Druhot v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Denise Druhot
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv02053
Filed: February 9, 2016
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John W. Darrah
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Druhot's motion for entry of judgment (ECF No. 17 ) is granted, and Reliance Standard's motion for entry of judgment (ECF No. 33 ) is denied. Druhot is directed to send a proposed judgment to the court on or before October 19, 2017. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 9/28/2017. Mailed notice(vcf, )
December 14, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company for judgment pursuant to Fed. R. CIv. P. 52 (Kersting, Edna)
October 18, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Plaintiff Denise Druhot for judgment (DeBofsky, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Druhot v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Druhot
Represented By: Mark D. DeBofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Edna Sybil Kersting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?