Surita et al v. AM General LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nancy L. Surita and Rojelio Surita
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company, Blain's Farm & Fleet, DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc., Western Auto Supply, Union Carbide Corporation, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Eaton Corporation, AM General LLC, Blain Supply, Inc., Autozone, Inc., NAPA, Bosch Brake Components LLC, Cummins, Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, Caterpillar, Inc., O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc. and Blain Supply
Case Number: 1:2015cv07164
Filed: August 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2016 Filing 203 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Pursuant to Stipulation of Dismissal filed on 7/6/2016 #202 , Plaintiff and Defendants, by and through their attorneys, respectfully move this Honorable Court for the entry of an order dismissing, with prejudice, Defendants DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, and Union Carbide Corporation, and that any counter- and cross-claims filed by all parties against all parties also be dismissed, each party to bear their own costs. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (vcf, )
July 6, 2016 Filing 202 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, and Union Carbide Corporation (Henderson, David)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Surita's Amended Motion to Dismiss All Remaining Defendants #176 is granted as to Defendants Genuine Parts Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, and Caterpillar, Inc.; Surita's Motion #176 is denied as to Defendants Pneumo Abex LLC, Union Carbide Corporation, and DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc.; Surita's Agreed Motion to Dismiss all Remaining Defendants #174 is denied as moot; Surita is allowed until July 6, 2016 to file a response to the motions for summary judgment filed by Defendants Pneumo Abex LLC, Union Carbide Corporation, and DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc. [167-68, 180]; and Defendants Pneumo Abex LLC, Union Carbide Corporation, and DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc. are allowed until July 20, 2016 to file any replies in support of their motions for summary judgment. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 6/15/2016. Mailed notice(vcf, )
June 13, 2016 Filing 200 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Attorney Finlen's motion to withdraw as attorney #198 is granted. Motion hearing set for 6/14/2016 is stricken.Mailed notice (vcf, )
June 6, 2016 Filing 199 Certificate of Service and NOTICE of Motion by Charles Ryan Finlen for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #198 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 6/14/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Finlen, Charles)
June 6, 2016 Filing 198 MOTION by Attorney C. Ryan Finlen to withdraw as attorney for Western Auto Supply. No party information provided (Finlen, Charles)
May 19, 2016 Filing 197 REPLY by Nancy L. Surita, Rojelio Surita to MOTION by Defendant Pneumo Abex LLCAbex Response to Plaintiff's Motion and Memo for Voluntary Dismissal #184 , MOTION by Plaintiffs Rojelio Surita, Nancy L. Surita to dismiss Amended Motion to Dismiss All Remaining Defendants #176 , memorandum in support of motion #178 , response to motion #188 Plaintiff's Reply in Further Support of Motion for Voluntary Dismissal (Henderson, David)
May 16, 2016 Filing 196 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion by personal representative to be substituted for the deceased plaintiff #194 is granted. Motion hearing set for 5/17/2016 is stricken. Mailed notice (vcf, )
May 11, 2016 Filing 195 NOTICE of Motion by David Warren Henderson for presentment of motion to substitute party #194 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 5/17/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Henderson, David)
May 11, 2016 Filing 194 MOTION by Plaintiffs Nancy L. Surita, Rojelio Surita to substitute party Rojelio Surita for Nancy Surita, deceased (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Death Certificate, #2 Exhibit B - Order Appointing Trustee)(Henderson, David)
May 6, 2016 Filing 193 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion to withdraw as attorney Sara E. Feld #191 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
May 5, 2016 Filing 192 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing held. Plaintiff's reply to their amended motion to dismiss all remaining defendants #176 is due by 5/19/2016. Court will rule by mail. Oral motion to withdraw the appearance Attorney Sara Elaine Feld is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
May 5, 2016 Filing 191 MOTION by Attorney Sara E. Feld to withdraw as attorney for Cummins, Inc.. No party information provided (Feld, Sara)
May 5, 2016 Filing 190 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Nancy L. Surita, Rojelio Surita by David Warren Henderson (Henderson, David)
May 5, 2016 Filing 189 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Attorney David W. Henderson Application to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs #186 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
May 4, 2016 Filing 188 RESPONSE by DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiffs Rojelio Surita, Nancy L. Surita to dismiss Amended Motion to Dismiss All Remaining Defendants #176 (Correia, Michelle)
May 4, 2016 Filing 187 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Genuine Parts Company by Michael Francis Daniels (Daniels, Michael)
May 4, 2016 Filing 186 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11895650. for Attorney David W. Henderson (Henderson, David)
May 4, 2016 Filing 185 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation by Amee Lakhani (Lakhani, Amee)
May 3, 2016 Filing 184 RESPONSE by Pneumo Abex LLC Abex to Plaintiff's Motion and Memo for Voluntary Dismissal (Scott, Robert) Modified on 5/4/2016 (jc, ).
