions,,,, #63 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 8/30/2016 at 10:00 AM. (Barhorst, Stacie)
August 25, 2016 Filing 63 MOTION by Defendant ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc. to compel PLAINTIFF'S SIGNATURE ON HER INTERROGATORY RESPONSES, MOTION by Defendant ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc. for sanctions PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(g)(3) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Original Responses, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Supplemental Responses, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Amended Responses, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Jan. 20, 2016 Deposition Excerpt, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Jan. 29, 2016 Deposition Excerpt, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - May 27, 2016 Deposition Excerpt)(Barhorst, Stacie)
July 27, 2016 Filing 62 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Status hearing held. The parties reported that depositions have been completed. Prior to setting deadlines for summary judgment, counsel shall submit unredacted Union documents to the court for an in camera review. Further hearing set for 8/30/16 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ep, )
July 5, 2016 Filing 61 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Status hearing set for 7/27/2016 at 10:00 a.m. Parties have notified the Court that Defendant, Donna Kljucanin's deposition is set for 7/8/2016 at 10:00 a.m. at Plantiff's offices. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
July 5, 2016 Filing 60 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel:Status and motion hearing held. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Donna Kljucanin for Deposition #58 is entered and continued. Counsel shall contact the Court's courtroom deputy of the agreed deposition date of Donna Kljucanin and to set a further hearing date. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
June 30, 2016 Filing 59 NOTICE of Motion by Barbara Ann Susman for presentment of motion to compel, #58 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 7/5/2016 at 10:00 AM. (Susman, Barbara)
June 30, 2016 Filing 58 MOTION by Plaintiff Neidy Berrios to compel Defendant Donna Kljucanin for Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhbit K)(Susman, Barbara)
June 28, 2016 Filing 57 STATUS Report Pursuant to June 9, 2016 Order by Neidy Berrios (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Susman, Barbara)
June 28, 2016 Filing 56 STATUS Report by ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc., Donna Kljucanin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - "Court Order")(Barhorst, Stacie)
June 9, 2016 Filing 55 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: At the Court's instance, status hearing set for 6/14/2016 at 10:00 a.m. is stricken and reset to 7/5/2016 at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall submit a Current Status Update pursuant to the instructions on the Court's website by 6/28/2016. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
April 8, 2016 Filing 54 RESPONSE by Neidy Berriosin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc., Donna KljucaninTO DEEM PRIVILEGE WAIVED AND TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF UNREDACTED DOCUMENTS #51 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing and Certificate of Service)(Susman, Barbara)
March 24, 2016 Filing 53 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Status hearing held. Plaintiff is authorized to take no more than three depositions, which shall be completed by 5/31/16. The final discovery deadline in this case shall conclude on or before 5/31/16. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Compel #51 on or before 4/8/16. Defendant shall reply, if at all, on or before 4/15/16. Further status hearing set for 6/14/16 at 10:00 a.m. Hearing set for 3/29/16 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (ep, )
March 23, 2016 Filing 52 NOTICE of Motion by Stacie Elaine Barhorst for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #51 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 3/29/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Barhorst, Stacie)
March 23, 2016 Filing 51 MOTION by Defendants ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc., Donna KljucaninTO DEEM PRIVILEGE WAIVED AND TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF UNREDACTED DOCUMENTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to SEIU, #2 Exhibit B - SEIU Subpoena Response Excerpt, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's July 20, 2015 Email, #4 Exhibit D - Defendants July 23, 2015 Email, #5 Exhibit E - Pina Dep. Excerpt & Dep. Ex. 1)(Barhorst, Stacie)
January 27, 2016 Filing 50 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Status hearing held and continued to 3/24/16 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (ep, )
January 12, 2016 Filing 49 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Status hearing held. Plaintiff's deposition shall proceed on 1/20/16. Further status hearing set for 1/27/16 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ep, )
November 30, 2015 Filing 48 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Defendant's Motion to Withdraw #47 is granted. Show cause hearing set for 12/16/15 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (ep, )
November 24, 2015 Filing 47 MOTION by Defendant ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc. to withdraw order on rule to show cause,, terminate hearings, #46 , MOTION by Defendant ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc. to strike order on rule to show cause,, terminate hearings, #46 (Barhorst, Stacie)
