Illinois Tamale Co. v. El-Greg, Inc.

Plaintiff: Illinois Tamale Co.
Defendant: El-Greg, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv05387
Filed: May 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MOTION by Defendant El-Greg, Inc. for judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50 (Becker, Alan)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order written by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/14/2018: For the reasons stated, the Court finds defendant's defense of laches meritorious to the following extent: plaintiff's damages on its Lanham Act c laims are reduced to $10,000 (as opposed to $20,000), and its recovery of defendant's profits on the Lanham Act claims is reduced to $30,000 (as opposed to $60,000). It appears that these amounts do not duplicate the damage s the jury awarded on the breach of contract claim, which total $100,000. The Court directs the Clerk to enter judgment in favor of plaintiff Illinois Tamale Co. on all of its claims against defendant El-Greg, Inc, awarding Illinois Tamale damages in the total amount of $140,000. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/29/2018: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies defendant's motion for partial summary judgment [dkt. no. 70] and d enies plaintiff's cross-motion for partial summary judgment [dkt. no. 96]. Docket entry 87 is not actually a motion and is therefore terminated as a pending motion. The case is set for a status hearing on April 5, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. for the purpose of setting a trial date and discussing the possibility of settlement. (mk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Illinois Tamale Co. v. El-Greg, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Tamale Co.
Represented By: Eugene J. Geekie, Jr.
Represented By: Judith L. Grubner
Represented By: Joseph Ming Kuo
Represented By: Kevin H Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El-Greg, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Anthony Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?