Gupta et al v. Gupta et al
Plaintiff: Gupta, Anurag Gupta and Aleea Gupta
Defendant: Angela Gupta and Ranjan Gupta
Case Number: 1:2016cv02197
Filed: February 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Du Page
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2016 Filing 42 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/4/16 before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Court Reporter Contact Information: Kathleen_Fennell@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2017. (Fennell, Kathleen)
November 1, 2016 Filing 41 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: A stipulation for dismissal has been filed. This case is dismissed without prejudice. Civil Case Terminated. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
November 1, 2016 Filing 40 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice (White, Ethan)
November 1, 2016 Filing 39 STIPULATION Stipulation of the Parties (White, Ethan)
October 31, 2016 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Telephonic status hearing held. Parties report they have agreed on language for the stipulation. Parties shall file their stipulation to dismiss before the district judge by 11/04/16. All matters relating to the referral of this action having been concluded, the referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned judge. Honorable Judge Mary M. Rowland no longer referred to the case. Mailed notice. (dm, )
October 18, 2016 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Status hearing held. Parties report they have made significant progress entering into a stipulation. Telephonic status hearing set for 10/31/16 at 1:00 p.m. If parties are not able to reach an agreement an aggressive close of fact discovery will be set. Counsel shall call the Court's teleconference number: 866-434-5269, access code 3751971. Mailed notice. (dm, )
October 4, 2016 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Status hearing held to discuss setting settlement conference. Rather than requiring the parties to travel to Chicago to be present for an in-person settlement conference, the court proposes that the parties stipulate that (1) $825,000 borrowed by Defendants from Plaintiffs is community property under California law; (2) any money repaid by Dr. Ranjan Gupta at the time of the dissolution of Defendants' marriage will be credited to Dr. Ranjan Gupta in the divorce proceedings; (3) Defendants will continue to pay the interest on the loan and will pay $2,000 per month toward the principle between now and the dissolution of the marriage; and (4) at the dissolution of the marriage both Defendants will negotiate in good faith the prompt repayment of the remaining principle. Such a stipulation would result in a dismissal of this action and would obviate the need for the deposition of Mrs. Angela Gupta in this action. Status set for 10/18/16 at 9:15 a.m. for counsel to report whether the parties are amenable to enter said stipulation. Mailed notice. (dm, )
September 23, 2016 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Status set for 10/04/16 at 09:00 AM to set a settlement conference. Parties are to bring dates when both clients and counsel will be available for a settlement conference. Judge Rowland generally conducts settlement conferences Mondays, Tuesdays, Wednesdays, and Fridays from 1:30 PM to 4:30 PM. Other dates and times may be available as required by the Court or the parties. The parties are directed to review and to comply with Judge Rowland's Standing Order regarding Settlement Conferences, which is available on Judge Rowland's web page located on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice. (dm, )
September 22, 2016 Filing 34 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Mary M. Rowland for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: settlement conference.(ntf, )Notice mailed by judge's staff
September 22, 2016 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to compel #29 is withdrawn. Parties shall meet and confer to discuss settlement by 9/29/16. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
September 14, 2016 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held. Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's unopposed motion to extend discovery #27 is granted to 10/21/16. Plaintiff's motion to compel Defendant Angela Gupta's discovery responses #29 is entered and continued to 9/22/16 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
September 7, 2016 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing previously set for 9/8/16 is stricken and reset to 9/14/16 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiffs' motions to extend discovery #27 and to compel #29 are entered and continued to 9/14/16 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
September 1, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion by Ethan Emery White for presentment of motion to compel #29 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/8/2016 at 09:30 AM. (White, Ethan)
September 1, 2016 Filing 29 MOTION by Plaintiffs Aleea Gupta, Anurag Gupta to compel Motion to Compel Defendant Angela Guptas Discovery Responses (White, Ethan)
August 31, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion by Ethan Emery White for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery #27 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/8/2016 at 09:30 AM. (White, Ethan)
