Chaban v. William et al

Plaintiff: William Chaban
Defendant: Tarry William, Michael Lemke, Obaisi, Clinical Services/Grievance Officers 1-5, Jane and John Does 1-10, Jane & John Does 1-10 and Jane & John Does 1-5
Case Number: 1:2015cv01926
Filed: March 2, 2015
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Will
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2017 124 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order: For the reasons stated in this memorandum order, this case will be reassigned. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 10/11/2017:Mailed notice(clw, )
October 7, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order: This paragraph will not attempt to recapitulate the many issues dealt with in this opinion.Instead it concludes by ordering the respective defendants to cure the deficiencies identified in the text of this opinion on or before Octob er 26, 2015. That said, the previously established hearing date of December 18, 2015 will be retained in place on the understanding that in the interim any of the matters described in this opinion that appear capable of earlier resolution may be raised by appropriately supported motions. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 10/7/2015:Mailed notice(clw, )
June 23, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order: This matter has come before this Court on defendant Tarry Williams' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time (Dkt. 14) and this Court's June 17, 2015 Order (Dkt. 16). It is hereby ordered that: 1. Plaintiff's counsel will determine whether to file an Amended Complaint or to proceed on the original Complaint and will inform defense counsel of her decision by July 31, 2015. 2. If plaintiff's counsel decides to proceed on the original Complaint, defendants will an swer or otherwise plead by August 14, 2015. 3. If however plaintiff's counsel decides to file an Amended Complaint, it will be filed by August 21, 2015 and defendants will answer or otherwise plead to the Amended Complaint within 21 days after receipt of a copy of that revised pleading. In that event this Court will reset the presently set status hearing to a date after the filing of defendants' responsive pleading. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 6/23/2015:Mailed notice(clw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaban v. William et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Chaban
Represented By: Katharine Elizabeth Heitman
Represented By: Bonnie L. Keane
Represented By: Edward H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarry William
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lemke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obaisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinical Services/Grievance Officers 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane & John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane & John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?