April 28, 2016 Filing 183 NOTICE of Motion by Michelle Kristine Correia for presentment of motion for summary judgment #180 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 5/5/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Correia, Michelle)
April 28, 2016 Filing 182 56.1 Statement of Facts STATEMENT by DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Correia, Michelle)
April 28, 2016 Filing 181 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Correia, Michelle)
April 28, 2016 Filing 180 MOTION by Defendant DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc. for summary judgment (Correia, Michelle)
April 28, 2016 Filing 179 Defendant Genuine Parts Company's Consent to Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(l)(A)(ii) by Genuine Parts Company (Henry, Gregory)
April 28, 2016 Filing 178 MEMORANDUM by Nancy L. Surita, Rojelio Surita in support of motion to dismiss #176 in Support of Motion for Voluntary Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Henderson, David)
April 14, 2016 Filing 177 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Amended motion to dismiss all remaining defendants #176 is entered and continued. Plaintiffs may file any supplement in support of their motion to dismiss #176 by April 28, 2016. Any Defendants who agree to Plaintiffs motion to dismiss #176 shall file their consent to that motion also by April 28, 2016. Any additional summary judgment motions by any Defendants who have not yet filed a summary judgment motion shall be filed also by April 28, 2016. Defendant's Motions for summary judgment #167 , #168 , #173 and #174 are entered and continued. Status hearing set for May 5, 2016 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (vcf, )
April 13, 2016 Filing 176 MOTION by Plaintiffs Rojelio Surita, Nancy L. Surita to dismiss Amended Motion to Dismiss All Remaining Defendants (Henderson, David)
April 13, 2016 Filing 175 NOTICE of Motion by David Warren Henderson for presentment of motion to dismiss #174 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 4/14/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Henderson, David)
April 13, 2016 Filing 174 MOTION by Plaintiffs Rojelio Surita, Nancy L. Surita to dismiss All Remaining Defendants (Henderson, David)
April 11, 2016 Filing 173 MOTION by Defendant Pneumo Abex LLC for summary judgment Re-Notice (Scott, Robert)
April 6, 2016 Filing 172 NOTICE of Motion by Robert W. Scott, Jr for presentment of motion for summary judgment #167 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 4/14/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Scott, Robert)
April 5, 2016 Filing 171 Re- NOTICE of Motion by Tobin J Taylor for presentment of motion for summary judgment, #168 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 4/14/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Taylor, Tobin)
April 4, 2016 Filing 170 NOTICE of Motion by Tobin J Taylor for presentment of motion for summary judgment, #168 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 4/14/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Taylor, Tobin)
April 4, 2016 Filing 169 MEMORANDUM by Union Carbide Corporation in support of motion for summary judgment, #168 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Taylor, Tobin)
April 4, 2016 Filing 168 MOTION by Cross Claimant Union Carbide Corporation, Cross Defendants Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Defendant Union Carbide Corporation for summary judgment (Taylor, Tobin)
March 30, 2016 Filing 167 MOTION by Defendant Pneumo Abex LLC, Cross Defendant Pneumo Abex LLC for summary judgment Motion by Defendant Pneumo Abex LLC's Motion.Memo for Summary Judgment (Scott, Robert)
March 28, 2016 Filing 166 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: AGREED motion for leave to substitute counsel #162 is granted. Uncontested motion for extension of time for moving Defendants to tender expert witness reports until 4/22/2016 #164 is granted. Motion hearings set for 3/29/2016 is stricken Mailed notice (vcf, )
March 23, 2016 Filing 165 Notice of Uncontested Motion for Extension of Time for Moving Defendants to Tender Expert Witness Reports NOTICE of Motion by Mary E Buckley for presentment of extension of time #164 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 3/29/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Buckley, Mary)
March 23, 2016 Filing 164 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for extension of time for Defendants to Tender Expert Witness Reports (Buckley, Mary)
March 16, 2016 Filing 163 (Agreed Motion) NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Joseph Burns for presentment of before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 3/29/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Burns, Thomas)
March 16, 2016 Filing 162 MOTION by Cross Defendants The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Cross Claimants The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company to substitute attorney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreed Stipulation)(Burns, Thomas)
March 16, 2016 Filing 161 ATTORNEY Appearance for Cross Defendants The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Cross Claimants The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company by Thomas Joseph Burns (Burns, Thomas)
March 4, 2016 Filing 160 Disclosure of Expert Witnesses by Genuine Parts Company (Henry, Gregory)
March 4, 2016 Filing 159 CERTIFICATE of Service for its Witness Disclosure by David Francis Fanning on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Fanning, David)
March 4, 2016 Filing 158 Witness List by Pneumo Abex LLC (Scott, Robert)
February 4, 2016 Filing 157 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Motion for leave to file defendant Union Carbide Corporations answer and affirmative defenses to plaintiffs' second amended complaint, crossclaim against co-defendants and answer to any and all crossclaims #151 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