November 16, 2015 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Defendant's Motion for a Rule to Show Cause #44 is granted. Hearing set for 11/17/15 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Show cause hearing set for 12/16/15 at 10:00 a.m. Antonette Aguayo is directed to appear on behalf of Union Health Service and show cause as to why she should not be held in contempt for failure to comply with Defendant's subpoena. Mailed notice (ep, )
November 12, 2015 Filing 45 NOTICE of Motion by Stacie Elaine Barhorst for presentment of motion for rule to show cause #44 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 11/17/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Barhorst, Stacie)
November 12, 2015 Filing 44 MOTION by Defendant ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc. for rule to show cause AGAINST UNION HEALTH SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Errata A, #2 Exhibit B)(Barhorst, Stacie)
November 6, 2015 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Defendant's Motion to Strike the November 10, 2015 Date #42 is granted. Rule to Show Cause #36 noticed for 11/10/15 is withdrawn and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (ep, )
November 6, 2015 Filing 42 MOTION by Defendants ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc., Donna Kljucanin to strike terminate hearings,, motion hearing,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings, #41 TO STRIKE NOVEMBER 10, 2015 DATE (Barhorst, Stacie)
October 27, 2015 Filing 41 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Status and motion hearing held. Defendants' Motion for a Rule to Show Cause #36 is entered and continued to 11/10/15 at 9:30 a.m. The Clerk is directed to place under seal docket entry no. 36 as it contains personal information. Counsel shall confer regarding an agreed list of deponents as discussed on the record. Status hearing previously set for 1/12/16 at 9:15 a.m. will stand. Mailed notice (ep, )
October 26, 2015 Filing 40 AMENDED motion for rule to show cause, #36 AMENDED EXHIBIT C - LETTER TO SIMMERER (Barhorst, Stacie)
October 26, 2015 Filing 39 AMENDED motion for rule to show cause, #36 AMENDED EXHIBIT A - SUBPOENA (Barhorst, Stacie)
October 26, 2015 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE of Service AMENDED by Stacie Elaine Barhorst on behalf of ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc., Donna Kljucanin regarding notice of motion #37 , MOTION by Defendants ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc., Donna Kljucanin for rule to show cause #36 (Barhorst, Stacie)
October 21, 2015 Filing 37 NOTICE of Motion by Stacie Elaine Barhorst for presentment of motion for rule to show cause, #36 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 10/27/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Barhorst, Stacie)
October 21, 2015 Filing 36 MOTION by Defendants ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc., Donna Kljucanin for rule to show cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service of Subpoena, #3 Exhibit C - Oct. 12, 2015 Letter to Simmerer)(Barhorst, Stacie) (RESTRICTED) (sxw, ).
October 7, 2015 Filing 35 AGREED Confidentiality Order. Signed by the Honorable James B. Zagel on 10/7/2015. Mailed notice(ep, )
October 7, 2015 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Defendants' Agreed Joint Motion for Protective Order #32 is granted. Hearing set for 10/20/15 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (ep, )
October 1, 2015 Filing 33 AGREED JOINT NOTICE of Motion by Stacie Elaine Barhorst for presentment of motion for protective order #32 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 10/20/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Barhorst, Stacie)
October 1, 2015 Filing 32 MOTION by Defendants ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc., Donna Kljucanin for protective order AGREED JOINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreed Protective Order)(Barhorst, Stacie)
September 24, 2015 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Status hearing held and continued to 10/27/15 at 9:15 a.m. to discuss any remaining discovery issues. Further status hearing set for 1/12/16 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (ep, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 30 AGREED JOINT NOTICE of Motion by Stacie Elaine Barhorst for presentment of motion for protective order #29 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 9/29/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Barhorst, Stacie)
September 24, 2015 Filing 29 MOTION by Defendants ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc., Donna Kljucanin for protective order AGREED JOINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreed Confidentiality Order)(Barhorst, Stacie)
August 25, 2015 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Motion hearing held. Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery #26 is granted. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's discovery on or before 9/18/15. Mailed notice (ep, )
August 17, 2015 Filing 27 NOTICE of Motion by Stacie Elaine Barhorst for presentment of extension of time #26 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 8/25/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Barhorst, Stacie)
August 17, 2015 Filing 26 MOTION by Defendants ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc., Donna Kljucanin for extension of time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF DISCOVERY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barhorst, Stacie)
July 30, 2015 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Motion hearing held. As stated on the record, a portion of Defendant's Motion to Compel #21 is withdrawn. The parties will conduct a Rule 37 conference in the Court's attorney witness room on 8/3/15 at 2:00 p.m. Mailed notice (ep, )
July 27, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE of Motion by Barbara Ann Susman for presentment of motion to strike,, motion for relief,,, #23 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 7/30/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Susman, Barbara)
