Briscoe v. Village of Vernon Hills et al
Plaintiff: John Briscoe
Defendant: Village of Vernon Hills, Roger Byrne, John Kalmar, Larry Nakrin and Mark Fleischhauer
Case Number: 1:2015cv10761
Filed: November 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: McHenry
Presiding Judge: Samuel Der-Yeghiayan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. The Court grants defendants' motion to dismiss 45 without prejudice. Plaintiff is given a final opportunity to amend his complaint by April 30, 2018 to state a claim or this case will be dismissed with prejudice. Status set for May 2, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/30/2018. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Plaintiff's motion 19 is granted and defendants' motion 25 is denied. The judgment entered on May 25, 2016 18 is vacated. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by April 20, 2017. Status hearing set for April 26, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/29/2017. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan on 5/25/2016: Mailed notice (mw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briscoe v. Village of Vernon Hills et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Briscoe
Represented By: Thomas Steven Radja, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Vernon Hills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kalmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Nakrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Fleischhauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?