February 4, 2016 Filing 156 ANSWER to amended complaint , CROSSCLAIM by Union Carbide Corporation against Blain's Farm & Fleet, Caterpillar, Inc., DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc., Eaton Corporation, Genuine Parts Company, Pneumo Abex LLC, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company . by Union Carbide Corporation(Taylor, Tobin)
February 4, 2016 Filing 155 ATTORNEY Appearance for Cross Defendants Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Defendant Union Carbide Corporation by Tobin J Taylor (Taylor, Tobin)
February 3, 2016 Filing 154 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiffs Nancy L. Surita, Rojelio Surita of Plaintiffs' Expert Reports (Henderson, David)
February 3, 2016 Filing 153 Second Supplemental Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Morris, Howard)
January 22, 2016 Filing 152 NOTICE of Motion by Tobin J Taylor for presentment of motion for leave to file,, #151 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 2/4/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Taylor, Tobin)
January 22, 2016 Filing 151 MOTION by Cross Defendants Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Defendant Union Carbide Corporation for leave to file Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, Crossclaim Against Co-Defendants, and Answer to Any and all Crossclaims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Taylor, Tobin)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER: Plaintiffs Nancy L. Surita and Rojelio Surita (collectively, "Plaintiffs") initially filed their complaint in this case in the Circuit Court of Cook County on July 2, 2015, alleging that Nancy Surita was exposed to asbestos and asbestos-containing products that were manufactured, supplied, or distributed by various defendants. See Dkt. 1, 1-2. Among others, Plaintiffs named as defendants in that case AM General LLC ("AM General"), Eaton Corporation ("Eaton"), and Cummins, Inc. ("Cummins"). AM General removed the action to this Court on August 14, 2015, asserting federal officer removal jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1442(a)(1). See id. at 7-8. Following removal to this Court, defendants AM General, Eaton, and Cummins (among others) filed motions to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2). See Dkts. 136, 139, 144. Plaintiffs' responded with a "Notice of Non-Opposition" to Eaton's motion to dismiss #143 , and Notices of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of defendants AM General and Cummins #145 , #146 . Accordingly, Eaton's motion to dismiss being unopposed, that motion #136 is granted; and AM General and Cummins having been dismissed from this action, their motions to dismiss #139 , #144 are denied as moot. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 1/8/2016. Mailed notice(vcf, )
January 6, 2016 Filing 149 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed on 12/23/2015 #146 , Defendant Cummins, Inc., is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Mailed notice (vcf, )
January 6, 2016 Filing 148 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed on 12/23/2015 #145 , Defendant AM General, LLC, is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Mailed notice (vcf, )
December 31, 2015 Filing 147 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiffs Nancy L. Surita, Rojelio Surita Plaintiffs' Expert Designation (Simon, Dana)
December 23, 2015 Filing 146 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs Without Prejudice of Defendant Cummins, Inc. (Galeoto, Gemma)
December 23, 2015 Filing 145 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs Without Prejudice of Defendant AM General LLC (Galeoto, Gemma)
December 16, 2015 Filing 144 MOTION by Defendant Cummins, Inc., Cross Defendant Cummins, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Rule 12(b)(2) (Feld, Sara)
December 14, 2015 Filing 143 Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendant Eaton Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Nancy L. Surita, Rojelio Surita (Galeoto, Gemma)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER: This cause coming before the Court on behalf of AM General LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (ECF No. #139 ), pursuant to agreement with plaintiffs' counsel and per the direction of this Court's Courtroom Deputy, the Court being duly advised, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Any Response shall be filed by January 4, 2016. Any Reply shall be filed by January 22, 2016. Court will rule by mail. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 12/4/2015. Mailed notice(vcf, )
December 1, 2015 Filing 141 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice filed on 11/30/2015 #137 , Plaintiffs Nancy L. Surita and Rojelio Surita voluntarily dismisses Defendant Honeywell International Inc., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., as successor-in-interest to The Bendix Corporation ("Honeywell") is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Mailed notice (vcf, )
December 1, 2015 Filing 140 ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM by DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc. against All Defendants and Answer to Crossclaims. by DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc.(Correia, Michelle)
November 30, 2015 Filing 139 MOTION by Defendant AM General LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fraerman, Andrew)
November 30, 2015 Filing 138 BRIEFING SCHEDULE ORDER: Eaton Corporation's rule 12(b)(2) motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction #136 is entered and briefed as follows: Answer is due by is due by 12/14/2015. Reply is due by 12/21/2015. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 11/30/2015. Mailed notice(vcf, )
November 30, 2015 Filing 137 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs Without Prejudice of Defendant Honeywell International Inc. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Galeoto, Gemma)
November 23, 2015 Filing 136 MOTION by Defendant Eaton Corporation to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hughes, Andrew)