July 27, 2015 Filing 23 MOTION by Plaintiff Neidy Berrios to strike MOTION by Defendant ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc. to compel Admissions to Requests to Admit #21 , MOTION by Defendant ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc. to compel Responses to Interrogatories and a Request to Produce #19 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Certificate of Service)(Susman, Barbara)
July 23, 2015 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Stacie Elaine Barhorst for presentment of motion to compel,, #21 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 7/30/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Barhorst, Stacie)
July 23, 2015 Filing 21 MOTION by Defendant ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc. to compel Admissions to Requests to Admit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a - Responses to Requests to Admit, #2 Exhibit B - Barhorst Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit 3 to Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit 4 to Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit 5 to Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit 6 to Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit 7 to Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit 8 to Exhibit B, #11 Exhibit 9 to Exhibit B, #12 Exhibit C - Berrios Documents)(Barhorst, Stacie)
July 23, 2015 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Stacie Elaine Barhorst for presentment of motion to compel,, #19 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 7/30/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Barhorst, Stacie)
July 23, 2015 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendant ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc. to compel Responses to Interrogatories and a Request to Produce (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit B - Barhorst Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit 3 to Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit 4 to Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit 5 to Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit 6 to Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit 7 to Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit 8 to Exhibit B, #11 Exhibit 9 to Exhibit B)(Barhorst, Stacie)
June 11, 2015 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Status hearing held and continued to 9/24/15 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (ep, )
June 4, 2015 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Defendant's counsel has informed the Court's courtroom deputy that the Motion Regarding the Sufficiency of Plaintiff's Objections and Answers to Requests to Admit #14 is being voluntarily withdrawn. Therefore, the hearing set for 6/4/15 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (ep, )
May 29, 2015 Filing 16 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc. (Barhorst, Stacie)
May 28, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Stacie Elaine Barhorst for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #14 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 6/4/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Barhorst, Stacie)
May 28, 2015 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc.TO DETERMINE THE SUFFICIENCY OF PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS AND/OR OBJECTIONS TO REQUESTS TO ADMIT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Barhorst, Stacie)
April 22, 2015 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Donna Kljucanin(Barhorst, Stacie)
April 22, 2015 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Donna Kljucanin by Stacie Elaine Barhorst (Barhorst, Stacie)
April 14, 2015 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Status hearing held and continued to 6/11/15 at 9:15 a.m. Discovery shall proceed. Mailed notice (ep, )
March 30, 2015 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc.(Barhorst, Stacie)
March 17, 2015 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Motion hearing held. Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension #7 is granted. Further status hearing set for 4/14/15 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (ep, )
March 12, 2015 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED NOTICE of Motion by Stacie Elaine Barhorst for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief #7 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 3/17/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Barhorst, Stacie)
March 12, 2015 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 UNOPPOSED (Barhorst, Stacie)
March 3, 2015 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc. by Dean Gournis (Gournis, Dean)
March 3, 2015 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc. by Stacie Elaine Barhorst (Barhorst, Stacie)
February 23, 2015 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc. and Donna Kljucanin. (sj, )
February 17, 2015 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable James B. Zagel. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (dc, )
February 13, 2015 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Neidy Berrios by Barbara Ann Susman (Susman, Barbara)
February 13, 2015 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Susman, Barbara)
February 13, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Neidy Berrios; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-10347843. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Susman, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berrios v. ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neidy Berrios
Represented By: Barbara Ann Susman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABM Janitorial Services - North Central, Inc.
Represented By: Stacie Elaine Barhorst
Represented By: Dean Gournis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Kljucanin
Represented By: Stacie Elaine Barhorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?