August 31, 2016 Filing 27 MOTION by Plaintiffs Aleea Gupta, Anurag Gupta for extension of time to complete discovery Unopposed Motion to Extend Discovery (White, Ethan)
July 7, 2016 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held and continued to 9/8/16 at 9:30 a.m. Parties' oral motion to extend fact discovery is granted to 9/6/16. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
June 29, 2016 Filing 25 ANSWER to amended complaint by Angela Gupta(Mocogni, Kevin)
June 29, 2016 Filing 24 ANSWER to amended complaint by Ranjan Gupta(Lubin, Peter)
June 8, 2016 Filing 23 AMENDED complaint by Anurag Gupta, Aleea Gupta against All Defendants (White, Ethan)
June 8, 2016 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiffs' motion to file amended complaint, instanter #20 is granted. Motion hearing date of 6/16/16 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
June 7, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Ethan Emery White for presentment of motion to file instanter #20 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 6/16/2016 at 09:30 AM. (White, Ethan)
June 7, 2016 Filing 20 MOTION by Plaintiffs Aleea Gupta, Anurag Gupta to file instanter Motion to File Amended Complaint, Instanter (White, Ethan)
May 27, 2016 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Angela Gupta(Mocogni, Kevin)
May 17, 2016 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held and continued to 7/7/16 at 9:30 a.m. Defendant Angela Gupta's oral motion for extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is granted to 5/24/16. All fact discovery shall be noticed in time to be completed by 7/15/16. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
May 4, 2016 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Ranjan Gupta(Lubin, Peter)
May 4, 2016 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ranjan Gupta by Andrew Charles Murphy (Murphy, Andrew)
May 4, 2016 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ranjan Gupta by Patrick Doyle Austermuehle (Austermuehle, Patrick)
May 4, 2016 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ranjan Gupta by Vincent Louis DiTommaso (DiTommaso, Vincent)
May 4, 2016 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ranjan Gupta by Peter Scott Lubin (Lubin, Peter)
April 19, 2016 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held and continued to 5/17/16 at 9:30 a.m. Defendant Angela Gupta's oral motion for extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is granted to 5/11/16. Parties are directed to meet and confer to discuss settlement. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
March 31, 2016 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant Angela Gupta's unopposed motion for extension of time to responsively plead to Plaintiffs' complaint #9 is granted to 4/20/16. Motion hearing date of 4/6/16 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
March 31, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel W. Tarpey for presentment of extension of time #9 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 4/6/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Tarpey, Daniel)
March 31, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Angela Gupta for extension of time (Tarpey, Daniel)
March 23, 2016 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Angela Gupta by Kevin T Mocogni (Mocogni, Kevin)
March 23, 2016 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Angela Gupta by Daniel W. Tarpey (Tarpey, Daniel)
February 26, 2016 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Initial status hearing set for 4/19/16 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
February 12, 2016 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Aleea Gupta, Anurag Gupta by John Patrick Killacky (Killacky, John)
February 12, 2016 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Aleea Gupta, Anurag Gupta by Michael Irving Leonard (Leonard, Michael)
February 12, 2016 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Aleea Gupta, Anurag Gupta by Ethan Emery White (White, Ethan)
February 12, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (White, Ethan)
February 12, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Anurag Gupta, Aleea Gupta; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-11610492.(White, Ethan)
February 12, 2016 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. (dc, )
February 12, 2016 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Angela Gupta, Ranjan Gupta (pg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gupta et al v. Gupta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anurag Gupta
Represented By: Ethan Emery White
Represented By: John Patrick Killacky
Represented By: Michael Irving Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleea Gupta
Represented By: Ethan Emery White
Represented By: John Patrick Killacky
Represented By: Michael Irving Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Gupta
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Kevin T. Mocogni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranjan Gupta
Represented By: Andrew Charles Murphy
Represented By: Vincent Louis DiTommaso
Represented By: Peter Scott Lubin
Represented By: Patrick Doyle Austermuehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?