November 23, 2015 Filing 135 Caterpillar Inc.'s ANSWER to amended complaint , CROSSCLAIM by Caterpillar, Inc. against All Plaintiffs . by Caterpillar, Inc.(Buckley, Mary)
November 16, 2015 Filing 134 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Pneumo Abex LLC regarding answer to amended complaint, crossclaim #132 , claim #133 (Scott, Robert)
November 16, 2015 Filing 133 CLAIM by Pneumo Abex LLC regarding answer to amended complaint, crossclaim,, #130 Answer to Goodyear Tire's Crossclaims (Scott, Robert)
November 16, 2015 Filing 132 Pneumo Abex LLC's ANSWER to amended complaint , CROSSCLAIM by Pneumo Abex LLC against All Defendants . by Pneumo Abex LLC(Scott, Robert)
November 13, 2015 Filing 131 ATTORNEY Appearance for Cross Defendant Cummins, Inc. by Sara Elaine Feld (Feld, Sara)
November 11, 2015 Filing 130 Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Companys ANSWER to amended complaint Second Amended, CROSSCLAIM by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company against All Defendants . by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company(Morris, Howard)
November 10, 2015 Filing 129 Second AMENDED complaint by Rojelio Surita, Nancy L. Surita against All Defendants (Galeoto, Gemma)
November 10, 2015 Filing 128 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file second amended complaint #123 is granted. Motion hearing set for 11/19/2015 is stricken. Mailed notice (vcf, )
November 10, 2015 Filing 127 Second Amended NOTICE of Motion by Gemma Galeoto for presentment of motion to amend/correct #123 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 11/19/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Galeoto, Gemma)
November 9, 2015 Filing 126 Answer to Counterclaim by Pneumo Abex LLC (Scott, Robert)
November 5, 2015 Filing 125 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing held. Plaintiffs are to disclose experts by 1/4/2016. Plaintiffs' expert reports are to be tendered to Defendants on 2/3/2016. Defendants are to disclose experts by 3/4/2016. Defendants' expert reports are to be tendered by 4/4/2016. All oral depositions, including experts, to be completed by 7/1/2016. Status hearing it set for 7/7/2016 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
November 5, 2015 Filing 124 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Gemma Galeoto for presentment of motion to amend/correct #123 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 11/12/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Galeoto, Gemma)
November 5, 2015 Filing 123 MOTION by Plaintiffs Nancy L. Surita, Rojelio Surita to amend/correct Amend Complaint (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint)(Galeoto, Gemma)
November 4, 2015 Filing 122 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company by David Francis Fanning (Fanning, David)
November 4, 2015 Filing 121 The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company against All Defendants . by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company(Morris, Howard)
November 4, 2015 Filing 120 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company by Howard Patrick Morris (Morris, Howard)
November 4, 2015 Filing 119 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Galeoto, Gemma)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER: First Amended Rule 12(b)(2) motion for lack personal jurisdiction #52 is granted. For the following reasons, the Court grants Defendant Blain Supply, Inc's ("Blain") motion to dismiss Plaintiffs Nancy L. Surita and Rojelio Surita (the "Suritas") First Amended Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) ("Rule 12(b)(2)"). Blain Supply, Inc. is terminated. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 11/4/2015. Mailed notice(vcf, )
November 4, 2015 Filing 117 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation by Brett Michael Mares (Mares, Brett)
November 4, 2015 Filing 116 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Doc. #115 is denied based on Plaintiffs' failure to comply with the Judge Kocoras's motion practice as stated on the Court's website: "All motions must be filed at least three working days prior to the date of the hearing of the motion pursuant to Local Rule 78.1." Plaintiffs are to refile their motion for leave to amend consistent with the local rules. Also, a notice of motion should be filed in a separate entry. Mailed notice (vcf, )
November 3, 2015 Filing 115 MOTION by Plaintiffs Nancy L. Surita, Rojelio Surita to amend/correct Amend Complaint (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Second Amended Complaint)(Galeoto, Gemma)
November 3, 2015 Filing 114 AGREED ORDER: Agreed motion to dismiss defendant Autozone, Inc. #111 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 11/3/2015. Mailed notice(vcf, )
November 2, 2015 Filing 113 AGREED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL: Agreed Motion to dismiss Western Auto Supply Company, Bosch Brake Components LLC and O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc., Including all cross claims #105 is granted. Motion hearing set for 11/3/2015 is stricken. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 11/2/2015. Mailed notice(vcf, )
October 28, 2015 Filing 112 NOTICE of Motion by Linda J. Hay for presentment of motion to dismiss #111 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 11/3/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Hay, Linda)
October 28, 2015 Filing 111 MOTION by Defendant Autozone, Inc. to dismiss AutoZone, Inc. (Hay, Linda)
October 28, 2015 Filing 110 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Autozone, Inc. by Linda J. Hay (Hay, Linda)
October 27, 2015 Filing 109 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pneumo Abex LLC by Timothy Whitzel Swain, Ii (Swain, Timothy)
October 26, 2015 Filing 108 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing set for 10/27/2015 is stricken. Motion by Defendant Blain Supply, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction was briefed on 9/22/2015 doc#53 . Mailed notice (vcf, )
