Napleton's Arlington Heights Motors, Inc et al v. FCA US, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Napleton's Arlington Heights Motors, Inc., Napleton's North Palm Auto Park, Inc., Napleton's River Oaks Motors, Inc., Napleton's Mid Rivers Motors, Inc., Napleton's Ellwood Motors, Inc., Clermont Motors, LLC and Napleton Enterprises, LLC |
Defendant: |
FCA US LLC and FCA Realty, LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00403 |
Filed: |
January 12, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois |
Office: |
Chicago Office |
County: |
Cook |
Presiding Judge: |
Virginia M. Kendall |
Nature of Suit: |
Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause of Action: |
18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 10, 2018 |
Filing
347
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/10/2018. FCA's Motion to Dismiss 289 is granted. Plaintiff's RICO claims in Counts IV and V are dismissed with prejudice. The Court also reaffirms that Counts VI, VII, XIII, and XIV in the Second Amended Complaint are dismissed with prejudice. Mailed notice(lk, )
|
October 4, 2016 |
Filing
62
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 10/4/2016. The Defendants' motion to dismiss 41 is granted in part.Specifically, the motion is denied with respect to Counts I, II, III, VIII, X, and XII. The motion i s granted without prejudice as to Counts IV and V and granted with prejudice as to Counts VI, VII, XIII, and XIV. Finally, the motion granted in part with regards to Counts IX and XI. Discovery shall proceed on the Counts set forth in this order and the parties shall appear at the previously set status conference set for 10/13/2016 at 9:00 a.m. for a detailed schedule. Mailed notice(lk, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Napleton's Arlington Heights Motors, Inc et al v. FCA US, LLC et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Napleton's Arlington Heights Motors, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Leonard A Bellavia |
Represented By: |
Steven H Blatt |
Represented By: |
Jeffery Moore Cross |
Represented By: |
David C. Gustman |
Represented By: |
Kevin M. Hyde |
Represented By: |
David J Ogles |
Represented By: |
Dylan D. Smith |
Represented By: |
Alexander S. Vesselinovitch |
Represented By: |
Thomas Mark Williams |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Napleton's North Palm Auto Park, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Leonard A Bellavia |
Represented By: |
Steven H Blatt |
Represented By: |
Jeffery Moore Cross |
Represented By: |
David C. Gustman |
Represented By: |
Kevin M. Hyde |
Represented By: |
David J Ogles |
Represented By: |
Dylan D. Smith |
Represented By: |
Alexander S. Vesselinovitch |
Represented By: |
Thomas Mark Williams |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Napleton's River Oaks Motors, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Jeffery Moore Cross |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Napleton's Mid Rivers Motors, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Jeffery Moore Cross |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Napleton's Ellwood Motors, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Jeffery Moore Cross |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Clermont Motors, LLC |
Represented By: |
Jeffery Moore Cross |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Napleton Enterprises, LLC |
Represented By: |
Jeffery Moore Cross |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: FCA US LLC |
Represented By: |
Robert D Cultice |
Represented By: |
Caitlin W. Monahan |
Represented By: |
Randall Lee Oyler |
Represented By: |
Brandon C. Prosansky |
Represented By: |
Owen H. Smith |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: FCA Realty, LLC |
Represented By: |
Robert D Cultice |
Represented By: |
Caitlin W. Monahan |
Represented By: |
Randall Lee Oyler |
Represented By: |
Brandon C. Prosansky |
Represented By: |
Owen H. Smith |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?