Talley v. Clerk of the U.S. Court of Appeals, 7th Circuit et al
Plaintiff: Durwyn Talley
Defendant: Clerk of the U.S. Court of Appeals, 7th Circuit, Gongocky, Tilden, Montwill, Joyce Friel, Warden Reardon, Gore, Warden Anglin, Campbell, Warden Wright, Fenoglio, Baker, Nurse Hardy, Salvador Godinez and 2nd Wexford Medical Director of IDOC
Case Number: 1:2015cv05323
Filed: June 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM Order: Plaintiff Talley's Motion to the Court 15 is denied and his Response to the Seventh Circuit Clerk's statement 16 is rejected. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 9/1/2015:Mailed notice(clw, )
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order:Plaintiff Talley's Motion To Vacate Judgment and Amend Pleadings 8 is denied, as is his renewed In Forma Pauperis Application 10 , and this action remains dismissed with prejudice. The authorities at Menard ( or at any other correctional facility where plaintiff Talley may hereafter be confined) are ordered to remit to this District Court's Clerk's Office an amount equal to one-half of all deposits made to Talley's trust fund account duri ng each month. Those remittances are to be applied first toward Talley's monthly obligation to pay fees in connection with any litigation that preceded this action, with the excess over that amount to be applied each month toward his $350 filing fee obligation attributable to this action, until that latter amount is fully paid. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/13/2015:Mailed notice and Mailed notice to Menard.(clw, )
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Because the dismissal of this action constitutes the third "strike" against plaintiff Talley under Section 1915(g), this Court invites the United States Attorney's Office (or whatever other counsel the def endant Clerk of Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit may choose to represent him) to respond with an explanation of the conduct complained of by plaintiff. Plaintiff Talley's In Forma Pauperis Application asks this Court to order the miss ing information even though it is his responsibility to do so -- but rather than standing on ceremony, this Court is transmitting a copy of this memorandum opinion and order to the trust fund officer at Menard Correctional Center with a request that the printout for the missing time frame be transmitted to the Clerk of Court for the United States District Court. Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/28/2015:Mailed notice(clw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talley v. Clerk of the U.S. Court of Appeals, 7th Circuit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Durwyn Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk of the U.S. Court of Appeals, 7th Circuit
Represented By: AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gongocky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montwill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Friel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Reardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Anglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fenoglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador Godinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2nd Wexford Medical Director of IDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?