October 26, 2015 Filing 107 Second Amended NOTICE of Motion by Michael Daniel Martinez for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #52 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 11/5/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Martinez, Michael)
October 23, 2015 Filing 106 ANSWER to Crossclaim AM GENERAL LLC, ANSWER to Crossclaim EATON CORPORATION, ANSWER to Crossclaim DRS SUSTAINMENT CORP, ANSWER to Crossclaim BOSCH BRAKE COMPONENTS, ANSWER to Crossclaim GENUINE PARTS COMPANY, ANSWER to Crossclaim WESTERN AUTO SUPPLY and PNEUMO ABEX LLC by Cummins, Inc.(Nye, Brian)
October 23, 2015 Filing 105 MOTION by Plaintiffs Rojelio Surita, Nancy L. Surita to dismiss Western Auto Supply Co., Bosch Brake Components LLC and O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc., Including All Cross Claims (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Galeoto, Gemma)
October 23, 2015 Filing 104 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Autozone, Inc. by Anthony G. Joseph (Joseph, Anthony)
October 22, 2015 Filing 103 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Nancy L. Surita. Honeywell International, Inc. waiver sent on 9/21/2015, answer due 11/20/2015. (Galeoto, Gemma)
October 22, 2015 Filing 102 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Nancy L. Surita. The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company waiver sent on 10/20/2015, answer due 12/21/2015. (Galeoto, Gemma)
October 22, 2015 Filing 101 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation by Andrew Joseph Keyt (Keyt, Andrew)
October 19, 2015 Filing 100 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation by Mark A Ludolph (Ludolph, Mark)
October 19, 2015 Filing 99 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation by Tobin J Taylor (Taylor, Tobin)
October 19, 2015 Filing 98 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Agreed motion to withdraw Claire Allyn Floore as counsel #65 is granted. Motion hearing set for 10/20/2015 is stricken. Mailed notice (vcf, )
October 19, 2015 Filing 97 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Eaton Corporation by James L. Mccrystal, Jr (Mccrystal, James)
October 19, 2015 Filing 96 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Attorney Tiffany M Quick Application to appear pro hac vice #94 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
October 16, 2015 Filing 95 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. by Scott H. Koontz (Koontz, Scott)
October 16, 2015 Filing 94 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11194160. (Quick, Tiffany)
October 15, 2015 Filing 93 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Attorney James L. McCrystal, Jr Application to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Eaton Corporation #91 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
October 15, 2015 Filing 92 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. by Shari Faith Keiser (Keiser, Shari)
October 15, 2015 Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11190832. (Mccrystal, James)
October 13, 2015 Filing 90 correspondence enclosing courtesy copy of Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss to chambers by O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. (Antikainen, Michael)
October 13, 2015 Filing 89 REPLY by O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. to MOTION by Defendant O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Plaintiff's first Amended Complaint #56 , MOTION by Defendant O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #10 (Antikainen, Michael)
October 13, 2015 Filing 88 REPLY by Blain Supply, Inc. to response in opposition to motion #67 to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Corporation File Detail Reports)(Martinez, Michael)
October 12, 2015 Filing 87 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. by Si-Yong Yi (Yi, Si-Yong)
October 12, 2015 Filing 86 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. by Jennifer Jerit Johnson (Johnson, Jennifer)
October 12, 2015 Filing 85 CLAIM by Pneumo Abex LLC regarding Answers to AM Gen., Eaton, & Bosch Brake's Crossclaims (Scott, Robert)
October 8, 2015 Filing 84 NOTICE by Western Auto Supply re answer to crossclaim #81 , other #83 , answer to crossclaim #80 , answer to crossclaim #82 with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Finlen, Charles)
October 8, 2015 Filing 83 Western Auto Supply Company's ANSWER to Crossclaim by Eaton Corporation by Western Auto Supply (Finlen, Charles)
October 8, 2015 Filing 82 Western Auto Supply Company's ANSWER to Crossclaim by DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc. by Western Auto Supply(Finlen, Charles)
October 8, 2015 Filing 81 Western Auto Supply Company's ANSWER to Crossclaim by Genuine Parts Company by Western Auto Supply(Finlen, Charles)
October 8, 2015 Filing 80 Western Auto Supply Company's ANSWER to Crossclaim by Bosch Brake Components, LLC by Western Auto Supply(Finlen, Charles)
October 6, 2015 Filing 79 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Correia, Michelle)
October 6, 2015 Filing 78 ANSWER to amended complaint , CROSSCLAIM by DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc. against All Defendants Answer to all Crossclaims. by DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc.(Correia, Michelle)
October 6, 2015 Filing 77 ANSWER to Crossclaim OF WESTERN AUTO SUPPLY by Bosch Brake Components LLC(Tauras, Richard)
October 6, 2015 Filing 76 ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM by Genuine Parts Company against AM General LLC, Autozone, Inc., Blain Supply, Inc., Blain's Farm & Fleet, Bosch Brake Components LLC, Caterpillar, Inc., Cummins, Inc., DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc., Eaton Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Western Auto Supply . by Genuine Parts Company(Henry, Gregory)
October 6, 2015 Filing 75 ANSWER to Crossclaim OF PNEUMO ABEX by Bosch Brake Components LLC(Tauras, Richard) . (Docket Text modified by Clerks Office). "Duplicate filing of entry no. 74." (tt, ).
October 6, 2015 Filing 74 ANSWER to Crossclaim OF PNEUMO ABEX by Bosch Brake Components LLC(Tauras, Richard)
October 6, 2015 Filing 73 ANSWER to Crossclaim OF EATON CORPORATION by Bosch Brake Components LLC(Tauras, Richard)
October 6, 2015 Filing 72 ANSWER to Crossclaim OF AM GENERAL by Bosch Brake Components LLC(Tauras, Richard)
October 6, 2015 Filing 71 CROSSCLAIM by Bosch Brake Components LLC against All Defendants .(Tauras, Richard)
October 6, 2015 Filing 70 ANSWER to amended complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Bosch Brake Components LLC(Tauras, Richard)
October 6, 2015 Filing 69 Eaton Corporation's ANSWER to amended complaint , Eaton Corporation's ANSWER to Crossclaim by Eaton Corporation(Hughes, Andrew)
October 6, 2015 Filing 68 RESPONSE by Nancy L. Surita, Rojelio Suritain Opposition to MOTION by Defendant O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Plaintiff's first Amended Complaint #56 , MOTION by Defendant O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Galeoto, Gemma)
October 6, 2015 Filing 67 RESPONSE by Nancy L. Surita, Rojelio Suritain Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Blain Supply, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #52 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Galeoto, Gemma)
October 6, 2015 Filing 66 AGREED NOTICE of Motion by Charles Ryan Finlen for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #65 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 10/20/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Finlen, Charles)
October 6, 2015 Filing 65 MOTION by Attorney Claire A. Floore to withdraw as attorney for Western Auto Supply, Western Auto Supply, Western Auto Supply, Western Auto Supply, Western Auto Supply. No party information provided (Finlen, Charles)
October 5, 2015 Filing 64 ANSWER to amended complaint With Affirmative Defenses, ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM by AM General LLC against Autozone, Inc., Blain Supply, Inc., Blain's Farm & Fleet, Bosch Brake Components LLC, Caterpillar, Inc., Cummins, Inc., DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc., Eaton Corporation, Genuine Parts Company, Honeywell International, Inc., O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, Nancy L. Surita, Rojelio Surita, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Western Auto Supply . by AM General LLC(Fraerman, Andrew)
October 1, 2015 Filing 63 NOTICE by Western Auto Supply re answer to amended complaint, crossclaim,,,, #59 , answer to crossclaim #61 , answer to crossclaim #60 , notification of affiliates pursuant to local rule 3.2 #62 with Certificate of Service (Finlen, Charles)
October 1, 2015 Filing 62 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Western Auto Supply and Disclosure Statement pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 (Finlen, Charles)
October 1, 2015 Filing 61 ANSWER to Crossclaim by Pneumo Abex LLC by Western Auto Supply(Finlen, Charles)
October 1, 2015 Filing 60 ANSWER to Crossclaim by AM General LLC by Western Auto Supply(Finlen, Charles)
October 1, 2015 Filing 59 ANSWER to amended complaint with AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES and JURY DEMAND, and CROSSCLAIM by Western Auto Supply against AM General LLC, Autozone, Inc., Blain Supply, Inc., Blain's Farm & Fleet, Bosch Brake Components LLC, Caterpillar, Inc., Cummins, Inc., DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc., Eaton Corporation, Genuine Parts Company, Honeywell International, Inc., O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Union Carbide Corporation . by Western Auto Supply(Finlen, Charles)
September 30, 2015 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. regarding answer to amended complaint #57 (Buckley, Mary)
September 30, 2015 Filing 57 DEFENDANT CATERPILLAR INC.'S ANSWER to amended complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLANTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND by Caterpillar, Inc.(Buckley, Mary)
September 28, 2015 Filing 56 MOTION by Defendant O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Plaintiff's first Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Antikainen, Michael)
September 22, 2015 Filing 55 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Michael Daniel Martinez for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #52 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 10/27/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Martinez, Michael)
September 22, 2015 Filing 54 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Daniel Martinez for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #52 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 10/15/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Martinez, Michael)
September 22, 2015 Filing 53 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing held. O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction #10 and defendant, Blain Supply, Inc. motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction [35-1] is entered and briefed as follows; Plaintiffs' answer is due by 10/6/2015. Replies are due by 10/13/2015. Court will rule by mail. Status hearing set for 11/5/2015 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (vcf, )
September 22, 2015 Filing 52 MOTION by Defendant Blain Supply, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Wisconsin Department of Financial Institutions Corporate Records for Blain Supply, Inc.)(Martinez, Michael)
September 21, 2015 Filing 51 ATTORNEY Appearance for Cross Defendant Western Auto Supply, Defendant Western Auto Supply by John Paul Arranz (Arranz, John)
September 18, 2015 Filing 50 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc. by Michelle Kristine Correia (Correia, Michelle)
September 18, 2015 Filing 49 Pneumo Abex LLC's ANSWER to amended complaint , CROSSCLAIM by Pneumo Abex LLC against All Defendants ., COUNTERCLAIM filed by Pneumo Abex LLC against All Plaintiffs . by Pneumo Abex LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Scott, Robert)
September 17, 2015 Filing 48 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pneumo Abex LLC by Robert W. Scott, Jr (Scott, Robert)
September 16, 2015 Filing 47 AMENDED Complaint at Law (Wadington, Robert)
September 15, 2015 Filing 46 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Bosch Brake Components LLC (Tauras, Richard)
September 15, 2015 Filing 45 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bosch Brake Components LLC, Cross Defendant Bosch Brake Components LLC by Richard P. Tauras (Tauras, Richard)
September 14, 2015 Filing 44 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Rojelio Surita, Nancy L. Surita against All Defendants. (tt, )
September 14, 2015 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Defendant Caterpillar Inc.'s routine unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint until 9/15/2015 #19 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file first amended complaint #32 is granted. Blain Supply, Inc.'s unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint and to file responsive pleading, Instanter by 9/21/2015 #35 is granted. Motion hearings set for 9/15/2015 are stricken. Mailed notice (vcf, )
September 14, 2015 Filing 42 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Western Auto Supply by Charles Ryan Finlen (Finlen, Charles)
September 11, 2015 Filing 41 Defendant Caterpillar Inc.'s ANSWER to Crossclaim of Defendant AM General LLC by Caterpillar, Inc.(Buckley, Mary)
September 10, 2015 Filing 40 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 STATEMENT by Eaton Corporation , MacCabe & McGuire (Hughes, Andrew)
September 9, 2015 Filing 39 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Genuine Parts Company (Henry, Gregory)
September 9, 2015 Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Genuine Parts Company by Gregory T Henry (Henry, Gregory)
September 8, 2015 Filing 37 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Blain's Farm & Fleet (Martinez, Michael)
September 8, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE of Motion by Michael Daniel Martinez for presentment of extension of time,, #35 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 9/15/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Martinez, Michael)
September 8, 2015 Filing 35 MOTION by Defendant Blain's Farm & Fleet for extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' complaint and to file responsive pleading, instanter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Blain Supply, Inc.'s Section 2-619 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Exhibit B: Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C: Cook County Electronic Docket, #4 Exhibit D: Proposed Rule 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit E: Email from Plaintiffs' Counsel)(Martinez, Michael)
September 8, 2015 Filing 34 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Blain's Farm & Fleet by Michael Daniel Martinez (Martinez, Michael)
September 4, 2015 Filing 33 NOTICE of Motion by Robert Neil Wadington for presentment of motion for leave to file #32 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 9/15/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Wadington, Robert)
September 4, 2015 Filing 32 MOTION by Plaintiff Nancy L. Surita for leave to file First Amended Complaint at Law (Wadington, Robert)
September 4, 2015 Filing 31 MOTION by Cross Defendant Cummins, Inc., Defendant Cummins, Inc. for disclosure Notification of Affiliate/Disclosure Statement (Nye, Brian)
September 4, 2015 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Cummins, Inc.(Nye, Brian)
September 4, 2015 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Cross Defendant Cummins, Inc., Defendant Cummins, Inc. by Brian M Nye (Nye, Brian)
September 4, 2015 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Cross Defendant Cummins, Inc., Defendant Cummins, Inc. by Steven Alan Hart (Hart, Steven)
September 3, 2015 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Nancy L. Surita, Rojelio Surita by Robert Neil Wadington (Wadington, Robert)
September 2, 2015 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Eaton Corporation by Patrick Ray Lavery , MacCabe & McGuire (Lavery, Patrick)
September 2, 2015 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Eaton Corporation by Timothy John Murphy , MacCabe & McGuire (Murphy, Timothy)
September 2, 2015 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc. by Thomas M. Crawford (Crawford, Thomas)
September 1, 2015 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Eaton Corporation by Andrew L Hughes , MacCabe & McGuire (Hughes, Andrew)
August 28, 2015 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mary E Buckley on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc. regarding notice of motion, #20 , MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for extension of time to file answer Routine Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint #19 , attorney appearance #18 , statement #21 , attorney appearance #17 (Buckley, Mary)
August 28, 2015 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement STATEMENT by Caterpillar, Inc. (Buckley, Mary)
August 28, 2015 Filing 20 Notice of Defendant Caterpillar Inc.'s Routine Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint NOTICE of Motion by Mary E Buckley for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #19 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 9/15/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Buckley, Mary)
August 28, 2015 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. for extension of time to file answer Routine Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Buckley, Mary)
August 28, 2015 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. by Mary E Buckley (Buckley, Mary)
August 28, 2015 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. by Anthony J. Anscombe (Anscombe, Anthony)
August 27, 2015 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Attorney Nancy Shane Rappaport Application to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendant AM General LLC #15 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 27, 2015 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11019896. (Rappaport, Nancy)
August 27, 2015 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Western Auto Supply by Adam H Doeringer (Doeringer, Adam)
August 26, 2015 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Western Auto Supply, Cross Defendant Western Auto Supply by Claire Allyn Floore Defendant Western Auto Supply Company's Entry of Appearance (Floore, Claire)
August 25, 2015 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Attorney Gemma R. Galeoto Application to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs #11 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 25, 2015 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11008294. Gemma Galeoto (Galeoto, Gemma)
August 21, 2015 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Antikainen, Michael)
August 21, 2015 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. (Antikainen, Michael)
August 21, 2015 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. by Michael Thomas Antikainen (Antikainen, Michael)
August 21, 2015 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by AM General LLC re answer to complaint, crossclaim,, #6 (Fraerman, Andrew)
August 21, 2015 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM by AM General LLC against Autozone, Inc., Blain's Farm & Fleet, Bosch Brake Components LLC, Caterpillar, Inc., Cummins, Inc., DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc., Eaton Corporation, Genuine Parts Company, O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, Union Carbide Corporation, Western Auto Supply . by AM General LLC(Fraerman, Andrew)
August 21, 2015 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 9/22/2015 at 09:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 17, 2015 Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (sxn, )
August 14, 2015 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. (mgh, )
August 14, 2015 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AM General LLC by Andrew Michael Fraerman (Fraerman, Andrew)
August 14, 2015 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fraerman, Andrew)
August 14, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (15 L 6799) filed by AM General LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-10975407. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- 15 L 6799 - Circuit Court of Cook County Court Pleadings)(Fraerman, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Surita et al v. AM General LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Michael Francis Daniels
Represented By: Gregory T Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blain's Farm & Fleet
Represented By: Michael Daniel Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRS Sustainment Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Crawford
Represented By: Michelle Kristine Correia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Auto Supply
Represented By: Claire Allyn Floore
Represented By: John Paul Arranz
Represented By: Adam H Doeringer
Represented By: Charles Ryan Finlen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Brett Michael Mares
Represented By: Mark A Ludolph
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Keyt
Represented By: Amee Lakhani
Represented By: Tobin J Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Burns
Represented By: Howard Patrick Morris
Represented By: David Francis Fanning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: James L. Mccrystal, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew L Hughes
Represented By: Patrick Ray Lavery
Represented By: Timothy John Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AM General LLC
Represented By: Nancy Shane Rappaport
Represented By: Andrew Michael Fraerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blain Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone, Inc.
Represented By: Linda J. Hay
Represented By: Anthony G. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAPA
Represented By: Michael Francis Daniels
Represented By: Gregory T Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bosch Brake Components LLC
Represented By: Richard P. Tauras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M Nye
Represented By: Steven Alan Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Timothy Whitzel Swain, II
Represented By: Robert W. Scott, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: Mary E Buckley
Represented By: Anthony J. Anscombe
Represented By: Shari Faith Keiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Thomas Antikainen
Represented By: Scott H. Koontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Si-Yong Yi
Represented By: Jennifer Jerit Johnson
Represented By: Tiffany M Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blain Supply
Represented By: Michael Daniel Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy L. Surita
Represented By: David Warren Henderson
Represented By: Gemma Galeoto
Represented By: Robert Neil Wadington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rojelio Surita
Represented By: David Warren Henderson
Represented By: Gemma Galeoto
Represented By: Robert Neil Wadington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?